State of Texas, et al v. USA, et al Featured Case
Plaintiff / Appellee: STATE OF TENNESSEE, STATE OF WEST VIRGINIA, STATE OF LOUISIANA, STATE OF ARIZONA, STATE OF NORTH DAKOTA, STATE OF NEBRASKA, STATE OF KANSAS, JOHN NANTZ, STATE OF SOUTH CAROLINA, STATE OF MISSISSIPPI, by and through Governor Phil Bryant, NEILL HURLEY, STATE OF ARKANSAS, STATE OF TEXAS, STATE OF ALABAMA, STATE OF WISCONSIN, STATE OF SOUTH DAKOTA, STATE OF GEORGIA, STATE OF UTAH, PAUL LEPAGE, Governor of Maine, STATE OF FLORIDA, STATE OF MISSOURI and STATE OF INDIANA
Not Yet Classified: DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, STATE OF CONNECTICUT, STATE OF MINNESOTA, STATE OF RHODE ISLAND, STATE OF MASSACHUSETTS, STATE OF OREGON, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, STATE OF ILLINOIS, STATE OF NEW YORK, STATE OF VIRGINIA, STATE OF WASHINGTON, STATE OF KENTUCKY, STATE OF VERMONT, STATE OF DELAWARE, STATE OF NEW JERSEY, STATE OF HAWAII and STATE OF CALIFORNIA
Defendant / Appellant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, UNITED STATES INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, CHARLES P. RETTIG, in his Official Capacity as Commissioner of Internal Revenue and ALEX M. AZAR, II, SECRETARY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Intervenor: STATE OF COLORADO, STATE OF IOWA, UNITED STATES HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES, STATE OF MICHIGAN and STATE OF NEVADA
Amicus Curiae: STATE OF OHIO, 483 FEDERALLY RECOGNIZED TRIBAL NATIONS, ILYA SOMIN, JUSTICE IN AGING, SAMUEL L. BRAY, GLMA HEALTH PROFESSIONALS ADVANCING LGBT EQUALITY, NATIONAL ALLIANCE ON MENTAL ILLNESS, COMMUNITY CATALYST, NICHOLAS BAGLEY, WALTER DELLINGER, ALLIANCE OF COMMUNITY HEALTH PLANS, AMERICAN OSTEOPATHIC ASSOCIATION, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF PEOPLE WITH DISABILITIES, CYSTIC FIBROSIS FOUNDATION, NATIONAL HEALTH LAW PROGRAM, CENTER FOR MEDICARE ADVOCACY, CHILDREN'S PARTNERSHIP, KENNEDY FORUM, ASSOCIATION FOR COMMUNITY AFFILIATED PLANS, HCA HEALTHCARE, INCORPORATED, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF CHILD AND ADOLESCENT PSYCHIATRY, AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR METABOLIC AND BARIATRIC SURGERY, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF HEMATOLOGY, AMERICAN LUNG ASSOCIATION, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF RETIRED PERSONS, RENAL PHYSICIANS ASSOCIATION, NATIONAL WOMEN'S LAW CENTER, CROHN'S AND COLITIS FOUNDATION, HEMOPHILIA FEDERATION OF AMERICA, AMERICAN CANCER SOCIETY CANCER ACTION NETWORK, AMERICA'S HEALTH INSURANCE PLANS, AMERICAN HEART ASSOCIATION, AMERICAN COLLEGE OF CORRECTIONAL PHYSICIANS, AMERICAN COLLEGE OF OBSTETRICIANS AND GYNECOLOGISTS, KEVIN C. WALSH, ABBE R. GLUCK, ELEVEN OTHER LEADING NATIONAL DISABILITY RIGHTS ORGANIZATIONS, BLUE CROSS BLUE SHIELD ASSOCIATION, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF RETIRED PERSONS FOUNDATION, MICHAEL W. MCCONNELL, NATIONAL HEMOPHILIA FOUNDATION, DOUGLAS LAYCOCK, AMERICAN COLLEGE OF RADIATION ONCOLOGY, NATIONAL COALITION FOR CANCER SURVIVORSHIP, ASTHMA AND IMMUNOLOGY, 35 COUNTIES, CITIES, AND TOWNS, GLOBAL HEALTHY LIVING FOUNDATION, DISABILITY RIGHTS EDUCATION AND DEFENSE FUND, MARCH OF DIMES, AMERICAN GERIATRICS SOCIETY, FIRST FOCUS, LEUKEMIA AND LYMPHOMA SOCIETY, AMERICAN DIABETES ASSOCIATION, STATE OF MONTANA, CALIFORNIA STATE ASSOCIATION OF COUNTIES, JUDGE DAVID L BAZELON CENTER FOR MENTAL HEALTH LAW, FEDERATION OF AMERICAN HOSPITALS, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF PUBLIC HEALTH PHYSICIANS, ASSOCIATION OF AMERICAN MEDICAL COLLEGES, BIPARTISAN ECONOMIC SCHOLARS, JONATHAN H. ADLER, AMERICAN ACADEMY OF ALLERGY, AMERICAN MEDICAL ASSOCIATION, FAMILIES USA, AMERICAN COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS, NATIONAL MULTIPLE SCLEROSIS SOCIETY, CENTER ON BUDGET AND POLICY PRIORITIES, AMERICAN CANCER SOCIETY, BLACK WOMEN'S HEALTH IMPERATIVE, AMERICAN ACADEMY OF FAMILY PHYSICIANS, CATHOLIC HEALTH ASSOCIATION OF THE UNITED STATES, AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION, AMERICAN HOSPITAL ASSOCIATION, AMERICAN MEDICAL WOMEN'S ASSOCIATION, SMALL BUSINESS MAJORITY FOUNDATION, NATIONAL PARTNERSHIP FOR WOMEN AND FAMILIES, AMERICAN PSYCHIATRIC ASSOCIATION, SERVICE EMPLOYEES INTERNATIONAL UNION, EPILEPSY FOUNDATION, 24 STATE HOSPITALS ASSOCIATIONS, AMERICAN ACADEMY OF PEDIATRICS, AMERICA'S ESSENTIAL HOSPITALS, AMERICAN BUSINESS DEFENSE FOUNDATION, RESTORING LIBERTY ACTION COMMITTEE, ASSOCIATION OF AMERICAN PHYSICIANS & SURGEONS AND CITIZENS' COUNCIL FOR HEALTH FREEDOM, DOWNSIZE DC FOUNDATION, CONSERVATIVE LEGAL DEFENSE AND EDUCATION FUND, CITIZENS UNITED FOUNDATION, GUN OWNERS FOUNDATION, GUN OWNERS OF AMERICA, INCORPORATED, DOWNSIZE DC.ORG, FITZGERALD GRIFFIN FOUNDATION, 60 PLUS FOUNDATION, 60 PLUS ASSOCIATION, EBERLE COMMUNICATIONS GROUP, INCORPORATED, CITIZENS UNITED, FOUNDATION FOR MORAL LAW and AMERICAN CENTER FOR LAW AND JUSTICE
Case Number: 19-10011
Filed: January 7, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2019 CLERK ORDER granting Motion to withdraw as counsel filed by Mr. Edward C. DuMont [ # 9123153-2 ] [19-10011] (RAJ) [Entered: 08/16/2019 12:40 PM]
August 16, 2019 MOTION filed by Attorney Mr. Edward C. DuMont for Appellant State of California to withdraw as counsel [9123153-2]. Date of Service: 08/16/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Al-Fuhaid, Frederick, Hacker, Hawkins, Henneke, McCarty, White; Attorney for Amici Curiae: Allison, Anthony, Baker, Bierig, Blalack, Carr, Chen, Delery, DiCarlo, Dotzel, Eidsmoe, Flowers, Gyamfi, Halligan, Hedrick, Hellman, Hunt, Jennings, Kitchens, Marotta, Masters, Melkonian, Olson, Palmore, Petronio, Salgado, Santos, Schlafly, Schultz, Sekulow, Shah, Solomon, Underwood, Van Kirk, Wolff, Zionts; Attorney for Intervenors: Anders, Blake, Frazelle, Goldenberg, Gorod, Hammoud, Hanner, Kreisberg, Letter, Meltzer, Miller-Ziegler, Olson, Phatak, Shapiro, Stern, Tatelman, Verrilli, Wydra; Attorney for Appellants: Battles, Berns, Boergers, DiBattista, DuMont, Elias, Flentje, Ikeda, Kallen, Lenz, McGuire, Nakatsuji, Palma, Rubin, Siegel, Soueid, Sprung, Totaro, Van Zile, Vogel, Willey [19-10011] (Edward C. DuMont ) [Entered: 08/16/2019 12:34 PM]
