Sawbill Companies, Inc. v. Menard, Inc.
Plaintiff: ANDREW KNIGHT, JUSTIN VERSCHOORE, JANE E. SWIM, WALLY BLOSS, THOMAS J. RILEY, ELLIOTT MASSEY, TWIN CITY DEVELOPMENT, LLC, GREGORY ALLEN REITMEYER, GARY BENDICKSON and BENJAMIN PRUSKY
Defendant: JELD-WEN, INC. and MASONITE CORPORATION
Plaintiff / Appellee: NIGEL GAY, PATRICIA OLSON, SAWBILL COMPANIES, INC., MARTY FAHNCKE, JOHN VAN HORN, JUAN THE BUILDER, INC., AKER CUSTOM CARPENTRY, LLC, COLLIN SALAZAR REAL ESTATE, LLC, MARGARET PREECE, BRENDA MASSEY, JULIE WHALEN, CRAIG WEITZ, RONALD KADE ASAY, MELANIE LOPEZ, MOUNTAIN TOP CUSTOMS, LLC, d/b/a Mountain Top Custom Construction, TRINIDAD CORONA, LARRY DAY FOX, CARLISLE CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, LLC, ORANGE CONSTRUCTION SOLUTIONS, INC., RICHARD RANALLI, KENNETH DALLAMORA, ALLISON DELLATORE, ROBYN ADLER, ALBERT MAGNONE CONTRACTING & REMODELING, CHRIS BEST, CARYN YOST, EVENTHOST, INC., d/b/a National Builders, HELLER GENERAL CONTRACTING, GEOFFREY HURDLE and ARTEVA CONSTRUCTION, LLC
Appellant: MENARD, INC.
Case Number: 21-1013
Filed: January 5, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 2, 2021 Filing 28 COURT ORDER filed granting limited Motion for stay pending appeal [ # 12 ]; directing filing of joint monthly status reports. Copies to all parties. [1000908615] [21-1010, 21-1011, 21-1012, 21-1013] AB [Entered: 03/02/2021 03:32 PM]
February 26, 2021 Filing 27 JOINT MEMORANDUM by Robyn Adler, Aker Custom Carpentry, LLC, Albert Magnone Contracting & Remodeling, Arteva Construction, LLC, Ronald Kade Asay, Chris Best, Carlisle Construction Company, LLC, Collin Salazar Real Estate, LLC, Trinidad Corona, Kenneth Dallamora, Allison Dellatore, EventHost, Inc., Marty Fahncke, Larry Day Fox, Nigel Gay, Heller General Contracting, John Van Horn, Geoffrey Hurdle, Juan the Builder, Inc., Melanie Lopez, Brenda Massey, Mountain Top Customs, LLC, Patricia Olson, Orange Construction Solutions, Inc., Margaret Preece, Richard Ranalli, Craig Weitz, Julie Whalen and Huttig Building Products, Inc. in 21-1010, Robyn Adler, Aker Custom Carpentry, LLC, Albert Magnone Contracting & Remodeling, Arteva Construction, LLC, Ronald Kade Asay, Chris Best, Carlisle Construction Company, LLC, Collin Salazar Real Estate, LLC, Trinidad Corona, Kenneth Dallamora, Allison Dellatore, EventHost, Inc., Marty Fahncke, Larry Day Fox, Nigel Gay, Heller General Contracting, John Van Horn, Geoffrey Hurdle, Juan the Builder, Inc., Melanie Lopez, Brenda Massey, Mountain Top Customs, LLC, Patricia Olson, Orange Construction Solutions, Inc., Margaret Preece, Richard Ranalli, Craig Weitz, Julie Whalen and OrePac Building Products, Inc. in 21-1011, Robyn Adler, Aker Custom Carpentry, LLC, Albert Magnone Contracting & Remodeling, Arteva Construction, LLC, Ronald Kade Asay, Chris Best, Carlisle Construction Company, LLC, Collin Salazar Real Estate, LLC, Trinidad Corona, Kenneth Dallamora, Allison Dellatore, EventHost, Inc., Marty Fahncke, Larry Day Fox, Nigel Gay, Heller General Contracting, John Van Horn, Geoffrey Hurdle, Juan the Builder, Inc., Melanie Lopez, Brenda Massey, Mountain Top Customs, LLC, Patricia Olson, Orange Construction Solutions, Inc., Margaret Preece, Richard Ranalli, Craig Weitz, Julie Whalen and BMC Stock Holdings, Inc. in 21-1012, Robyn Adler, Aker Custom Carpentry, LLC, Albert Magnone Contracting & Remodeling, Arteva