Joseph Mays v. T. Smith
Plaintiff / Appellant: JOSEPH RANDOLPH MAYS
Defendant / Appellee: J. HALFAST, Case Manager, OFFICER SLAYDON, OFFICER GLASS, OFFICER LASSITAR, LT. CHRISTOPHER, J. CARAWAY, Regional Director, JOHN/JANE DOES, R. MARTIN, Counselor, V. WILLIS, Unit Manager, JAMIE HOSKINS, Unicor Factory Manager, OFFICER V. WILKINS, S. MA'AT, Assoc. Warden, FCI Butner 1, K. HENDRY and T. B. SMITH, Warden, FCI Butner 1
Interested Party: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 20-7540
Filed: October 19, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2020 Filing 12 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Easha Anand for Rights Behind Bars and Roderick & Solange MacArthur Justice Center. [1000864842] [20-7540] Easha Anand [Entered: 12/14/2020 03:05 PM]
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER filed granting motion to extend filing time [ # 10 ]. Amicus brief due 01/14/2021. Paper copy requirements are temporarily suspended unless the case is under pre-argument review or being scheduled for argument, in which case a total of four paper copies of formal briefs and appendices are required., updating/ resuming informal briefing order deadlines. Any Informal Response Brief due 01/28/202. Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Joseph Mays. [1000864803] [20-7540] TW [Entered: 12/14/2020 02:41 PM]
December 10, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION by Rights Behind Bars, Amicus Curiae; Roderick & Solange MacArthur Justice Center, Amicus Curiae to extend filing time for Motion and Brief of Amici Curiae until January 28, 2021.. Date and method of service: 12/10/2020 ecf, US mail. [1000863226] [20-7540] Devi Rao [Entered: 12/10/2020 11:32 AM]
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER filed granting Motion for leave to proceed PLRA [7] Fee Amount: $505.00. Name and Prisoner Number: Joseph Mays 43487-007, Warden, Attn. Accounting Office FCI GILMER FEDERAL CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION P. O. Box 6000 Glenville, WV 26351-0000Copies to all parties. [1000862792] [20-7540] RHS [Entered: 12/09/2020 03:50 PM]
December 7, 2020 Filing 9 INFORMAL OPENING BRIEF by Joseph Randolph Mays. [20-7540] RHS [Entered: 12/09/2020 03:53 PM]
December 1, 2020 Filing 7 PLRA-APPLICATION (court access only) by Joseph Randolph Mays. Consent to Payment Form: Yes; Trust Account Statement: Yes. [20-7540] RHS [Entered: 12/01/2020 03:15 PM]
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER filed granting motion to extend filing time [ # 5 ] PLRA documents due 12/03/2020, Informal Opening Brief due 12/03/2020 Copies to all parties. [1000843142] [20-7540] RHS [Entered: 11/05/2020 03:30 PM]
November 5, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION by Joseph Randolph Mays to extend filing time for payment of fee/filing of PLRA.. Date and method of service: 11/05/2020 US mail. [1000843136] [20-7540] RHS [Entered: 11/05/2020 03:27 PM]
October 21, 2020 Filing 4 ASSEMBLED ELECTRONIC RECORD docketed. Originating case number: 5:18-ct-03186-FL. Record in folder? Yes. Record reviewed? Yes. PSR included? N/A. [20-7540] RHS [Entered: 10/21/2020 03:45 PM]
October 19, 2020 Filing 3 INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed.. Informal Opening Brief due 11/12/2020 Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief served. [20-7540] RHS [Entered: 10/19/2020 03:30 PM]
October 19, 2020 Filing 2 PLRA NOTICE issued to [ Joseph Randolph Mays ]. Fee due to District Court or PLRA application due to Court of Appeals within 15 days.. [20-7540] RHS [Entered: 10/19/2020 03:27 PM]
October 19, 2020 Filing 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 5:18-ct-03186-FL. Case manager: RSewell. [20-7540] RHS [Entered: 10/19/2020 03:25 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Joseph Mays v. T. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JOSEPH RANDOLPH MAYS
Represented By: Joseph Randolph Mays
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: J. HALFAST, Case Manager
Represented By: Sharon Coull Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: OFFICER SLAYDON
Represented By: Sharon Coull Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: OFFICER GLASS
Represented By: Sharon Coull Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: OFFICER LASSITAR
Represented By: Sharon Coull Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LT. CHRISTOPHER
Represented By: Sharon Coull Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: J. CARAWAY, Regional Director
Represented By: Sharon Coull Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOHN/JANE DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: R. MARTIN, Counselor
Represented By: Sharon Coull Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: V. WILLIS, Unit Manager
Represented By: Sharon Coull Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JAMIE HOSKINS, Unicor Factory Manager
Represented By: Sharon Coull Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: OFFICER V. WILKINS
Represented By: Sharon Coull Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: S. MA'AT, Assoc. Warden, FCI Butner 1
Represented By: Sharon Coull Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: K. HENDRY
Represented By: Sharon Coull Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: T. B. SMITH, Warden, FCI Butner 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?