July 11, 2019 CASE CAPTION updated. Not Party Lawrence Crawford added to case. [19-10011] (RAJ) [Entered: 07/11/2019 01:42 PM]
July 9, 2019 ORAL ARGUMENT HEARD before Judges King, Elrod, Engelhardt. Arguing Person Information Updated for: August E. Flentje arguing for Appellant II Azar, Secretary, Appellant Charles P. Rettig, Appellant United States Department of Health and Human Services, Appellant United States Internal Revenue Service; Arguing Person Information Updated for: Kyle Douglas Hawkins arguing for Appellee State of Alabama, Appellee State of Arizona, Appellee State of Arkansas, Appellee State of Florida, Appellee State of Georgia, Appellee State of Indiana, Appellee State of Kansas, Appellee State of Louisiana, Appellee State of Mississippi, Appellee State of Missouri, Appellee State of Nebraska, Appellee State of North Dakota, Appellee State of South Carolina, Appellee State of South Dakota, Appellee State of Tennessee, Appellee State of Texas, Appellee State of Utah; Arguing Person Information Updated for: Robert E. Henneke arguing for Appellee Neill Hurley; Arguing Person Information Updated for: Douglas Neal Letter arguing for Intervenor United States House of Representatives; Arguing Person Information Updated for: Samuel Siegel arguing for Appellant District of Columbia, Appellant State of California, Appellant State of Connecticut, Appellant State of Delaware, Appellant State of Hawaii, Appellant State of Illinois, Appellant State of Kentucky, Appellant State of Massachusetts, Appellant State of Minnesota, Appellant State of New Jersey, Appellant State of New York, Appellant State of North Carolina, Appellant State of Oregon, Appellant State of Rhode Island, Appellant State of Vermont, Appellant State of Virginia [19-10011] (SME) [Entered: 07/09/2019 01:56 PM]
July 5, 2019 LETTER filed by Appellees Mr. Neill Hurley and Mr. John Nantz referencing OA Panel Request [ # 9084688-2 ]. Date of Service: 07/05/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Al-Fuhaid, Frederick, Hacker, Hawkins, Henneke, McCarty, White; Attorney for Amici Curiae: Allison, Anthony, Baker, Bierig, Blalack, Carr, Chen, Delery, DiCarlo, Dotzel, Eidsmoe, Flowers, Gyamfi, Halligan, Hedrick, Hellman, Hunt, Jennings, Kitchens, Marotta, Masters, Melkonian, Olson, Palmore, Petronio, Salgado, Santos, Schlafly, Schultz, Sekulow, Shah, Solomon, Underwood, Van Kirk, Wolff, Zionts; Attorney for Intervenors: Anders, Blake, Frazelle, Goldenberg, Gorod, Hammoud, Hanner, Kreisberg, Letter, Meltzer, Miller-Ziegler, Olson, Phatak, Shapiro, Stern, Tatelman, Verrilli, Wydra; Attorney for Appellants: Battles, Berns, Boergers, DiBattista, DuMont, Elias, Flentje, Ikeda, Kallen, Lenz, McGuire, Nakatsuji, Palma, Rubin, Siegel, Soueid, Sprung, Totaro, Van Zile, Vogel, Willey [19-10011] (Robert E. Henneke ) [Entered: 07/05/2019 05:14 PM]
July 5, 2019 LETTER filed by Appellees State of Alabama, State of Arizona, State of Arkansas, State of Florida, State of Georgia, State of Indiana, State of Kansas, State of Louisiana, State of Mississippi, State of Missouri, State of Nebraska, State of North Dakota, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, State of Tennessee, State of Texas, State of Utah and State of West Virginia referencing OA Panel Request [ # 9084688-2 ]. Date of Service: 07/05/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Al-Fuhaid, Frederick, Hacker, Hawkins, Henneke, McCarty, White; Attorney for Amici Curiae: Allison, Anthony, Baker, Bierig, Blalack, Carr, Chen, Delery, DiCarlo, Dotzel, Eidsmoe, Flowers, Gyamfi, Halligan, Hedrick, Hellman, Hunt, Jennings, Kitchens, Marotta, Masters, Melkonian, Olson, Palmore, Petronio, Salgado, Santos, Schlafly, Schultz, Sekulow, Shah, Solomon, Underwood, Van Kirk, Wolff, Zionts; Attorney for Intervenors: Anders, Blake, Frazelle, Goldenberg, Gorod, Hammoud, Hanner, Kreisberg, Letter, Meltzer, Miller-Ziegler, Olson, Phatak, Shapiro, Stern, Tatelman, Verrilli, Wydra; Attorney for Appellants: Battles, Berns, Boergers, DiBattista, DuMont, Elias, Flentje, Ikeda, Kallen, Lenz, McGuire, Nakatsuji, Palma, Rubin, Siegel, Soueid, Sprung, Totaro, Van Zile, Vogel, Willey [19-10011] (Kyle Douglas Hawkins ) [Entered: 07/05/2019 04:31 PM]
July 5, 2019 LETTER filed by Intervenor United States House of Representatives referencing OA Panel Request [ # 9084688-2 ]. Date of Service: 07/05/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Al-Fuhaid, Frederick, Hacker, Hawkins, Henneke, McCarty, White; Attorney for Amici Curiae: Allison, Anthony, Baker, Bierig, Blalack, Carr, Chen, Delery, DiCarlo, Dotzel, Eidsmoe, Flowers, Gyamfi, Halligan, Hedrick, Hellman, Hunt, Jennings, Kitchens, Marotta, Masters, Melkonian, Olson, Palmore, Petronio, Salgado, Santos, Schlafly, Schultz, Sekulow, Shah, Solomon, Underwood, Van Kirk, Wolff, Zionts; Attorney for Intervenors: Anders, Blake, Frazelle, Goldenberg, Gorod, Hammoud, Hanner, Kreisberg, Letter, Meltzer, Miller-Ziegler, Olson, Phatak, Shapiro, Stern, Tatelman, Verrilli, Wydra; Attorney for Appellants: Battles, Berns, Boergers, DiBattista, DuMont, Elias, Flentje, Ikeda, Kallen, Lenz, McGuire, Nakatsuji, Palma, Rubin, Siegel, Soueid, Sprung, Totaro, Van Zile, Vogel, Willey [19-10011] (Donald B. Verrilli Jr.) [Entered: 07/05/2019 04:19 PM]