Construction, LLC, Ronald Kade Asay, Chris Best, Carlisle Construction Company, LLC, Collin Salazar Real Estate, LLC, Trinidad Corona, Kenneth Dallamora, Allison Dellatore, EventHost, Inc., Marty Fahncke, Larry Day Fox, Nigel Gay, Heller General Contracting, John Van Horn, Geoffrey Hurdle, Juan the Builder, Inc., Melanie Lopez, Brenda Massey, Mountain Top Customs, LLC, Patricia Olson, Orange Construction Solutions, Inc., Margaret Preece, Richard Ranalli, Craig Weitz, Julie Whalen and Menard, Inc. in 21-1013. [1000906389] [21-1010, 21-1011, 21-1012, 21-1013]--[Edited 02/26/2021 by AB- to modify docket text] Conrad Shumadine [Entered: 02/26/2021 09:26 AM]
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER filed updating briefing order deadlines. Opening brief and appendix due 04/02/2021. Response brief due 05/03/2021. Paper copy requirements are temporarily suspended unless the case is under pre-argument review or being scheduled for argument, in which case a total of four paper copies of formal briefs and appendices are required. Copies to all parties. [1000903987] [21-1010, 21-1011, 21-1012, 21-1013] AB [Entered: 02/23/2021 12:30 PM]
February 18, 2021 Filing 25 COURT ORDER filed directing filing of memorandum. Memorandum due: 02/26/2021 by 12:00 p.m. If necessary, response due: 03/03/2021 by 12:00 p.m. Any reply, if necessary, due: 03/05/2021 by 12:00 p.m. Copies to all parties. [1000901269] [21-1010, 21-1011, 21-1012, 21-1013] AB [Entered: 02/18/2021 04:21 PM]
January 21, 2021 Filing 24 BRIEFING ORDER filed. Paper copy requirements are temporarily suspended unless the case is under pre-argument review or being scheduled for argument, in which case a total of four paper copies of formal briefs and appendices are required. Opening Brief and Appendix due 03/02/2021. Response Brief due 04/01/2021. [21-1010, 21-1011, 21-1012, 21-1013] AB [Entered: 01/21/2021 07:39 AM]
January 21, 2021 Filing 23 DOCKETING STATEMENT by Menard, Inc.. [21-1013] Timothy Belevetz [Entered: 01/21/2021 12:03 AM]
January 15, 2021 Filing 22 REPLY by Huttig Building Products, Inc. in 21-1010, OrePac Building Products, Inc. in 21-1011, BMC Stock Holdings, Inc. in 21-1012, Menard, Inc. in 21-1013 to response [ # 18 ].. [21-1010, 21-1011, 21-1012, 21-1013] Anand Ramana [Entered: 01/15/2021 10:52 AM]
January 13, 2021 Filing 21 Corrected APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Conrad M. Shumadine for Robyn Adler, Aker Custom Carpentry, LLC, Albert Magnone Contracting & Remodeling, Arteva Construction, LLC, Ronald Kade Asay, Chris Best, Carlisle Construction Company, LLC, Collin Salazar Real Estate, LLC, Trinidad Corona, Kenneth Dallamora, Allison Dellatore, EventHost, Inc., Marty Fahncke, Larry Day Fox, Nigel Gay, Heller General Contracting, John Van Horn, Geoffrey Hurdle, Juan the Builder, Inc., Melanie Lopez, Brenda Massey, Mountain Top Customs, LLC, Patricia Olson, Orange Construction Solutions, Inc., Margaret Preece, Richard Ranalli, Craig Weitz and Julie Whalen in 21-1010, 21-1011, 21-1012, 21-1013. [1000880877] [21-1010, 21-1011, 21-1012, 21-1013] Conrad Shumadine [Entered: 01/13/2021 03:08 PM]
