Jane Doe v. James Dewees
Defendant / Appellee: MARY K. SMITH, District Court Administrative Clerk, JOYCE SCHAUM, Contractor with CONMED, UNIDENTIFIED CONTRACTOR, CONMED, DOUGLAS KRIETE, Deputy Sheriff, LONNIE J. JERSILD, Correctional Officer, MICHAEL GREEN, Correctional Officer, JERSILD, Correctional Officer, JOHNNA L. STEED, District Court Clerk, AMANDA BLIZZARD, Correctional Officer, CATHERINE PILO, CHESTER L. ARNOTT, Correctional Officer, JOHN BOWEN, III, Correctional Officer, KATHRYN GLENN, District Court Clerk, CRAIG KOERNER, Correctional Officer, NELLIE M. LONG, District Court Clerk, ROBERT E. SMITH, Correctional Officer, PAULA HYDE, Correctional Officer, ROCHELLE HERMAN, contractor witn CONMED, KRISTY CERNY, Correctional Officer, TERESA L. BOSLEY, Correctional Officer, MICHELE MINER, Court Commissioner, WESLEY L. DAVIS, Correctional Officer, GARTH MAYS, Correctional Officer, JAMES CERNY, Correctional Officer, C. HAINES, District Court Clerk, NADIA MEDEVICH, Correctional Officer, A. PARKS, Correctional Officer, DAREN METZLER, Deputy Sheriff, MEGAN DICKERSON, Administrative Commissioner, KRISTY NAILL, Correctional Officer, CATHY A. HAINES, District Court Clerk, SIX UNIDENTIFIED CORRECTIONAL OFFICERS, JENNIFER A. LEVEE, District Court Clerk, REBECCA L. ELLIGSON, District Court Clerk, KENNETH CHESGREEN, Correctional Officer, ADAM G. WELLS, Assitant State's Attorney for Carroll County, WADE BOLNER, FRANCES A. BYAN, District Court Clerk, MICHAEL E. BOYD, JAMES T. DEWEES, Sheriff of Carroll County, ROBIN L. SHORB, Correctional Officer, FIVE UNIDENTIFIED DISTRICT COURT CLERKS, JOANN ELLINGHAUS-JONES, CYNTHIA M. SIZEMORE, District Court Clerk, BRENDA S. STOREY, District Court Clerk, TONY L. MUMMERT, Correctional Officer, TRACY LILLEHAUG, Correctional Officer, JOHN F. GLORIOSO, District Court Clerk, GEORGE HARDINGER, Warden of Carroll County Detention Center (CCDC), BRIAN DELEONARDO, State's Attorney for Carroll County, DENNIS HARMON, Correctional Officer, C.S. WENDELL HIGHSMITH, JR., Correctional Officer, BEN CRAFT, Deputy Sheriff, BRITNIE BOSCHERT, Employee of CCDC, FRANCES M. NOEL, TRACEY L. LEISTER, District Court Clerk, ASHLEY MORRELL, Correctional Officer, CONMED HEALTHCARE MANAGEMENT, MICHAEL ANDREWS, Correctional Officer, CHEYENNE LEE, Correctional Officer, JUDY WARNER, Correctional Officer, MICHAEL L. MCCREA, MARY C. REESE, District Court Judge, E. M. ARNOLD, District Court Clerk and JOSHUA BOSCHERT, Correctional Officer
Plaintiff / Appellant: JANE DOE
Case Number: 20-1736
Filed: July 8, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2020 Filing 10 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Michael Andrews, Chester L. Arnott, Amanda Blizzard, Wade Bolner, Joshua Boschert, John Bowen, III, Michael E. Boyd, James Cerny, Kristy Cerny, Ben Craft, James T. Dewees, Michael Green, Cathy A. Haines, George Hardinger, Dennis Harmon, C.S. Wendell Highsmith, Jr., Lonnie J. Jersild, Paula Hyde, Craig Koerner, Douglas Kriete, Cheyenne Lee, Tracy Lillehaug, Garth Mays, Michael L. McCrea, Nadia Medevich, Daren Metzler, Ashley Morrell, Tony L. Mummert, Kristy Naill, A. Parks, Robin L. Shorb and Robert E. Smith. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000788587] [20-1736] Matthew Peter [Entered: 08/06/2020 01:35 PM]
August 6, 2020 Filing 9 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Jason L. Levine for Michael Andrews, E. M. Arnold, Chester L. Arnott, Amanda Blizzard, Wade Bolner, Joshua Boschert, John Bowen, III, Michael E. Boyd, James Cerny, Kristy Cerny, Ben Craft, James T. Dewees, Michael Green, Cathy A. Haines, George Hardinger, Dennis Harmon, C.S. Wendell Highsmith, Jr., Paula Hyde, Lonnie J. Jersild, Craig Koerner, Douglas Kriete, Cheyenne Lee, Tracy Lillehaug, Michael L. McCrea, Tony L. Mummert, Kristy Naill and Robin L. Shorb. [1000788586] [20-1736] Matthew Peter [Entered: 08/06/2020 01:33 PM]
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER filed granting motion to extend filing time [ # 7 ]. Number of days granted: 38. Informal Opening Brief due 09/14/2020. Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Jane Doe. [1000785087] [20-1736] TW [Entered: 07/31/2020 11:23 AM]
July 31, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION by Jane Doe to extend filing time for informal opening brief until 09/14/2020. Date and method of service: 07/31/2020 E-Mail. [1000785085] [20-1736] TW [Entered: 07/31/2020 11:20 AM]
July 31, 2020 Filing 6 CHANGE OF ADDRESS Notice by Jane Doe. [20-1736] TW [Entered: 07/31/2020 10:42 AM]
