Amer College of Obstetricians v. FDA
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES, UNITED STATES FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION, STEPHAN HAHN, M.D., in his official capacity of Commissioner of Food and Drugs, and his employees, agents and successors in office and ALEX AZAR, in his official capacity of Secretary, United States Department of of Health and Human Services, and his employees, agents and successors in office
Appellant: STATE OF MISSISSIPPI, STATE OF KENTUCKY, STATE OF INDIANA, STATE OF LOUISIANA, STATE OF ARKANSAS, STATE OF OKLAHOMA, STATE OF MISSOURI, STATE OF ALABAMA, STATE OF NEBRASKA and STATE OF IDAHO
Plaintiff / Appellee: HONOR MACNAUGHTON, M.D., NEW YORK STATE ACADEMY OF FAMILY PHYSICIANS, on behalf of its members and members' patients, SISTERSONG WOMEN OF COLOR REPRODUCTIVE JUSTICE COLLECTIVE, on behalf of its members and members' patients, AMERICAN COLLEGE OF OBSTETRICIANS AND GYNECOLOGISTS, COUNCIL OF UNIVERSITY CHAIRS OF OBSTETRICS AND GYNECOLOGY and AMERICAN COLLEGE OF OBSTETRICIANS AND GYNECOLOGISTS, on behalf of its members and members' patients
Case Number: 20-1784
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE ISSUED to American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists, Council of University Chairs of Obstetrics and Gynecology, Honor MacNaughton, M.D., New York State Academy of Family Physicians and SisterSong Women of Color Reproductive Justice Collective in 20-1784, Alex Azar, Stephan Hahn, M.D., HHS and FDA in 20-1824 requesting response to Motion to consolidate case [ # 21 ], Motion to file separate brief [ # 21 ]Response due 09/21/2020..[1000809410]. [20-1784, 20-1824, 20-1970] RHS [Entered: 09/11/2020 03:57 PM]
September 11, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION by State of Indiana, State of Louisiana, State of Alabama, State of Arkansas, State of Idaho, State of Kentucky, State of Mississippi, State of Missouri, State of Nebraska and State of Oklahoma to consolidate case 20-1824 with 20-1784 , to file separate briefs [21]. Date and method of service: 09/11/2020 ecf. [1000809201] [20-1784] Thomas Fisher [Entered: 09/11/2020 01:20 PM]
September 2, 2020 Filing 20 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Ruth Harlow for American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists, Council of University Chairs of Obstetrics and Gynecology, Honor MacNaughton, M.D., New York State Academy of Family Physicians and SisterSong Women of Color Reproductive Justice Collective. [1000804191] [20-1784] Ruth Harlow [Entered: 09/02/2020 11:01 AM]
September 2, 2020 Filing 19 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Rachel Reeves for American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists, Council of University Chairs of Obstetrics and Gynecology, Honor MacNaughton, M.D., New York State Academy of Family Physicians and SisterSong Women of Color Reproductive Justice Collective. [1000804183] [20-1784] Rachel Reeves [Entered: 09/02/2020 10:57 AM]
September 2, 2020 Filing 18 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Julia Kaye for American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists, Council of University Chairs of Obstetrics and Gynecology, Honor MacNaughton, M.D., New York State Academy of Family Physicians and SisterSong Women of Color Reproductive Justice Collective. [1000804177] [20-1784] Julia Kaye [Entered: 09/02/2020 10:50 AM]
September 2, 2020 Filing 17 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Lorie Chaiten for American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists, Council of University Chairs of Obstetrics and Gynecology, Honor MacNaughton, M.D., New York State Academy of Family Physicians and SisterSong Women of Color Reproductive Justice Collective. [1000804168] [20-1784] Lorie Chaiten [Entered: 09/02/2020 10:48 AM]
September 2, 2020 Filing 16 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Jennifer Dalven for American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists, SisterSong Women of Color Reproductive Justice Collective, Council of University Chairs of Obstetrics and Gynecology, Honor MacNaughton, M.D. and New York State Academy of Family Physicians. [1000804145] [20-1784] Jennifer Dalven [Entered: 09/02/2020 10:33 AM]
August 24, 2020 Filing 15 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by SisterSong Women of Color Reproductive Justice Collective. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000798003] [20-1784] Andrew Tutt [Entered: 08/24/2020 01:53 PM]
