Jensen Alexander v. Joseph Ely
Plaintiff / Appellant: JENSEN KEN ALEXANDER
Defendant / Appellee: JOSEPH ELY, Unit Manager of "D" Building at the time, MRS. CHURCH, Counselor / I.C.A. member, MR. KING, Major / I.C.A. member, DENNIS COLLINS, Head of Unit Managers / I.C.A. member, MR. CHURCH, Lieutenant / I.C.A. member, MR. MANIS, Warden, BRENDA RAVIZEE, Institutional Ombudsman Wallens Ridge, DAVID ANDERSON, Assistant Warden / I.C.A., RICHARD LIGHT, Lieutenant of "D" Building at the time/I.C.A. Member and MR. CROWDER, Regional Ombudsman
Case Number: 23-6027
Filed: January 10, 2023
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Civil Rights

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
May 26, 2023 Jensen Alexander v. Joseph Ely

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 2, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER filed granting motion for leave to proceed PLRA [8]. Fee Amount: $505.00. Name and Prisoner Number: Jensen Ken Alexander, #1473921. Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Jensen Ken Alexander, #1473921, VADOC CENTRALIZED MAIL DISTRIBUTION CENTER, 3521 Woods Way, State Farm, VA 23160, Warden, Attn. Accounting Office,Wallens Ridge State Prison, 272 Dogwood Drive, Big Stone Gap, VA 24219 and Anne Margaret Morris, OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF VIRGINIA, 202 North 9th Street, Richmond, VA 23219. [1001309028] [23-6027] NRS [Entered: 02/02/2023 09:03 AM]
February 2, 2023 Filing 8 PLRA-APPLICATION (court access only) by Jensen Ken Alexander. Consent to Payment Form: Yes; Trust Account Statement: Yes. [1001309001] [23-6027] NRS [Entered: 02/02/2023 08:52 AM]
February 2, 2023 Filing 7 INFORMAL OPENING BRIEF by Jensen Ken Alexander. [1001308992] [23-6027] NRS [Entered: 02/02/2023 08:51 AM]
January 17, 2023 Filing 6 Letter re: case status request by Jensen Ken Alexander. [1001299970] [23-6027] NRS [Entered: 01/17/2023 04:45 PM]
January 10, 2023 Filing 4 RECORD requested from Clerk of Court [1001296456]. Due: 01/24/2023. [23-6027] NRS [Entered: 01/10/2023 02:28 PM]
January 10, 2023 Filing 3 INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Jensen Ken Alexander, #1473921, VADOC CENTRALIZED MAIL DISTRIBUTION CENTER, 3521 Woods Way, State Farm, VA 23160 and Anne Margaret Morris, OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF VIRGINIA, 202 North 9th Street, Richmond, VA 23219. [1001296452] Informal Opening Brief due 02/03/2023. Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief served. [23-6027] NRS [Entered: 01/10/2023 02:25 PM]
January 10, 2023 Filing 2 PLRA NOTICE issued to [ Jensen Ken Alexander ]. Fee due to District Court or PLRA application due to Court of Appeals within 15 days. Mailed to: Jensen Ken Alexander, #1473921, VADOC CENTRALIZED MAIL DISTRIBUTION CENTER, 3521 Woods Way, State Farm, VA 23160 and Anne Margaret Morris, OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF VIRGINIA, 202 North 9th Street, Richmond, VA 23219. [1001296442] [23-6027] NRS [Entered: 01/10/2023 02:19 PM]
January 10, 2023 Filing 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 7:20-cv-00766-JPJ-PMS. Case manager: NaeemahSims. [1001296435] [23-6027] NRS [Entered: 01/10/2023 02:15 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Jensen Alexander v. Joseph Ely
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JENSEN KEN ALEXANDER
Represented By: Jensen Ken Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOSEPH ELY, Unit Manager of "D" Building at the time
Represented By: Anne Margaret Morris
Represented By: Richard Carson Vorhis
Represented By: Anne Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MRS. CHURCH, Counselor / I.C.A. member
Represented By: Anne Margaret Morris
Represented By: Richard Carson Vorhis
Represented By: Anne Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MR. KING, Major / I.C.A. member
Represented By: Anne Margaret Morris
Represented By: Richard Carson Vorhis
Represented By: Anne Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DENNIS COLLINS, Head of Unit Managers / I.C.A. member
Represented By: Anne Margaret Morris
Represented By: Richard Carson Vorhis
Represented By: Anne Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MR. CHURCH, Lieutenant / I.C.A. member
Represented By: Anne Margaret Morris
Represented By: Richard Carson Vorhis
Represented By: Anne Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MR. MANIS, Warden
Represented By: Anne Margaret Morris
Represented By: Richard Carson Vorhis
Represented By: Anne Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BRENDA RAVIZEE, Institutional Ombudsman Wallens Ridge
Represented By: Anne Margaret Morris
Represented By: Richard Carson Vorhis
Represented By: Anne Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DAVID ANDERSON, Assistant Warden / I.C.A.
Represented By: Anne Margaret Morris
Represented By: Richard Carson Vorhis
Represented By: Anne Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RICHARD LIGHT, Lieutenant of "D" Building at the time/I.C.A. Member
Represented By: Anne Margaret Morris
Represented By: Richard Carson Vorhis
Represented By: Anne Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MR. CROWDER, Regional Ombudsman
Represented By: Anne Margaret Morris
Represented By: Richard Carson Vorhis
Represented By: Anne Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?