Larry Beverly v. Alex Azar
Plaintiff / Appellant: LARRY D. BEVERLY and ADA R. WILSON
Defendant / Appellee: ALEX M. AZAR, Secretary, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services
Case Number: 20-1724
Filed: July 6, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER filed granting motion to extend filing time [ # 11 ]. Number of days granted: 28. Opening brief and appendix due 10/02/2020. Response brief due 10/30/2020. Paper copy requirements are temporarily suspended unless the case is under pre-argument review or being scheduled for argument, in which case a total of four paper copies of formal briefs and appendices are required. Copies to all parties.. [1000794622] [20-1724] MR [Entered: 08/18/2020 11:20 AM]
August 18, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION by Larry D. Beverly to extend filing time for opening brief and appendix Case load and impact of Covid-19. until October 2, 2020.. Date and method of service: 08/18/2020 ecf, US mail. [1000794495] [20-1724] Nathaniel Johnson [Entered: 08/18/2020 09:59 AM]
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER filed extending filing time for opening brief and appendix until 09/04/2020. Number of days granted: 18. Opening brief and appendix due 09/04/2020. Response brief due 10/02/2020. Paper copy requirements are temporarily suspended unless the case is under pre-argument review or being scheduled for argument, in which case a total of four paper copies of formal briefs and appendices are required. Copies to all parties. [1000786126] [20-1724] TW [Entered: 08/03/2020 02:31 PM]
July 21, 2020 Filing 9 Initial mediation conference scheduled. [20-1724] LHP [Entered: 07/21/2020 02:47 PM]
July 20, 2020 Filing 8 DOCKETING STATEMENT by Larry D. Beverly and Ada R. Wilson. [20-1724] Nathaniel Johnson [Entered: 07/20/2020 10:35 PM]
July 20, 2020 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Larry D. Beverly and Ada R. Wilson. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000778113] [20-1724] Nathaniel Johnson [Entered: 07/20/2020 10:33 PM]
July 20, 2020 Filing 6 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM by Larry D. Beverly and Ada R. Wilson for. [20-1724] Nathaniel Johnson [Entered: 07/20/2020 10:32 PM]
July 20, 2020 Filing 5 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Nathaniel Johnson for Larry D. Beverly and Ada R. Wilson. [1000778111] [20-1724] Nathaniel Johnson [Entered: 07/20/2020 10:29 PM]
July 6, 2020 Filing 4 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Molissa H. Farber for Alex M. Azar. [1000769182] [20-1724] Molissa Farber [Entered: 07/06/2020 11:02 AM]
July 6, 2020 Filing 3 BRIEFING ORDER filed.. Paper copy requirements are temporarily suspended unless the case is under pre-argument review or being scheduled for argument, in which case a total of four paper copies of formal briefs and appendices is required. Opening Brief and Appendix due 08/17/2020. Response Brief due 09/14/2020 [20-1724] MR [Entered: 07/06/2020 10:14 AM]
July 6, 2020 Filing 2 DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case Originating case number: 8:18-cv-02697-SDT.. [20-1724] MR [Entered: 07/06/2020 10:13 AM]
July 6, 2020 Filing 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 8:18-cv-02697-SDT. Case manager: MRadday. [20-1724] MR [Entered: 07/06/2020 10:12 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Larry Beverly v. Alex Azar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: LARRY D. BEVERLY
Represented By: Nathaniel David Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ADA R. WILSON
Represented By: Nathaniel David Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ALEX M. AZAR, Secretary, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services
Represented By: Molissa Heather Farber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?