Shawn Rhoades v. Savannah River Nuclear Solutions, LLC
Plaintiff / Appellant: SHAWN PHILLIP RHOADES, JOSEPH FRANKLIN DENNIS, JOSHUA MARSHALL FLOYD, BRUCE ALLAN HICKMAN, STEPHEN JAMES SNYDER, MICHAEL HOWARD DERRICK, EMILY ROBERSON SKELLEY, CHARLES GREGORY SPRINGS, JOHN N. VINSON, JASON DUANE HICKS, COURIE JONATHAN DENNIS, KIMBERLY MARIE VIETMEIER, MARTHA LEANNE BOETTJER-EYSTER, JIMMY DALE FURTICK, MARY WILLIAMS HALL, DONNA BRINSON STALCUP, MICHAEL WILEY MOULTON, JR., LAURIE ALDRICH WOOD, JEFFREY JOHN GRINNELL, VICKIE LEE HEAD, VICTORIA B. SININGER, CHESTER CRAIG GOSNEY, GLENN ADAM DEFREES, PENELOPE ROGERS FELL, THOMAS JOHN DIAZ, STEPHEN JUDSON HALL, CYNTHIA POWELL BURKE, LORI A. ROBERTS, BRYCE ALLEN ROBERTS, AUBRIE JACKSON NORRIS, JR., JEFFREY ALAN KLAPPER, VANESSA F. REWIS, KEREK MONROE BEARDEN, TIMOTHY LEVI PARKER, GEORGE REN FELL, ROSS ROBERSON, BETTY JO STILL, RICHARD HENRY TURLINGTON, BRITTANY HOLSONBACK PARKER, MICHAEL MATTHEW VOLPE, FRANKLIN WALLACE ODOM, STEPHANIE DIANNE WILLIAMS, RICHARD DOUGLAS POSEY, JOSEPH WILLIAMS GENTRY, JR., CHARISSE OSBORNE NAGY, JOSEPH MARK REDD, JOSHUA DANE GROSS, DAWN MICHELLE CULLEN, HARRY CHARLES COREY, JOHN LOUIS WILSON, BRYAN REID SCOTT, JR., HAILEY ALEXIS HICKMAN, EMMETT DANIEL FERRELL, JR., ROY PHILLIP BROCK, JR., CHRISTOPHER DANIEL HERNDON, CATHERINE CARTER LYNN, HAYLEY MARIE WILLIAMS, JANA DARNELL SCHROEDER, THOMAS LUTHER GOOGE, CLARENCE A. PALMER, JAMES ARNOLD JONES, EDWARD LINDSEY BOOZER, JR., LINDA G. SPARKS, RYAN ALAN MANN, LAWRENCE ELMER JEFFERS, III, RICHARD CARLISLE HOLLEY, TINA MARIE WINGFIELD, CHRISTOPHER SAMUEL BRUCE, JOHN MARK LEMASTER, GINGER HUMPHRIES-HASEK, CHRISTINA CHEREE FASSARI, JASON MARELLA, MICHAEL RAY ANDIS, JIMMIE PHILLIP HARMON, JACOB BENJAMIN ANDERSON, BENJAMIN JAMES WRETT THOMPSON, DANIEL RYAN DANIEL, DENNIS PAUL VILLEMAIN, EMMALEE WALL, JAMES MITCHELL WHITTINGTON, JESSICA STEEDLEY, JOEL LLOYD SHAFFER, JONATHAN BRENT COLE, MICHAEL BRYAN ROEBER, RICHARD PERRY BROWN, ROBERT WILLIAM KIRKLAND, RYAN KNIGHT WAGNER, STEVEN MARK LAWSON, TERESA ARNWINE, TRACY EUGENE STOVER, JR. and TROY DAREN MCCLENDON
Defendant / Appellee: SAVANNAH RIVER NUCLEAR SOLUTIONS, LLC
Case Number: 21-2381
Filed: December 14, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2022 Filing 11 RULE 45 NOTICE issued to Jacob Benjamin Anderson, Michael Ray Andis, Teresa Arnwine, Kerek Monroe Bearden, Martha LeAnne Boettjer-Eyster, Edward Lindsey Boozer, Jr., Roy Phillip Brock, Jr., Richard Perry Brown, Christopher Samuel Bruce, Cynthia Powell Burke, Jonathan Brent Cole, Harry Charles Corey, Dawn Michelle Cullen, Daniel Ryan Daniel, Glenn Adam DeFrees, Courie Jonathan Dennis, Joseph Franklin Dennis, Michael Howard Derrick, Thomas John Diaz, Christina Cheree Fassari, George Ren Fell, Penelope Rogers Fell, Emmett Daniel Ferrell, Jr., Joshua Marshall Floyd, Jimmy Dale Furtick, Joseph Williams Gentry, Jr., Thomas Luther Googe, Chester Craig Gosney, Jeffrey John Grinnell, Joshua Dane Gross, Mary Williams Hall, Stephen Judson Hall, Jimmie Phillip Harmon, Vickie Lee Head, Christopher Daniel Herndon, Bruce Allan Hickman, Hailey Alexis Hickman, Jason Duane Hicks, Richard Carlisle Holley, Ginger Humphries-Hasek, Lawrence Elmer Jeffers, III, James Arnold Jones, Robert William Kirkland, Jeffrey Alan Klapper, Steven Mark Lawson, John Mark