Charles Harbison v. VDOC
Defendant / Appellee: OFFICER B. SHAFFNER, SGT. OFFICER MAY, LT. JASON HIGGINS, VIRGINIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, OFFICER JOSHUA LUNDY and WARDEN, RIVER NORTH CORRECTIONAL CENTER
Plaintiff / Appellant: CHARLES HARBISON
Case Number: 20-7863
Filed: December 21, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER filed granting Motion for leave to proceed PLRA [6] Fee Amount: $505.00. Name and Prisoner Number: Charles Harbison, #1040351. Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Charles Harbison; Warden. [1000885450] [20-7863] CT [Entered: 01/22/2021 09:08 AM]
January 21, 2021 Filing 7 INFORMAL OPENING BRIEF by Charles Harbison. [20-7863] CT [Entered: 01/22/2021 09:06 AM]
January 21, 2021 Filing 6 PLRA-APPLICATION (court access only) by Charles Harbison. Consent to Payment Form: Yes; Trust Account Statement: received 01/19/2021. [20-7863] CT [Entered: 01/22/2021 08:57 AM]
January 19, 2021 Filing 5 PLRA/IFP-TRUST ACCOUNT STATEMENT (court access only) by Charles Harbison. [20-7863] CT [Entered: 01/20/2021 10:11 AM]
December 21, 2020 Filing 4 ASSEMBLED ELECTRONIC RECORD docketed. Originating case number: 7:19-cv-00805-TTC-RSB. Record in folder? Yes. Record reviewed? Yes. PSR included? N/A. [20-7863] CT [Entered: 12/21/2020 03:50 PM]
December 21, 2020 Filing 3 INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Informal Opening Brief due 01/14/2021. Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief served. [20-7863] CT [Entered: 12/21/2020 03:20 PM]
December 21, 2020 Filing 2 PLRA NOTICE issued to [ Charles Harbison ]. Fee due to District Court or PLRA application due to Court of Appeals within 15 days.. [20-7863] CT [Entered: 12/21/2020 12:22 PM]
December 21, 2020 Filing 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 7:19-cv-00805-TTC-RSB. Case manager: CathyHerb. [20-7863] CT [Entered: 12/21/2020 11:18 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Charles Harbison v. VDOC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: OFFICER B. SHAFFNER
Represented By: Liza Shawn Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SGT. OFFICER MAY
Represented By: Liza Shawn Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LT. JASON HIGGINS
Represented By: Liza Shawn Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: VIRGINIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Represented By: Liza Shawn Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: OFFICER JOSHUA LUNDY
Represented By: Liza Shawn Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WARDEN, RIVER NORTH CORRECTIONAL CENTER
Represented By: Liza Shawn Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CHARLES HARBISON
Represented By: Charles Harbison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?