Timothy McNeal v. J. Hutchinson
Plaintiff / Appellant: TIMOTHY MCNEAL
Defendant / Appellee: J. HUTCHINSON, Acting Warden, C. NEVILS, MR. GLENN, MS. LANHAM, MS. NECOMB, MR. TAYLOR, MS. JOHNSON and MS. V. MARTIN
Case Number: 22-7319
Filed: November 15, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2023 Filing 12 Supplemental INFORMAL OPENING BRIEF by Timothy McNeal. [1001292809] [22-7319] RHS [Entered: 01/04/2023 10:35 AM]
December 20, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE by Glenn, J. Hutchinson, Johnson, Lanham, V. Martin, Necomb, C. Nevils and Taylor that no brief will be filed. [1001286754] [22-7319] Beth Drake [Entered: 12/20/2022 02:24 PM]
December 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER filed granting Motion for leave to proceed PLRA [8]. Fee Amount: $505.00. Name and Prisoner Number: Timothy McNeal 95525-020. Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Timothy McNeal and Financial Section, South Carolina Department of Corrections, Post Office Box 21787 Columbia, SC 29221. [1001283545] [22-7319] RHS [Entered: 12/15/2022 08:39 AM]
December 14, 2022 Filing 9 INFORMAL OPENING BRIEF by Timothy McNeal. [1001283427] [22-7319] RHS [Entered: 12/14/2022 04:54 PM]
December 14, 2022 Filing 8 PLRA-APPLICATION (court access only) by Timothy McNeal. Consent to Payment Form: Yes; Trust Account Statement: Yes. [1001283425] [22-7319] RHS [Entered: 12/14/2022 04:52 PM]
November 22, 2022 Filing 7 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Assistant United States Attorney Jennifer L. Mallory for Glenn, J. Hutchinson, Johnson, Lanham, V. Martin, Necomb, C. Nevils and Taylor. [1001270754] [22-7319] Jennifer Mallory [Entered: 11/22/2022 02:45 PM]
November 21, 2022 Filing 6 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Assistant United States Attorney Beth Drake for Glenn, J. Hutchinson, Johnson, Lanham, V. Martin, Necomb, C. Nevils and Taylor. [1001269480] [22-7319] Beth Drake [Entered: 11/21/2022 01:46 PM]
November 18, 2022 Filing 5 ASSEMBLED ELECTRONIC RECORD docketed. Originating case number: 2:21-cv-03431-JFA. Record in folder or on docket? Yes. Record reviewed? Yes. PSR & SOR included? N/A. [1001268270] [22-7319] TW [Entered: 11/18/2022 09:31 AM]
November 17, 2022 Filing 4 RECORD requested from Clerk of Court [1001267442]. Due: 12/01/2022. [22-7319] RHS [Entered: 11/17/2022 09:30 AM]
November 15, 2022 Filing 3 Case docketed. Originating case number: 2:21-cv-03431-JFA. Case manager: RSewell. [1001266715] [22-7319] RHS [Entered: 11/16/2022 09:23 AM]
November 15, 2022 Filing 2 INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed.. [1001266454] Informal Opening Brief due 12/09/2022 Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief served. [22-7319] RHS [Entered: 11/15/2022 04:16 PM]
November 15, 2022 Filing 1 PLRA NOTICE issued to [ Timothy McNeal ]. Fee due to District Court or PLRA application due to Court of Appeals within 15 days. [1001266447] [22-7319] RHS [Entered: 11/15/2022 04:13 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Timothy McNeal v. J. Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: TIMOTHY MCNEAL
Represented By: Timothy McNeal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: J. HUTCHINSON, Acting Warden
Represented By: Beth Drake
Represented By: Jennifer L. Mallory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: C. NEVILS
Represented By: Beth Drake
Represented By: Jennifer L. Mallory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MR. GLENN
Represented By: Beth Drake
Represented By: Jennifer L. Mallory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MS. LANHAM
Represented By: Beth Drake
Represented By: Jennifer L. Mallory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MS. NECOMB
Represented By: Beth Drake
Represented By: Jennifer L. Mallory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MR. TAYLOR
Represented By: Beth Drake
Represented By: Jennifer L. Mallory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MS. JOHNSON
Represented By: Beth Drake
Represented By: Jennifer L. Mallory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MS. V. MARTIN
Represented By: Beth Drake
Represented By: Jennifer L. Mallory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?