LeMaster, Catherine Carter Lynn, Ryan Alan Mann, Jason Marella, Troy Daren McClendon, Michael Wiley Moulton, Jr., Charisse Osborne Nagy, Aubrie Jackson Norris, Jr., Franklin Wallace Odom, Clarence A. Palmer, Brittany Holsonback Parker, Timothy Levi Parker, Richard Douglas Posey, Joseph Mark Redd, Vanessa F. Rewis, Shawn Phillip Rhoades, Ross Roberson, Bryce Allen Roberts, Lori A. Roberts, Michael Bryan Roeber, Jana Darnell Schroeder, Bryan Reid Scott, Jr., Joel Lloyd Shaffer, Victoria B. Sininger, Emily Roberson Skelley, Stephen James Snyder, Linda G. Sparks, Charles Gregory Springs, Donna Brinson Stalcup, Jessica Steedley, Betty Jo Still, Tracy Eugene Stover, Jr., Benjamin James Wrett Thompson, Richard Henry Turlington, Kimberly Marie Vietmeier, Dennis Paul Villemain, John N. Vinson, Michael Matthew Volpe, Ryan Knight Wagner, Emmalee Wall, James Mitchell Whittington, Hayley Marie Williams, Stephanie Dianne Williams, John Louis Wilson, Tina Marie Wingfield and Laurie Aldrich Wood re: failure to file brief and appendix.Case will be dismissed if default is not cured within 15 days. [1001107904] [21-2381] DL [Entered: 02/10/2022 10:04 AM]
December 28, 2021 Filing 10 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Benjamin P.J. Dudek for Savannah River Nuclear Solutions, LLC. [1001081888] [21-2381] Benjamin Dudek [Entered: 12/28/2021 02:30 PM]
December 28, 2021 Filing 9 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Savannah River Nuclear Solutions, LLC. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1001081861] [21-2381] Michael Carrouth [Entered: 12/28/2021 01:57 PM]
December 28, 2021 Filing 8 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Michael D. Carrouth for Savannah River Nuclear Solutions, LLC. [1001081860] [21-2381] Michael Carrouth [Entered: 12/28/2021 01:56 PM]
December 27, 2021 Filing 7 BRIEFING ORDER filed. Paper copy requirements are temporarily suspended unless the case is under pre-argument review or being scheduled for argument, in which case a total of four paper copies of formal briefs and appendices are required. [1001080881] Opening Brief and Appendix due 02/07/2022. Response Brief due 03/09/2022. [21-2381] EB [Entered: 12/27/2021 12:45 PM]
December 27, 2021 Filing 6 DOCKETING STATEMENT by Jacob Benjamin Anderson, Michael Ray Andis, Teresa Arnwine, Kerek Monroe Bearden, Martha LeAnne Boettjer-Eyster, Edward Lindsey Boozer, Jr., Roy Phillip Brock, Jr., Richard Perry Brown, Christopher Samuel Bruce, Cynthia Powell Burke, Jonathan Brent Cole, Harry Charles Corey, Dawn Michelle Cullen, Daniel Ryan Daniel, Glenn Adam DeFrees, Courie Jonathan Dennis, Joseph Franklin Dennis, Michael Howard Derrick, Thomas John Diaz, Christina Cheree Fassari, George Ren Fell, Penelope Rogers Fell, Emmett Daniel Ferrell, Jr., Joshua Marshall Floyd, Jimmy Dale Furtick, Joseph Williams Gentry, Jr., Thomas Luther Googe, Chester Craig Gosney, Jeffrey John Grinnell, Joshua Dane Gross, Mary Williams Hall, Stephen Judson Hall, Jimmie Phillip Harmon, Vickie Lee Head, Christopher Daniel Herndon, Bruce Allan Hickman, Hailey Alexis Hickman, Jason Duane Hicks, Richard Carlisle Holley, Ginger Humphries-Hasek, Lawrence Elmer Jeffers, III, James Arnold Jones, Robert William Kirkland, Jeffrey Alan Klapper, Steven Mark Lawson, John Mark LeMaster, Catherine