Takaeus Graham v. S. Stallard
Defendant / Appellee: NATARCHA GREGG, J. COLLINS, S. COLLINS, WELLS, MARCUS ELAM, C. A. CAUDILL, WALLENS RIDGE STATE PRISON, B. RAVIZEE, A. DAVID ROBINSON, C. KING, MS. BELCHER, M. BROYLES, S. STALLARD, A. GILBERT, C. W. FRANKS, J. FIELDS, B. BERG, ASSISTANT WARDEN J. COMBS, CARMONY, WARDEN FLEMING, HAROLD CLARKE, VIRGINIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS and STOUT
Plaintiff / Appellant: TAKAEUS MAKEON GRAHAM
Case Number: 20-7533
Filed: October 19, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 8, 2020 Filing 9 FEE NOTICE issued to Takaeus Makeon Graham - initial notice. Fee or application to proceed as indigent due 01/07/2021 Originating case number: 7:17-cv-00035-EKD-JCH.. [20-7533] RHS [Entered: 12/08/2020 03:54 PM]
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER filed granting Motion to extend filing time [ # 7 ] Number of days granted: 30. Informal Opening Brief due 01/07/2021 Copies to all parties. [1000862003] [20-7533] RHS [Entered: 12/08/2020 03:51 PM]
December 8, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION by Takaeus Makeon Graham to extend filing time for informal opening brief until 30 days. Date and method of service: 12/01/2020 US mail. [1000862001] [20-7533] RHS [Entered: 12/08/2020 03:49 PM]
December 1, 2020 Filing 6 PLRA/IFP-TRUST ACCOUNT STATEMENT (court access only) by Takaeus Makeon Graham. [20-7533] RHS [Entered: 12/01/2020 03:11 PM]
November 18, 2020 Filing 5 RULE 45 NOTICE issued to Takaeus Makeon Graham re: for failure to satisfy PLRA and informal briefing requirements. Case will be dismissed if default is not cured within 15 days. Informal Opening Brief due 12/03/2020. PLRA documents due 12/03/2020. [20-7533] RHS [Entered: 11/18/2020 12:22 PM]
October 23, 2020 Filing 4 DOCUMENT referencing [ # 1 ] case - copy of notice of appeal by Takaeus Makeon Graham. [1000835567] [20-7533] RHS [Entered: 10/23/2020 03:15 PM]
October 19, 2020 Filing 3 INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed.. Informal Opening Brief due 11/12/2020 Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief served. [20-7533] RHS [Entered: 10/19/2020 09:43 AM]
October 19, 2020 Filing 2 PLRA NOTICE issued to [ Takaeus Makeon Graham ]. Fee due to District Court or PLRA application due to Court of Appeals within 15 days. [20-7533] RHS [Entered: 10/19/2020 09:41 AM]
October 19, 2020 Filing 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 7:17-cv-00035-EKD-JCH. Case manager: RSewell. [20-7533] RHS [Entered: 10/19/2020 09:35 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Takaeus Graham v. S. Stallard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NATARCHA GREGG
Represented By: Laura Haeberle Cahill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: J. COLLINS
Represented By: Laura Haeberle Cahill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: S. COLLINS
Represented By: Laura Haeberle Cahill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WELLS
Represented By: Laura Haeberle Cahill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MARCUS ELAM
Represented By: Laura Haeberle Cahill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: C. A. CAUDILL
Represented By: Laura Haeberle Cahill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WALLENS RIDGE STATE PRISON
Represented By: Laura Haeberle Cahill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: B. RAVIZEE
Represented By: Laura Haeberle Cahill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: A. DAVID ROBINSON
Represented By: Laura Haeberle Cahill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: C. KING
Represented By: Laura Haeberle Cahill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MS. BELCHER
Represented By: Laura Haeberle Cahill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: M. BROYLES
Represented By: Laura Haeberle Cahill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: S. STALLARD
Represented By: Laura Haeberle Cahill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: A. GILBERT
Represented By: Laura Haeberle Cahill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: C. W. FRANKS
Represented By: Laura Haeberle Cahill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: J. FIELDS
Represented By: Laura Haeberle Cahill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: B. BERG
Represented By: Laura Haeberle Cahill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ASSISTANT WARDEN J. COMBS
Represented By: Laura Haeberle Cahill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CARMONY
Represented By: Laura Haeberle Cahill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WARDEN FLEMING
Represented By: Laura Haeberle Cahill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HAROLD CLARKE
Represented By: Laura Haeberle Cahill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: VIRGINIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Represented By: Laura Haeberle Cahill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: STOUT
Represented By: Laura Haeberle Cahill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: TAKAEUS MAKEON GRAHAM
Represented By: Takaeus Makeon Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?