Nicole Winston v. Keybank
Plaintiff / Appellant: NICOLE YVETTE WINSTON
Defendant / Appellee: KEYBANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION
Case Number: 22-2215
Filed: November 28, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Contract Actions

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
January 19, 2023 Nicole Winston v. Keybank

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 19, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 JUDGMENT ORDER filed. Decision: Affirmed. Originating case number: 8:22-cv-02800-TDC. Entered on Docket Date: 01/19/2023. Copies to all parties and the district court/agency. Mailed to: Nicole Winston. [1001301019] [22-2215] RP [Entered: 01/19/2023 08:32 AM]
January 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 UNPUBLISHED PER CURIAM OPINION filed. Motion disposition in opinion--denying Motion to seal [ # 9 ]. Originating case number: 8:22-cv-02800-TDC. Copies to all parties and the district court/agency. Mailed to: Nicole Winston. [1001301018] [22-2215] RP [Entered: 01/19/2023 08:30 AM]
January 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION by Nicole Yvette Winston to seal case. Date and method of service: 01/05/2023 US mail. [1001293992] [22-2215] RP [Entered: 01/05/2023 03:02 PM]
November 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Nicole Winston. [1001272626] Informal opening brief filed in the district court. Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief served. [22-2215] RP [Entered: 11/28/2022 02:26 PM]
November 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ASSEMBLED ELECTRONIC RECORD docketed. Originating case number: 8:22-cv-02800-TDC. Record in folder or on docket? Yes. Record reviewed? Yes. PSR & SOR included? N/A. [1001272602] [22-2215] RP [Entered: 11/28/2022 02:05 PM]
November 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER filed granting Motion to proceed in forma pauperis [2]. Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Nicole Yvette Winston. [1001272398] [22-2215] RP [Entered: 11/28/2022 11:36 AM]
November 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Redacted version posted for informal opening brief. Reason not available through remote electronic access:personal data identifiers. [1001272344] [22-2215] RP [Entered: 11/28/2022 10:57 AM]
November 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RECORD requested from Clerk of Court [1001272337]. Due: 12/12/2022. [22-2215] RP [Entered: 11/28/2022 10:54 AM]
November 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INFORMAL OPENING BRIEF by Nicole Yvette Winston. [1001272335] [22-2215] RP [Entered: 11/28/2022 10:53 AM]
November 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 IFP-APPLICATION to proceed in forma pauperis (FRAP 24)(court access only) by Nicole Yvette Winston. [1001272330] [22-2215] RP [Entered: 11/28/2022 10:52 AM]
November 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 8:22-cv-02800-TDC. Case manager: RachelPhillips. [1001272324] [22-2215] RP [Entered: 11/28/2022 10:50 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Nicole Winston v. Keybank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: NICOLE YVETTE WINSTON
Represented By: Nicole Yvette Winston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KEYBANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?