Carter Lynn, Ryan Alan Mann, Jason Marella, Troy Daren McClendon, Michael Wiley Moulton, Jr., Charisse Osborne Nagy, Aubrie Jackson Norris, Jr., Franklin Wallace Odom, Clarence A. Palmer, Brittany Holsonback Parker, Timothy Levi Parker, Richard Douglas Posey, Joseph Mark Redd, Vanessa F. Rewis, Shawn Phillip Rhoades, Ross Roberson, Bryce Allen Roberts, Lori A. Roberts, Michael Bryan Roeber, Jana Darnell Schroeder, Bryan Reid Scott, Jr., Joel Lloyd Shaffer, Victoria B. Sininger, Emily Roberson Skelley, Stephen James Snyder, Linda G. Sparks, Charles Gregory Springs, Donna Brinson Stalcup, Jessica Steedley, Betty Jo Still, Tracy Eugene Stover, Jr., Benjamin James Wrett Thompson, Richard Henry Turlington, Kimberly Marie Vietmeier, Dennis Paul Villemain, John N. Vinson, Michael Matthew Volpe, Ryan Knight Wagner, Emmalee Wall, James Mitchell Whittington, Hayley Marie Williams, Stephanie Dianne Williams, John Louis Wilson, Tina Marie Wingfield and Laurie Aldrich Wood.. [1001080830] [21-2381] Donald Brown [Entered: 12/27/2021 12:03 PM]
December 27, 2021 Filing 5 Amended DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Jacob Benjamin Anderson, Michael Ray Andis, Teresa Arnwine, Kerek Monroe Bearden, Martha LeAnne Boettjer-Eyster, Edward Lindsey Boozer, Jr., Roy Phillip Brock, Jr., Richard Perry Brown, Christopher Samuel Bruce, Cynthia Powell Burke, Jonathan Brent Cole, Harry Charles Corey, Dawn Michelle Cullen, Daniel Ryan Daniel, Glenn Adam DeFrees, Courie Jonathan Dennis, Joseph Franklin Dennis, Michael Howard Derrick, Thomas John Diaz, Christina Cheree Fassari, George Ren Fell, Penelope Rogers Fell, Emmett Daniel Ferrell, Jr., Joshua Marshall Floyd, Jimmy Dale Furtick, Joseph Williams Gentry, Jr., Thomas Luther Googe, Chester Craig Gosney, Jeffrey John Grinnell, Joshua Dane Gross, Mary Williams Hall, Stephen Judson Hall, Jimmie Phillip Harmon, Vickie Lee Head, Christopher Daniel Herndon, Bruce Allan Hickman, Hailey Alexis Hickman, Jason Duane Hicks, Richard Carlisle Holley, Ginger Humphries-Hasek, Lawrence Elmer Jeffers, III, James Arnold Jones, Robert William Kirkland, Jeffrey Alan Klapper, Steven Mark Lawson, John Mark LeMaster, Catherine Carter Lynn, Ryan Alan Mann, Jason Marella, Troy Daren McClendon, Michael Wiley Moulton, Jr., Charisse Osborne Nagy, Aubrie Jackson Norris, Jr., Franklin Wallace Odom, Clarence A. Palmer, Brittany Holsonback Parker, Timothy Levi Parker, Richard Douglas Posey, Joseph Mark Redd, Vanessa F. Rewis, Shawn Phillip Rhoades, Ross Roberson, Bryce Allen Roberts, Lori A. Roberts, Michael Bryan Roeber, Jana Darnell Schroeder, Bryan Reid Scott, Jr., Joel Lloyd Shaffer, Victoria B. Sininger, Emily Roberson Skelley, Stephen James Snyder, Linda G. Sparks, Charles Gregory Springs, Donna Brinson Stalcup, Jessica Steedley, Betty Jo Still, Tracy Eugene Stover, Jr., Benjamin James Wrett Thompson, Richard Henry Turlington, Kimberly Marie Vietmeier, Dennis Paul Villemain, John N. Vinson, Michael Matthew Volpe, Ryan Knight Wagner, Emmalee Wall, James Mitchell Whittington, Hayley Marie Williams, Stephanie Dianne Williams, John Louis Wilson, Tina Marie Wingfield and Laurie Aldrich Wood. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1001080699] [21-2381] Donald Brown [Entered: 12/27/2021 10:36 AM]