January 13, 2021 Filing 20 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Robyn Adler, Aker Custom Carpentry, LLC, Albert Magnone Contracting & Remodeling, Arteva Construction, LLC, Ronald Kade Asay, Chris Best, Carlisle Construction Company, LLC, Collin Salazar Real Estate, LLC, Trinidad Corona, Kenneth Dallamora, Allison Dellatore, EventHost, Inc., Marty Fahncke, Larry Day Fox, Nigel Gay, Heller General Contracting, John Van Horn, Geoffrey Hurdle, Juan the Builder, Inc., Melanie Lopez, Brenda Massey, Mountain Top Customs, LLC, Patricia Olson, Orange Construction Solutions, Inc., Margaret Preece, Richard Ranalli, Sawbill Companies, Inc., Craig Weitz, Julie Whalen, Caryn Yost and Huttig Building Products, Inc. in 21-1010, Robyn Adler, Aker Custom Carpentry, LLC, Albert Magnone Contracting & Remodeling, Arteva Construction, LLC, Ronald Kade Asay, Chris Best, Carlisle Construction Company, LLC, Collin Salazar Real Estate, LLC, Trinidad Corona, Kenneth Dallamora, Allison Dellatore, EventHost, Inc., Marty Fahncke, Larry Day Fox, Nigel Gay, Heller General Contracting, John Van Horn, Geoffrey Hurdle, Juan the Builder, Inc., Melanie Lopez, Brenda Massey, Mountain Top Customs, LLC, Patricia Olson, Orange Construction Solutions, Inc., Margaret Preece, Richard Ranalli, Sawbill Companies, Inc., Craig Weitz, Julie Whalen, Caryn Yost and OrePac Building Products, Inc. in 21-1011, Robyn Adler, Aker Custom Carpentry, LLC, Albert Magnone Contracting & Remodeling, Arteva Construction, LLC, Ronald Kade Asay, Chris Best, Carlisle Construction Company, LLC, Collin Salazar Real Estate, LLC, Trinidad Corona, Kenneth Dallamora, Allison Dellatore, EventHost, Inc., Marty Fahncke, Larry Day Fox, Nigel Gay, Heller General Contracting, John Van Horn, Geoffrey Hurdle, Juan the Builder, Inc., Melanie Lopez, Brenda Massey, Mountain Top Customs, LLC, Patricia Olson, Orange Construction Solutions, Inc., Margaret Preece, Richard Ranalli, Sawbill Companies, Inc., Craig Weitz, Julie Whalen, Caryn Yost and BMC Stock Holdings, Inc. in 21-1012, Robyn Adler, Aker Custom Carpentry, LLC, Albert Magnone Contracting & Remodeling, Arteva Construction, LLC, Ronald Kade Asay, Chris Best, Carlisle Construction Company, LLC, Collin Salazar Real Estate, LLC, Trinidad Corona, Kenneth Dallamora, Allison Dellatore, EventHost, Inc., Marty Fahncke, Larry Day Fox, Nigel Gay, Heller General Contracting, John Van Horn, Geoffrey Hurdle, Juan the Builder, Inc., Melanie Lopez, Brenda Massey, Mountain Top Customs, LLC, Patricia Olson, Orange Construction Solutions, Inc., Margaret Preece, Richard Ranalli, Sawbill Companies, Inc., Craig Weitz, Julie Whalen, Caryn Yost and Menard, Inc. in 21-1013. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000880798] [21-1010, 21-1011, 21-1012, 21-1013] Conrad Shumadine [Entered: 01/13/2021 02:04 PM]
January 13, 2021 Filing 19 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL for Robyn Adler, Aker Custom Carpentry, LLC, Albert Magnone Contracting & Remodeling, Arteva Construction, LLC, Ronald Kade Asay, Chris Best, Carlisle Construction Company, LLC, Collin Salazar Real Estate, LLC, Trinidad Corona, Kenneth Dallamora, Allison Dellatore, EventHost, Inc., Marty Fahncke, Larry Day Fox, Nigel Gay, Heller General Contracting, John Van Horn, Geoffrey Hurdle, Juan the Builder, Inc., Melanie Lopez, Brenda Massey, Mountain Top Customs, LLC, Patricia Olson, Orange Construction Solutions, Inc., Margaret Preece, Richard Ranalli, Sawbill Companies, Inc., Craig Weitz, Julie Whalen, Caryn Yost and Huttig Building Products, Inc. in 21-1010, Robyn Adler, Aker Custom Carpentry, LLC, Albert