Wayne Jordan v. Thomas Seltzer
Plaintiff / Appellant: WAYNE ARTHUR JORDAN
Defendant / Appellee: THOMAS SELTZER, WALTER WEST, VANESSA ANDERSON, Case Management-Classification ECI, STEPHEN SANDERS, ROBERT L. GREEN, Secretary-DPSCS, MARYLAND DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY AND CORRECTIONAL SERVICES, J. PHILLIP MORGAN and MARYLAND CORRECTIONAL ENTERPRISE
Case Number: 23-7079
Filed: October 27, 2023
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Civil Rights
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 1, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER filed deferring action on motion to appoint/assign counsel filed by Appellant Wayne Arthur Jordan [ # 11 ]. Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Wayne Arthur Jordan. [1001482615] [23-7079] EB [Entered: 12/01/2023 03:15 PM]
December 1, 2023 Filing 12 PLRA/IFP-TRUST ACCOUNT STATEMENT (court access only) by Wayne Arthur Jordan. [1001482605] [23-7079] EB [Entered: 12/01/2023 03:08 PM]
December 1, 2023 Filing 11 MOTION by Wayne Arthur Jordan to appoint/assign counsel. [1001482598] [23-7079] EB [Entered: 12/01/2023 03:03 PM]
December 1, 2023 Filing 10 INFORMAL OPENING BRIEF by Wayne Arthur Jordan. [1001482597] [23-7079] EB [Entered: 12/01/2023 03:02 PM]
December 1, 2023 Filing 9 CHANGE OF ADDRESS Notice by Wayne Arthur Jordan. [1001482595] [23-7079] EB [Entered: 12/01/2023 03:01 PM]
November 27, 2023 Filing 8 RULE 45 NOTICE issued to Wayne Arthur Jordan re: failure to file informal brief. Mailed to: Jordan. [1001479608] [23-7079] AW [Entered: 11/27/2023 09:05 PM]
November 22, 2023 Filing 7 PLRA/IFP-TRUST ACCOUNT STATEMENT (court access only) by Wayne Arthur Jordan. [1001478445] [23-7079] AW [Entered: 11/22/2023 02:22 PM]
November 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER filed granting Motion for leave to proceed PLRA [5] Fee Amount: $505.00. Name and Prisoner Number: Wayne Jordan #203822. Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Wayne Jordan and Warden, Attn: Accounting, JESSUP CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION P. O. Box 534 Jessup, MD 20794-0534. [1001475996] [23-7079] AW [Entered: 11/17/2023 02:42 PM]
November 17, 2023 Filing 5 PLRA-APPLICATION (court access only) by Wayne Arthur Jordan. Consent to Payment Form: Yes; Trust Account Statement: No. [1001475817] [23-7079] AW [Entered: 11/17/2023 12:28 PM]
October 27, 2023 Filing 4 RECORD requested from Clerk of Court [1001463364]. Due: 11/13/2023. [23-7079] AW [Entered: 10/27/2023 02:15 PM]
October 27, 2023 Filing 3 INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Jordan. [1001463362] Informal Opening Brief due 11/20/2023 Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief served. [23-7079] AW [Entered: 10/27/2023 02:14 PM]
October 27, 2023 Filing 2 PLRA NOTICE issued to [ Wayne Arthur Jordan ]. Fee due to District Court or PLRA application due to Court of Appeals within 15 days. Mailed to: Jordan. [1001463357] [23-7079] AW [Entered: 10/27/2023 02:11 PM]
October 27, 2023 Filing 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:21-cv-03048-GLR. Case manager: AWalker. [1001463355] [23-7079] AW [Entered: 10/27/2023 02:10 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Wayne Jordan v. Thomas Seltzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: WAYNE ARTHUR JORDAN
Represented By: Wayne Arthur Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: THOMAS SELTZER
Represented By: Beverly Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WALTER WEST
Represented By: Beverly Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: VANESSA ANDERSON, Case Management-Classification ECI
Represented By: Beverly Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: STEPHEN SANDERS
Represented By: Beverly Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ROBERT L. GREEN, Secretary-DPSCS
Represented By: Beverly Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MARYLAND DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY AND CORRECTIONAL SERVICES
Represented By: Beverly Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: J. PHILLIP MORGAN
Represented By: Beverly Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MARYLAND CORRECTIONAL ENTERPRISE
Represented By: Beverly Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?