David Meyers v. G. Kellett
Defendant / Appellee: JAMES PARKS, Manager of Offender Management Services, VADOC, G. KELLETT, Unit Manager, G.E.O., DR. WILLIAMS, G.E.O., LVCC Eye Doctor, INTELLIGENCE OFFICER MORGAN, Intelligence Officer of LVCC - on, DANIEL CALHOUN, Chief Physician of LVCC, SOUTH HILL COMMUNITY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL DIRECTOR, Chief Physician, PAUL HAYMES, Chief of VADOC Special Investigations Unit, A. DAVID ROBINSON, Chief of Corrections Operations, VADOC, G. MILITANA, Physician of LVCC, INTELLIGENCE OFFICER WHITFIELD, Intelligence Officer of LVCC - on, M. JONES, Grievance Coordinator - LVCC, MAJOR D. BLOWE, Major of G.E.O., LVCC, NURSE L'REUX, LVCC - Nurse on, D. GOODE, LVCC - Health Services Administrator, NURSE CHANDLER, LVCC - Nurse on, OFFICER GILLUS, Officer of G.E.O., LVCC, MID-ATLANTIC EYE PHYSICIANS, Chief Physician Optometrist, A. PARKER, Chief of Security, G.E.O., CMC - COUNSELOR BURKE, Counselor of LVCC Unit 80, OFFICER SERGEANT BRIGHT, LVCC - G.E.O. Transportation Officer, KEITH DAWKINS, CCS Manager VADOC, GAIL JONES, VADOC - Central Classification Services, GEO-THE GROUP, INC, G.E.O. Corrections Detention and OFFICER MS. JONES, G.E.O., LVCC
Plaintiff / Appellant: DAVID MEYERS
Case Number: 21-6678
Filed: April 30, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER filed granting Motion to extend filing time [ # 8 ]. Number of days granted: 35. PLRA documents due 07/12/2021. Copies to all parties. Mailed to: David Meyers. [1000962953] [21-6678] RJL [Entered: 06/03/2021 10:41 AM]
June 2, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION by David Meyers in 21-6678, 21-6727, 21-6728, 21-6711 to extend filing time for PLRA documents. Date and method of service: 06/02/2021 US mail. [1000962428] [21-6678, 21-6727, 21-6728, 21-6711] RJL [Entered: 06/02/2021 03:40 PM]
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER filed granting Motion to extend filing time [ # 6 ] and rescinding Rule 45 Notice issued 05/21/2021. Number of days granted: 21. PLRA documents due 06/07/2021. Copies to all parties. Mailed to: David Meyers. [1000958525] [21-6678] RJL [Entered: 05/26/2021 03:27 PM]
May 26, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION by David Meyers in 21-6678, 21-6711, 21-6728, and 21-6727 to extend filing time for PLRA Documents. Date and method of service: 05/26/2021 US mail. [1000958518] [21-6678, 21-6711, 21-6728, 21-6727] RJL [Entered: 05/26/2021 03:21 PM]
May 25, 2021 Filing 5 PLRA-CONSENT TO PAYMENT form by David Meyers. [21-6678] RJL [Entered: 05/25/2021 01:34 PM]
May 21, 2021 Filing 4 RULE 45 NOTICE issued to David Meyers re: failure to satisfy fee requirements under PLRA Case will be dismissed if default is not cured within 15 days. Mailed to: David Meyers. Rule 45 due 06/07/2021.21-6678] RJL [Entered: 05/21/2021 08:55 AM]
May 5, 2021 Filing 3 ASSEMBLED ELECTRONIC RECORD docketed. Originating case number: 2:17-cv-00102-AWA-DEM. Record in folder? Yes. Record reviewed? Yes. PSR & SOR included? N/A. [21-6678] RJL [Entered: 05/05/2021 10:48 AM]
April 30, 2021 Filing 2 PLRA NOTICE issued to [ David Meyers ]. Fee due to District Court or PLRA application due to Court of Appeals within 15 days. Mailed to: David Meyers. [21-6678] RJL [Entered: 04/30/2021 11:32 AM]
April 30, 2021 Filing 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 2:17-cv-00102-AWA-DEM. Case manager: Rachel Lee. [21-6678] RJL [Entered: 04/30/2021 09:51 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: David Meyers v. G. Kellett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JAMES PARKS, Manager of Offender Management Services, VADOC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: G. KELLETT, Unit Manager, G.E.O.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DR. WILLIAMS, G.E.O., LVCC Eye Doctor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: INTELLIGENCE OFFICER MORGAN, Intelligence Officer of LVCC - on
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DANIEL CALHOUN, Chief Physician of LVCC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SOUTH HILL COMMUNITY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL DIRECTOR, Chief Physician
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PAUL HAYMES, Chief of VADOC Special Investigations Unit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: A. DAVID ROBINSON, Chief of Corrections Operations, VADOC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: G. MILITANA, Physician of LVCC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: INTELLIGENCE OFFICER WHITFIELD, Intelligence Officer of LVCC - on
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: M. JONES, Grievance Coordinator - LVCC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MAJOR D. BLOWE, Major of G.E.O., LVCC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NURSE L'REUX, LVCC - Nurse on
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: D. GOODE, LVCC - Health Services Administrator
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NURSE CHANDLER, LVCC - Nurse on
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: OFFICER GILLUS, Officer of G.E.O., LVCC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MID-ATLANTIC EYE PHYSICIANS, Chief Physician Optometrist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: A. PARKER, Chief of Security, G.E.O.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CMC - COUNSELOR BURKE, Counselor of LVCC Unit 80
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: OFFICER SERGEANT BRIGHT, LVCC - G.E.O. Transportation Officer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KEITH DAWKINS, CCS Manager VADOC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GAIL JONES, VADOC - Central Classification Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GEO-THE GROUP, INC, G.E.O. Corrections Detention
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: OFFICER MS. JONES, G.E.O., LVCC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DAVID MEYERS
Represented By: David Meyers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?