Jacob Doe v. The University of North Carolina System
Plaintiff: JACOB DOE
Defendant: THE UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA SYSTEM, THE UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA AT CHAPEL HILL, UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA AT CHAPEL HILL BOARD OF TRUSTEES, f/k/a University of North Carolina Board of Trustees, BOARD OF GOVERNORS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA, LEE H. ROBERTS, f/k/a Kevin Guskiewicz, in his official capacity, ELIZABETH HALL, individually and in her official capacity, JEREMY ENLOW, individually and in his official capacity, BETH FROEHLING, individually and in her official capacity, REBECCA GIBSON, individually and in her official capacity, JACLYN FEENEY, individually and in her official capacity, DAVID ELROD, individually and in his official capacity and DESIREE RIECKENBERG, individually and in her official capacity
Case Number: 24-1301
Filed: April 10, 2024
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 7, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER filed granting Motion to extend filing time [ # 20 ]. Number of days granted: 14. Opening brief and appendix due 06/28/2024. Response brief due 07/29/2024. No paper copies required unless case has been tentatively calendared or copies otherwise ordered. Copies to all parties. [1001581658] [24-1301] AW [Entered: 06/07/2024 03:34 PM]
June 3, 2024 Filing 22 RESPONSE/ANSWER by Jacob Doe to Motion to extend filing time [ # 20 ]. Nature of response: in opposition. [1001578653] [24-1301] Tara Davis [Entered: 06/03/2024 04:00 PM]
May 30, 2024 Filing 21 NOTICE ISSUED to Jacob Doe requesting response to Motion to extend filing time [ # 20 ]Response due: 06/03/2024.[1001577097]. [24-1301] DL [Entered: 05/30/2024 04:37 PM]
May 30, 2024 Filing 20 MOTION by Board of Governors of the University of North Carolina, David Elrod, Jeremy Enlow, Jaclyn Feeney, Beth Froehling, Rebecca Gibson, Elizabeth Hall, Desiree Rieckenberg, Lee H. Roberts, The University of North Carolina System, University of North Carolina at Chapel Hill Board of Trustees and The University of North Carolina at Chapel Hill to extend filing time for opening brief and appendix until July 15, 2024.. Date and method of service: 05/30/2024 ecf. [1001576957] [24-1301] Lindsay Smith [Entered: 05/30/2024 02:54 PM]
May 24, 2024 Mediation forms. [1001574229] [24-1301] LHP [Entered: 05/24/2024 11:07 AM]
May 20, 2024 Filing 19 Exhibit(s) [ # 18 ] response by Jacob Doe.. [1001570983] [24-1301] Tara Davis [Entered: 05/20/2024 11:14 AM]
May 20, 2024 Filing 18 RESPONSE/ANSWER by Jacob Doe to Motion for stay pending appeal [ # 16 ]. Nature of response: in opposition. [1001570972] [24-1301] Tara Davis [Entered: 05/20/2024 11:08 AM]
May 14, 2024 Filing 17 NOTICE ISSUED to Jacob Doe requesting response to Motion for stay pending appeal [ # 16 ]. Response due no later than 05/20/2024 at Noon.[1001568515]. [24-1301] AW [Entered: 05/14/2024 02:50 PM]
May 14, 2024 Filing 16 MOTION by Board of Governors of the University of North Carolina, David Elrod, Jeremy Enlow, Jaclyn Feeney, Beth Froehling, Rebecca Gibson, Elizabeth Hall, Desiree Rieckenberg, Lee H. Roberts, The University of North Carolina at Chapel Hill, The University of North Carolina System and University of North Carolina at Chapel Hill Board of Trustees for stay pending appeal.. Date and method of service: 05/14/2024 ecf. [1001568388] [24-1301] Lindsay Smith [Entered: 05/14/2024 12:34 PM]
May 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER filed updating briefing deadlines. Opening brief and appendix due 06/14/2024. Response brief due 07/15/2024. No paper copies required unless case has been tentatively calendared or copies otherwise ordered. Copies to all parties. [1001566853] [24-1301] AW [Entered: 05/10/2024 03:01 PM]
