Jordan Jones v. George Solomon
Defendant: FNU WILLIAMS, Inmate Grievance Examiner for the North Carolina Department of Public Safety, ELIZABETH D. WALLACE, Inmate Grievance Examiner for the North Carolina Department of Public Safety, JASMINE BELYEU, Inmate Grievance Examiner for the North Carolina Department of Public Safety, JONNITA BAKER, Inmate Grievance Examiner for the North Carolina Department of Public Safety, JEFFREY A. DANIELS, Western Region Security Coordinator of the North Carolina Department of Public Safety, BRIAN WATSON, Special Affairs Captain of Avery-Mitchell Correctional Institution, ADRIAN Z. CROWE, Unit Manager for the Avery Unit of Avery-Mitchell Correctional Institution, BRYAN DALE JOHNSON, Unit Manager for the Watauga Unit of Avery-Mitchell Correctional Institution, FNU CORNETT, Unit Manager for Yancey Unit of Avery-Mitchell Correctional Institution, JAMES C. WALDROOP, Assistant Unit Manager for the Avery Unit of Avery-Mitchell Correctional Institution, ROBIN HUDGINS, Assistant Unit Manager for Watauga Unit of Avery-Mitchell Correctional Institution, MARK RANDALL GEOUGE, Assistant Unit Manager for Yancey Unit of Avery-Mitchell Correctional Institution, TYLER STOCKTON, Correctional Officer for the Avery Unit of Avery-Mitchell Correctional Institution, FNU BANKS, Correctional Officer for the Avery Unit of Avery-Mitchell Correctional Institution and FNU BALL, Correctional Officer for the Avery Unit of Avery-Mitchell Correctional Institution
Plaintiff / Appellant: JORDAN ANDREW JONES
Defendant / Appellee: GEORGE T. SOLOMON, Director of the North Carolina Department of Public Safety, W. DAVID GUICE, Commissioner of the North Carolina Department of Public Safety, FRANK L. PERRY, Secretary of the North Carolina Department of Public Safety, RANDY S. MULL, Disciplinary Hearing Officer for the North Carolina Department of Public Safety, MIKE BALL, Superintendent of Avery-Mitchell Correctional Institution, JASON PENLAND, Assistant Superintendent for Programs of Avery-Mitchell Correctional Institution, GREGORY P. TAYLOR, Assistant Superintendent for Custody and Operations of Avery-Mitchell Correctional Institution, TIM LAUGHRUN, Classification Coordinator of Avery-Mitchell Correctional Institution, REENE REEL, Captain designated Officer-in-Charge of Avery-Mitchell Correctional Institution, BONDY CARROLL, Correctional Sergeant for the Avery Unit of Avery-Mitchell Correctional Institution, MARTY COOPER, GILBERT LEWIS, STEPHEN P. CARPENTER, SCOTTY LOWERY, JOSEPH BUCHANAN and JOHN DOE, Captian or Lieuteant designated Officer-in-Charge of Avery-Mitchell Correctional Institution
Case Number: 21-7239
Filed: August 26, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2021 Filing 12 ASSEMBLED ELECTRONIC RECORD docketed. Originating case number: 1:18-cv-00089-MR. Record in folder? Yes. Record reviewed? Yes. PSR & SOR included? N/A. [21-7239] TF [Entered: 10/08/2021 11:11 AM]
October 7, 2021 Filing 11 RECORD FOLLOW UP NOTICE ISSUED to Clerk of Court. Due: 10/21/2021. [21-7239] TF [Entered: 10/07/2021 08:53 AM]
September 21, 2021 Filing 10 RECORD FOLLOW UP NOTICE ISSUED to Clerk of Court. Due: 10/05/2021. [21-7239] TF [Entered: 09/21/2021 01:08 PM]
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER filed granting Motion for leave to proceed PLRA [8] Fee Amount: $505.00. Name and Prisoner Number: Jordan Andrew Jones, #1336365. Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Jones, Nyeshea Willie, Division of Prisons, Administrative Services Section, 831 W. Morgan Street, 4265 MSC, Raleigh, NC 27699-4265. [1001027247] [21-7239] TF [Entered: 09/21/2021 01:03 PM]
September 20, 2021 Filing 8 PLRA-APPLICATION (court access only) by Jordan Andrew Jones. Consent to Payment Form: Yes; Trust Account Statement: No. [21-7239] TF [Entered: 09/21/2021 12:56 PM]
September 20, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION by Jordan Andrew Jones to appoint/assign counsel. [1001027233] [21-7239] TF [Entered: 09/21/2021 12:54 PM]
September 20, 2021 Filing 6 INFORMAL OPENING BRIEF by Jordan Andrew Jones. [21-7239] TF [Entered: 09/21/2021 12:53 PM]
August 31, 2021 Filing 5 RECORD FOLLOW UP NOTICE ISSUED to Clerk of Court. Due: 09/14/2021. [21-7239] TF [Entered: 08/31/2021 08:15 AM]
August 26, 2021 Filing 4 RECORD requested from Clerk of Court. Due: 09/09/2021. [21-7239] TF [Entered: 08/26/2021 01:27 PM]
August 26, 2021 Filing 3 INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Jones. Informal Opening Brief due 09/20/2021 Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief served. [21-7239] TF [Entered: 08/26/2021 12:52 PM]
August 26, 2021 Filing 2 PLRA NOTICE issued to [ Jordan Andrew Jones ]. Fee due to District Court or PLRA application due to Court of Appeals within 15 days. Mailed to: Jones. [21-7239] TF [Entered: 08/26/2021 12:50 PM]
