Tacitus Hall v. Timothy Anderson
Defendant / Appellee: NATIONAL SERVICING CENTER, FORD MANUFACTURER, KEITH MICHAEL YACKO, JOHN STALLINGS, President, METLIFE BANK, N.A., CHARLENE WHITE, Circuit Clerk, DMV COMMISSIONERS, HOMEWARD/CARITAS, TIMOTHY V. ANDERSON, HUD Commissioner & Anderson Law, METLIFE HOME LOANS, LLC, VIRGINIA COMMONWEALTH UNIVERSITY, BETTER HOUSING COALITION, VIRGINIA DEPARTMENT OF MOTOR VEHICLES, VIRGINIA ELECTRIC & POWER COMPANY, d/b/a Dominion Energy, JAMES MATTHEWS, HENRICO & VA COURTS, AAA, HUD/TSS, LLC, JOHN MARSHALL CORPORATE WARD SYSTEMS, JOHN ASBURY, CEO, TRACY THORNE-BEGLAND, WILLIAM I.F. COLLINS, UNION BANK AND TRUST, DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, MCMICHAEL TAYLOR GRAY, LLC, ELECTED CIRCUIT CLERK JEWITT, DENISE HARRIS, Circuit Clerk, MANDI LOUPASSI, HUD, United States Housing & Urban Development, J. SARGEANT REYNOLDS COMMUNITY COLLEGE, RICHMOND FORD LINCOLN and U. S. POSTAL SERVICE
Plaintiff / Appellant: TACITUS ANASTACIUS HALL, a/k/a Tazz Hall
Case Number: 20-1786
Filed: July 20, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2020 Filing 15 SUPPLEMENTAL INFORMAL OPENING BRIEF by Tacitus Anastacius Hall. [20-1786] EB [Entered: 09/11/2020 02:57 PM]
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER filed granting Motion to file supplemental brief [ # 13 ]. Any supplemental opening brief due: 09/09/2020. Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Tacitus Anastacius Hall. [1000795633] [20-1786] EB [Entered: 08/19/2020 02:36 PM]
August 19, 2020 Filing 13 Renewed MOTION by Tacitus Anastacius Hall to file supplemental brief. [1000795503] [20-1786] EB [Entered: 08/19/2020 01:09 PM]
August 19, 2020 Filing 12 INFORMAL OPENING BRIEF by Tacitus Anastacius Hall. [20-1786] EB [Entered: 08/19/2020 01:06 PM]
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER filed denying Motion to file supplemental brief [ # 10 ]. Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Tacitus Anastacius Hall. [1000794825] [20-1786] EB [Entered: 08/18/2020 02:30 PM]
August 17, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION by Tacitus Anastacius Hall file supplemental brief. [1000794469] [20-1786] EB [Entered: 08/18/2020 09:51 AM]
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER filed granting Motion to extend filing time [ # 8 ]. Number of days granted: 30. Informal Opening Brief due 09/16/2020. Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Tacitus Anastacius Hall. [1000794125] [20-1786] EB [Entered: 08/17/2020 04:56 PM]
August 17, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION by Tacitus Anastacius Hall to extend filing time for informal opening brief. [1000794122] [20-1786] EB [Entered: 08/17/2020 04:55 PM]
July 20, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE ISSUED re: filing of amended/additional notice of appeal. Date Notice filed: 07/20/2020. Mailed to: Tacitus Anastacius Hall. [20-1786] EB [Entered: 07/20/2020 03:51 PM]
July 20, 2020 Filing 6 INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Tacitus A. Hall. Informal Opening Brief due 08/13/2020. Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief served. [20-1786] EB [Entered: 07/20/2020 11:10 AM]
July 20, 2020 Filing 4 ASSEMBLED ELECTRONIC RECORD docketed. Originating case number: 3:20-cv-00163-JAG. Record in folder? Yes. Record reviewed? Yes. PSR included? N/A. [20-1786] EB [Entered: 07/20/2020 10:59 AM]
July 20, 2020 Filing 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 3:20-cv-00163-JAG. Case manager: EBorneisen. [20-1786] EB [Entered: 07/20/2020 10:29 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Tacitus Hall v. Timothy Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NATIONAL SERVICING CENTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FORD MANUFACTURER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KEITH MICHAEL YACKO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOHN STALLINGS, President
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: METLIFE BANK, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHARLENE WHITE, Circuit Clerk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DMV COMMISSIONERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HOMEWARD/CARITAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TIMOTHY V. ANDERSON, HUD Commissioner & Anderson Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: METLIFE HOME LOANS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: VIRGINIA COMMONWEALTH UNIVERSITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BETTER HOUSING COALITION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: VIRGINIA DEPARTMENT OF MOTOR VEHICLES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: VIRGINIA ELECTRIC & POWER COMPANY, d/b/a Dominion Energy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JAMES MATTHEWS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HENRICO & VA COURTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AAA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HUD/TSS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOHN MARSHALL CORPORATE WARD SYSTEMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOHN ASBURY, CEO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TRACY THORNE-BEGLAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WILLIAM I.F. COLLINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNION BANK AND TRUST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MCMICHAEL TAYLOR GRAY, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ELECTED CIRCUIT CLERK JEWITT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DENISE HARRIS, Circuit Clerk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MANDI LOUPASSI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HUD, United States Housing & Urban Development
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: J. SARGEANT REYNOLDS COMMUNITY COLLEGE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RICHMOND FORD LINCOLN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: U. S. POSTAL SERVICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: TACITUS ANASTACIUS HALL, a/k/a Tazz Hall
Represented By: Tacitus Anastacius Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?