US v. Kyle Thompson
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: KYLE STEPHEN THOMPSON
Case Number: 25-6129
Filed: February 24, 2025
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petition-Vacate Sentence
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 24, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 24, 2025 Filing 11 RECORD FOLLOW UP NOTICE ISSUED to Clerk of Court. [1001741451] Due: 04/04/2025. [25-6129] BAW [Entered: 03/24/2025 04:35 PM]
March 24, 2025 Filing 10 NOTICE ISSUED re: misrouted fee received/transmitted to District Court of Maryland in paper form. Amount: $605.00. Mailed to: Kyle Stephen Thompson #63021-037 FMC BUTNER - FEDERAL MEDICAL CENTER P. O. Box 1600 Butner, NC 27509-0000. [1001741436] [25-6129] MJP [Entered: 03/24/2025 04:18 PM]
March 14, 2025 Filing 9 RECORD FOLLOW UP NOTICE ISSUED to Clerk of Court. [1001736868] Due: 03/21/2025. [25-6129] BAW [Entered: 03/14/2025 02:35 PM]
March 14, 2025 Filing 8 (ENTRY RESTRICTED) RECORD FOLLOW UP NOTICE ISSUED to Clerk of Court. [1001736862] [25-6129]--[Edited 03/14/2025 by BAW-see ECF#9] BAW [Entered: 03/14/2025 02:29 PM]
March 14, 2025 Filing 7 RESTRICTED ACCESS DOCUMENT (court & party access only) filed by Kyle Stephen Thompson. Document Title: Fee Notice Status. Full document restriction required due to: other . [1001736861] [25-6129] BAW [Entered: 03/14/2025 02:28 PM]
March 14, 2025 Filing 6 INFORMAL OPENING BRIEF by Kyle Stephen Thompson. [1001736858] [25-6129] BAW [Entered: 03/14/2025 02:26 PM]
March 7, 2025 Filing 5 RECORD FOLLOW UP NOTICE ISSUED to Clerk of Court. [1001732641] Due: 03/21/2025. [25-6129] BAW [Entered: 03/07/2025 10:47 AM]
February 24, 2025 Filing 4 RECORD requested from Clerk of Court [1001725653]. Due: 03/10/2025. [25-6129] BAW [Entered: 02/24/2025 12:38 PM]
February 24, 2025 Filing 3 INFORMAL PRELIMINARY BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Kyle Stephen Thompson. [1001725650] Informal Opening Brief due 03/20/2025. [25-6129] BAW [Entered: 02/24/2025 12:36 PM]
February 24, 2025 Filing 2 FEE NOTICE issued to Kyle Stephen Thompson - initial notice. Fee or application to proceed as indigent due 03/26/2025. Originating case numbers: 8:17-cr-00195-TDC-1, 8:24-cv-01986-TDC. Mailed to: Kyle Stephen Thompson. [1001725642] [25-6129] BAW [Entered: 02/24/2025 12:31 PM]
February 24, 2025 Filing 1 2255 case docketed. Originating case numbers: 8:17-cr-00195-TDC-1, 8:24-cv-01986-TDC. Date notice of appeal filed: 02/20/2025. Case manager: BevWashington. Did district court rule on COA? Yes. [1001725625] [25-6129] BAW [Entered: 02/24/2025 12:20 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: US v. Kyle Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Kristi Noel O'Malley
Represented By: Kelly O. Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KYLE STEPHEN THOMPSON
Represented By: Kyle Stephen Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?