Luis Sims v. Dept of Public Safety and Correctional Services
Defendant / Appellee: JOHN DOE, EMMANUEL ESIANOR, KASAHUN TEMESGEN, CORIZON HEALTH, INCORPORATED, DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY AND CORRECTIONAL SERVICES, ZOWIE BARNES, M.D., MONTUNRAYO O. ADEGORUSI, NICOLE HARGRAVE, Wexford Health Service Administrator, WEXFORD HEALTH SOURCES, INC., AYOKU OKETUNJI, LIBERATUS DE ROSA, M.D. and JANE DOE
Plaintiff / Appellant: LUIS A. SIMS
Case Number: 21-6473
Filed: March 29, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 14, 2021 Filing 13 Notice issued re: [ # 10 ] letter. Mailed to: Luis Sims. [21-6473] JR [Entered: 04/14/2021 02:06 PM]
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER filed updating informal briefing order and PLRA deadlines. Informal Opening Brief and PLRA documents due 05/24/2021. Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Luis Sims. [1000933955] [21-6473] JR [Entered: 04/14/2021 01:03 PM]
April 14, 2021 Filing 10 Letter by Luis A. Sims . [1000933666] [21-6473] JR [Entered: 04/14/2021 09:42 AM]
April 7, 2021 Filing 9 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Montunrayo O. Adegorusi, Zowie Barnes, M.D., Emmanuel Esianor, Nicole Hargrave, Dr. Ayoku Oketunji, Kasahun Temesgen and Liberatus De Rosa, M.D.. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000930372] [21-6473] Gina Smith [Entered: 04/07/2021 03:47 PM]
April 7, 2021 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Wexford Health Sources, Inc.. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000930370] [21-6473] Gina Smith [Entered: 04/07/2021 03:45 PM]
April 7, 2021 Filing 7 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Douglas Conrad Meister for Montunrayo O. Adegorusi, Zowie Barnes, M.D., Liberatus De Rosa, M.D., Emmanuel Esianor, Nicole Hargrave, Dr. Ayoku Oketunji, Kasahun Temesgen and Wexford Health Sources, Inc.. [1000930365] [21-6473] Gina Smith [Entered: 04/07/2021 03:42 PM]
April 7, 2021 Filing 6 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Gina Marie Smith for Montunrayo O. Adegorusi, Zowie Barnes, M.D., Liberatus De Rosa, M.D., Emmanuel Esianor, Nicole Hargrave, Dr. Ayoku Oketunji, Kasahun Temesgen and Wexford Health Sources, Inc.. [1000930355] [21-6473] Gina Smith [Entered: 04/07/2021 03:36 PM]
March 31, 2021 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Corizon Health, Incorporated. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000926295] [21-6473] Patricia Beall [Entered: 03/31/2021 11:07 AM]
March 31, 2021 Filing 4 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Patricia H. Beall for Corizon Health, Incorporated, Liberatus De Rosa, M.D., Zowie Barnes, M.D., Montunrayo O. Adegorusi, Emmanuel Esianor, Nicole Hargrave and Kasahun Temesgen. [1000926262] [21-6473] Patricia Beall [Entered: 03/31/2021 10:40 AM]
March 29, 2021 Filing 3 INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Luis A. Sims. Informal Opening Brief due 04/22/2021 Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief served. [21-6473] JR [Entered: 03/29/2021 11:20 AM]
March 29, 2021 Filing 2 PLRA NOTICE issued to [ Luis A. Sims ]. Fee due to District Court or PLRA application due to Court of Appeals within 15 days. Mailed to: Luis A. Sims. [21-6473] JR [Entered: 03/29/2021 11:18 AM]
March 29, 2021 Filing 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:19-cv-00704-GLR. Case manager: JRice. [21-6473] JR [Entered: 03/29/2021 11:03 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Luis Sims v. Dept of Public Safety and Correctional Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOHN DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: EMMANUEL ESIANOR
Represented By: Patricia H. Beall
Represented By: Jacqueline G. Greiss
Represented By: Douglas Conrad Meister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KASAHUN TEMESGEN
Represented By: Patricia H. Beall
Represented By: Jacqueline G. Greiss
Represented By: Douglas Conrad Meister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CORIZON HEALTH, INCORPORATED
Represented By: Patricia H. Beall
Represented By: Jacqueline G. Greiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY AND CORRECTIONAL SERVICES
Represented By: Dorianne Avery Meloy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ZOWIE BARNES, M.D.
Represented By: Douglas Conrad Meister
Represented By: Gina Marie Smith Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MONTUNRAYO O. ADEGORUSI
Represented By: Patricia H. Beall
Represented By: Jacqueline G. Greiss
Represented By: Douglas Conrad Meister
Represented By: Gina Marie Smith Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NICOLE HARGRAVE, Wexford Health Service Administrator
Represented By: Patricia H. Beall
Represented By: Jacqueline G. Greiss
Represented By: Douglas Conrad Meister
Represented By: Gina Marie Smith Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WEXFORD HEALTH SOURCES, INC.
Represented By: Douglas Conrad Meister
Represented By: Gina Marie Smith Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AYOKU OKETUNJI
Represented By: Douglas Conrad Meister
Represented By: Gina Marie Smith Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LIBERATUS DE ROSA, M.D.
Represented By: Patricia H. Beall
Represented By: Jacqueline G. Greiss
Represented By: Douglas Conrad Meister
Represented By: Gina Marie Smith Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JANE DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: LUIS A. SIMS
Represented By: Luis A. Sims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?