Robert Via, Jr. v. Chadwick Dotson
Plaintiff: ROBERT KING VIA, JR.
Defendant: CHADWICK DOTSON, Director of Virginia Department of Corrections, K. CROSBY, Regional Ombudsman for VDOC, BETH CABELL, Warden of Sussex II State Prison, OPERATIONS MANAGER VANDERMARK and OFFICER CRITTON, Grievance Office
Case Number: 24-6015
Filed: January 5, 2024
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Civil Rights
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2024 Filing 9 Rule 42(b) mandate issued. Originating case number: 3:23-cv-00318-DJN-MRC. Mailed to: Robert Via. [1001531285] [24-6015] MEB [Entered: 03/04/2024 08:18 PM]
March 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER filed granting Motion to dismiss appeal pursuant to FRAP 42(b) [ # 7 ]. Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Robert Via. [1001531284] [24-6015] MEB [Entered: 03/04/2024 08:16 PM]
March 4, 2024 Filing 7 MOTION by Robert King Via, Jr. to dismiss appeal pursuant to FRAP 42(b) [7]. [1001531283] [24-6015] MEB [Entered: 03/04/2024 08:15 PM]
February 12, 2024 Filing 6 RULE 45 NOTICE issued to Robert King Via, Jr. re: failure to satisfy fee requirements under PLRA Case will be dismissed if default is not cured within 15 days. Mailed to: Robert Via. [1001520192] [24-6015] MEB [Entered: 02/12/2024 04:02 PM]
January 10, 2024 Filing 5 INFORMAL OPENING BRIEF titled as "Application for Certificate of Appealability" by Robert King Via, Jr. [1001508558] [24-6015] MEB [Entered: 01/23/2024 02:12 PM]
January 8, 2024 Filing 4 RECORD requested from Clerk of Court [1001500861]. Due: 01/22/2024. [24-6015] MEB [Entered: 01/08/2024 12:00 PM]
January 8, 2024 Filing 3 INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Robert Via, Jr. [1001500854] Informal Opening Brief due 02/01/2024. Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief served. [24-6015] MEB [Entered: 01/08/2024 11:58 AM]
January 8, 2024 Filing 2 PLRA NOTICE issued to [ Robert King Via, Jr. ]. Fee due to District Court or PLRA application due to Court of Appeals within 15 days. Mailed to: Robert Via, Jr. [1001500849] [24-6015] MEB [Entered: 01/08/2024 11:54 AM]
January 5, 2024 Filing 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 3:23-cv-00318-DJN-MRC. Case manager: MBeall. [1001500216] [24-6015] MEB [Entered: 01/05/2024 03:21 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Robert Via, Jr. v. Chadwick Dotson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT KING VIA, JR.
Represented By: Robert King Via Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHADWICK DOTSON, Director of Virginia Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. CROSBY, Regional Ombudsman for VDOC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BETH CABELL, Warden of Sussex II State Prison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OPERATIONS MANAGER VANDERMARK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OFFICER CRITTON, Grievance Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?