Haritha Nadendla v. WakeMed
Plaintiff / Appellant: HARITHA NADENDLA, M.D.
Defendant / Appellee: WAKEMED, d/b/a WakeMed Cary Hospital
Case Number: 21-1300
Filed: March 19, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
January 21, 2022 Summary Nadendla v. WakeMed

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 28, 2021 Filing 12 JOINT APPENDIX (electronic and paper form) by Haritha Nadendla. Digital media exhibit volume? No. [1000942364] [21-1300] Matthew Ballew [Entered: 04/28/2021 03:18 PM]
April 28, 2021 Filing 11 BRIEF by Haritha Nadendla in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: OPENING. [1000942362] [21-1300] Matthew Ballew [Entered: 04/28/2021 03:16 PM]
April 9, 2021 Filing 10 DOCKETING STATEMENT by Haritha Nadendla. [21-1300] Matthew Ballew [Entered: 04/09/2021 05:33 PM]
April 8, 2021 Filing 9 DOCKETING FORMS FOLLOW-UP NOTICE ISSUED to Haritha Nadendla re: filing of docketing statement. Docketing statement due from Haritha Nadendla on 04/12/2021. [21-1300] EB [Entered: 04/08/2021 10:13 AM]
April 1, 2021 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Haritha Nadendla. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000927650] [21-1300] Matthew Ballew [Entered: 04/01/2021 05:43 PM]
April 1, 2021 Filing 7 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Matthew D. Ballew for Haritha Nadendla. [1000927644] [21-1300] Matthew Ballew [Entered: 04/01/2021 05:24 PM]
March 31, 2021 Filing 6 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Matthew Nis Leerberg for WakeMed. [1000926588] [21-1300] Matthew Leerberg [Entered: 03/31/2021 02:36 PM]
March 31, 2021 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by WakeMed. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000926585] [21-1300] Elizabeth Hedrick [Entered: 03/31/2021 02:35 PM]
March 31, 2021 Filing 4 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Elizabeth Sims Hedrick for WakeMed. [1000926584] [21-1300] Elizabeth Hedrick [Entered: 03/31/2021 02:34 PM]
March 19, 2021 Filing 3 BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Marcus C. Hewitt. Paper copy requirements are temporarily suspended unless the case is under pre-argument review or being scheduled for argument, in which case a total of four paper copies of formal briefs and appendices are required. Opening Brief and Appendix due 04/28/2021. Response Brief due 05/28/2021. [21-1300] EB [Entered: 03/19/2021 11:29 AM]
March 19, 2021 Filing 2 DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case. Originating case number: 5:18-cv-00540-H. Mailed to: Marcus C. Hewitt. [21-1300] EB [Entered: 03/19/2021 11:27 AM]
March 19, 2021 Filing 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 5:18-cv-00540-H. Case manager: EBorneisen. [21-1300] EB [Entered: 03/19/2021 11:24 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Haritha Nadendla v. WakeMed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: HARITHA NADENDLA, M.D.
Represented By: Robert Ellis Zaytoun
Represented By: John Richard Taylor
Represented By: Matthew David Ballew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WAKEMED, d/b/a WakeMed Cary Hospital
Represented By: Marcus C. Hewitt
Represented By: Elizabeth Sims Hedrick
Represented By: Matthew Nis Leerberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?