August 24, 2020 Filing 14 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by New York State Academy of Family Physicians. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000798000] [20-1784] Andrew Tutt [Entered: 08/24/2020 01:52 PM]
August 24, 2020 Filing 13 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Council of University Chairs of Obstetrics and Gynecology. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000797998] [20-1784] Andrew Tutt [Entered: 08/24/2020 01:51 PM]
August 24, 2020 Filing 12 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000797996] [20-1784] Andrew Tutt [Entered: 08/24/2020 01:51 PM]
August 24, 2020 Filing 11 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Andrew T. Tutt for American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists, Council of University Chairs of Obstetrics and Gynecology, Honor MacNaughton, M.D., New York State Academy of Family Physicians and SisterSong Women of Color Reproductive Justice Collective. [1000797994] [20-1784] Andrew Tutt [Entered: 08/24/2020 01:50 PM]
August 24, 2020 Filing 10 BRIEFING ORDER filed.. Paper copy requirements are temporarily suspended unless the case is under pre-argument review or being scheduled for argument, in which case a total of four paper copies of formal briefs and appendices are required. Opening Brief and Appendix due 10/05/2020. Response Brief due 11/02/2020 [20-1784] RHS [Entered: 08/24/2020 12:18 PM]
August 6, 2020 Filing 9 Revised TRANSCRIPT ORDER ACKNOWLEDGMENT filed for Rebecca Stonestreet. Identify by proceeding and date all transcript ordered from this court reporter: Preliminary Injunction hearing - 6/19/2020. Names of all parties ordering transcript from this reporter: State of Indiana et al.. Originating case number: 8:20-cv-01320-TDC. Transcript due from Rebecca Stonestreet, Official Court Reporter on 08/17/2020. [20-1784] RHS [Entered: 08/06/2020 08:46 AM]
August 5, 2020 Filing 8 TRANSCRIPT ORDER ACKNOWLEDGMENT filed for Rebecca Stonestreet. Identify by proceeding and date all transcript ordered from this court reporter: Preliminary Injunction hearing - 6/19/2020. Names of all parties ordering transcript from this reporter: Originating case number: 8:20-cv-01320-TDC. Transcript due from Rebecca Stonestreet, Official Court Reporter on 10/13/2020. [20-1784] RHS [Entered: 08/05/2020 02:13 PM]
August 3, 2020 Filing 7 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Gene C. Schaerr for State of Alabama, State of Arkansas, State of Idaho, State of Indiana, State of Kentucky, State of Louisiana, State of Mississippi, State of Missouri, State of Nebraska and State of Oklahoma. [1000785912] [20-1784] Gene Schaerr [Entered: 08/03/2020 11:47 AM]
August 3, 2020 Filing 6 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Stephen S Schwartz for State of Alabama, State of Arkansas, State of Idaho, State of Indiana, State of Kentucky, State of Louisiana, State of Mississippi, State of Missouri, State of Nebraska and State of Oklahoma. [1000785863] [20-1784] Stephen Schwartz [Entered: 08/03/2020 11:19 AM]
August 3, 2020 Filing 5 DOCKETING STATEMENT by State of Indiana, State of Alabama, State of Arkansas, State of Idaho, State of Kentucky, State of Louisiana, State of Mississippi, State of Missouri, State of Nebraska and State of Oklahoma. [20-1784] Thomas Fisher [Entered: 08/03/2020 11:10 AM]
August 3, 2020 Filing 4 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Thomas M. Fisher for State of Indiana, State of Alabama, State of Arkansas, State of Idaho, State of Kentucky, State of Louisiana, State of Mississippi, State of Missouri, State of Nebraska and State of Oklahoma. [1000785839] [20-1784] Thomas Fisher [Entered: 08/03/2020 11:05 AM]
July 29, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE ISSUED re: case caption modified. Mailed to: Alexander Bush, Gina Colarusso, Anjali Dalal, Julia Kaye, Elizabeth Murrill, Julia Payne, Rachel Reeves, Joseph St. John, David Weiner. [20-1784] JSN [Entered: 07/29/2020 03:51 PM]
July 20, 2020 Filing 2 DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case Originating case number: 8:20-cv-01320-TDC.. [20-1784] RHS [Entered: 07/20/2020 09:32 AM]