May 7, 2024 Filing 14 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Stuart Bernstein, Esq. for Jacob Doe. [1001564562] [24-1301] Stuart Bernstein [Entered: 05/07/2024 12:14 PM]
May 7, 2024 Filing 13 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Jacob Doe. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1001564561] [24-1301] Stuart Bernstein [Entered: 05/07/2024 12:12 PM]
May 7, 2024 Filing 12 DOCKETING FORMS FOLLOW-UP NOTICE ISSUED to Jacob Doe re: filing of disclosure form Disclosure statement due from Jacob Doe on 05/08/2024. [1001564448] [24-1301] AW [Entered: 05/07/2024 10:42 AM]
May 7, 2024 Filing 11 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL for Jacob Doe. [1001564398] [24-1301] Tara Davis [Entered: 05/07/2024 10:05 AM]
May 6, 2024 Filing 10 Initial mediation conference scheduled. [1001564058] [24-1301] LHP [Entered: 05/06/2024 03:28 PM]
May 3, 2024 Filing 9 DOCKETING FORMS FOLLOW-UP NOTICE ISSUED to Jacob Doe re: filing of appearance form and disclosure statement. Appearance form and disclosure statement due on 05/06/2024 from Stuart Bernstein, Robert Christopher Ekstrand and/or Andrew T. Miltenberg on behalf of Jacob Doe. [1001563424] [24-1301] AW [Entered: 05/03/2024 04:35 PM]
April 29, 2024 Filing 8 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Marla Spector Bowman for The University of North Carolina at Chapel Hill. [1001560284] [24-1301] Marla Bowman [Entered: 04/29/2024 02:16 PM]
April 24, 2024 Filing 7 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Nicholas Brod for Board of Governors of the University of North Carolina, David Elrod, Jeremy Enlow, Jaclyn Feeney, Beth Froehling, Rebecca Gibson, Elizabeth Hall, Desiree Rieckenberg, Lee H. Roberts, The University of North Carolina at Chapel Hill, The University of North Carolina System and University of North Carolina at Chapel Hill Board of Trustees. [1001557750] [24-1301] Nicholas Brod [Entered: 04/24/2024 10:22 AM]
April 24, 2024 Filing 6 BRIEFING ORDER filed. No paper copies required unless case has been tentatively calendared or copies otherwise ordered. All filings must comply with # Appendix Pagination & Brief Citation Guide . [1001557739] Opening Brief and Appendix due 06/03/2024. Response Brief due 07/03/2024 [24-1301] AW [Entered: 04/24/2024 10:18 AM]
April 24, 2024 Filing 5 DOCKETING STATEMENT by Board of Governors of the University of North Carolina, David Elrod, Jeremy Enlow, Jaclyn Feeney, Beth Froehling, Rebecca Gibson, Elizabeth Hall, Desiree Rieckenberg, Lee H. Roberts, The University of North Carolina at Chapel Hill, The University of North Carolina System and University of North Carolina at Chapel Hill Board of Trustees.. [1001557718] [24-1301] Lindsay Smith [Entered: 04/24/2024 10:04 AM]
April 24, 2024 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Board of Governors of the University of North Carolina, David Elrod, Jeremy Enlow, Jaclyn Feeney, Beth Froehling, Rebecca Gibson, Elizabeth Hall, Desiree Rieckenberg, Lee H. Roberts, The University of North Carolina at Chapel Hill, The University of North Carolina System and University of North Carolina at Chapel Hill Board of Trustees. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1001557713] [24-1301] Lindsay Smith [Entered: 04/24/2024 10:01 AM]
April 24, 2024 Filing 3 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Lindsay Vance Smith for Board of Governors of the University of North Carolina, David Elrod, Jeremy Enlow, Jaclyn Feeney, Beth Froehling, Rebecca Gibson, Elizabeth Hall, Desiree Rieckenberg, Lee H. Roberts, The University of North Carolina at Chapel Hill, The University of North Carolina System and University of North Carolina at Chapel Hill Board of Trustees. [1001557710] [24-1301] Lindsay Smith [Entered: 04/24/2024 10:00 AM]
April 10, 2024 Filing 2 DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case. Originating case number: 1:23-cv-00041-MR. [1001550522] [24-1301] AW [Entered: 04/10/2024 12:12 PM]
