Irvin Betch v. Maurice O'Brien
Plaintiff / Appellant: IRVIN J. BETCH and PATRICIA A. BETCH
Defendant / Appellee: ATTORNEY MAURICE W. O'BRIEN, ATTORNEY DIANE SALLY ROSENBERG, ATTORNEY CRISTIAN ALEC MENDOZA, ATTORNEY MARK D. MEYER, BALTIMORE HOME WHOLESALERS, LLC and ROSENBERG & ASSOCIATES, LLC
Case Number: 22-2108
Filed: October 25, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Contract Actions
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2022 Filing 18 Amended INFORMAL REPLY BRIEF by Irvin J. Betch and Patricia A. Betch. [1001285293] [22-2108] CP [Entered: 12/19/2022 11:00 AM]
December 16, 2022 Filing 17 (ENTRY RESTRICTED) Amended petition/motion by Irvin J. Betch and Patricia A. Betch amending [ # 16 ]. Document: 1-Betch+Amended+Fedeal+1st.+RESPOND+%26+OBJECTION+to+BHW+12-2022.pdf; Scan_20221216 (3).pdf; Scan_20221216 (4).pdf. [1001284991] [22-2108]--[Edited 12/19/2022 by CP-See ECF #18 for corrected entry.] Irvin Betch [Entered: 12/16/2022 06:55 PM]
December 16, 2022 Filing 16 INFORMAL REPLY BRIEF by Irvin J. Betch and Patricia A. Betch. [1001284323] [22-2108]--[Edited 12/16/2022 by TB to replace attachment #32 with the signed certificate of service from ECF #15] Irvin Betch [Entered: 12/16/2022 07:11 AM]
December 16, 2022 Filing 15 (ENTRY RESTRICTED) PRO SE SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF by Irvin J. Betch and Patricia A. Betch. [1001284322] [22-2108]--[Edited 12/16/2022 by TB - See ECF 16 for informal reply brief] Irvin Betch [Entered: 12/16/2022 06:45 AM]
December 5, 2022 Filing 14 INFORMAL RESPONSE BRIEF by Baltimore Home Wholesalers, LLC. [1001277164] [22-2108] Byron Huffman [Entered: 12/05/2022 02:38 PM]
December 1, 2022 Filing 13 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Sara Tussey for Cristian Alec Mendoza, Diane Sally Rosenberg, Mark D. Meyer, Maurice W. O'Brien and Rosenberg & Associates, LLC. [1001275607] [22-2108] Sara Tussey [Entered: 12/01/2022 03:57 PM]
December 1, 2022 Filing 12 DOCKETING FORMS FOLLOW-UP NOTICE ISSUED to Cristian Alec Mendoza, Mark D. Meyer, Maurice W. O'Brien, Diane Sally Rosenberg and Rosenberg & Associates, LLC re: filing of appearance form. Appearance form due on 12/05/2022 from Sara Nicholson Tussey. [1001275232] [22-2108] CP [Entered: 12/01/2022 10:14 AM]
December 1, 2022 Filing 11 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Irvin J. Betch and Patricia A. Betch. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No. [1001275226] [22-2108] CP [Entered: 12/01/2022 10:12 AM]
November 21, 2022 Filing 10 INFORMAL OPENING BRIEF by Irvin J. Betch and Patricia A. Betch. [1001269078] [22-2108] CP [Entered: 11/21/2022 09:23 AM]
November 15, 2022 Filing 9 DOCKETING FORMS FOLLOW-UP NOTICE ISSUED to Irvin J. Betch and Patricia A. Betch re: filing of disclosure form. Mailed to: Irvin J. Betch, Patricia A. Betch. [1001266211] [22-2108] CP [Entered: 11/15/2022 02:23 PM]
November 4, 2022 Filing 8 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Byron L. Huffman, Esq. for Baltimore Home Wholesalers, LLC. [1001261262] [22-2108] Byron Huffman [Entered: 11/04/2022 03:28 PM]
November 4, 2022 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Baltimore Home Wholesalers, LLC. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1001261213] [22-2108] Byron Huffman [Entered: 11/04/2022 02:59 PM]
October 26, 2022 Filing 6 ASSEMBLED ELECTRONIC RECORD docketed. Originating case number: 8:22-cv-00894-PX. Record in folder or on docket? Yes. Record reviewed? Yes. PSR & SOR included? N/A. [1001255243] [22-2108] CP [Entered: 10/26/2022 01:38 PM]
October 25, 2022 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Cristian Alec Mendoza, Mark D. Meyer, Maurice W. O'Brien, Rosenberg & Associates, LLC and Diane Sally Rosenberg. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1001254597] [22-2108] Sara Tussey [Entered: 10/25/2022 04:08 PM]
October 25, 2022 Filing 4 RECORD requested from Clerk of Court [1001254553]. Due: 11/08/2022. [22-2108] CP [Entered: 10/25/2022 03:28 PM]
October 25, 2022 Filing 3 INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Irvin J. Betch, Patricia A. Betch. [1001254543] Informal Opening Brief due 11/18/2022. Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief served. [22-2108] CP [Entered: 10/25/2022 03:24 PM]
October 25, 2022 Filing 2 FEE NOTICE issued to Irvin J. Betch, Patricia A. Betch - initial notice. Fee or application to proceed as indigent due 11/28/2022. Originating case number: 8:22-cv-00894-PX. Mailed to: Irvin J. Betch, Patricia A. Betch. [1001254511] [22-2108] CP [Entered: 10/25/2022 03:12 PM]
October 25, 2022 Filing 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 8:22-cv-00894-PX. Case manager: CPoulsen. [1001254507] [22-2108] CP [Entered: 10/25/2022 03:07 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Irvin Betch v. Maurice O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: IRVIN J. BETCH
Represented By: Irvin J. Betch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: PATRICIA A. BETCH
Represented By: Patricia A. Betch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ATTORNEY MAURICE W. O'BRIEN
Represented By: Sara Nicholson Tussey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ATTORNEY DIANE SALLY ROSENBERG
Represented By: Sara Nicholson Tussey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ATTORNEY CRISTIAN ALEC MENDOZA
Represented By: Sara Nicholson Tussey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ATTORNEY MARK D. MEYER
Represented By: Sara Nicholson Tussey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BALTIMORE HOME WHOLESALERS, LLC
Represented By: Byron Lane Huffman
Represented By: Byron L. Huffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ROSENBERG & ASSOCIATES, LLC
Represented By: Sara Nicholson Tussey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?