Frank Reid v. Corizon Health Services
Plaintiff: FRANK REID
Defendant: CORIZON HEALTH SERVICES, Virginia Department of Corrections Contract Medical Provider, J. BLEDSOE, Red Onion State Prison Medical Administrator, DOCTOR FOX, Red Onion State Prison Physician, STEVE HERRICK, Health Services Director for Virginia Department of Corrections, TREY FULLER, Assistant Health Services Director for Virginia Department of Corrections, JOSEPH WALTERS, Deputy Director for Administration, CHADWICK DOTSON, Director of Virginia Department of Corrections, RICK WHITE, Warden, Red Onion State Prison, A. DAVID ROBINSON, Chief of Operations for Virginia Department of Corrections, REBECCA BEVINS, Physical Therapist, B. WITT, RNCA, LARRY COLLINS, Unit Manager at Red Onion, SERGEANT B. TAYLOR, Correctional Officer, B. DOTSON, Correctional Officer, T. COX, Correctional Officer, T. NEECE, Correctional Officer, MAJOR KING, Chief of Security at Red Onion State Prison, K. RAMEY, Hearings Officer, J. ADAMS, Hearings Officer, MS. CARLISLE, ADA Coordinator for Virginia Department of Corrections, D. TURNER, Chief of Housing and Programs at Red Onion Prison, P. SYKES, AMA at Red Onion Prison, J. HECKFORD, Correctional Officer, SERGEANT ELDRIDGE, Correctional Officer and HAROLD W. CLARKE, Director of Virginia Department of Corrections
Case Number: 24-6422
Filed: May 3, 2024
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Civil Rights

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
August 27, 2024 Frank Reid v. Corizon Health Services

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2024 Filing 15 Exhibit(s) [ # 12 ] in support of informal opening brief by Frank Reid.[1001592931] [24-6422] DL [Entered: 06/27/2024 03:46 PM]
June 25, 2024 Filing 14 Letter stating appellant is sending a documentary exhibit in support of informal opening brief [ # 12 ] informal opening brief by Frank Reid . [1001590908] [24-6422] DL [Entered: 06/25/2024 10:42 AM]
June 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER filed granting motion for leave to proceed PLRA [9], [8]. Fee Amount: $605.00. Name and Prisoner Number: Frank Reid, #1063812. Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Frank Reid; Warden, Attn. Accounting Office, Red Onion State Prison 10800 H. Jack Rose Highway Pound, VA 24279. [1001590391] [24-6422] EB [Entered: 06/24/2024 03:42 PM]
June 24, 2024 Filing 12 INFORMAL OPENING BRIEF by Frank Reid. [1001590376] [24-6422] EB [Entered: 06/24/2024 03:37 PM]
June 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER filed granting Motion to extend filing time [ # 10 ]. Number of days granted: 30. Informal Opening Brief due 07/18/2024. Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Frank Reid, #1063812, VADOC CENTRALIZED MAIL DISTRIBUTION CENTER, 3521 Woods Way, State Farm, VA 23160. [1001586966] [24-6422] KS [Entered: 06/18/2024 09:43 AM]
June 17, 2024 Filing 10 MOTION by Frank Reid to schedule oral argument, to extend filing time for informal opening brief. Date and method of service: 06/13/2024 US mail. [1001586965] [24-6422] KS [Entered: 06/18/2024 09:42 AM]
June 17, 2024 Filing 9 PLRA-APPLICATION (court access only) by Frank Reid. Consent to Payment Form: Yes; Trust Account Statement: No. [1001586963] [24-6422] KS [Entered: 06/18/2024 09:40 AM]
June 6, 2024 Filing 8 PLRA-APPLICATION (court access only) by Frank Reid. Consent to Payment Form: Yes; Trust Account Statement: No. [1001581009] [24-6422] KS [Entered: 06/06/2024 03:59 PM]
May 31, 2024 Filing 7 RULE 45 NOTICE issued to Frank Reid for failure to satisfy PLRA and informal briefing requirements. Case will be dismissed if default is not cured within 15 days. Mailed to: Frank Reid, #1063812, VADOC CENTRALIZED MAIL DISTRIBUTION CENTER, 3521 Woods Way, State Farm, VA 23160. [1001577708] [24-6422] KS [Entered: 05/31/2024 03:31 PM]
May 16, 2024 Filing 6 DOCUMENT re: filing of notice of appeal by Frank Reid. [1001570034] [24-6422] KS [Entered: 05/16/2024 03:12 PM]
May 3, 2024 Filing 4 RECORD requested from Clerk of Court. Due: 05/17/2024. [1001563024] [24-6422] KS [Entered: 05/03/2024 11:36 AM]
May 3, 2024 Filing 3 INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Frank Reid, #1063812, VADOC CENTRALIZED MAIL DISTRIBUTION CENTER, 3521 Woods Way, State Farm, VA 23160. [1001563020] Informal Opening Brief due 05/28/2024. Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief served. [24-6422] KS [Entered: 05/03/2024 11:34 AM]
May 3, 2024 Filing 2 PLRA NOTICE issued to [ Frank Reid ]. Fee due to District Court or PLRA application due to Court of Appeals within 15 days. Mailed to: Frank Reid, #1063812, VADOC CENTRALIZED MAIL DISTRIBUTION CENTER, 3521 Woods Way, State Farm, VA 23160. [1001563018] [24-6422] KS [Entered: 05/03/2024 11:32 AM]
May 3, 2024 Filing 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 7:22-cv-00346-MFU-JCH. Case manager: KStump. [1001563016] [24-6422] KS [Entered: 05/03/2024 11:29 AM]
April 29, 2024 Filing 5 DOCUMENT re: filing of notice of appeal by Frank Reid. [1001563032] [24-6422] KS [Entered: 05/03/2024 11:41 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Frank Reid v. Corizon Health Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRANK REID
Represented By: Frank Reid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CORIZON HEALTH SERVICES, Virginia Department of Corrections Contract Medical Provider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. BLEDSOE, Red Onion State Prison Medical Administrator
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOCTOR FOX, Red Onion State Prison Physician
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEVE HERRICK, Health Services Director for Virginia Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TREY FULLER, Assistant Health Services Director for Virginia Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSEPH WALTERS, Deputy Director for Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHADWICK DOTSON, Director of Virginia Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICK WHITE, Warden, Red Onion State Prison
Represented By: Margaret Hoehl O'Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. DAVID ROBINSON, Chief of Operations for Virginia Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: REBECCA BEVINS, Physical Therapist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. WITT, RNCA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LARRY COLLINS, Unit Manager at Red Onion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SERGEANT B. TAYLOR, Correctional Officer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. DOTSON, Correctional Officer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. COX, Correctional Officer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. NEECE, Correctional Officer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAJOR KING, Chief of Security at Red Onion State Prison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. RAMEY, Hearings Officer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. ADAMS, Hearings Officer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MS. CARLISLE, ADA Coordinator for Virginia Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. TURNER, Chief of Housing and Programs at Red Onion Prison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P. SYKES, AMA at Red Onion Prison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. HECKFORD, Correctional Officer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SERGEANT ELDRIDGE, Correctional Officer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HAROLD W. CLARKE, Director of Virginia Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?