August 26, 2021 Filing 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:18-cv-00089-MR. Case manager: TFischer. [21-7239] TF [Entered: 08/26/2021 12:32 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Jordan Jones v. George Solomon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JORDAN ANDREW JONES
Represented By: Jordan Andrew Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GEORGE T. SOLOMON, Director of the North Carolina Department of Public Safety
Represented By: James Benjamin Trachtman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: W. DAVID GUICE, Commissioner of the North Carolina Department of Public Safety
Represented By: James Benjamin Trachtman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FRANK L. PERRY, Secretary of the North Carolina Department of Public Safety
Represented By: James Benjamin Trachtman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RANDY S. MULL, Disciplinary Hearing Officer for the North Carolina Department of Public Safety
Represented By: James Benjamin Trachtman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MIKE BALL, Superintendent of Avery-Mitchell Correctional Institution
Represented By: James Benjamin Trachtman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JASON PENLAND, Assistant Superintendent for Programs of Avery-Mitchell Correctional Institution
Represented By: James Benjamin Trachtman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GREGORY P. TAYLOR, Assistant Superintendent for Custody and Operations of Avery-Mitchell Correctional Institution
Represented By: James Benjamin Trachtman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TIM LAUGHRUN, Classification Coordinator of Avery-Mitchell Correctional Institution
Represented By: James Benjamin Trachtman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: REENE REEL, Captain designated Officer-in-Charge of Avery-Mitchell Correctional Institution
Represented By: James Benjamin Trachtman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BONDY CARROLL, Correctional Sergeant for the Avery Unit of Avery-Mitchell Correctional Institution
Represented By: James Benjamin Trachtman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MARTY COOPER
Represented By: James Benjamin Trachtman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GILBERT LEWIS
Represented By: James Benjamin Trachtman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: STEPHEN P. CARPENTER
Represented By: James Benjamin Trachtman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SCOTTY LOWERY
Represented By: James Benjamin Trachtman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOSEPH BUCHANAN
Represented By: James Benjamin Trachtman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOHN DOE, Captian or Lieuteant designated Officer-in-Charge of Avery-Mitchell Correctional Institution
Represented By: James Benjamin Trachtman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU WILLIAMS, Inmate Grievance Examiner for the North Carolina Department of Public Safety
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELIZABETH D. WALLACE, Inmate Grievance Examiner for the North Carolina Department of Public Safety
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JASMINE BELYEU, Inmate Grievance Examiner for the North Carolina Department of Public Safety
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JONNITA BAKER, Inmate Grievance Examiner for the North Carolina Department of Public Safety
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEFFREY A. DANIELS, Western Region Security Coordinator of the North Carolina Department of Public Safety
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRIAN WATSON, Special Affairs Captain of Avery-Mitchell Correctional Institution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADRIAN Z. CROWE, Unit Manager for the Avery Unit of Avery-Mitchell Correctional Institution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRYAN DALE JOHNSON, Unit Manager for the Watauga Unit of Avery-Mitchell Correctional Institution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU CORNETT, Unit Manager for Yancey Unit of Avery-Mitchell Correctional Institution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES C. WALDROOP, Assistant Unit Manager for the Avery Unit of Avery-Mitchell Correctional Institution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBIN HUDGINS, Assistant Unit Manager for Watauga Unit of Avery-Mitchell Correctional Institution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARK RANDALL GEOUGE, Assistant Unit Manager for Yancey Unit of Avery-Mitchell Correctional Institution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TYLER STOCKTON, Correctional Officer for the Avery Unit of Avery-Mitchell Correctional Institution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU BANKS, Correctional Officer for the Avery Unit of Avery-Mitchell Correctional Institution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU BALL, Correctional Officer for the Avery Unit of Avery-Mitchell Correctional Institution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?