July 30, 2020 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Britnie Boschert, Rochelle Herman and Joyce Schaum. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000784586] [20-1736] Megan Mantzavinos [Entered: 07/30/2020 02:47 PM]
July 30, 2020 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Conmed Healthcare Management. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000784341] [20-1736] Megan Mantzavinos [Entered: 07/30/2020 11:33 AM]
July 29, 2020 Filing 3 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Megan T. Mantzavinos for Conmed Healthcare Management, Rochelle Herman, Britnie Boschert and Joyce Schaum. [1000783492] [20-1736] Megan Mantzavinos [Entered: 07/29/2020 08:26 AM]
July 14, 2020 Filing 2 INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed.. Informal Opening Brief due 08/07/2020 Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief served. [20-1736] RHS [Entered: 07/14/2020 03:27 PM]
July 8, 2020 Filing 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 8:18-cv-02014-TDC. Case manager: RSewell. [20-1736] RHS [Entered: 07/10/2020 09:52 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Jane Doe v. James Dewees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MARY K. SMITH, District Court Administrative Clerk
Represented By: Jason L. Levine Esq.
Represented By: Michele J. McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOYCE SCHAUM, Contractor with CONMED
Represented By: Jason L. Levine Esq.
Represented By: Sharon E. Conners
Represented By: Megan Trocki Mantzavinos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNIDENTIFIED CONTRACTOR, CONMED
Represented By: Jason L. Levine Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DOUGLAS KRIETE, Deputy Sheriff
Represented By: Jason L. Levine Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LONNIE J. JERSILD, Correctional Officer
Represented By: Jason L. Levine Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MICHAEL GREEN, Correctional Officer
Represented By: Jason L. Levine Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JERSILD, Correctional Officer
Represented By: Jason L. Levine Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOHNNA L. STEED, District Court Clerk
Represented By: Jason L. Levine Esq.
Represented By: Michele J. McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AMANDA BLIZZARD, Correctional Officer
Represented By: Jason L. Levine Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CATHERINE PILO
Represented By: Jason L. Levine Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHESTER L. ARNOTT, Correctional Officer
Represented By: Jason L. Levine Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOHN BOWEN, III, Correctional Officer
Represented By: Jason L. Levine Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KATHRYN GLENN, District Court Clerk
Represented By: Jason L. Levine Esq.
Represented By: Michele J. McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CRAIG KOERNER, Correctional Officer
Represented By: Jason L. Levine Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NELLIE M. LONG, District Court Clerk
Represented By: Jason L. Levine Esq.
Represented By: Michele J. McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ROBERT E. SMITH, Correctional Officer
Represented By: Jason L. Levine Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PAULA HYDE, Correctional Officer
Represented By: Jason L. Levine Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ROCHELLE HERMAN, contractor witn CONMED
Represented By: Jason L. Levine Esq.
Represented By: Megan Trocki Mantzavinos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KRISTY CERNY, Correctional Officer
Represented By: Jason L. Levine Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TERESA L. BOSLEY, Correctional Officer
Represented By: Jason L. Levine Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MICHELE MINER, Court Commissioner
Represented By: Jason L. Levine Esq.
Represented By: Michele J. McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WESLEY L. DAVIS, Correctional Officer
Represented By: Jason L. Levine Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GARTH MAYS, Correctional Officer
Represented By: Jason L. Levine Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JAMES CERNY, Correctional Officer
Represented By: Jason L. Levine Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: C. HAINES, District Court Clerk
Represented By: Jason L. Levine Esq.
