Amanda Hailey v. Air & Liquid Systems Corp
Defendant: METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, WARREN PUMPS, INCORPORATED, GREEN, TWEED & CO., GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY, f/k/a Kelly Springfield Tire Company and JOHN CRANE-HOUDAILLE, INCORPORATED
3Rd Party Plaintiff: FOSTER WHEELER LLC
Plaintiff / Appellant: AMANDA BROOKE HAILEY, Personal Representative of the Estate of Charles Anthony Shockley, TABITHA SIMMONS, To the Use of Tabitha Simmons, Surviving Daughter of Charles Anthony Shockley and ROBIN L. SHOCKLEY, Surviving Spouse of Charles Anthony Shockley
Defendant / Appellee: IMO INDUSTRIES, INCORPORATED, f/k/a Delaval, Inc., f/k/a DeLaval Turbine, Inc., f/k/a IMP Delaval, Inc., CRANE CO, (Individually and as Successor-in-Interest to Chapman Valve Co., Deming Pumps, Cochrane Corp., Cochrane, Inc., Crane Pumps, Jenkins Valves, National-US Radiator Corp., National Steel Boilers and Pacific Steel Boiler Co.), CBS CORPORATION, a Delaware Corporation formerly known as Viacom, Inc., Successor by merger to CBS Corporation, a Pennsylvania Corporation formerly known as Westinghouse Electric Corporation and B.F. Sturtevant, GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY and AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION
3Rd Party Defendant: MANVILLE TRUST PERSONAL INJURY SETTLEMENT TRUST
Case Number: 20-1980
Filed: September 14, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER filed extending filing time for opening brief and appendix until January 22, 2021. Number of days granted: 60. Opening brief and appendix due 01/21/2021. Response brief due 03/19/2021. Paper copy requirements are temporarily suspended unless the case is under pre-argument review or being scheduled for argument, in which case a total of four paper copies of formal briefs and appendices are required. Copies to all parties. [1000835428] [20-1980] TW [Entered: 10/23/2020 01:24 PM]
October 21, 2020 Filing 21 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Donald S. Meringer for General Electric Company. [1000833976] [20-1980] Donald Meringer [Entered: 10/21/2020 04:02 PM]
October 14, 2020 Filing 20 BRIEFING ORDER filed. Paper copy requirements are temporarily suspended unless the case is under pre-argument review or being scheduled for argument, in which case a total of four paper copies of formal briefs and appendices are required. Opening Brief and Appendix due 11/23/2020. Response Brief due 12/23/2020. [20-1980] RE [Entered: 10/14/2020 08:20 AM]
September 29, 2020 Filing 19 Initial mediation conference scheduled. [20-1980] MRB [Entered: 09/29/2020 09:56 AM]
September 29, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE ISSUED re: case caption. [20-1980] RE [Entered: 09/29/2020 07:41 AM]
September 28, 2020 Filing 17 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Amanda Brooke Hailey, Robin L. Shockley and Tabitha Simmons. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000818646] [20-1980] Patrick Ciociola [Entered: 09/28/2020 12:13 PM]
September 28, 2020 Filing 16 DOCKETING STATEMENT by Robin L. Shockley, Tabitha Simmons and Amanda Brooke Hailey. [20-1980] Patrick Ciociola [Entered: 09/28/2020 12:10 PM]
September 28, 2020 Filing 15 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Patrick A. Ciociola for Amanda Brooke Hailey, Robin L. Shockley and Tabitha Simmons. [1000818633] [20-1980] Patrick Ciociola [Entered: 09/28/2020 12:08 PM]
September 25, 2020 Filing 14 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by General Electric Company. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000817943] [20-1980] Michael Haslup [Entered: 09/25/2020 02:18 PM]
September 24, 2020 Filing 13 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Michael L.Haslup for General Electric Company. [1000817071] [20-1980] Michael Haslup [Entered: 09/24/2020 01:00 PM]
September 24, 2020 Filing 12 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by IMO Industries, Incorporated. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000816851] [20-1980] Joel Newport [Entered: 09/24/2020 10:33 AM]
September 24, 2020 Filing 11 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Joel Newport for IMO Industries, Incorporated. [1000816849] [20-1980] Joel Newport [Entered: 09/24/2020 10:32 AM]
September 23, 2020 Filing 10 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000816435] [20-1980] Frank Loker [Entered: 09/23/2020 05:15 PM]
September 23, 2020 Filing 9 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by F. Ford Loker for Air & Liquid Systems Corporation. [1000816432] [20-1980] Frank Loker [Entered: 09/23/2020 05:12 PM]
