Timothy King v. Erik Hooks
Plaintiff: XAVIER KINNEY, MICHAEL BLANKEY, TIMOTHY BOYD, GREGORY PORTER, CORTNEY LEACH, MILTON L. LAWRENCE, CHRIS PEARSALL, JIMMY TINSLEY, IRVIN VASQUEZ, RONALD BLAIR WINSTEAD, DAYVON D. PERSON, JOHN MCNEILL, LARRY FULLER, DERICK WHITE and DONALD USEVICH
Defendant / Appellee: KENNETH LASSITER, MELANIE SHELTON, CYNTHIA THORNTON, W. DAVID GUICE, SUSAN ADDAMS, BETTY BROWN and ERIK A. HOOKS
Plaintiff / Appellant: TIMOTHY ROYAL KING
Case Number: 21-6561
Filed: April 14, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2021 Filing 10 INFORMAL OPENING BRIEF by Timothy Royal King. [21-6561] KH [Entered: 05/06/2021 03:47 PM]
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER filed granting Motion for leave to proceed PLRA [8] Fee Amount: $505. Name and Prisoner Number: Timothy King, 0227079. Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Timothy King, Nyeshea Willie Division of Prisons Administrative Services Section 831 W. Morgan Street 4265 MSC Raleigh, NC 27699-426. [1000943949] [21-6561] KH [Entered: 04/30/2021 03:31 PM]
April 28, 2021 Filing 8 PLRA-APPLICATION (court access only) by Timothy Royal King. Consent to Payment Form: No; Trust Account Statement: No. [21-6561] KH [Entered: 04/29/2021 11:31 AM]
April 27, 2021 Filing 7 PLRA TRUST ACCOUNT STATEMENT (court access only) by Timothy Royal King. [21-6561] KH [Entered: 04/28/2021 01:11 PM]
April 27, 2021 Filing 6 PLRA-CONSENT TO PAYMENT form by Timothy Royal King. [21-6561] KH [Entered: 04/28/2021 01:11 PM]
April 27, 2021 Filing 5 Letter re: Fee & PLRA by Timothy Royal King . [1000942172] [21-6561] KH [Entered: 04/28/2021 01:10 PM]
April 14, 2021 Filing 4 ASSEMBLED ELECTRONIC RECORD docketed. Originating case number: 5:17-ct-03043-FL. Record in folder? Yes. Record reviewed? Yes. PSR & SOR included? N/A. [21-6561] KH [Entered: 04/14/2021 01:28 PM]
April 14, 2021 Filing 3 INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Timothy King. Informal Opening Brief due 05/10/2021 Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief served. [21-6561] KH [Entered: 04/14/2021 01:25 PM]
April 14, 2021 Filing 2 PLRA NOTICE issued to [ Timothy Royal King ]. Fee due to District Court or PLRA application due to Court of Appeals within 15 days. Mailed to: Timothy Royal King. [21-6561] KH [Entered: 04/14/2021 01:20 PM]
April 14, 2021 Filing 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 5:17-ct-03043-FL. Case manager: KHancock. [21-6561] KH [Entered: 04/14/2021 10:54 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Timothy King v. Erik Hooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: XAVIER KINNEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL BLANKEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TIMOTHY BOYD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GREGORY PORTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CORTNEY LEACH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MILTON L. LAWRENCE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRIS PEARSALL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JIMMY TINSLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IRVIN VASQUEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RONALD BLAIR WINSTEAD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAYVON D. PERSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN MCNEILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LARRY FULLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DERICK WHITE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DONALD USEVICH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KENNETH LASSITER
Represented By: Adrina Greenlee Bass
Represented By: Yvonne Bulluck Ricci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MELANIE SHELTON
Represented By: Adrina Greenlee Bass
Represented By: Yvonne Bulluck Ricci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CYNTHIA THORNTON
Represented By: Adrina Greenlee Bass
Represented By: Yvonne Bulluck Ricci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: W. DAVID GUICE
Represented By: Adrina Greenlee Bass
Represented By: Yvonne Bulluck Ricci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SUSAN ADDAMS
Represented By: Adrina Greenlee Bass
Represented By: Yvonne Bulluck Ricci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BETTY BROWN
Represented By: Adrina Greenlee Bass
Represented By: Yvonne Bulluck Ricci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ERIK A. HOOKS
Represented By: Adrina Greenlee Bass
Represented By: Yvonne Bulluck Ricci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: TIMOTHY ROYAL KING
Represented By: Timothy Royal King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?