December 27, 2021 Filing 4 (ENTRY RESTRICTED) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Jacob Benjamin Anderson, Michael Ray Andis, Teresa Arnwine, Kerek Monroe Bearden, Martha LeAnne Boettjer-Eyster, Edward Lindsey Boozer, Jr., Roy Phillip Brock, Jr., Richard Perry Brown, Christopher Samuel Bruce, Cynthia Powell Burke, Jonathan Brent Cole, Harry Charles Corey, Dawn Michelle Cullen, Daniel Ryan Daniel, Glenn Adam DeFrees, Courie Jonathan Dennis, Joseph Franklin Dennis, Michael Howard Derrick, Thomas John Diaz, Christina Cheree Fassari, George Ren Fell, Penelope Rogers Fell, Emmett Daniel Ferrell, Jr., Joshua Marshall Floyd, Jimmy Dale Furtick, Joseph Williams Gentry, Jr., Thomas Luther Googe, Chester Craig Gosney, Jeffrey John Grinnell, Joshua Dane Gross, Mary Williams Hall, Stephen Judson Hall, Jimmie Phillip Harmon, Vickie Lee Head, Christopher Daniel Herndon, Bruce Allan Hickman, Hailey Alexis Hickman, Jason Duane Hicks, Richard Carlisle Holley, Ginger Humphries-Hasek, Lawrence Elmer Jeffers, III, James Arnold Jones, Robert William Kirkland, Jeffrey Alan Klapper, Steven Mark Lawson, John Mark LeMaster, Catherine Carter Lynn, Ryan Alan Mann, Jason Marella, Troy Daren McClendon, Michael Wiley Moulton, Jr., Charisse Osborne Nagy, Aubrie Jackson Norris, Jr., Franklin Wallace Odom, Clarence A. Palmer, Brittany Holsonback Parker, Timothy Levi Parker, Richard Douglas Posey, Joseph Mark Redd, Vanessa F. Rewis, Shawn Phillip Rhoades, Ross Roberson, Bryce Allen Roberts, Lori A. Roberts, Michael Bryan Roeber, Jana Darnell Schroeder, Bryan Reid Scott, Jr., Joel Lloyd Shaffer, Victoria B. Sininger, Emily Roberson Skelley, Stephen James Snyder, Linda G. Sparks, Charles Gregory Springs, Donna Brinson Stalcup, Jessica Steedley, Betty Jo Still, Tracy Eugene Stover, Jr., Benjamin James Wrett Thompson, Richard Henry Turlington, Kimberly Marie Vietmeier, Dennis Paul Villemain, John N. Vinson, Michael Matthew Volpe, Ryan Knight Wagner, Emmalee Wall, James Mitchell Whittington, Hayley Marie Williams, Stephanie Dianne Williams, John Louis Wilson, Tina Marie Wingfield and Laurie Aldrich Wood. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1001080692] [21-2381]--[Edited 12/27/2021 by EB- See ECF 5 for amended disclosure] Donald Brown [Entered: 12/27/2021 10:32 AM]
December 27, 2021 Filing 3 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Donald M. Brown, Jr. for Jacob Benjamin Anderson, Michael Ray Andis, Teresa Arnwine, Kerek Monroe Bearden, Martha LeAnne Boettjer-Eyster, Edward Lindsey Boozer, Jr., Roy Phillip Brock, Jr., Richard Perry Brown, Christopher Samuel Bruce, Cynthia Powell Burke, Jonathan Brent Cole, Harry Charles Corey, Dawn Michelle Cullen, Daniel Ryan Daniel, Glenn Adam DeFrees, Courie Jonathan Dennis, Joseph Franklin Dennis, Michael Howard Derrick, Thomas John Diaz, Christina Cheree Fassari, George Ren Fell, Penelope Rogers Fell, Emmett Daniel Ferrell, Jr., Joshua Marshall Floyd, Jimmy Dale Furtick, Joseph Williams Gentry, Jr., Thomas Luther Googe, Chester Craig Gosney, Jeffrey John Grinnell, Joshua Dane Gross, Mary Williams Hall, Stephen Judson Hall, Jimmie Phillip Harmon, Vickie Lee Head, Christopher Daniel Herndon, Bruce Allan Hickman, Hailey Alexis Hickman, Jason Duane Hicks, Richard Carlisle Holley, Ginger Humphries-Hasek, Lawrence Elmer Jeffers, III, James Arnold Jones, Robert