James Jacobs v. Richland County
Defendant / Appellee: LEON LOTT, individually and in his official capacity as Richland County Sheriff, RICHLAND COUNTY, DEPUTY JUSTIN MOODY, individually and each in his Official capacity as Richland County Deputy Sheriff, RICHLAND COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT, DEPUTY RANDY DAVIS, individually and each in his Official capacity as Richland County Deputy Sheriff and DEPUTY JAMES GILBERT, individually and each in his Official capacity as Richland County Deputy Sheriff
Plaintiff / Appellant: JAMES D. JACOBS
Case Number: 20-1789
Filed: July 22, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2020 Filing 18 Corrected JOINT APPENDIX (electronic and paper form) by James D. Jacobs. Digital media exhibit volume? No. [1000799454] [20-1789] John Hudson [Entered: 08/26/2020 07:12 AM]
August 25, 2020 Filing 17 Docket correction requested from James D. Jacobs. Re: [ # 15 ] appendix. Access to appendix has been restricted to case participants. [20-1789] KH [Entered: 08/25/2020 03:28 PM]
August 25, 2020 Filing 16 BRIEF by James D. Jacobs in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: OPENING. [1000798643] [20-1789] John Hudson [Entered: 08/25/2020 09:35 AM]
August 25, 2020 Filing 15 (ENTRY RESTRICTED) JOINT APPENDIX (electronic and paper form) by James D. Jacobs. Digital media exhibit volume? No. [1000798640] [20-1789]--[Edited 08/27/2020 by KH- See ECF 18] John Hudson [Entered: 08/25/2020 09:33 AM]
August 5, 2020 Filing 14 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Robert D Garfield for Richland County, Richland County Sheriff's Department, Justin Moody, Leon Lott, James Gilbert and Randy Davis. [1000788009] [20-1789] Robert Garfield [Entered: 08/05/2020 04:57 PM]
August 5, 2020 Filing 13 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Leon Lott. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000787784] [20-1789] Andrew Lindemann [Entered: 08/05/2020 01:45 PM]
August 5, 2020 Filing 12 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Justin Moody. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000787782] [20-1789] Andrew Lindemann [Entered: 08/05/2020 01:44 PM]
August 5, 2020 Filing 11 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by James Gilbert. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000787779] [20-1789] Andrew Lindemann [Entered: 08/05/2020 01:43 PM]
August 5, 2020 Filing 10 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Randy Davis. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000787776] [20-1789] Andrew Lindemann [Entered: 08/05/2020 01:42 PM]
August 5, 2020 Filing 9 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Richland County Sheriff's Department. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000787773] [20-1789] Andrew Lindemann [Entered: 08/05/2020 01:41 PM]
August 5, 2020 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Richland County. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000787770] [20-1789] Andrew Lindemann [Entered: 08/05/2020 01:40 PM]
August 5, 2020 Filing 7 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Andrew F. Lindemann for Randy Davis, James Gilbert, Leon Lott, Justin Moody, Richland County and Richland County Sheriff's Department. [1000787769] [20-1789] Andrew Lindemann [Entered: 08/05/2020 01:39 PM]
August 3, 2020 Filing 6 DOCKETING STATEMENT by James D. Jacobs. [20-1789] John Hudson [Entered: 08/03/2020 04:37 PM]
August 3, 2020 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by James D. Jacobs. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000786326] [20-1789] John Hudson [Entered: 08/03/2020 04:35 PM]
August 3, 2020 Filing 4 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Dwight Hudson for James D. Jacobs. [1000786324] [20-1789] John Hudson [Entered: 08/03/2020 04:34 PM]
July 22, 2020 Filing 3 BRIEFING ORDER filed. Paper copy requirements are temporarily suspended unless the case is under pre-argument review or being scheduled for argument, in which case a total of four paper copies of formal briefs and appendices are required. Opening Brief and Appendix due 08/31/2020. Response Brief due 09/30/2020. [20-1789] KH [Entered: 07/22/2020 11:34 AM]
July 22, 2020 Filing 2 DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case. Originating case number: 3:18-cv-03216-SAL. [20-1789] KH [Entered: 07/22/2020 11:33 AM]
July 22, 2020 Filing 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 3:18-cv-03216-SAL. Case manager: KHancock. [20-1789] KH [Entered: 07/22/2020 11:31 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: James Jacobs v. Richland County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LEON LOTT, individually and in his official capacity as Richland County Sheriff
Represented By: Robert David Garfield
Represented By: Andrew Lindemann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RICHLAND COUNTY
Represented By: Robert David Garfield
Represented By: Andrew Lindemann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DEPUTY JUSTIN MOODY, individually and each in his Official capacity as Richland County Deputy Sheriff
Represented By: Robert David Garfield
Represented By: Andrew Lindemann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RICHLAND COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT
Represented By: Robert David Garfield
Represented By: Andrew Lindemann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DEPUTY RANDY DAVIS, individually and each in his Official capacity as Richland County Deputy Sheriff
Represented By: Robert David Garfield
Represented By: Andrew Lindemann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DEPUTY JAMES GILBERT, individually and each in his Official capacity as Richland County Deputy Sheriff
Represented By: Robert David Garfield
Represented By: Andrew Lindemann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JAMES D. JACOBS
Represented By: John Dwight Hudson Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?