Magnone Contracting & Remodeling, Arteva Construction, LLC, Ronald Kade Asay, Chris Best, Carlisle Construction Company, LLC, Collin Salazar Real Estate, LLC, Trinidad Corona, Kenneth Dallamora, Allison Dellatore, EventHost, Inc., Marty Fahncke, Larry Day Fox, Nigel Gay, Heller General Contracting, John Van Horn, Geoffrey Hurdle, Juan the Builder, Inc., Melanie Lopez, Brenda Massey, Mountain Top Customs, LLC, Patricia Olson, Orange Construction Solutions, Inc., Margaret Preece, Richard Ranalli, Sawbill Companies, Inc., Craig Weitz, Julie Whalen, Caryn Yost and OrePac Building Products, Inc. in 21-1011, Robyn Adler, Aker Custom Carpentry, LLC, Albert Magnone Contracting & Remodeling, Arteva Construction, LLC, Ronald Kade Asay, Chris Best, Carlisle Construction Company, LLC, Collin Salazar Real Estate, LLC, Trinidad Corona, Kenneth Dallamora, Allison Dellatore, EventHost, Inc., Marty Fahncke, Larry Day Fox, Nigel Gay, Heller General Contracting, John Van Horn, Geoffrey Hurdle, Juan the Builder, Inc., Melanie Lopez, Brenda Massey, Mountain Top Customs, LLC, Patricia Olson, Orange Construction Solutions, Inc., Margaret Preece, Richard Ranalli, Sawbill Companies, Inc., Craig Weitz, Julie Whalen, Caryn Yost and BMC Stock Holdings, Inc. in 21-1012, Robyn Adler, Aker Custom Carpentry, LLC, Albert Magnone Contracting & Remodeling, Arteva Construction, LLC, Ronald Kade Asay, Chris Best, Carlisle Construction Company, LLC, Collin Salazar Real Estate, LLC, Trinidad Corona, Kenneth Dallamora, Allison Dellatore, EventHost, Inc., Marty Fahncke, Larry Day Fox, Nigel Gay, Heller General Contracting, John Van Horn, Geoffrey Hurdle, Juan the Builder, Inc., Melanie Lopez, Brenda Massey, Mountain Top Customs, LLC, Patricia Olson, Orange Construction Solutions, Inc., Margaret Preece, Richard Ranalli, Sawbill Companies, Inc., Craig Weitz, Julie Whalen, Caryn Yost and Menard, Inc. in 21-1013. [1000880790] [21-1010, 21-1011, 21-1012, 21-1013] Conrad Shumadine [Entered: 01/13/2021 02:02 PM]
January 13, 2021 Filing 18 Supplemental RESPONSE/ANSWER by Robyn Adler, Aker Custom Carpentry, LLC, Albert Magnone Contracting & Remodeling, Arteva Construction, LLC, Ronald Kade Asay, Chris Best, Carlisle Construction Company, LLC, Collin Salazar Real Estate, LLC, Trinidad Corona, Kenneth Dallamora, Allison Dellatore, EventHost, Inc., Marty Fahncke, Larry Day Fox, Nigel Gay, Heller General Contracting, John Van Horn, Geoffrey Hurdle, Juan the Builder, Inc., Melanie Lopez, Brenda Massey, Mountain Top Customs, LLC, Patricia Olson, Orange Construction Solutions, Inc., Margaret Preece, Richard Ranalli, Sawbill Companies, Inc., Craig Weitz, Julie Whalen, Caryn Yost and Huttig Building Products, Inc. in 21-1010, Robyn Adler, Aker Custom Carpentry, LLC, Albert Magnone Contracting & Remodeling, Arteva Construction, LLC, Ronald Kade Asay, Chris Best, Carlisle Construction Company, LLC, Collin Salazar Real Estate, LLC, Trinidad Corona, Kenneth Dallamora, Allison Dellatore, EventHost, Inc., Marty Fahncke, Larry Day Fox, Nigel Gay, Heller General Contracting, John Van Horn, Geoffrey Hurdle, Juan the Builder, Inc., Melanie Lopez, Brenda Massey, Mountain Top Customs, LLC, Patricia Olson, Orange Construction Solutions, Inc., Margaret Preece, Richard Ranalli, Sawbill Companies, Inc., Craig Weitz, Julie Whalen, Caryn Yost and OrePac Building Products, Inc. in 21-1011, Robyn Adler, Aker