Jimmy Roberts v. Erik Hooks
Petitioner / Appellant: JIMMY ALLEN ROBERTS
Respondent / Appellee: ERIK A. HOOKS, Secretary of NCDPS, substituted for Barney Owens
Case Number: 22-1868
Filed: August 19, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
January 19, 2023 Jimmy Roberts v. Erik Hooks

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 7, 2022 Filing 5 INFORMAL OPENING BRIEF by Jimmy Allen Roberts. [1001225752] [22-1868] EB [Entered: 09/07/2022 02:09 PM]
August 22, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION by Jimmy Allen Roberts for certificate of appealability. [1001216299] [22-1868] EB [Entered: 08/22/2022 04:51 PM]
August 22, 2022 Filing 3 ASSEMBLED ELECTRONIC RECORD docketed. Originating case number: 1:21-cv-00058-MR. Record in folder? Yes. Record reviewed? Yes. PSR & SOR included? N/A. State court paper record requested in 2254 case? No. [1001215577] [22-1868] EB [Entered: 08/22/2022 08:49 AM]
August 19, 2022 Filing 2 INFORMAL PRELIMINARY BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Jimmy Allen Roberts. [1001215086] Informal Opening Brief due 09/12/2022. [22-1868] EB [Entered: 08/19/2022 12:09 PM]
August 19, 2022 Filing 1 Habeas corpus appeal docketed. Originating case number: 1:21-cv-00058-MR. Date notice of appeal filed: 08/05/2022. Case manager: EBorneisen. Did district court rule on COA? Yes. [1001215027] [22-1868] EB [Entered: 08/19/2022 11:24 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Jimmy Roberts v. Erik Hooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: JIMMY ALLEN ROBERTS
Represented By: Jimmy Allen Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: ERIK A. HOOKS, Secretary of NCDPS, substituted for Barney Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?