J.O.P. v. DHS
Plaintiff / Appellee: J.O.P., E.D.G., M.A.L.C., M.E.R.E., K.A.R.C. and L.M.Z., on behalf of themselves as individuals and on behalf of others similarly situated.
Defendant / Appellant: MATTHEW C. ALLEN, in his official capacity as Senior Official performing the Duties of the Director of U.S. Immigration & Customs Enforcement, U. S. IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, TRACY RENAUD, in her official capacity as Director of U.S. Citizenship & Immigration Services, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY and ALEJANDRO N. MAYORKAS, in his official capacity as Secretary of Homeland Security
Case Number: 21-1187
Filed: February 19, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER filed granting Motion to extend filing time [ # 13 ] Number of days granted: 30. Opening brief and appendix due 05/19/2021. Response brief due 06/18/2021. Paper copy requirements are temporarily suspended unless the case is under pre-argument review or being scheduled for argument, in which case a total of four paper copies of formal briefs and appendices are required. Copies to all parties. [1000925888] [21-1187] KH [Entered: 03/30/2021 04:00 PM]
March 29, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION by Matthew C. Allen, Alejandro N. Mayorkas, Tracy Renaud, U. S. Immigration & Customs Enforcement, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services and United States Department of Homeland Security to extend filing time for opening brief and appendix until May 19, 2021.. Date and method of service: 03/29/2021 ecf. [1000925051] [21-1187] Yamileth Davila [Entered: 03/29/2021 04:32 PM]
March 24, 2021 Filing 12 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by E.D.G., J.O.P., K.A.R.C., L.M.Z., M.A.L.C. and M.E.R.E.. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000922319] [21-1187] Stephen Shaw [Entered: 03/24/2021 01:12 PM]
March 24, 2021 Filing 11 DOCKETING FORMS FOLLOW-UP NOTICE ISSUED to E.D.G., J.O.P., K.A.R.C., L.M.Z., M.A.L.C. and M.E.R.E. re: filing of disclosure form. Disclosure statement due from E.D.G., J.O.P., K.A.R.C., L.M.Z., M.A.L.C. and M.E.R.E. on 03/29/2021. [21-1187] KH [Entered: 03/24/2021 11:25 AM]
March 16, 2021 Filing 10 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Elaine Herrmann Blais for E.D.G., J.O.P., K.A.R.C., L.M.Z., M.A.L.C. and M.E.R.E.. [1000917157] [21-1187] Elaine Blais [Entered: 03/16/2021 03:15 PM]
March 8, 2021 Filing 9 BRIEFING ORDER filed. Paper copy requirements are temporarily suspended unless the case is under pre-argument review or being scheduled for argument, in which case a total of four paper copies of formal briefs and appendices are required. Opening Brief and Appendix due 04/19/2021. Response Brief due 05/17/2021. [21-1187] KH [Entered: 03/08/2021 02:58 PM]
March 5, 2021 Filing 8 DOCKETING STATEMENT by Matthew C. Allen, Alejandro N. Mayorkas, Tracy Renaud, U. S. Immigration & Customs Enforcement, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services and United States Department of Homeland Security. [21-1187] Yamileth Davila [Entered: 03/05/2021 07:18 PM]
March 5, 2021 Filing 7 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Kevin DeJong for E.D.G., J.O.P., K.A.R.C., L.M.Z., M.A.L.C. and M.E.R.E.. [1000911114] [21-1187] Kevin DeJong [Entered: 03/05/2021 01:45 PM]
March 4, 2021 Filing 6 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Yamileth G. Davila for Matthew C. Allen, Alejandro N. Mayorkas, Tracy Renaud, U. S. Immigration & Customs Enforcement, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services and United States Department of Homeland Security. [1000910634] [21-1187] Yamileth Davila [Entered: 03/04/2021 09:15 PM]
March 3, 2021 Filing 5 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Stephen Shaw for E.D.G., J.O.P., K.A.R.C., L.M.Z., M.A.L.C. and M.E.R.E.. [1000909287] [21-1187] Stephen Shaw [Entered: 03/03/2021 12:06 PM]
March 3, 2021 Filing 4 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Brian T. Burgess for E.D.G., J.O.P., K.A.R.C., L.M.Z., M.A.L.C. and M.E.R.E.. [1000909272] [21-1187] Brian Burgess [Entered: 03/03/2021 11:56 AM]
February 22, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE ISSUED re: Updated and amended case caption. [21-1187] KH [Entered: 02/22/2021 01:31 PM]
February 19, 2021 Filing 2 DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case. Originating case number: 8:19-cv-01944-GJH. [21-1187] KH [Entered: 02/19/2021 05:09 PM]
February 19, 2021 Filing 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 8:19-cv-01944-GJH. Case manager: KHancock. [21-1187] KH [Entered: 02/19/2021 05:06 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: J.O.P. v. DHS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: J.O.P.