Custom Carpentry, LLC, Albert Magnone Contracting & Remodeling, Arteva Construction, LLC, Ronald Kade Asay, Chris Best, Carlisle Construction Company, LLC, Collin Salazar Real Estate, LLC, Trinidad Corona, Kenneth Dallamora, Allison Dellatore, EventHost, Inc., Marty Fahncke, Larry Day Fox, Nigel Gay, Heller General Contracting, John Van Horn, Geoffrey Hurdle, Juan the Builder, Inc., Melanie Lopez, Brenda Massey, Mountain Top Customs, LLC, Patricia Olson, Orange Construction Solutions, Inc., Margaret Preece, Richard Ranalli, Sawbill Companies, Inc., Craig Weitz, Julie Whalen, Caryn Yost and BMC Stock Holdings, Inc. in 21-1012, Robyn Adler, Aker Custom Carpentry, LLC, Albert Magnone Contracting & Remodeling, Arteva Construction, LLC, Ronald Kade Asay, Chris Best, Carlisle Construction Company, LLC, Collin Salazar Real Estate, LLC, Trinidad Corona, Kenneth Dallamora, Allison Dellatore, EventHost, Inc., Marty Fahncke, Larry Day Fox, Nigel Gay, Heller General Contracting, John Van Horn, Geoffrey Hurdle, Juan the Builder, Inc., Melanie Lopez, Brenda Massey, Mountain Top Customs, LLC, Patricia Olson, Orange Construction Solutions, Inc., Margaret Preece, Richard Ranalli, Sawbill Companies, Inc., Craig Weitz, Julie Whalen, Caryn Yost and Menard, Inc. in 21-1013 to court Order for temporary administrative stay [ # 17 ], court Order to require response [ # 17 ], court Order [ # 17 ], response [ # 14 ]. Nature of response: in support of. [21-1010, 21-1011, 21-1012, 21-1013] Conrad Shumadine [Entered: 01/13/2021 12:04 PM]
January 8, 2021 Filing 17 COURT ORDER filed granting an interim stay pending further order of the court and requesting a supplemental response to the motion for stay by noon on 1/13/2021, with any reply by noon on 1/15/2021. Copies to all parties. [1000878561] [21-1010, 21-1011, 21-1012, 21-1013] PSC [Entered: 01/08/2021 08:04 PM]
January 8, 2021 Filing 16 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Menard, Inc. in 21-1013. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000878322] [21-1013, 21-1010, 21-1011, 21-1012] Timothy Belevetz [Entered: 01/08/2021 02:14 PM]
January 8, 2021 Filing 15 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Timothy D. Belevetz for Menard, Inc. in 21-1013. [1000878319] [21-1013, 21-1010, 21-1011, 21-1012] Timothy Belevetz [Entered: 01/08/2021 02:11 PM]
January 8, 2021 Filing 14 RESPONSE/ANSWER by Robyn Adler, Aker Custom Carpentry, LLC, Albert Magnone Contracting & Remodeling, Arteva Construction, LLC, Ronald Kade Asay, Chris Best, Carlisle Construction Company, LLC, Collin Salazar Real Estate, LLC, Trinidad Corona, Kenneth Dallamora, Allison Dellatore, EventHost, Inc., Marty Fahncke, Larry Day Fox, Nigel Gay, Heller General Contracting, John Van Horn, Geoffrey Hurdle, Juan the Builder, Inc., Melanie Lopez, Brenda Massey, Mountain Top Customs, LLC, Patricia Olson, Orange Construction Solutions, Inc., Margaret Preece, Richard Ranalli, Sawbill Companies, Inc., Craig Weitz, Julie Whalen, Caryn Yost and Huttig Building Products, Inc. in 21-1010, Robyn Adler, Aker Custom Carpentry, LLC, Albert Magnone Contracting & Remodeling, Arteva Construction, LLC, Ronald Kade Asay, Chris Best, Carlisle Construction Company, LLC, Collin Salazar Real Estate, LLC, Trinidad Corona, Kenneth Dallamora, Allison Dellatore, EventHost, Inc., Marty Fahncke, Larry Day Fox, Nigel Gay, Heller