Emmanuel McGriff El v. William Bland
Defendant / Appellee: JUDGE WILLIAM BLAND, MATTHEW DELBRIDGE, District Attorney, JOHN DOE 2 and JOHN DOE 1
Plaintiff / Appellant: EMMANUEL LEE MCGRIFF EL
Case Number: 21-6355
Filed: March 10, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER filed granting Motion for leave to proceed PLRA [5]. Fee Amount: $505. Name and Prisoner Number: Emmanuel Lee McGriff El, #69806. Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Emmanuel McGriff El. [1000932505] [21-6355] JSN [Entered: 04/12/2021 04:49 PM]
April 12, 2021 Filing 8 PLRA-CONSENT TO PAYMENT form by Emmanuel Lee McGriff El. [21-6355] JSN [Entered: 04/12/2021 04:47 PM]
March 31, 2021 Filing 7 RULE 45 NOTICE issued to Emmanuel Lee McGriff El re: failure to satisfy fee requirements under PLRA. Case will be dismissed if default is not cured within 15 days. Mailed to: Emmanuel McGriff. [21-6355] JSN [Entered: 03/31/2021 05:41 PM]
March 29, 2021 Filing 6 INFORMAL OPENING BRIEF by Emmanuel Lee McGriff El. [21-6355] JSN [Entered: 03/29/2021 03:57 PM]
March 29, 2021 Filing 5 PLRA-APPLICATION (court access only) by Emmanuel Lee McGriff El. Consent to Payment Form: No; Trust Account Statement: No. [21-6355] JSN [Entered: 03/29/2021 03:56 PM]
March 10, 2021 Filing 4 ASSEMBLED ELECTRONIC RECORD docketed. Originating case number: 5:20-ct-03008-FL. Record in folder? Yes. Record reviewed? Yes. PSR included? N/A. [21-6355] JSN [Entered: 03/10/2021 02:19 PM]
March 10, 2021 Filing 3 INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Informal Opening Brief due 04/05/2021. Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief served. Mailed to: Emmanuel McGriff El. [21-6355] JSN [Entered: 03/10/2021 02:17 PM]
March 10, 2021 Filing 2 PLRA NOTICE issued to [ Emmanuel Lee McGriff El ]. Fee due to District Court or PLRA application due to Court of Appeals within 15 days. Mailed to: Emmanuel McGriff El. [21-6355] JSN [Entered: 03/10/2021 02:14 PM]
March 10, 2021 Filing 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 5:20-ct-030008-FL. Case manager: JeffNeal. [21-6355] JSN [Entered: 03/10/2021 02:10 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Emmanuel McGriff El v. William Bland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JUDGE WILLIAM BLAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MATTHEW DELBRIDGE, District Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOHN DOE 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOHN DOE 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: EMMANUEL LEE MCGRIFF EL
Represented By: Emmanuel Lee McGriff El
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?