Kathy Steele v. Jason Goodman
Plaintiff / Appellee: KATHY STEELE, Administrator of the Estate of Robert David Steele, et al. and EARTH INTELLIGENCE NETWORK
Defendant / Appellant: JASON GOODMAN
Case Number: 23-1509
Filed: May 10, 2023
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Assault, Libel, and Slander

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
June 21, 2023 Kathy Steele v. Jason Goodman

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 5, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Mandate temporarily stayed pending ruling on petition for rehearing or rehearing en banc. [1001395308] [23-1509] EB [Entered: 07/05/2023 09:45 AM]
July 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 PETITION for rehearing en banc by Jason Goodman. [1001395281] [23-1509] Jason Goodman [Entered: 07/05/2023 09:32 AM]
June 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 JUDGMENT ORDER filed. Decision: Dismissed. Originating case number: 3:21-cv-00573-JAG. Entered on Docket Date: 06/21/2023. Copies to all parties and the district court/agency. [1001388130] [23-1509] EB [Entered: 06/21/2023 09:56 AM]
June 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 UNPUBLISHED PER CURIAM OPINION filed. Motion disposition in opinion--granting motion to dismiss appeal [ # 5 ]; denying as moot motion to expedite decision [ # 6 ]; denying request for attorney's fees. Originating case number: 3:21-cv-00573-JAG. Copies to all parties and the district court/agency. [1001388106] [23-1509] EB [Entered: 06/21/2023 09:44 AM]
June 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 INFORMAL RESPONSE BRIEF by Kathy Steele. [1001386766] [23-1509] Steven Biss [Entered: 06/19/2023 09:53 PM]
June 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 INFORMAL OPENING BRIEF by Jason Goodman. [1001379029] [23-1509] Jason Goodman [Entered: 06/05/2023 01:51 PM]
May 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Earth Intelligence Network. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1001375911] [23-1509] Steven Biss [Entered: 05/30/2023 03:06 PM]
May 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Kathy Steele. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1001375908] [23-1509] Steven Biss [Entered: 05/30/2023 03:05 PM]
May 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 RULE 46 NOTICE issued to Steven Scott Biss for Kathy Steele and Earth Intelligence Network regarding filing of disclosure form. Requested document due 06/06/2023. [1001371627] [23-1509] EB [Entered: 05/22/2023 03:56 PM]
May 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 RESPONSE/ANSWER by Jason Goodman to to dismiss appeal [ # 5 ], to expedite decision [ # 6 ], initial notice [ # 2 ]. Nature of response: in opposition. [1001368380] [23-1509] Jason Goodman [Entered: 05/16/2023 07:28 PM]
May 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Steven S. Biss for Kathy Steele. [1001367692] [23-1509] Steven Biss [Entered: 05/16/2023 10:13 AM]
May 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 DOCKETING FORMS FOLLOW-UP NOTICE ISSUED to Earth Intelligence Network and Kathy Steele re: filing of appearance form and filing of disclosure form. Appearance form due on 05/19/2023 from Steven Scott Biss. Disclosure statement due from Earth Intelligence Network and Robert David Steele on 05/19/2023. [1001367657] [23-1509] EB [Entered: 05/16/2023 09:58 AM]
May 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Jason Goodman. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1001367460] [23-1509] Jason Goodman [Entered: 05/15/2023 08:25 PM]
May 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE ISSUED to Jason Goodman requesting response to motion to dismiss appeal [ # 5 ]. Response due: 05/19/2023.[1001365885]. Copies to all parties. [23-1509]--[Edited 05/11/2023 by EB- docket text modified] EB [Entered: 05/11/2023 01:52 PM]
May 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION by Kathy Steele to expedite decision. Date and method of service: 05/10/2023 US mail, ecf. [1001365441] [23-1509] Steven Biss [Entered: 05/10/2023 07:10 PM]
May 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION by Kathy Steele to dismiss appeal [5]. Date and method of service: 05/10/2023 US mail, ecf. [1001365439] [23-1509] Steven Biss [Entered: 05/10/2023 06:48 PM]
May 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RECORD requested from Clerk of Court [1001364924]. Due: 05/24/2023. [23-1509] EB [Entered: 05/10/2023 10:53 AM]
May 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Jason Goodman. [1001364912] Informal Opening Brief due 06/05/2023. Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief served. [23-1509] EB [Entered: 05/10/2023 10:42 AM]
May 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 FEE NOTICE issued to Jason Goodman - initial notice. Fee or application to proceed as indigent due 06/09/2023. Originating case number: 3:21-cv-00573-JAG. Mailed to: Jason Goodman. [1001364905] [23-1509] EB [Entered: 05/10/2023 10:38 AM]
May 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 3:21-cv-00573-JAG. Case manager: EBorneisen. [1001364896] [23-1509] EB [Entered: 05/10/2023 10:31 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Kathy Steele v. Jason Goodman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: KATHY STEELE, Administrator of the Estate of Robert David Steele, et al.
Represented By: Steven Scott Biss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: EARTH INTELLIGENCE NETWORK
Represented By: Steven Scott Biss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: JASON GOODMAN
Represented By: Jason Goodman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?