General Contracting, John Van Horn, Geoffrey Hurdle, Juan the Builder, Inc., Melanie Lopez, Brenda Massey, Mountain Top Customs, LLC, Patricia Olson, Orange Construction Solutions, Inc., Margaret Preece, Richard Ranalli, Sawbill Companies, Inc., Craig Weitz, Julie Whalen, Caryn Yost and OrePac Building Products, Inc. in 21-1011, Robyn Adler, Aker Custom Carpentry, LLC, Albert Magnone Contracting & Remodeling, Arteva Construction, LLC, Ronald Kade Asay, Chris Best, Carlisle Construction Company, LLC, Collin Salazar Real Estate, LLC, Trinidad Corona, Kenneth Dallamora, Allison Dellatore, EventHost, Inc., Marty Fahncke, Larry Day Fox, Nigel Gay, Heller General Contracting, John Van Horn, Geoffrey Hurdle, Juan the Builder, Inc., Melanie Lopez, Brenda Massey, Mountain Top Customs, LLC, Patricia Olson, Orange Construction Solutions, Inc., Margaret Preece, Richard Ranalli, Sawbill Companies, Inc., Craig Weitz, Julie Whalen, Caryn Yost and BMC Stock Holdings, Inc. in 21-1012, Robyn Adler, Aker Custom Carpentry, LLC, Albert Magnone Contracting & Remodeling, Arteva Construction, LLC, Ronald Kade Asay, Chris Best, Carlisle Construction Company, LLC, Collin Salazar Real Estate, LLC, Trinidad Corona, Kenneth Dallamora, Allison Dellatore, EventHost, Inc., Marty Fahncke, Larry Day Fox, Nigel Gay, Heller General Contracting, John Van Horn, Geoffrey Hurdle, Juan the Builder, Inc., Melanie Lopez, Brenda Massey, Mountain Top Customs, LLC, Patricia Olson, Orange Construction Solutions, Inc., Margaret Preece, Richard Ranalli, Sawbill Companies, Inc., Craig Weitz, Julie Whalen, Caryn Yost and Menard, Inc. in 21-1013 to notice requesting response [ # 13 ]. [21-1010, 21-1011, 21-1012, 21-1013] Conrad Shumadine [Entered: 01/08/2021 12:53 PM]
January 8, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE ISSUED to Robyn Adler, Aker Custom Carpentry, LLC, Albert Magnone Contracting & Remodeling, Arteva Construction, LLC, Ronald Kade Asay, Chris Best, Carlisle Construction Company, LLC, Collin Salazar Real Estate, LLC, Trinidad Corona, Kenneth Dallamora, Allison Dellatore, EventHost, Inc., Marty Fahncke, Larry Day Fox, Nigel Gay, Heller General Contracting, John Van Horn, Geoffrey Hurdle, Juan the Builder, Inc., Melanie Lopez, Brenda Massey, Mountain Top Customs, LLC, Patricia Olson, Orange Construction Solutions, Inc., Margaret Preece, Richard Ranalli, Sawbill Companies, Inc., Craig Weitz, Julie Whalen and Caryn Yost in 21-1010, 21-1011, 21-1012, and 21-1013 requesting response to Motion for stay pending appeal [ # 12 ]. Response due: 01/08/2021. [1000877999] [21-1010, 21-1011, 21-1012, 21-1013] AB [Entered: 01/08/2021 10:00 AM]
January 8, 2021 Filing 12 Emergency MOTION by Huttig Building Products, Inc. in 21-1010, OrePac Building Products, Inc. in 21-1011, BMC Stock Holdings, Inc. in 21-1012, Menard, Inc. in 21-1013 for stay pending appeal, for single judge consideration. Date of action to be stayed, if applicable: stay district court order requiring public disclosure of confidential materials on or before Monday, January 11, 2021. Date and method of service: 01/08/2021 ecf. [1000877908] [21-1010, 21-1011, 21-1012, 21-1013] Anand Ramana [Entered: 01/08/2021 08:36 AM]
January 8, 2021 Filing 11 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by BMC Stock Holdings, Inc. in 21-1012. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000877869] [21-1010, 21-1011, 21-1012, 21-1013] Thomas Segars [Entered: 01/08/2021 07:41 AM]