William Kirkland, Jeffrey Alan Klapper, Steven Mark Lawson, John Mark LeMaster, Catherine Carter Lynn, Ryan Alan Mann, Jason Marella, Troy Daren McClendon, Michael Wiley Moulton, Jr., Charisse Osborne Nagy, Aubrie Jackson Norris, Jr., Franklin Wallace Odom, Clarence A. Palmer, Brittany Holsonback Parker, Timothy Levi Parker, Richard Douglas Posey, Joseph Mark Redd, Vanessa F. Rewis, Shawn Phillip Rhoades, Ross Roberson, Bryce Allen Roberts, Lori A. Roberts, Michael Bryan Roeber, Jana Darnell Schroeder, Bryan Reid Scott, Jr., Joel Lloyd Shaffer, Victoria B. Sininger, Emily Roberson Skelley, Stephen James Snyder, Linda G. Sparks, Charles Gregory Springs, Donna Brinson Stalcup, Jessica Steedley, Betty Jo Still, Tracy Eugene Stover, Jr., Benjamin James Wrett Thompson, Richard Henry Turlington, Kimberly Marie Vietmeier, Dennis Paul Villemain, John N. Vinson, Michael Matthew Volpe, Ryan Knight Wagner, Emmalee Wall, James Mitchell Whittington, Hayley Marie Williams, Stephanie Dianne Williams, John Louis Wilson, Tina Marie Wingfield and Laurie Aldrich Wood. [1001080595] [21-2381] Donald Brown [Entered: 12/27/2021 09:48 AM]
December 14, 2021 Filing 2 DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case. Originating case number: 1:21-cv-03391-JMC. [1001074579] [21-2381] EB [Entered: 12/14/2021 12:03 PM]
December 14, 2021 Filing 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:21-cv-03391-JMC. Case manager: EBorneisen. [1001074573] [21-2381] EB [Entered: 12/14/2021 11:57 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Shawn Rhoades v. Savannah River Nuclear Solutions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: SHAWN PHILLIP RHOADES
Represented By: Donald Mitchell Brown II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JOSEPH FRANKLIN DENNIS
Represented By: Donald Mitchell Brown II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JOSHUA MARSHALL FLOYD
Represented By: Donald Mitchell Brown II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: BRUCE ALLAN HICKMAN
Represented By: Donald Mitchell Brown II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: STEPHEN JAMES SNYDER
Represented By: Donald Mitchell Brown II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MICHAEL HOWARD DERRICK
Represented By: Donald Mitchell Brown II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: EMILY ROBERSON SKELLEY
Represented By: Donald Mitchell Brown II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CHARLES GREGORY SPRINGS
Represented By: Donald Mitchell Brown II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JOHN N. VINSON
Represented By: Donald Mitchell Brown II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JASON DUANE HICKS
Represented By: Donald Mitchell Brown II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: COURIE JONATHAN DENNIS
Represented By: Donald Mitchell Brown II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: KIMBERLY MARIE VIETMEIER
Represented By: Donald Mitchell Brown II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MARTHA LEANNE BOETTJER-EYSTER
Represented By: Donald Mitchell Brown II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JIMMY DALE FURTICK
Represented By: Donald Mitchell Brown II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MARY WILLIAMS HALL