July 5, 2019 APPELLANT'S SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF FILED. # of Copies Provided: 0 Miscellaneous deadline satisfied [19-10011] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: APPELLANT'S SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF FILED by District of Columbia, State of California, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Hawaii, State of Illinois, State of Kentucky, State of Massachusetts, State of Minnesota, State of New Jersey, State of New York, State of North Carolina, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Virginia and State of Washington. Date of service: 07/05/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Al-Fuhaid, Frederick, Hacker, Hawkins, Henneke, McCarty, White; Attorney for Amici Curiae: Allison, Anthony, Baker, Bierig, Blalack, Carr, Chen, Delery, DiCarlo, Dotzel, Eidsmoe, Flowers, Gyamfi, Halligan, Hedrick, Hellman, Hunt, Jennings, Kitchens, Marotta, Masters, Melkonian, Olson, Palmore, Petronio, Salgado, Santos, Schlafly, Schultz, Sekulow, Shah, Solomon, Underwood, Van Kirk, Wolff, Zionts; Attorney for Intervenors: Anders, Blake, Frazelle, Goldenberg, Gorod, Hammoud, Hanner, Kreisberg, Letter, Meltzer, Miller-Ziegler, Olson, Phatak, Shapiro, Stern, Tatelman, Verrilli, Wydra; Attorney for Appellants: Battles, Berns, Boergers, DiBattista, DuMont, Elias, Flentje, Ikeda, Kallen, Lenz, McGuire, Nakatsuji, Palma, Rubin, Siegel, Soueid, Sprung, Totaro, Van Zile, Vogel, Willey [19-10011] (Samuel Siegel ) [Entered: 07/05/2019 04:13 PM]
July 5, 2019 LETTER filed by Appellees State of Alabama, State of Arizona, State of Arkansas, State of Florida, State of Georgia, State of Indiana, State of Kansas, State of Louisiana, State of Mississippi, State of Missouri, State of Nebraska, State of North Dakota, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, State of Tennessee, State of Texas, State of Utah and State of West Virginia referencing 28j Letter filed by Appellees Mr. Neill Hurley and Mr. John Nantz [ # 9090461-2 ]. Date of Service: 07/05/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Al-Fuhaid, Frederick, Hacker, Hawkins, Henneke, McCarty, White; Attorney for Amici Curiae: Allison, Anthony, Baker, Bierig, Blalack, Carr, Chen, Delery, DiCarlo, Dotzel, Eidsmoe, Flowers, Gyamfi, Halligan, Hedrick, Hellman, Hunt, Jennings, Kitchens, Marotta, Masters, Melkonian, Olson, Palmore, Petronio, Salgado, Santos, Schlafly, Schultz, Sekulow, Shah, Solomon, Underwood, Van Kirk, Wolff, Zionts; Attorney for Intervenors: Anders, Blake, Frazelle, Goldenberg, Gorod, Hammoud, Hanner, Kreisberg, Letter, Meltzer, Miller-Ziegler, Olson, Phatak, Shapiro, Stern, Tatelman, Verrilli, Wydra; Attorney for Appellants: Battles, Berns, Boergers, DiBattista, DuMont, Elias, Flentje, Ikeda, Kallen, Lenz, McGuire, Nakatsuji, Palma, Rubin, Siegel, Soueid, Sprung, Totaro, Van Zile, Vogel, Willey [19-10011] (Kyle Douglas Hawkins ) [Entered: 07/05/2019 01:30 PM]
July 5, 2019 RESPONSE filed by Intervenor United States House of Representatives to the 28j Letter filed by Appellees Mr. Neill Hurley and Mr. John Nantz [ # 9090461-2 ] Date of Service: 07/05/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Al-Fuhaid, Frederick, Hacker, Hawkins, Henneke, McCarty, White; Attorney for Amici Curiae: Allison, Anthony, Baker, Bierig, Blalack, Carr, Chen, Delery, DiCarlo, Dotzel, Eidsmoe, Flowers, Gyamfi, Halligan, Hedrick, Hellman, Hunt, Jennings, Kitchens, Marotta, Masters, Melkonian, Olson, Palmore, Petronio, Salgado, Santos, Schlafly, Schultz, Sekulow, Shah, Solomon, Underwood, Van Kirk, Wolff, Zionts; Attorney for Intervenors: Anders, Blake, Frazelle, Goldenberg, Gorod, Hammoud, Hanner, Kreisberg, Letter, Meltzer, Miller-Ziegler, Olson, Phatak, Shapiro, Stern, Tatelman, Verrilli, Wydra; Attorney for Appellants: Battles, Berns, Boergers, DiBattista, DuMont, Elias, Flentje, Ikeda, Kallen, Lenz, McGuire, Nakatsuji, Palma, Rubin, Siegel, Soueid, Sprung, Totaro, Van Zile, Vogel, Willey [19-10011] (Donald B. Verrilli Jr.) [Entered: 07/05/2019 06:17 AM]
July 3, 2019 SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITIES (FRAP 28j) FILED by Appellees Mr. Neill Hurley and Mr. John Nantz Date of Service: 07/03/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Al-Fuhaid, Frederick, Hacker, Hawkins, Henneke, McCarty, White; Attorney for Amici Curiae: Allison, Anthony, Baker, Bierig, Blalack, Carr, Chen, Delery, DiCarlo, Dotzel, Eidsmoe, Flowers, Gyamfi, Halligan, Hedrick, Hellman, Hunt, Jennings, Kitchens, Marotta, Masters, Melkonian, Olson, Palmore, Petronio, Salgado, Santos, Schlafly, Schultz, Sekulow, Shah, Solomon, Underwood, Van Kirk, Wolff, Zionts; Attorney for Intervenors: Anders, Blake, Frazelle, Goldenberg, Gorod, Hammoud, Hanner, Kreisberg, Letter, Meltzer, Miller-Ziegler, Olson, Phatak, Shapiro, Stern, Tatelman, Verrilli, Wydra; Attorney for Appellants: Battles, Berns, Boergers, DiBattista, DuMont, Elias, Flentje, Ikeda, Kallen, Lenz, McGuire, Nakatsuji, Palma, Rubin, Siegel, Soueid, Sprung, Totaro, Van Zile, Vogel, Willey [19-10011] (Robert E. Henneke ) [Entered: 07/03/2019 02:01 PM]