Represented By: Michele J. McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NADIA MEDEVICH, Correctional Officer
Represented By: Jason L. Levine Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: A. PARKS, Correctional Officer
Represented By: Jason L. Levine Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DAREN METZLER, Deputy Sheriff
Represented By: Jason L. Levine Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MEGAN DICKERSON, Administrative Commissioner
Represented By: Michele J. McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KRISTY NAILL, Correctional Officer
Represented By: Jason L. Levine Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CATHY A. HAINES, District Court Clerk
Represented By: Jason L. Levine Esq.
Represented By: Wendy Lozinsky Shiff
Represented By: Michele J. McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SIX UNIDENTIFIED CORRECTIONAL OFFICERS
Represented By: Jason L. Levine Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JENNIFER A. LEVEE, District Court Clerk
Represented By: Jason L. Levine Esq.
Represented By: Michele J. McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: REBECCA L. ELLIGSON, District Court Clerk
Represented By: Jason L. Levine Esq.
Represented By: Michele J. McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KENNETH CHESGREEN, Correctional Officer
Represented By: Jason L. Levine Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ADAM G. WELLS, Assitant State's Attorney for Carroll County
Represented By: Jason L. Levine Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WADE BOLNER
Represented By: Jason L. Levine Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FRANCES A. BYAN, District Court Clerk
Represented By: Jason L. Levine Esq.
Represented By: Wendy Lozinsky Shiff
Represented By: Michele J. McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MICHAEL E. BOYD
Represented By: Jason L. Levine Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JAMES T. DEWEES, Sheriff of Carroll County
Represented By: Jason L. Levine Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ROBIN L. SHORB, Correctional Officer
Represented By: Jason L. Levine Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FIVE UNIDENTIFIED DISTRICT COURT CLERKS
Represented By: Jason L. Levine Esq.
Represented By: Michele J. McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOANN ELLINGHAUS-JONES
Represented By: Jason L. Levine Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CYNTHIA M. SIZEMORE, District Court Clerk
Represented By: Jason L. Levine Esq.
Represented By: Michele J. McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BRENDA S. STOREY, District Court Clerk
Represented By: Jason L. Levine Esq.
Represented By: Wendy Lozinsky Shiff
Represented By: Michele J. McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TONY L. MUMMERT, Correctional Officer
Represented By: Jason L. Levine Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TRACY LILLEHAUG, Correctional Officer
Represented By: Jason L. Levine Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOHN F. GLORIOSO, District Court Clerk
Represented By: Jason L. Levine Esq.
Represented By: Michele J. McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GEORGE HARDINGER, Warden of Carroll County Detention Center (CCDC)
Represented By: Jason L. Levine Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BRIAN DELEONARDO, State's Attorney for Carroll County
Represented By: Jason L. Levine Esq.
Represented By: Wendy Lozinsky Shiff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DENNIS HARMON, Correctional Officer
Represented By: Jason L. Levine Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: C.S. WENDELL HIGHSMITH, JR., Correctional Officer
Represented By: Jason L. Levine Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BEN CRAFT, Deputy Sheriff
Represented By: Jason L. Levine Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BRITNIE BOSCHERT, Employee of CCDC
Represented By: Sharon E. Conners
Represented By: Megan Trocki Mantzavinos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FRANCES M. NOEL
Represented By: Jason L. Levine Esq.
Represented By: Michele J. McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TRACEY L. LEISTER, District Court Clerk
Represented By: Jason L. Levine Esq.
Represented By: Michele J. McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ASHLEY MORRELL, Correctional Officer
Represented By: Jason L. Levine Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CONMED HEALTHCARE MANAGEMENT
Represented By: Megan Trocki Mantzavinos
Represented By: Jason L. Levine Esq.
Represented By: Sharon E. Conners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MICHAEL ANDREWS, Correctional Officer
Represented By: Jason L. Levine Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHEYENNE LEE, Correctional Officer
Represented By: Jason L. Levine Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JUDY WARNER, Correctional Officer
Represented By: Jason L. Levine Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MICHAEL L. MCCREA
Represented By: Jason L. Levine Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MARY C. REESE, District Court Judge
Represented By: Jason L. Levine Esq.
Represented By: Michele J. McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: E. M. ARNOLD, District Court Clerk
Represented By: Jason L. Levine Esq.
Represented By: Wendy Lozinsky Shiff
Represented By: Michele J. McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOSHUA BOSCHERT, Correctional Officer
Represented By: Jason L. Levine Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JANE DOE
Represented By: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?