Timothy Reeves v. Circuit Court for Prince George's County
Plaintiff: TIMOTHY REEVES
Defendant: CIRCUIT COURT OF PRINCE GEORGE COUNTY, CIRCUIT COURT LAND RECORDS, ROBIN GILL BRIGHT, Lawyer, JOHN A. ANSELL, JEREMY B. WILKINS, ROBERT A. OLIVERI, AMANDA DRISCOLE, PAUL HEINMULLER, BROCK & SCOTT, PLLC and HARVEY WEST AUCTIONEERS
Case Number: 24-1104
Filed: January 31, 2024
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
April 22, 2024 Timothy Reeves v. Circuit Court for Prince George's County

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2024 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Timothy Reeves. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1001527803] [24-1104] JSN [Entered: 02/27/2024 12:44 PM]
February 26, 2024 Filing 4 INFORMAL OPENING BRIEF by Timothy Reeves. [1001527798] [24-1104] JSN [Entered: 02/27/2024 12:41 PM]
January 31, 2024 Filing 3 RECORD requested from Clerk of Court [1001513350]. Due: 02/14/2024. [24-1104] JSN [Entered: 01/31/2024 02:33 PM]
January 31, 2024 Filing 2 INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. [1001513347] Informal Opening Brief due 02/26/2024. Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief served. Mailed to: Timothy Reeves. [24-1104] JSN [Entered: 01/31/2024 02:30 PM]
January 31, 2024 Filing 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 8:23-cv-02678-BAH. Case manager: JeffNeal. [1001513336] [24-1104] JSN [Entered: 01/31/2024 02:25 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Timothy Reeves v. Circuit Court for Prince George's County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TIMOTHY REEVES
Represented By: Timothy Reeves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CIRCUIT COURT OF PRINCE GEORGE COUNTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CIRCUIT COURT LAND RECORDS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBIN GILL BRIGHT, Lawyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN A. ANSELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEREMY B. WILKINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT A. OLIVERI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMANDA DRISCOLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAUL HEINMULLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BROCK & SCOTT, PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HARVEY WEST AUCTIONEERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?