July 3, 2019 APPELLANT'S SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF FILED by Mr. Alex M. Azar, II, Secretary, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, Mr. Charles P. Rettig, HHS, United States Internal Revenue Service and USA. Miscellaneous deadline satisfied [19-10011] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: APPELLANT'S SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF FILED by Mr. Alex M. Azar, II, Secretary, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, HHS, Mr. Charles P. Rettig, United States Internal Revenue Service and USA. Date of service: 07/03/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Al-Fuhaid, Frederick, Hacker, Hawkins, Henneke, McCarty, White; Attorney for Amici Curiae: Allison, Anthony, Baker, Bierig, Blalack, Carr, Chen, Delery, DiCarlo, Dotzel, Eidsmoe, Flowers, Gyamfi, Halligan, Hedrick, Hellman, Hunt, Jennings, Kitchens, Marotta, Masters, Melkonian, Olson, Palmore, Petronio, Salgado, Santos, Schlafly, Schultz, Sekulow, Shah, Solomon, Underwood, Van Kirk, Wolff, Zionts; Attorney for Intervenors: Anders, Blake, Frazelle, Goldenberg, Gorod, Hammoud, Hanner, Kreisberg, Letter, Meltzer, Miller-Ziegler, Olson, Phatak, Shapiro, Stern, Tatelman, Verrilli, Wydra; Attorney for Appellants: Battles, Berns, Boergers, DiBattista, DuMont, Elias, Flentje, Ikeda, Kallen, Lenz, McGuire, Nakatsuji, Palma, Rubin, Siegel, Soueid, Sprung, Totaro, Van Zile, Vogel, Willey [19-10011] (August E. Flentje ) [Entered: 07/03/2019 01:02 PM]
July 2, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Michelle Shane Kallen for party(s) Appellant State of Virginia, in case 19-10011 [19-10011] (PAC) [Entered: 07/02/2019 02:10 PM]
July 2, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Darren Lee McCarty for Appellee State of Arkansas in 19-10011, Attorney Darren Lee McCarty for Appellee State of West Virginia in 19-10011, Attorney Darren Lee McCarty for Appellee State of Utah in 19-10011, Attorney Darren Lee McCarty for Appellee State of Tennessee in 19-10011, Attorney Darren Lee McCarty for Appellee State of South Dakota in 19-10011, Attorney Darren Lee McCarty for Appellee State of South Carolina in 19-10011, Attorney Darren Lee McCarty for Appellee State of North Dakota in 19-10011, Attorney Darren Lee McCarty for Appellee State of Nebraska in 19-10011, Attorney Darren Lee McCarty for Appellee State of Missouri in 19-10011, Attorney Darren Lee McCarty for Appellee State of Mississippi in 19-10011, Attorney Darren Lee McCarty for Appellee State of Louisiana in 19-10011, Attorney Darren Lee McCarty for Appellee State of Kansas in 19-10011, Attorney Darren Lee McCarty for Appellee State of Indiana in 19-10011, Attorney Darren Lee McCarty for Appellee State of Georgia in 19-10011, Attorney Darren Lee McCarty for Appellee State of Florida in 19-10011, Attorney Darren Lee McCarty for Appellee State of Arizona in 19-10011, Attorney Darren Lee McCarty for Appellee State of Alabama in 19-10011, Attorney Darren Lee McCarty for Appellee State of Texas in 19-10011 [19-10011] (PAC) [Entered: 07/02/2019 02:08 PM]
July 2, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Edward C. DuMont for party(s) Appellant State of California, in case 19-10011 [19-10011] (PAC) [Entered: 07/02/2019 02:04 PM]
July 2, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-10011] (Michelle Shane Kallen ) [Entered: 07/02/2019 01:11 PM]
July 2, 2019 COURT ORDER: appellees' opposed motion for an extension of time to and including July 23, 2019, to file their supplemental brief is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. All counsel are to submit the requested supplemental briefing by 5:00 p.m. central time on Friday, July 5, 2019. [ # 9088464-3 ]; appellees' opposed motion to continue oral argument is DENIED. [ # 9088464-4 ] [19-10011] (PAC) [Entered: 07/02/2019 12:23 PM]
July 2, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Darren Lee McCarty, Esq. for State of Alabama, State of Arizona, State of Arkansas, State of Florida, State of Georgia, State of Indiana, State of Kansas, State of Louisiana, State of Mississippi, State of Missouri, State of Nebraska, State of North Dakota, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, State of Tennessee, State of Texas, State of Utah and State of West Virginia for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-10011] (Darren Lee McCarty ) [Entered: 07/02/2019 08:20 AM]
July 1, 2019 RESPONSE/OPPOSITION filed by District of Columbia, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Hawaii, State of Illinois, State of Kentucky, State of Massachusetts, State of Minnesota, State of New Jersey, State of New York, State of North Carolina, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Virginia, State of Washington and United States House of Representatives [9088476-1] to the Motion to extend time to file appellee's supp brief filed by Appellees State of Tennessee, State of South Carolina, State of Alabama, State of Louisiana, State of Florida, State of Arkansas, State of South Dakota, State of Georgia, State of Missouri, State of Utah, State of Kansas, State of West Virginia, State of Texas, State of Nebraska, State of Mississippi, State of Arizona, State of Indiana and State of North Dakota in 19-10011 [ # 9088464-3 ], Motion to continue oral argument filed by Appellees State of Tennessee, State of South Carolina, State of Alabama, State of Louisiana, State of Florida, State of Arkansas, State of South Dakota, State of Georgia, State of Missouri, State of Utah, State of Kansas, State of West Virginia, State of Texas, State of Nebraska, State of Mississippi, State of Arizona, State of Indiana and State of North Dakota in 19-10011 [ # 9088464-4 ] Date of Service: 07/01/2019. [19-10011] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: LETTER filed by Appellant State of California referencing Letter filed by Appellees State of Alabama, State of Arizona, State of Arkansas, State of Florida, State of Georgia, State of Indiana, State of Kansas, State of Louisiana, State of Mississippi, State of Missouri, State of Nebraska, State of North Dakota, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, State of Tennessee, State of Texas, State of Utah and State of West Virginia [ # 9088464-2 ]. Date