R.M.S. Titanic, Inc. v. US
Defendant: D. JAMES BAKER, Administrator, National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration, United States Department of Commerce, WILLIAM M. DALEY, Secretary of Commerce, United States Department of Commerce, THE WRECKED AND ABANDONED VESSEL, its engines, tackle, apparel, appurtenances, cargo, etc., Located within one (1) nautical mile of a point located at 41 degrees 43' 32" North Latitude and 49 degrees 56' 49" West Longitude, believed to be the RMS TIT, ROBERT C. BLUMBERG, Attorney-Advisor, Office of Oceans Affairs, United States Department of State, MADELEINE K. ALBRIGHT, Secretary of State, United States Department of State and OLE VARMER, Attorney-Advisor, National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration, United States Department of Commerce
Appellant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Plaintiff / Appellee: R.M.S. TITANIC, INCORPORATED, successor in interest to Titanic Ventures, limited partnership
Case Number: 20-1936
Filed: September 1, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE ISSUED to R.M.S. Titanic, Inc. requesting response to Motion to consolidate case [ # 4 ], Motion to extend filing time [ # 4 ], Motion to amend/correct [ # 4 ] Response due 09/10/2020.[1000805260]. [20-1936] KH [Entered: 09/03/2020 03:58 PM]
September 3, 2020 Filing 6 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by David G. Barger for R.M.S. Titanic, Incorporated. [1000804934] [20-1936] David Barger [Entered: 09/03/2020 11:35 AM]
September 3, 2020 Filing 5 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Kent P. Porter for US. [1000804850] [20-1936] Kent Porter [Entered: 09/03/2020 10:46 AM]
September 3, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION by US to consolidate case 20-1936 with 20-1684 , to extend filing time for opening brief and appendix , if consolidation is granted, the deadline under a consolidated brief schedule. , to amend/correct caption. Date and method of service: 09/03/2020 ecf. [1000804789] [20-1936] Dennis Fan [Entered: 09/03/2020 09:28 AM]
September 3, 2020 Filing 3 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Dennis Fan for US. [1000804767] [20-1936] Dennis Fan [Entered: 09/03/2020 09:17 AM]
September 2, 2020 Filing 2 DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case. Originating case number: 2:93-cv-00902-RBS. [20-1936] KH [Entered: 09/02/2020 12:46 PM]
September 1, 2020 Filing 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 2:93-cv-00902-RBS. Case manager: KHancock. [20-1936] KH [Entered: 09/02/2020 12:43 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: R.M.S. Titanic, Inc. v. US
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. JAMES BAKER, Administrator, National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration, United States Department of Commerce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM M. DALEY, Secretary of Commerce, United States Department of Commerce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE WRECKED AND ABANDONED VESSEL, its engines, tackle, apparel, appurtenances, cargo, etc., Located within one (1) nautical mile of a point located at 41 degrees 43' 32" North Latitude and 49 degrees 56' 49" West Longitude, believed to be the RMS TIT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT C. BLUMBERG, Attorney-Advisor, Office of Oceans Affairs, United States Department of State
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MADELEINE K. ALBRIGHT, Secretary of State, United States Department of State
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OLE VARMER, Attorney-Advisor, National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration, United States Department of Commerce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Dennis Fan
Represented By: Kent Pendleton Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: R.M.S. TITANIC, INCORPORATED, successor in interest to Titanic Ventures, limited partnership
Represented By: Brian Andrew Wainger
Represented By: David G. Barger
Represented By: William R. Poynter
Represented By: Ryan Van Patten Dougherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?