September 23, 2020 Filing 8 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Philip A. Kulinski for CBS Corporation. [1000816148] [20-1980] Clare Maisano [Entered: 09/23/2020 02:01 PM]
September 22, 2020 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CBS Corporation. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000815449] [20-1980] Clare Maisano [Entered: 09/22/2020 03:36 PM]
September 22, 2020 Filing 6 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Clare M. Maisano for CBS Corporation. [1000815446] [20-1980] Clare Maisano [Entered: 09/22/2020 03:35 PM]
September 22, 2020 Filing 5 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Michael J Ross for Crane Co. [1000814933] [20-1980] Michael Ross [Entered: 09/22/2020 09:55 AM]
September 21, 2020 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Crane Co. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000814581] [20-1980] Neil MacDonald [Entered: 09/21/2020 04:58 PM]
September 21, 2020 Filing 3 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Neil J. MacDonald for Crane Co. [1000814579] [20-1980] Neil MacDonald [Entered: 09/21/2020 04:56 PM]
September 15, 2020 Filing 2 DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case Originating case number: 1:18-cv-02590-DKC. Mailed to: Matthew Blaustein, Christopher Conley, David Fusco, Philip Kulinski, Scott McDowell, Katherine Mercer-Lawson, Joel Newport, Kristen Overton, Ronald Richardson, Rachelle Schofield, Steven Smith and David Speziali. [20-1980] RE [Entered: 09/15/2020 12:05 PM]
September 14, 2020 Filing 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:18-cv-02590-DKC. Case manager: REdwards. [20-1980] RE [Entered: 09/14/2020 05:01 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Amanda Hailey v. Air & Liquid Systems Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: FOSTER WHEELER LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WARREN PUMPS, INCORPORATED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREEN, TWEED & CO.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY, f/k/a Kelly Springfield Tire Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN CRANE-HOUDAILLE, INCORPORATED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: AMANDA BROOKE HAILEY, Personal Representative of the Estate of Charles Anthony Shockley
Represented By: Ronald Eugene Richardson
Represented By: Steven Wentzel Smith
Represented By: Matthew Ira Blaustein
Represented By: Patrick Alexander Ciociola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: TABITHA SIMMONS, To the Use of Tabitha Simmons, Surviving Daughter of Charles Anthony Shockley
Represented By: Ronald Eugene Richardson
Represented By: Steven Wentzel Smith
Represented By: Matthew Ira Blaustein
Represented By: Patrick Alexander Ciociola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ROBIN L. SHOCKLEY, Surviving Spouse of Charles Anthony Shockley
Represented By: Ronald Eugene Richardson
Represented By: Steven Wentzel Smith
Represented By: Matthew Ira Blaustein
Represented By: Patrick Alexander Ciociola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: IMO INDUSTRIES, INCORPORATED, f/k/a Delaval, Inc., f/k/a DeLaval Turbine, Inc., f/k/a IMP Delaval, Inc.
Represented By: Joel D. Newport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CRANE CO, (Individually and as Successor-in-Interest to Chapman Valve Co., Deming Pumps, Cochrane Corp., Cochrane, Inc., Crane Pumps, Jenkins Valves, National-US Radiator Corp., National Steel Boilers and Pacific Steel Boiler Co.)
Represented By: David A. Fusco
Represented By: Neil Joseph MacDonald
Represented By: Rachelle A. Schofield
Represented By: Michael James Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CBS CORPORATION, a Delaware Corporation formerly known as Viacom, Inc., Successor by merger to CBS Corporation, a Pennsylvania Corporation formerly known as Westinghouse Electric Corporation and B.F. Sturtevant
Represented By: Philip Andrew Kulinski
Represented By: Kristen Overton
Represented By: Clare Marie Maisano
Represented By: Christopher George Conley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY
Represented By: Donald Stephen Meringer
Represented By: Michael L. Haslup
Represented By: Erik David Nadolink
Represented By: David Speziali
Represented By: Katherine Mercer-Lawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION
Represented By: Scott Mason Richmond Esq.
Represented By: Frank Ford Loker Esq. Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: MANVILLE TRUST PERSONAL INJURY SETTLEMENT TRUST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?