Represented By: Brian Timothy Burgess Esq.
Represented By: Michelle Natalia Mendez
Represented By: Elaine Herrmann Blais
Represented By: Stephen Richard Shaw
Represented By: Kevin Jon DeJong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: E.D.G.
Represented By: Brian Timothy Burgess Esq.
Represented By: Elaine Herrmann Blais
Represented By: Stephen Richard Shaw
Represented By: Kevin Jon DeJong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: M.A.L.C.
Represented By: Brian Timothy Burgess Esq.
Represented By: Michelle Natalia Mendez
Represented By: Elaine Herrmann Blais
Represented By: Stephen Richard Shaw
Represented By: Kevin Jon DeJong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: M.E.R.E.
Represented By: Brian Timothy Burgess Esq.
Represented By: Michelle Natalia Mendez
Represented By: Elaine Herrmann Blais
Represented By: Stephen Richard Shaw
Represented By: Kevin Jon DeJong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: K.A.R.C.
Represented By: Brian Timothy Burgess Esq.
Represented By: Michelle Natalia Mendez
Represented By: Elaine Herrmann Blais
Represented By: Stephen Richard Shaw
Represented By: Kevin Jon DeJong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: L.M.Z., on behalf of themselves as individuals and on behalf of others similarly situated.
Represented By: Brian Timothy Burgess Esq.
Represented By: Elaine Herrmann Blais
Represented By: Stephen Richard Shaw
Represented By: Kevin Jon DeJong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: MATTHEW C. ALLEN, in his official capacity as Senior Official performing the Duties of the Director of U.S. Immigration & Customs Enforcement
Represented By: Matthew Adam Haven
Represented By: Vickie Elaine LeDuc
Represented By: Allen F. Loucks Esq.
Represented By: Yamileth G. Davila
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: U. S. IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT
Represented By: Matthew Adam Haven
Represented By: Vickie Elaine LeDuc
Represented By: Allen F. Loucks Esq.
Represented By: Yamileth G. Davila
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
Represented By: Matthew Adam Haven
Represented By: Vickie Elaine LeDuc
Represented By: Allen F. Loucks Esq.
Represented By: Yamileth G. Davila
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: TRACY RENAUD, in her official capacity as Director of U.S. Citizenship & Immigration Services
Represented By: Matthew Adam Haven
Represented By: Vickie Elaine LeDuc
Represented By: Allen F. Loucks Esq.
Represented By: Yamileth G. Davila
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Represented By: Matthew Adam Haven
Represented By: Vickie Elaine LeDuc
Represented By: Allen F. Loucks Esq.
Represented By: Yamileth G. Davila
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: ALEJANDRO N. MAYORKAS, in his official capacity as Secretary of Homeland Security
Represented By: Matthew Adam Haven
Represented By: Vickie Elaine LeDuc
Represented By: Allen F. Loucks Esq.
Represented By: Yamileth G. Davila
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?