Represented By: Donald Mitchell Brown II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DONNA BRINSON STALCUP
Represented By: Donald Mitchell Brown II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MICHAEL WILEY MOULTON, JR.
Represented By: Donald Mitchell Brown II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: LAURIE ALDRICH WOOD
Represented By: Donald Mitchell Brown II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JEFFREY JOHN GRINNELL
Represented By: Donald Mitchell Brown II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: VICKIE LEE HEAD
Represented By: Donald Mitchell Brown II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: VICTORIA B. SININGER
Represented By: Donald Mitchell Brown II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CHESTER CRAIG GOSNEY
Represented By: Donald Mitchell Brown II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: GLENN ADAM DEFREES
Represented By: Donald Mitchell Brown II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: PENELOPE ROGERS FELL
Represented By: Donald Mitchell Brown II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: THOMAS JOHN DIAZ
Represented By: Donald Mitchell Brown II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: STEPHEN JUDSON HALL
Represented By: Donald Mitchell Brown II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CYNTHIA POWELL BURKE
Represented By: Donald Mitchell Brown II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: LORI A. ROBERTS
Represented By: Donald Mitchell Brown II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: BRYCE ALLEN ROBERTS
Represented By: Donald Mitchell Brown II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: AUBRIE JACKSON NORRIS, JR.
Represented By: Donald Mitchell Brown II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JEFFREY ALAN KLAPPER
Represented By: Donald Mitchell Brown II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: VANESSA F. REWIS
Represented By: Donald Mitchell Brown II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: KEREK MONROE BEARDEN
Represented By: Donald Mitchell Brown II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: TIMOTHY LEVI PARKER
Represented By: Donald Mitchell Brown II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: GEORGE REN FELL
Represented By: Donald Mitchell Brown II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ROSS ROBERSON
Represented By: Donald Mitchell Brown II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: BETTY JO STILL
Represented By: Donald Mitchell Brown II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: RICHARD HENRY TURLINGTON
Represented By: Donald Mitchell Brown II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: BRITTANY HOLSONBACK PARKER
Represented By: Donald Mitchell Brown II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MICHAEL MATTHEW VOLPE
Represented By: Donald Mitchell Brown II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: FRANKLIN WALLACE ODOM
Represented By: Donald Mitchell Brown II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: STEPHANIE DIANNE WILLIAMS
Represented By: Donald Mitchell Brown II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: RICHARD DOUGLAS POSEY
Represented By: Donald Mitchell Brown II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JOSEPH WILLIAMS GENTRY, JR.