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 8:20-cv-01320-TDC. Case manager: RSewell. [20-1784] RHS [Entered: 07/17/2020 01:14 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Amer College of Obstetricians v. FDA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: STATE OF MISSISSIPPI
Represented By: Joseph Scott St. John
Represented By: Thomas Molnar Fisher
Represented By: Gene C. Schaerr
Represented By: Alexander Alan Bush
Represented By: Julia Payne
Represented By: Stephen S. Schwartz
Represented By: Elizabeth Baker Murrill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: STATE OF KENTUCKY
Represented By: Joseph Scott St. John
Represented By: Thomas Molnar Fisher
Represented By: Gene C. Schaerr
Represented By: Alexander Alan Bush
Represented By: Julia Payne
Represented By: Stephen S. Schwartz
Represented By: Elizabeth Baker Murrill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: STATE OF INDIANA
Represented By: Joseph Scott St. John
Represented By: Thomas Molnar Fisher
Represented By: Gene C. Schaerr
Represented By: Alexander Alan Bush
Represented By: Julia Payne
Represented By: Stephen S. Schwartz
Represented By: Elizabeth Baker Murrill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: STATE OF LOUISIANA
Represented By: Joseph Scott St. John
Represented By: Thomas Molnar Fisher
Represented By: Gene C. Schaerr
Represented By: Alexander Alan Bush
Represented By: Julia Payne
Represented By: Stephen S. Schwartz
Represented By: Elizabeth Baker Murrill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: STATE OF ARKANSAS
Represented By: Joseph Scott St. John
Represented By: Thomas Molnar Fisher
Represented By: Gene C. Schaerr
Represented By: Alexander Alan Bush
Represented By: Julia Payne
Represented By: Stephen S. Schwartz
Represented By: Elizabeth Baker Murrill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: STATE OF OKLAHOMA
Represented By: Joseph Scott St. John
Represented By: Thomas Molnar Fisher
Represented By: Gene C. Schaerr
Represented By: Alexander Alan Bush
Represented By: Julia Payne
Represented By: Stephen S. Schwartz
Represented By: Elizabeth Baker Murrill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: STATE OF MISSOURI
Represented By: Joseph Scott St. John
Represented By: Thomas Molnar Fisher
Represented By: Gene C. Schaerr
Represented By: Alexander Alan Bush
Represented By: Julia Payne
Represented By: Stephen S. Schwartz
Represented By: Elizabeth Baker Murrill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: STATE OF ALABAMA
Represented By: Joseph Scott St. John
Represented By: Thomas Molnar Fisher
Represented By: Gene C. Schaerr
Represented By: Alexander Alan Bush
Represented By: Julia Payne
Represented By: Stephen S. Schwartz
Represented By: Elizabeth Baker Murrill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: STATE OF NEBRASKA
Represented By: Joseph Scott St. John
Represented By: Thomas Molnar Fisher
Represented By: Gene C. Schaerr
Represented By: Alexander Alan Bush
Represented By: Julia Payne
Represented By: Stephen S. Schwartz
Represented By: Elizabeth Baker Murrill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: STATE OF IDAHO
Represented By: Joseph Scott St. John
Represented By: Thomas Molnar Fisher
Represented By: Gene C. Schaerr
Represented By: Alexander Alan Bush
Represented By: Julia Payne
Represented By: Stephen S. Schwartz
Represented By: Elizabeth Baker Murrill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES
Represented By: Hilary Keith Perkins
Represented By: Molissa Heather Farber
Represented By: Michael Raab
Represented By: Joshua Yrion Dos Santos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION
Represented By: Hilary Keith Perkins
Represented By: Molissa Heather Farber
Represented By: Michael Raab
Represented By: Joshua Yrion Dos Santos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEPHAN HAHN, M.D., in his official capacity of Commissioner of Food and Drugs, and his employees, agents and successors in office
Represented By: Hilary Keith Perkins
Represented By: Molissa Heather Farber
Represented By: Michael Raab
Represented By: Joshua Yrion Dos Santos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEX AZAR, in his official capacity of Secretary, United States Department of of Health and Human Services, and his employees, agents and successors in office
Represented By: Hilary Keith Perkins
Represented By: Molissa Heather Farber
Represented By: Michael Raab
Represented By: Joshua Yrion Dos Santos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: HONOR MACNAUGHTON, M.D.
