Ricky Shepard v. Warden of Perry Correctional Institution
Petitioner / Appellant: RICKY JAMES SHEPARD, a/k/a Rickey James Shepard
Respondent / Appellee: WARDEN OF PERRY CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION
Case Number: 21-7133
Filed: August 3, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
December 6, 2021 Ricky Shepard v. Warden of Perry Correctional I

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2021 Filing 6 Supplemental INFORMAL OPENING BRIEF by Ricky James Shepard. [21-7133] AB [Entered: 09/30/2021 03:47 PM]
August 31, 2021 Filing 5 INFORMAL OPENING BRIEF by Ricky James Shepard. [21-7133] AB [Entered: 08/31/2021 01:56 PM]
August 30, 2021 Filing 4 RULE 45 NOTICE issued to Ricky James Shepard re: failure to file informal brief. Mailed to: Ricky James Shepard PERRY CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION 430 Oaklawn Road Pelzer, SC 29669-0000. [21-7133] AB [Entered: 08/30/2021 10:11 AM]
August 4, 2021 Filing 3 ASSEMBLED ELECTRONIC RECORD docketed. Originating case number: 4:21-cv-00818-MGL. Record in folder? Yes. Record reviewed? Yes. PSR & SOR included? N/A. State court paper record requested in 2254 case? N/A. [21-7133] AB [Entered: 08/04/2021 06:20 PM]
August 3, 2021 Filing 2 INFORMAL PRELIMINARY BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Ricky James Shepard PERRY CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION 430 Oaklawn Road Pelzer, SC 29669-0000. Informal Opening Brief due 08/27/2021. [21-7133] AB [Entered: 08/03/2021 01:59 PM]
August 3, 2021 Filing 1 Habeas corpus appeal docketed. Originating case number: 4:21-cv-00818-MGL. Date notice of appeal filed: 08/02/2021. Case manager: ABrownlee. Did district court rule on COA? No. [21-7133] AB [Entered: 08/03/2021 09:18 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Ricky Shepard v. Warden of Perry Correctional Institution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: RICKY JAMES SHEPARD, a/k/a Rickey James Shepard
Represented By: Ricky James Shepard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: WARDEN OF PERRY CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?