of Service: 07/01/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Al-Fuhaid, Frederick, Hacker, Hawkins, Henneke, McCarty, White; Attorney for Amici Curiae: Allison, Anthony, Baker, Bierig, Blalack, Carr, Chen, Delery, DiCarlo, Dotzel, Eidsmoe, Flowers, Gyamfi, Halligan, Hedrick, Hellman, Hunt, Jennings, Kitchens, Marotta, Masters, Melkonian, Olson, Palmore, Petronio, Salgado, Santos, Schlafly, Schultz, Sekulow, Shah, Solomon, Underwood, Van Kirk, Wolff, Zionts; Attorney for Intervenors: Anders, Blake, Frazelle, Goldenberg, Gorod, Hammoud, Hanner, Kreisberg, Letter, Meltzer, Miller-Ziegler, Olson, Phatak, Shapiro, Stern, Tatelman, Verrilli, Wydra; Attorney for Appellants: Battles, Berns, Boergers, DiBattista, Elias, Flentje, Ikeda, Lenz, McGuire, Nakatsuji, Palma, Rubin, Siegel, Soueid, Sprung, Totaro, Van Zile, Vogel, Willey [19-10011] (Samuel Siegel ) [Entered: 07/01/2019 09:50 PM]
July 1, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-10011] (Edward C. DuMont ) [Entered: 07/01/2019 06:22 PM]
July 1, 2019 OPPOSED MOTION to extend time to file supplemental brief of appellee until 07/23/2019 [9088464-3], to continue oral argument [9088464-4]. Date of service: 07/01/2019 [19-10011] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: LETTER filed by Appellees State of Alabama, State of Arizona, State of Arkansas, State of Florida, State of Georgia, State of Indiana, State of Kansas, State of Louisiana, State of Mississippi, State of Missouri, State of Nebraska, State of North Dakota, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, State of Tennessee, State of Texas, State of Utah and State of West Virginia referencing OA Panel Request [ # 9084688-2 ]. Date of Service: 07/01/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Al-Fuhaid, Frederick, Hacker, Hawkins, Henneke, McCarty, White; Attorney for Amici Curiae: Allison, Anthony, Baker, Bierig, Blalack, Carr, Chen, Delery, DiCarlo, Dotzel, Eidsmoe, Flowers, Gyamfi, Halligan, Hedrick, Hellman, Hunt, Jennings, Kitchens, Marotta, Masters, Melkonian, Olson, Palmore, Petronio, Salgado, Santos, Schlafly, Schultz, Sekulow, Shah, Solomon, Underwood, Van Kirk, Wolff, Zionts; Attorney for Intervenors: Anders, Blake, Frazelle, Goldenberg, Gorod, Hammoud, Hanner, Kreisberg, Letter, Meltzer, Miller-Ziegler, Olson, Phatak, Shapiro, Stern, Tatelman, Verrilli, Wydra; Attorney for Appellants: Battles, Berns, Boergers, DiBattista, Elias, Flentje, Ikeda, Lenz, McGuire, Nakatsuji, Palma, Rubin, Siegel, Soueid, Sprung, Totaro, Van Zile, Vogel, Willey [19-10011] (Kyle Douglas Hawkins ) [Entered: 07/01/2019 06:15 PM]
June 27, 2019 DOCUMENT RECEIVED - NO ACTION TAKEN. No action will be taken at this time on the motion to intervene filed by Lawrence Crawford because again the filer does not state who he wishes to intervene on behalf of and his request is out of time [19-10011] (RAJ) [Entered: 06/28/2019 03:32 PM]
June 26, 2019 The ORAL ARGUMENT panel has requested of the parties the following: supplemental letter briefs. Miscellaneous due on 07/03/2019 for Appellants Alex M. Azar, II, Secretary, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, District of Columbia, Charles P. Rettig, State of California, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Hawaii, State of Illinois, State of Kentucky, State of Massachusetts, State of Minnesota, State of New Jersey, State of New York, State of North Carolina, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Virginia, State of Washington, United States Department of Health and Human Services, United States Internal Revenue Service and United States of America, Appellees Neill Hurley, Paul LePage, John Nantz, State of Alabama, State of Arizona, State of Arkansas, State of Florida, State of Georgia, State of Indiana, State of Kansas, State of Louisiana, State of Mississippi, State of Missouri, State of Nebraska, State of North Dakota, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, State of Tennessee, State of Texas, State of Utah, State of West Virginia and State of Wisconsin and Intervenors State of Colorado, State of Iowa, State of Michigan, State of Nevada and United States House of Representatives [19-10011] (SME) [Entered: 06/26/2019 12:40 PM]
June 21, 2019 LETTER filed by Appellant State of California Letter to Court regarding division of argument time. Date of Service: 06/21/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Al-Fuhaid, Frederick, Hacker, Hawkins, Henneke, McCarty, White; Attorney for Amici Curiae: Allison, Anthony, Baker, Bierig, Blalack, Carr, Chen, Delery, DiCarlo, Dotzel, Eidsmoe, Flowers, Gyamfi, Halligan, Hedrick, Hellman, Hunt, Jennings, Kitchens, Marotta, Masters, Melkonian, Olson, Palmore, Petronio, Salgado, Santos, Schlafly, Schultz, Sekulow, Shah, Solomon, Underwood, Van Kirk, Wolff, Zionts; Attorney for Intervenors: Anders, Blake, Frazelle, Goldenberg, Gorod, Hammoud, Hanner, Kreisberg, Letter, Meltzer, Miller-Ziegler, Olson, Phatak, Shapiro, Stern, Tatelman, Verrilli, Wydra; Attorney for Appellants: Battles, Berns, Boergers, DiBattista, Elias, Flentje, Ikeda, Lenz, McGuire, Nakatsuji, Palma, Rubin, Siegel, Soueid, Sprung, Totaro, Van Zile, Vogel, Willey [19-10011] (Samuel Siegel ) [Entered: 06/21/2019 04:39 PM]
June 13, 2019 CLERK ORDER granting Motion to withdraw as counsel filed by Mr. Michael Qian [ # 9075297-2 ] [19-10011] (RAJ) [Entered: 06/13/2019 03:53 PM]
