Melanie Hood-Wilson v. Community College of Baltimore
Plaintiff / Appellant: MELANIE HOOD-WILSON
Defendant / Appellee: COMMUNITY COLLEGE OF BALTIMORE COUNTY
Case Number: 20-1950
Filed: September 4, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER filed extending briefing order deadlines. Response brief due 12/14/2020. Reply brief due 01/15/2021. Paper copy requirements are temporarily suspended unless the case is under pre-argument review or being scheduled for argument, in which case a total of four paper copies of formal briefs and appendices are required. Copies to all parties. [1000834364] [20-1950] CB [Entered: 10/22/2020 10:18 AM]
October 15, 2020 Filing 12 Mediation conference data modified. [20-1950] LHP [Entered: 10/15/2020 08:56 AM]
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER filed extending briefing order deadlines. Opening brief and appendix due 11/09/2020. Response brief due 12/09/2020. Paper copy requirements are temporarily suspended unless the case is under pre-argument review or being scheduled for argument, in which case a total of four paper copies of formal briefs and appendices are required. Copies to all parties. [1000821289] [20-1950] CB [Entered: 10/01/2020 07:46 AM]
September 23, 2020 Filing 10 Initial mediation conference scheduled. [20-1950] LHP [Entered: 09/23/2020 02:32 PM]
September 16, 2020 Filing 9 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Bernadette M. Hunton for Community College of Baltimore County. [1000811509] [20-1950] Bernadette Hunton [Entered: 09/16/2020 09:57 AM]
September 16, 2020 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Community College of Baltimore County. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000811501] [20-1950] Clifford Geiger [Entered: 09/16/2020 09:55 AM]
September 16, 2020 Filing 7 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Clifford B. Geiger for Community College of Baltimore County. [1000811494] [20-1950] Clifford Geiger [Entered: 09/16/2020 09:52 AM]
September 16, 2020 Filing 6 BRIEFING ORDER filed. Opening Brief and Appendix due 10/26/2020. Response Brief due 11/25/2020. Paper copy requirements are temporarily suspended unless the case is under pre-argument review or being scheduled for argument, in which case a total of four paper copies of formal briefs and appendices are required. Mailed to: Vincent Jackson. [20-1950] CB [Entered: 09/16/2020 07:48 AM]
September 15, 2020 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Melanie Hood-Wilson. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000811145] [20-1950] Yaida Ford [Entered: 09/15/2020 04:35 PM]
September 15, 2020 Filing 4 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Yaida Ford for Melanie Hood-Wilson. [1000811142] [20-1950] Yaida Ford [Entered: 09/15/2020 04:35 PM]
September 15, 2020 Filing 3 DOCKETING STATEMENT by Melanie Hood-Wilson. [20-1950] Yaida Ford [Entered: 09/15/2020 01:48 PM]
September 4, 2020 Filing 2 DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case. Originating case number: 1:20-cv-00124-RDB. Mailed to: Yaida Ford. [20-1950] CB [Entered: 09/04/2020 08:23 AM]
September 4, 2020 Filing 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:20-cv-00124-RDB. Case manager: CBennett. [20-1950] CB [Entered: 09/04/2020 08:20 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Melanie Hood-Wilson v. Community College of Baltimore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MELANIE HOOD-WILSON
Represented By: Yaida O. Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: COMMUNITY COLLEGE OF BALTIMORE COUNTY
Represented By: Bernadette M. Hunton
Represented By: Vincent Patrick Jackson
Represented By: Clifford Bernard Geiger Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?