Edna Gigon v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff / Appellant: EDNA GIGON
Defendant / Appellee: COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Case Number: 22-1476
Filed: May 2, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: D.I.W.C./D.I.W.W.
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 19, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2022 Filing 12 BRIEF by Edna Gigon. Type of Brief: OPENING. [1001179953] [22-1476] Charlotte Hall [Entered: 06/19/2022 07:44 AM]
June 15, 2022 Filing 11 JOINT APPENDIX by Edna Gigon. Digital media exhibit volume? No. [1001178704] [22-1476] Charlotte Hall [Entered: 06/15/2022 10:41 PM]
June 15, 2022 Filing 10 Administrative record [ # 7 ] adopted as appendix by Edna Gigon. Paper copy requirements are temporarily suspended unless the case is under pre-argument review or being scheduled for argument, in which case a total of four paper copies of formal briefs and appendices are required. [1001178283] [22-1476] Charlotte Hall [Entered: 06/15/2022 10:41 AM]
May 17, 2022 Filing 9 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by David N. Mervis for Commissioner of Social Security. [1001163748] [22-1476] David Mervis [Entered: 05/17/2022 02:44 PM]
May 13, 2022 Filing 8 BRIEFING ORDER filed. Paper copy requirements are temporarily suspended unless the case is under pre-argument review or being scheduled for argument, in which case a total of four paper copies of formal briefs and appendices are required. [1001162109] Opening Brief and Appendix due 06/22/2022. Response Brief due 07/22/2022 [22-1476] TF [Entered: 05/13/2022 12:09 PM]
May 12, 2022 Filing 7 ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD in electronic format by Commissioner of Social Security. Method of service: ECF service on counsel. [1001161443] [22-1476] Mary Ellen Russell [Entered: 05/12/2022 12:40 PM]
May 12, 2022 Filing 6 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Mary Ellen Russell for Commissioner of Social Security. [1001161411] [22-1476] Mary Ellen Russell [Entered: 05/12/2022 12:15 PM]
May 10, 2022 Filing 5 DOCKETING STATEMENT by Edna Gigon.. [1001160042] [22-1476] Charlotte Hall [Entered: 05/10/2022 02:06 PM]
May 10, 2022 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Edna Gigon. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1001160040] [22-1476] Charlotte Hall [Entered: 05/10/2022 02:05 PM]
May 10, 2022 Filing 3 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Charlotte W. Hall for Edna Gigon. [1001160038] [22-1476] Charlotte Hall [Entered: 05/10/2022 02:04 PM]
May 2, 2022 Filing 2 SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD requested (counseled cases) . Was administrative record filed in electronic form in district court? Yes. [1001155460] Administrative Record (Social Security) due 05/16/2022. [22-1476] TF [Entered: 05/02/2022 12:10 PM]
May 2, 2022 Filing 1 DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1001155382-2 ] social security case Originating case number: 1:20-cv-00133-FDW. [1001155413] [22-1476] TF [Entered: 05/02/2022 11:37 AM]
May 2, 2022 Social Security case docketed. Originating case number: 1:20-cv-00133-FDW. Date notice of appeal filed: 04/28/2022. Case manager: TFischer. [1001155382] [22-1476] TF [Entered: 05/02/2022 11:18 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Edna Gigon v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: EDNA GIGON
Represented By: Derrick Kyle Arrowood
Represented By: Charlotte W. Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Represented By: Mary Ellen Russell
Represented By: David Nathaniel Mervis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?