Represented By: Donald Mitchell Brown II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CHARISSE OSBORNE NAGY
Represented By: Donald Mitchell Brown II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JOSEPH MARK REDD
Represented By: Donald Mitchell Brown II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JOSHUA DANE GROSS
Represented By: Donald Mitchell Brown II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DAWN MICHELLE CULLEN
Represented By: Donald Mitchell Brown II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: HARRY CHARLES COREY
Represented By: Donald Mitchell Brown II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JOHN LOUIS WILSON
Represented By: Donald Mitchell Brown II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: BRYAN REID SCOTT, JR.
Represented By: Donald Mitchell Brown II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: HAILEY ALEXIS HICKMAN
Represented By: Donald Mitchell Brown II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: EMMETT DANIEL FERRELL, JR.
Represented By: Donald Mitchell Brown II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ROY PHILLIP BROCK, JR.
Represented By: Donald Mitchell Brown II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CHRISTOPHER DANIEL HERNDON
Represented By: Donald Mitchell Brown II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CATHERINE CARTER LYNN
Represented By: Donald Mitchell Brown II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: HAYLEY MARIE WILLIAMS
Represented By: Donald Mitchell Brown II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JANA DARNELL SCHROEDER
Represented By: Donald Mitchell Brown II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: THOMAS LUTHER GOOGE
Represented By: Donald Mitchell Brown II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CLARENCE A. PALMER
Represented By: Donald Mitchell Brown II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JAMES ARNOLD JONES
Represented By: Donald Mitchell Brown II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: EDWARD LINDSEY BOOZER, JR.
Represented By: Donald Mitchell Brown II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: LINDA G. SPARKS
Represented By: Donald Mitchell Brown II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: RYAN ALAN MANN
Represented By: Donald Mitchell Brown II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: LAWRENCE ELMER JEFFERS, III
Represented By: Donald Mitchell Brown II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: RICHARD CARLISLE HOLLEY
Represented By: Donald Mitchell Brown II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: TINA MARIE WINGFIELD
Represented By: Donald Mitchell Brown II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CHRISTOPHER SAMUEL BRUCE
Represented By: Donald Mitchell Brown II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JOHN MARK LEMASTER
Represented By: Donald Mitchell Brown II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: GINGER HUMPHRIES-HASEK
Represented By: Donald Mitchell Brown II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CHRISTINA CHEREE FASSARI
Represented By: Donald Mitchell Brown II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JASON MARELLA
Represented By: Donald Mitchell Brown II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MICHAEL RAY ANDIS
Represented By: Donald Mitchell Brown II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JIMMIE PHILLIP HARMON
Represented By: Donald Mitchell Brown II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JACOB BENJAMIN ANDERSON
Represented By: Donald Mitchell Brown II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: BENJAMIN JAMES WRETT THOMPSON
Represented By: Donald Mitchell Brown II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DANIEL RYAN DANIEL
Represented By: Donald Mitchell Brown II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DENNIS PAUL VILLEMAIN
Represented By: Donald Mitchell Brown II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: EMMALEE WALL
Represented By: Donald Mitchell Brown II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JAMES MITCHELL WHITTINGTON
Represented By: Donald Mitchell Brown II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JESSICA STEEDLEY
Represented By: Donald Mitchell Brown II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JOEL LLOYD SHAFFER
Represented By: Donald Mitchell Brown II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JONATHAN BRENT COLE
Represented By: Donald Mitchell Brown II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MICHAEL BRYAN ROEBER
Represented By: Donald Mitchell Brown II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: RICHARD PERRY BROWN
Represented By: Donald Mitchell Brown II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ROBERT WILLIAM KIRKLAND
Represented By: Donald Mitchell Brown II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: RYAN KNIGHT WAGNER
Represented By: Donald Mitchell Brown II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: STEVEN MARK LAWSON
Represented By: Donald Mitchell Brown II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: TERESA ARNWINE
Represented By: Donald Mitchell Brown II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: TRACY EUGENE STOVER, JR.
Represented By: Donald Mitchell Brown II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: TROY DAREN MCCLENDON
Represented By: Donald Mitchell Brown II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SAVANNAH RIVER NUCLEAR SOLUTIONS, LLC
Represented By: Michael D. Carrouth
Represented By: Benjamin Patrick James Dudek
Represented By: John Hagood Tighe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?