Kenneth Grabarczyk v. Joshua Stein
Defendant / Appellant: JOSHUA STEIN, Attorney General of the State of North Carolina in his official capacity, BOB SCHURMEIER, Director of the North Carolina State Bureau of Investigation in his official capacity and SEAN BOONE, District Attorney of Alamance County, North Carolina in his official capacity
Plaintiff / Appellee: KENNETH GRABARCZYK
Case Number: 21-1209
Filed: February 24, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2021 Filing 15 Corrected JOINT APPENDIX (electronic and paper form) by Sean Boone, Bob Schurmeier and Joshua Stein. Digital media exhibit volume? No. [1000934783] [21-1209] Joseph Finarelli [Entered: 04/15/2021 02:26 PM]
April 15, 2021 Filing 14 (ENTRY RESTRICTED) JOINT APPENDIX (electronic and paper form) by Sean Boone, Bob Schurmeier and Joshua Stein. Digital media exhibit volume? No. [1000934764] [21-1209]--[Edited 04/15/2021 by AB] Joseph Finarelli [Entered: 04/15/2021 02:00 PM]
April 15, 2021 Filing 13 BRIEF by Sean Boone, Bob Schurmeier and Joshua Stein in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: OPENING. [1000934762] [21-1209] Joseph Finarelli [Entered: 04/15/2021 01:59 PM]
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER filed updating briefing order deadlines. Opening brief and appendix due 04/16/2021. Response brief due 05/17/2021. Paper copy requirements are temporarily suspended unless the case is under pre-argument review or being scheduled for argument, in which case a total of four paper copies of formal briefs and appendices are required. Copies to all parties. [1000913832] [21-1209] AB [Entered: 03/10/2021 04:01 PM]
March 4, 2021 Filing 11 Initial mediation conference scheduled. [21-1209] LHP [Entered: 03/04/2021 09:30 AM]
March 2, 2021 Filing 10 DOCKETING STATEMENT by Sean Boone, Bob Schurmeier and Joshua Stein. [21-1209] Joseph Finarelli [Entered: 03/02/2021 03:25 PM]
March 2, 2021 Filing 9 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Bryan G. Nichols for Bob Schurmeier. [1000908593] [21-1209] Bryan Nichols [Entered: 03/02/2021 03:09 PM]
March 2, 2021 Filing 8 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Tamika L. Henderson for Joshua Stein. [1000908207] [21-1209] Tamika Henderson [Entered: 03/02/2021 10:43 AM]
March 2, 2021 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Kenneth Grabarczyk. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000908136] [21-1209] Paul Dubbeling [Entered: 03/02/2021 09:55 AM]
March 2, 2021 Filing 6 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Paul Dubbeling for Kenneth Grabarczyk. [1000908135] [21-1209] Paul Dubbeling [Entered: 03/02/2021 09:54 AM]
February 24, 2021 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Sean Boone. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000905236] [21-1209] Joseph Finarelli [Entered: 02/24/2021 05:18 PM]
February 24, 2021 Filing 4 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Joseph Finarelli for Sean Boone. [1000905234] [21-1209] Joseph Finarelli [Entered: 02/24/2021 05:18 PM]
February 24, 2021 Filing 3 BRIEFING ORDER filed. Paper copy requirements are temporarily suspended unless the case is under pre-argument review or being scheduled for argument, in which case a total of four paper copies of formal briefs and appendices are required. Opening Brief and Appendix due 04/05/2021. Response Brief due 05/05/2021. [21-1209] AB [Entered: 02/24/2021 05:02 PM]
February 24, 2021 Filing 2 DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case. Originating case number: 5:19-cv-00048-BO. [21-1209] AB [Entered: 02/24/2021 04:59 PM]
February 24, 2021 Filing 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 5:19-cv-00048-BO. Case manager: ABrownlee. [21-1209] AB [Entered: 02/24/2021 04:55 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Kenneth Grabarczyk v. Joshua Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: JOSHUA STEIN, Attorney General of the State of North Carolina in his official capacity
Represented By: Tamika Lynn Henderson
Represented By: Joshua Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: BOB SCHURMEIER, Director of the North Carolina State Bureau of Investigation in his official capacity
Represented By: Bryan Grant Nichols
Represented By: Joshua Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: SEAN BOONE, District Attorney of Alamance County, North Carolina in his official capacity
Represented By: Joseph Finarelli
Represented By: Joshua Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: KENNETH GRABARCZYK
Represented By: Paul Moore Dubbeling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?