June 13, 2019 MOTION filed by Attorney Mr. Michael Qian for Amici Curiae Mr. Jonathan H. Adler, Mr. Nicholas Bagley, Mr. Abbe R. Gluck and Mr. Ilya Somin to withdraw as counsel [9075297-2]. Date of Service: 06/13/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Al-Fuhaid, Frederick, Hacker, Hawkins, Henneke, McCarty, White; Attorney for Amici Curiae: Allison, Anthony, Baker, Bierig, Blalack, Carr, Chen, Delery, DiCarlo, Dotzel, Eidsmoe, Flowers, Gyamfi, Halligan, Hedrick, Hellman, Hunt, Jennings, Kitchens, Marotta, Masters, Melkonian, Olson, Palmore, Petronio, Qian, Salgado, Santos, Schlafly, Schultz, Sekulow, Shah, Solomon, Underwood, Van Kirk, Wolff, Zionts; Attorney for Intervenors: Anders, Blake, Frazelle, Goldenberg, Gorod, Hammoud, Hanner, Kreisberg, Letter, Meltzer, Miller-Ziegler, Olson, Phatak, Shapiro, Stern, Tatelman, Verrilli, Wydra; Attorney for Appellants: Battles, Berns, Boergers, DiBattista, Elias, Flentje, Ikeda, Lenz, McGuire, Nakatsuji, Palma, Rubin, Siegel, Soueid, Sprung, Totaro, Van Zile, Vogel, Willey [19-10011] (Michael Qian ) [Entered: 06/13/2019 01:35 PM]
June 4, 2019 COURT ORDER Granting Motion for additional argument time (45 minutes per side) filed by Appellants State of Connecticut, State of Illinois, State of Oregon, State of Delaware, State of Virginia, State of California, State of Hawaii, State of North Carolina, State of Rhode Island, State of Washington, State of New York, State of Massachusetts, District of Columbia, State of Vermont, State of Kentucky, State of Minnesota and State of New Jersey [ # 9066231-2 ] [19-10011] (SME) [Entered: 06/04/2019 11:17 AM]
June 3, 2019 Paper copies of Amicus Brief filed by Amicus Curiae Foundation for Moral Law in 19-10011 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes # of Copies Provided: 7. Paper Copies of Brief due deadline satisfied. [19-10011] (CAS) [Entered: 06/04/2019 11:11 AM]
June 3, 2019 UNOPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellants District of Columbia, State of California, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Hawaii, State of Illinois, State of Kentucky, State of Massachusetts, State of Minnesota, State of New Jersey, State of New York, State of North Carolina, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Virginia and State of Washington for additional argument time [9066231-2]. Date of service: 06/03/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Al-Fuhaid, Frederick, Hacker, Hawkins, Henneke, McCarty, White; Attorney for Amici Curiae: Allison, Anthony, Baker, Bierig, Blalack, Carr, Chen, Delery, DiCarlo, Dotzel, Eidsmoe, Flowers, Gyamfi, Halligan, Hedrick, Hellman, Hunt, Jennings, Kitchens, Marotta, Masters, Melkonian, Olson, Palmore, Petronio, Qian, Salgado, Santos, Schlafly, Schultz, Sekulow, Shah, Solomon, Underwood, Van Kirk, Wolff, Zionts; Attorney for Intervenors: Anders, Blake, Frazelle, Goldenberg, Gorod, Hammoud, Hanner, Kreisberg, Letter, Meltzer, Miller-Ziegler, Olson, Phatak, Shapiro, Stern, Tatelman, Verrilli, Wydra; Attorney for Appellants: Battles, Berns, Boergers, DiBattista, Elias, Flentje, Ikeda, Lenz, McGuire, Nakatsuji, Palma, Rubin, Siegel, Soueid, Sprung, Totaro, Van Zile, Vogel, Willey [19-10011] (Samuel Siegel ) [Entered: 06/03/2019 11:44 AM]
May 31, 2019 EXTENSION RECEIVED for Amicus Curiae Foundation for Moral Law. Extension Granted to and including 06/05/2019. Paper Copies of Brief due on 06/05/2019 for Amicus Curiae Foundation for Moral Law [19-10011] (RAJ) [Entered: 05/31/2019 12:03 PM]
May 24, 2019 Paper copies of Intervenor Brief filed by Intervenor United States House of Representatives in 19-10011 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes # of Copies Provided: 7. Paper Copies of Brief due deadline satisfied. [19-10011] (SBS) [Entered: 05/28/2019 08:03 AM]
May 23, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney John Allen Eidsmoe for Amicus Curiae Foundation for Moral Law in 19-10011 [19-10011] (RAJ) [Entered: 05/23/2019 04:24 PM]
May 23, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-10011] (John Allen Eidsmoe ) [Entered: 05/23/2019 03:04 PM]
May 23, 2019 PROPOSED SUFFICIENT BRIEF filed by Amicus Curiae Foundation for Moral Law [ # 9058504-2 ] Date of service: 05/23/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Al-Fuhaid, Frederick, Hacker, Hawkins, Henneke, McCarty, White; Attorney for Amici Curiae: Allison, Anthony, Baker, Bierig, Blalack, Carr, Chen, Delery, DiCarlo, Dotzel, Eidsmoe, Flowers, Gyamfi, Halligan, Hedrick, Hellman, Hunt, Jennings, Kitchens, Marotta, Masters, Melkonian, Olson, Palmore, Petronio, Qian, Salgado, Santos, Schlafly, Schultz, Sekulow, Shah, Solomon, Underwood, Van Kirk, Wolff, Zionts; Attorney for Intervenors: Anders, Blake, Frazelle, Goldenberg, Gorod, Hammoud, Hanner, Kreisberg, Letter, Meltzer, Miller-Ziegler, Olson, Phatak, Shapiro, Stern, Tatelman, Verrilli, Wydra; Attorney for Appellants: Battles, Berns, Boergers, DiBattista, Elias, Flentje, Ikeda, Lenz, McGuire, Nakatsuji, Palma, Rubin, Siegel, Soueid, Sprung, Totaro, Van Zile, Vogel, Willey [19-10011] (John Allen Eidsmoe ) [Entered: 05/23/2019 03:00 PM]
May 23, 2019 CASE CALENDARED for oral argument on Tuesday, 07/09/2019 in New Orleans in the West Courtroom -- PM session. In accordance with our policy, lead counsel only will receive via email at a later date a copy of the court's docket and an acknowledgment form. All other counsel of record should monitor the court's website for the posting of the oral argument calendars.. [19-10011] (SME) [Entered: 05/23/2019 11:08 AM]
May 23, 2019 Paper copies of Appellant Reply Brief filed by Appellants State of Connecticut, State of Illinois, State of Oregon, State of Delaware, State of Virginia, State of California, State of Hawaii, State of North Carolina, State of Rhode Island, State of Washington, State of New York, State of Massachusetts, District of Columbia, State of Vermont, State of Kentucky, State of Minnesota and State of New Jersey in 19-10011 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes # of Copies Provided: 7. Paper Copies of Brief due deadline satisfied. [19-10011] (SBS) [Entered: 05/23/2019 10:43 AM]
