Todd Bowers v. International Brotherhood of Boilermakers
Plaintiff / Appellant: TODD BOWERS
Defendant / Appellee: INTERNATIONAL BROTHERHOOD OF BOILERMAKERS, IRON SHIP BUILDERS, BLACKSMITHS, FORGERS, AND HELPERS
Case Number: 22-1130
Filed: February 10, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 7, 2022 Filing 14 Letter re: [ # 13 ] appendix by International Brotherhood of Boilermakers, Iron Ship builders, Blacksmiths, Forgers, and Helpers . [1001142358] [22-1130] Brandon Wood [Entered: 04/07/2022 04:49 PM]
April 4, 2022 Filing 13 JOINT APPENDIX by Todd Bowers. Digital media exhibit volume? No. [1001140012] [22-1130] Christian Riddell [Entered: 04/04/2022 02:13 PM]
April 4, 2022 Filing 12 BRIEF by Todd Bowers. Type of Brief: OPENING. [1001140011] [22-1130] Christian Riddell [Entered: 04/04/2022 02:10 PM]
February 23, 2022 Filing 11 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by John Francis Dascoli for International Brotherhood of Boilermakers, Iron Ship builders, Blacksmiths, Forgers, and Helpers. [1001115885] [22-1130] John Dascoli [Entered: 02/23/2022 05:13 PM]
February 22, 2022 Filing 10 BRIEFING ORDER filed. Opening Brief and Appendix due 04/04/2022. Response Brief due 05/03/2022. Paper copy requirements are temporarily suspended unless the case is under pre-argument review or being scheduled for argument, in which case a total of four paper copies of formal briefs and appendices are required. [1001114625] [22-1130] CB [Entered: 02/22/2022 03:00 PM]
February 22, 2022 Filing 9 DOCKETING STATEMENT by Todd Bowers.. [1001114572] [22-1130] Christian Riddell [Entered: 02/22/2022 02:18 PM]
February 22, 2022 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Todd Bowers. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1001114564] [22-1130] Christian Riddell [Entered: 02/22/2022 02:16 PM]
February 22, 2022 Filing 7 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Christian J Riddell for Todd Bowers. [1001114562] [22-1130] Christian Riddell [Entered: 02/22/2022 02:15 PM]
February 22, 2022 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by International Brotherhood of Boilermakers, Iron Ship builders, Blacksmiths, Forgers, and Helpers. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1001114202] [22-1130] Brandon Wood [Entered: 02/22/2022 10:54 AM]
February 16, 2022 Filing 5 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Jordan L. Glasgow for International Brotherhood of Boilermakers, Iron Ship builders, Blacksmiths, Forgers, and Helpers. [1001111696] [22-1130] Jordan Glasgow [Entered: 02/16/2022 02:04 PM]
February 16, 2022 Filing 4 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Jason R. McClitis for International Brotherhood of Boilermakers, Iron Ship builders, Blacksmiths, Forgers, and Helpers. [1001111688] [22-1130] Jason McClitis [Entered: 02/16/2022 02:01 PM]
February 16, 2022 Filing 3 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Brandon E. Wood for International Brotherhood of Boilermakers, Iron Ship builders, Blacksmiths, Forgers, and Helpers. [1001111684] [22-1130] Brandon Wood [Entered: 02/16/2022 02:00 PM]
February 10, 2022 Filing 2 DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case. Originating case number: 3:21-cv-00089-GMG. Mailed to: Jason McClitis and Brandon Wood. [1001107830] [22-1130] CB [Entered: 02/10/2022 09:29 AM]
February 10, 2022 Filing 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 3:21-cv-00089-GMG. Case manager: CBennett. [1001107824] [22-1130] CB [Entered: 02/10/2022 09:26 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Todd Bowers v. International Brotherhood of Boilermakers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: TODD BOWERS
Represented By: Christian John Riddell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: INTERNATIONAL BROTHERHOOD OF BOILERMAKERS, IRON SHIP BUILDERS, BLACKSMITHS, FORGERS, AND HELPERS
Represented By: John Francis Dascoli Esq.
Represented By: Jordan Lea Glasgow
Represented By: Jason R. McClitis
Represented By: Brandon E. Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?