January 7, 2021 Filing 10 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by OrePac Building Products, Inc. in 21-1011. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000877828] [21-1011, 21-1010, 21-1012, 21-1013] Patrick McDonald [Entered: 01/07/2021 10:47 PM]
January 7, 2021 Filing 9 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Patrick James McDonald for OrePac Building Products, Inc. in 21-1011. [1000877827] [21-1011, 21-1010, 21-1012, 21-1013] Patrick McDonald [Entered: 01/07/2021 10:46 PM]
January 7, 2021 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Huttig Building Products, Inc. in 21-1010. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000877815] [21-1010, 21-1011, 21-1012, 21-1013] Anand Ramana [Entered: 01/07/2021 08:46 PM]
January 7, 2021 Filing 7 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Anand V. Ramana for Huttig Building Products, Inc. in 21-1010. [1000877814] [21-1010, 21-1011, 21-1012, 21-1013] Anand Ramana [Entered: 01/07/2021 08:45 PM]
January 7, 2021 Filing 6 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Preetha Suresh Rini for BMC Stock Holdings, Inc. in 21-1012. [1000877764] [21-1010, 21-1011, 21-1012, 21-1013] Preetha Rini [Entered: 01/07/2021 04:39 PM]
January 7, 2021 Filing 5 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Kelly Margolis Dagger for BMC Stock Holdings, Inc. in 21-1012. [1000877761] [21-1010, 21-1011, 21-1012, 21-1013] Kelly Dagger [Entered: 01/07/2021 04:36 PM]
January 7, 2021 Filing 4 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Thomas H. Segars for BMC Stock Holdings, Inc. in 21-1012. [1000877757] [21-1010, 21-1011, 21-1012, 21-1013] Thomas Segars [Entered: 01/07/2021 04:33 PM]
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER filed consolidating cases 21-1011, 21-1012, and 21-1013 with case 21-1010. Copies to all parties. [1000876910] [21-1010, 21-1011, 21-1012, 21-1013] AB [Entered: 01/06/2021 05:40 PM]
January 6, 2021 Filing 2 DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case. Originating case number: 3:18-cv-00850-JAG. [21-1013] AB [Entered: 01/06/2021 05:30 PM]
January 5, 2021 Filing 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 3:18-cv-00850-JAG. Case manager: ABrownlee. [21-1013] AB [Entered: 01/06/2021 05:28 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Sawbill Companies, Inc. v. Menard, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: NIGEL GAY
Represented By: Conrad M. Shumadine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: PATRICIA OLSON
Represented By: Conrad M. Shumadine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: SAWBILL COMPANIES, INC.
Represented By: Conrad M. Shumadine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: MARTY FAHNCKE
Represented By: Conrad M. Shumadine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JOHN VAN HORN
Represented By: Conrad M. Shumadine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JUAN THE BUILDER, INC.
Represented By: Conrad M. Shumadine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: AKER CUSTOM CARPENTRY, LLC
Represented By: Conrad M. Shumadine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: COLLIN SALAZAR REAL ESTATE, LLC
Represented By: Conrad M. Shumadine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: MARGARET PREECE