April 10, 2024 Filing 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:23-cv-00041-MR. Case manager: AWalker. [1001550508] [24-1301] AW [Entered: 04/10/2024 11:58 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Jacob Doe v. The University of North Carolina System
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JACOB DOE
Represented By: Stuart Bernstein
Represented By: Robert Christopher Ekstrand
Represented By: Andrew T. Miltenberg
Represented By: Tara Jill Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA SYSTEM
Represented By: Adrina Greenlee Bass
Represented By: Jeremy David Lindsley
Represented By: Lindsay Vance Smith
Represented By: Joshua Stein
Represented By: Nicholas Scott Brod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA AT CHAPEL HILL
Represented By: Marla Spector Bowman
Represented By: Nicholas Scott Brod
Represented By: Lindsay Vance Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA AT CHAPEL HILL BOARD OF TRUSTEES, f/k/a University of North Carolina Board of Trustees
Represented By: Adrina Greenlee Bass
Represented By: Jeremy David Lindsley
Represented By: Lindsay Vance Smith
Represented By: Joshua Stein
Represented By: Nicholas Scott Brod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BOARD OF GOVERNORS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA
Represented By: Adrina Greenlee Bass
Represented By: Jeremy David Lindsley
Represented By: Lindsay Vance Smith
Represented By: Joshua Stein
Represented By: Nicholas Scott Brod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LEE H. ROBERTS, f/k/a Kevin Guskiewicz, in his official capacity
Represented By: Adrina Greenlee Bass
Represented By: Jeremy David Lindsley
Represented By: Lindsay Vance Smith
Represented By: Joshua Stein
Represented By: Nicholas Scott Brod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELIZABETH HALL, individually and in her official capacity
Represented By: Adrina Greenlee Bass
Represented By: Jeremy David Lindsley
Represented By: Lindsay Vance Smith
Represented By: Joshua Stein
Represented By: Nicholas Scott Brod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEREMY ENLOW, individually and in his official capacity
Represented By: Adrina Greenlee Bass
Represented By: Jeremy David Lindsley
Represented By: Lindsay Vance Smith
Represented By: Joshua Stein
Represented By: Nicholas Scott Brod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BETH FROEHLING, individually and in her official capacity
Represented By: Adrina Greenlee Bass
Represented By: Jeremy David Lindsley
Represented By: Lindsay Vance Smith
Represented By: Joshua Stein
Represented By: Nicholas Scott Brod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: REBECCA GIBSON, individually and in her official capacity
Represented By: Adrina Greenlee Bass
Represented By: Jeremy David Lindsley
Represented By: Lindsay Vance Smith
Represented By: Joshua Stein
Represented By: Nicholas Scott Brod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JACLYN FEENEY, individually and in her official capacity
Represented By: Adrina Greenlee Bass
Represented By: Jeremy David Lindsley
Represented By: Lindsay Vance Smith
Represented By: Joshua Stein
Represented By: Nicholas Scott Brod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID ELROD, individually and in his official capacity
Represented By: Adrina Greenlee Bass
Represented By: Jeremy David Lindsley
Represented By: Lindsay Vance Smith
Represented By: Joshua Stein
Represented By: Nicholas Scott Brod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DESIREE RIECKENBERG, individually and in her official capacity
Represented By: Adrina Greenlee Bass
Represented By: Jeremy David Lindsley
Represented By: Lindsay Vance Smith
Represented By: Joshua Stein
Represented By: Nicholas Scott Brod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?