May 23, 2019 Paper copies of Amicus Brief of American Center for Law and Justice [9057399-2] received as sufficient. Sufficient Paper Copies of Brief due deadline satisfied. [19-10011] (SBS) [Entered: 05/23/2019 10:38 AM]
May 23, 2019 FILING LETTER of State of Colorado, State of Iowa, State of Michigan and State of Nevada dated 05/23/2019 adopting reply brief of Appellants State of California, et al. [19-10011] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: FILING LETTER of State of Colorado, State of Iowa, State of Michigan and State of Nevada adopting brief of Appellant State of California Date of Service: 05/23/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Al-Fuhaid, Frederick, Hacker, Hawkins, Henneke, McCarty, White; Attorney for Amici Curiae: Allison, Anthony, Baker, Bierig, Blalack, Carr, Chen, Delery, DiCarlo, Dotzel, Eidsmoe, Flowers, Gyamfi, Halligan, Hedrick, Hellman, Hunt, Jennings, Kitchens, Marotta, Masters, Melkonian, Olson, Palmore, Petronio, Qian, Salgado, Santos, Schlafly, Schultz, Sekulow, Shah, Solomon, Underwood, Van Kirk, Wolff, Zionts; Attorney for Intervenors: Anders, Blake, Frazelle, Goldenberg, Gorod, Hammoud, Hanner, Kreisberg, Letter, Meltzer, Miller-Ziegler, Olson, Phatak, Shapiro, Stern, Tatelman, Verrilli, Wydra; Attorney for Appellants: Battles, Berns, Boergers, DiBattista, Elias, Flentje, Ikeda, Lenz, McGuire, Nakatsuji, Palma, Rubin, Siegel, Soueid, Sprung, Totaro, Van Zile, Vogel, Willey [19-10011] (Eric Olson ) [Entered: 05/23/2019 10:24 AM]
May 22, 2019 INTERVENOR'S REPLY BRIEF FILED # of Copies Provided: 0 Paper Copies of Brief due on 05/28/2019 for Intervenor United States House of Representatives. [19-10011] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: INTERVENOR'S BRIEF FILED by Intervenor United States House of Representatives. Date of service: 05/22/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Al-Fuhaid, Frederick, Hacker, Hawkins, Henneke, McCarty, White; Attorney for Amici Curiae: Allison, Anthony, Baker, Bierig, Blalack, Carr, Chen, Delery, DiCarlo, Dotzel, Eidsmoe, Flowers, Gyamfi, Halligan, Hedrick, Hellman, Hunt, Jennings, Kitchens, Marotta, Masters, Melkonian, Olson, Palmore, Petronio, Qian, Salgado, Santos, Schlafly, Schultz, Sekulow, Shah, Solomon, Underwood, Van Kirk, Wolff, Zionts; Attorney for Intervenors: Anders, Blake, Frazelle, Goldenberg, Gorod, Hammoud, Hanner, Kreisberg, Letter, Meltzer, Miller-Ziegler, Olson, Phatak, Shapiro, Stern, Tatelman, Verrilli, Wydra; Attorney for Appellants: Battles, Berns, Boergers, DiBattista, Elias, Flentje, Ikeda, Lenz, McGuire, Nakatsuji, Palma, Rubin, Siegel, Soueid, Sprung, Totaro, Van Zile, Vogel, Willey [19-10011] (Donald B. Verrilli Jr.) [Entered: 05/22/2019 05:54 PM]
May 22, 2019 APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF FILED # of Copies Provided: 0 Reply Brief deadline satisfied. Paper Copies of Brief due on 05/28/2019 for Appellants District of Columbia, State of California, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Hawaii, State of Illinois, State of Kentucky, State of Massachusetts, State of Minnesota, State of New York, State of North Carolina, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Virginia and State of Washington. [19-10011] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF FILED by District of Columbia, State of California, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Hawaii, State of Illinois, State of Kentucky, State of Massachusetts, State of Minnesota, State of New Jersey, State of New York, State of North Carolina, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Virginia and State of Washington. Date of service: 05/22/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Al-Fuhaid, Frederick, Hacker, Hawkins, Henneke, McCarty, White; Attorney for Amici Curiae: Allison, Anthony, Baker, Bierig, Blalack, Carr, Chen, Delery, DiCarlo, Dotzel, Eidsmoe, Flowers, Gyamfi, Halligan, Hedrick, Hellman, Hunt, Jennings, Kitchens, Marotta, Masters, Melkonian, Olson, Palmore, Petronio, Qian, Salgado, Santos, Schlafly, Schultz, Sekulow, Shah, Solomon, Underwood, Van Kirk, Wolff, Zionts; Attorney for Intervenors: Anders, Blake, Frazelle, Goldenberg, Gorod, Hammoud, Hanner, Kreisberg, Letter, Meltzer, Miller-Ziegler, Olson, Phatak, Shapiro, Stern, Tatelman, Verrilli, Wydra; Attorney for Appellants: Battles, Berns, Boergers, DiBattista, Elias, Flentje, Ikeda, Lenz, McGuire, Nakatsuji, Palma, Rubin, Siegel, Soueid, Sprung, Totaro, Van Zile, Vogel, Willey [19-10011] (Samuel Siegel ) [Entered: 05/22/2019 02:04 PM]
May 22, 2019 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF FILED by Foundation for Moral Law. Consent is Not Necessary as a Motion has been Granted. Additionally the Brief requires INSUFFICIENT FOR: CAPTION DOES NOT MATCH TITLE OF CASE; COVER OF BRIEF MUST INDICATE WHETHER THE BRIEF SUPPORTS AFFIRMANCE OR REVERSAL; CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE IS OUT OF ORDER; APPEARANCE FORM IS NEEDED FOR COUNSEL SIGNING THE BRIEF. Instructions to Attorney: PLEASE READ THE ATTACHED NOTICE FOR INSTRUCTIONS ON HOW TO REMEDY THE DEFAULT. # of Copies Provided: 0 Sufficient Brief due on 06/05/2019 for Amicus Curiae Foundation for Moral Law. [19-10011] (RSM) [Entered: 05/22/2019 10:03 AM]
May 22, 2019 COURT ORDER granting opposed motion of Foundation for Moral Law to file an Amicus Curiae brief in support of appellees [ # 9045430-2 ] filed by Foundation for Moral Law in 19-10011 [19-10011] (RSM) [Entered: 05/22/2019 09:17 AM]