Represented By: Ruth Ellen Harlow
Represented By: Jocelyn Annette Wiesner
Represented By: Anjali Dalal
Represented By: Gina Marie Colarusso
Represented By: David Weiner
Represented By: Andrew Tutt
Represented By: Julia Kaye
Represented By: Rachel Reeves
Represented By: John A. Freedman Esq.
Represented By: Julia Heather Kaye
Represented By: Anjali Sudhir Dalal
Represented By: Jennifer Ellen Dalven
Represented By: Rachel Marris Reeves
Represented By: Lorie Ann Chaiten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: NEW YORK STATE ACADEMY OF FAMILY PHYSICIANS, on behalf of its members and members' patients
Represented By: Ruth Ellen Harlow
Represented By: Jocelyn Annette Wiesner
Represented By: Anjali Dalal
Represented By: Gina Marie Colarusso
Represented By: David Weiner
Represented By: Andrew Tutt
Represented By: Julia Kaye
Represented By: Rachel Reeves
Represented By: John A. Freedman Esq.
Represented By: Julia Heather Kaye
Represented By: Anjali Sudhir Dalal
Represented By: Jennifer Ellen Dalven
Represented By: Rachel Marris Reeves
Represented By: Lorie Ann Chaiten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: SISTERSONG WOMEN OF COLOR REPRODUCTIVE JUSTICE COLLECTIVE, on behalf of its members and members' patients
Represented By: Ruth Ellen Harlow
Represented By: Jocelyn Annette Wiesner
Represented By: Anjali Dalal
Represented By: Gina Marie Colarusso
Represented By: David Weiner
Represented By: Andrew Tutt
Represented By: Julia Kaye
Represented By: Rachel Reeves
Represented By: John A. Freedman Esq.
Represented By: Julia Heather Kaye
Represented By: Anjali Sudhir Dalal
Represented By: Jennifer Ellen Dalven
Represented By: Rachel Marris Reeves
Represented By: Lorie Ann Chaiten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: AMERICAN COLLEGE OF OBSTETRICIANS AND GYNECOLOGISTS
Represented By: Ruth Ellen Harlow
Represented By: Jocelyn Annette Wiesner
Represented By: Anjali Dalal
Represented By: Gina Marie Colarusso
Represented By: David Weiner
Represented By: Andrew Tutt
Represented By: Julia Kaye
Represented By: Rachel Reeves
Represented By: John A. Freedman Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: COUNCIL OF UNIVERSITY CHAIRS OF OBSTETRICS AND GYNECOLOGY
Represented By: Ruth Ellen Harlow
Represented By: Jocelyn Annette Wiesner
Represented By: Anjali Dalal
Represented By: Gina Marie Colarusso
Represented By: David Weiner
Represented By: Andrew Tutt
Represented By: Julia Kaye
Represented By: Rachel Reeves
Represented By: John A. Freedman Esq.
Represented By: Julia Heather Kaye
Represented By: Anjali Sudhir Dalal
Represented By: Jennifer Ellen Dalven
Represented By: Rachel Marris Reeves
Represented By: Lorie Ann Chaiten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: AMERICAN COLLEGE OF OBSTETRICIANS AND GYNECOLOGISTS, on behalf of its members and members' patients
Represented By: Ruth Ellen Harlow
Represented By: Jocelyn Annette Wiesner
Represented By: Gina Marie Colarusso
Represented By: David Weiner
Represented By: Andrew Tutt
Represented By: John A. Freedman Esq.
Represented By: Julia Heather Kaye
Represented By: Anjali Sudhir Dalal
Represented By: Jennifer Ellen Dalven
Represented By: Rachel Marris Reeves
Represented By: Lorie Ann Chaiten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?