Represented By: Conrad M. Shumadine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: BRENDA MASSEY
Represented By: Conrad M. Shumadine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JULIE WHALEN
Represented By: Conrad M. Shumadine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CRAIG WEITZ
Represented By: Conrad M. Shumadine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: RONALD KADE ASAY
Represented By: Conrad M. Shumadine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: MELANIE LOPEZ
Represented By: Conrad M. Shumadine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: MOUNTAIN TOP CUSTOMS, LLC, d/b/a Mountain Top Custom Construction
Represented By: Conrad M. Shumadine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: TRINIDAD CORONA
Represented By: Conrad M. Shumadine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: LARRY DAY FOX
Represented By: Conrad M. Shumadine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CARLISLE CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, LLC
Represented By: Conrad M. Shumadine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ORANGE CONSTRUCTION SOLUTIONS, INC.
Represented By: Conrad M. Shumadine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: RICHARD RANALLI
Represented By: Conrad M. Shumadine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: KENNETH DALLAMORA
Represented By: Conrad M. Shumadine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ALLISON DELLATORE
Represented By: Conrad M. Shumadine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ROBYN ADLER
Represented By: Conrad M. Shumadine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ALBERT MAGNONE CONTRACTING & REMODELING
Represented By: Conrad M. Shumadine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CHRIS BEST
Represented By: Conrad M. Shumadine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CARYN YOST
Represented By: Conrad M. Shumadine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: EVENTHOST, INC., d/b/a National Builders
Represented By: Conrad M. Shumadine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: HELLER GENERAL CONTRACTING
Represented By: Conrad M. Shumadine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: GEOFFREY HURDLE
Represented By: Conrad M. Shumadine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ARTEVA CONSTRUCTION, LLC
Represented By: Conrad M. Shumadine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANDREW KNIGHT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUSTIN VERSCHOORE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JANE E. SWIM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WALLY BLOSS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THOMAS J. RILEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELLIOTT MASSEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TWIN CITY DEVELOPMENT, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GREGORY ALLEN REITMEYER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GARY BENDICKSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BENJAMIN PRUSKY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JELD-WEN, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MASONITE CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: MENARD, INC.
Represented By: Timothy D. Belevetz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?