Charles Tunstall v. Allen Davis
Plaintiff / Appellant: CHARLES ALONZO TUNSTALL
Defendant / Appellee: CAPTAIN ALLEN DAVIS, SERGEANT LOCKLEAR, MR. TUBBS and MR. LOWRY
Case Number: 22-7235
Filed: October 25, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2022 Filing 9 PLRA/IFP-TRUST ACCOUNT STATEMENT (court access only) by Charles Alonzo Tunstall. [1001270229] [22-7235] RE [Entered: 11/22/2022 09:49 AM]
November 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER filed granting Motion for leave to proceed PLRA [7] Fee Amount: $505. Name and Prisoner Number: CHARLES ALONZO TUNSTALL #0413203. Copies to all parties. Mailed to: CHARLES ALONZO TUNSTALL #0413203 and PLRA Custodian Nyeshea Willie, Division of Prisons, Administrative Services Section, 831 W. Morgan Street, 4265 MSC, Raleigh, NC 27699-4265. [1001264460] [22-7235] RE [Entered: 11/10/2022 04:53 PM]
November 10, 2022 Filing 7 PLRA-APPLICATION (court access only) by Charles Alonzo Tunstall. Consent to Payment Form: Yes; Trust Account Statement: No. [1001264454] [22-7235] RE [Entered: 11/10/2022 04:51 PM]
November 10, 2022 Filing 6 INFORMAL OPENING BRIEF by Charles Alonzo Tunstall. [1001264452] [22-7235] RE [Entered: 11/10/2022 04:50 PM]
October 25, 2022 Filing 5 ASSEMBLED ELECTRONIC RECORD docketed. Originating case number: 5:22-ct-03214-D. Record in folder or on docket? Yes. Record reviewed? Yes. PSR & SOR included? N/A. [1001254599] [22-7235] RE [Entered: 10/25/2022 04:10 PM]
October 25, 2022 Filing 4 RECORD requested from Clerk of Court [1001254206]. Due: 11/08/2022. [22-7235] RE [Entered: 10/25/2022 12:18 PM]
October 25, 2022 Filing 3 INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Charles Tunstall. [1001254200] Informal Opening Brief due 11/18/2022 Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief served. [22-7235] RE [Entered: 10/25/2022 12:16 PM]
October 25, 2022 Filing 2 PLRA NOTICE issued to [ Charles Alonzo Tunstall ]. Fee due to District Court or PLRA application due to Court of Appeals within 15 days. Mailed to: Charles Tunstall. [1001254199] [22-7235] RE [Entered: 10/25/2022 12:15 PM]
October 25, 2022 Filing 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 5:22-ct-03214-D. Case manager: REdwards. [1001254192] [22-7235] RE [Entered: 10/25/2022 12:10 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Charles Tunstall v. Allen Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CHARLES ALONZO TUNSTALL
Represented By: Charles Alonzo Tunstall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CAPTAIN ALLEN DAVIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SERGEANT LOCKLEAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MR. TUBBS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MR. LOWRY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?