May 20, 2019 Paper copies of Amicus Brief filed by American Center for Law and Justice in 19-10011 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes. Sufficient: No, as the brief is missing durable green covers on both the front and back of the document. # of Copies Provided: 7. Paper Copies of Brief due deadline satisfied.. Sufficient Paper Copies of Brief due on 05/28/2019 for Amicus Curiae American Center for Law and Justice [19-10011] (SBS) [Entered: 05/21/2019 09:38 AM]
May 13, 2019 Paper copies of Amicus Brief filed by Conservative Legal Defense and Education Fund, Gun Owners Foundation, Citizens United, Citizens United Foundation, Gun Owners of America, Incorporated, Restoring Liberty Action Committee, Eberle Communications Group, Incorporated, 60 Plus Association, 60 Plus Foundation, Fitzgerald Griffin Foundation, Downsize DC Foundation, Downsize DC.org and American Business Defense Foundation in 19-10011 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes # of Copies Provided: 7. Paper Copies of Brief due deadline satisfied. [19-10011] (SBS) [Entered: 05/13/2019 01:32 PM]
May 10, 2019 Paper copies of Amicus Brief filed by Association of American Physicians & Surgeons and Citizens' Council for Health Freedom in 19-10011 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes # of Copies Provided: 7. Paper Copies of Brief due deadline satisfied. [19-10011] (SBS) [Entered: 05/10/2019 11:47 AM]
May 10, 2019 PROPOSED SUFFICIENT BRIEF filed by Amicus Curiae American Center for Law and Justice [ # 9047840-2 ] Date of service: 05/10/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Al-Fuhaid, Frederick, Hacker, Hawkins, Henneke, McCarty, White; Attorney for Amici Curiae: Allison, Anthony, Baker, Bierig, Blalack, Carr, Chen, Delery, DiCarlo, Dotzel, Flowers, Gyamfi, Halligan, Hedrick, Hellman, Hunt, Jennings, Kitchens, Marotta, Masters, Melkonian, Olson, Palmore, Petronio, Qian, Salgado, Santos, Schlafly, Schultz, Sekulow, Shah, Solomon, Underwood, Van Kirk, Wolff, Zionts; Attorney for Intervenors: Anders, Blake, Frazelle, Goldenberg, Gorod, Hammoud, Hanner, Kreisberg, Letter, Meltzer, Miller-Ziegler, Olson, Phatak, Shapiro, Stern, Tatelman, Verrilli, Wydra; Attorney for Appellants: Battles, Berns, Boergers, DiBattista, Elias, Flentje, Ikeda, Lenz, McGuire, Nakatsuji, Palma, Rubin, Siegel, Soueid, Sprung, Totaro, Van Zile, Vogel, Willey; Attorney for Not Party: Eidsmoe [19-10011] (Jay A. Sekulow ) [Entered: 05/10/2019 10:32 AM]
May 9, 2019 CASE TENTATIVELY calendared for oral argument for the week of 07/08/2019. [19-10011] (GAM) [Entered: 05/09/2019 02:19 PM]
May 9, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Andrew Layton Schlafly for Amicus Curiae Association of American Physicians & Surgeons and Citizens' Council for Health Freedom in 19-10011 [19-10011] (CMB) [Entered: 05/09/2019 02:12 PM]
May 9, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney William Jeffrey Olson for Amicus Curiae Restoring Liberty Action Committee in 19-10011, Attorney William Jeffrey Olson for Amicus Curiae American Business Defense Foundation in 19-10011, Attorney William Jeffrey Olson for Amicus Curiae Downsize DC.org in 19-10011, Attorney William Jeffrey Olson for Amicus Curiae Downsize DC Foundation in 19-10011, Attorney William Jeffrey Olson for Amicus Curiae Fitzgerald Griffin Foundation in 19-10011, Attorney William Jeffrey Olson for Amicus Curiae 60 Plus Foundation in 19-10011, Attorney William Jeffrey Olson for Amicus Curiae 60 Plus Association in 19-10011, Attorney William Jeffrey Olson for Amicus Curiae Eberle Communications Group, Incorporated in 19-10011, Attorney William Jeffrey Olson for Amicus Curiae Conservative Legal Defense and Education Fund in 19-10011, Attorney William Jeffrey Olson for Amicus Curiae Gun Owners of America, Incorporated in 19-10011, Attorney William Jeffrey Olson for Amicus Curiae Gun Owners Foundation in 19-10011, Attorney William Jeffrey Olson for Amicus Curiae Citizens United Foundation in 19-10011, Attorney William Jeffrey Olson for Amicus Curiae Citizens United in 19-10011 [19-10011] (CMB) [Entered: 05/09/2019 12:28 PM]
May 9, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Jay A. Sekulow for Amicus Curiae American Center for Law and Justice in 19-10011 [19-10011] (CMB) [Entered: 05/09/2019 12:06 PM]
May 8, 2019 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF FILED by Restoring Liberty Action Committee, American Business Defense Foundation, Downsize DC.org, Downsize DC Foundation, Fitzgerald Griffin Foundation, 60 Plus Foundation, 60 Plus Association, Eberle Communications Group, Incorporated, Conservative Legal Defense and Education Fund, Gun Owners of America, Incorporated, Gun Owners Foundation, Citizens United Foundation and Citizens United. The Consent is Included in the Brief. # of Copies Provided: 0 Paper Copies of Brief due on 05/14/2019 for Amici Curiae Citizens United, Citizens United Foundation, Gun Owners Foundation, Gun Owners of America, Incorporated, Conservative Legal Defense and Education Fund, Eberle Communications Group, Incorporated, 60 Plus Association, 60 Plus Foundation, Fitzgerald Griffin Foundation, Downsize DC Foundation, Downsize DC.org, American Business Defense Foundation and Restoring Liberty Action Committee. [19-10011] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF FILED by Citizens United, Citizens United Fndn, Gun Owners Fndn, Gun Owners of America, Conservative Legal Def and Edu Fund, Eberle Communications Group, 60 Plus Assoc, 60 Plus Fndn, Fitzgerald Griffin Fndn, Downsize DC Fndn, DownsizeDC.org, ABDF, and RLAC. Date of service: 05/08/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Al-Fuhaid, Frederick, Hacker, Hawkins, Henneke, McCarty, White; Attorney for Amici Curiae: Allison, Anthony, Baker, Bierig, Blalack, Carr, Chen, Delery, DiCarlo, Dotzel, Flowers, Gyamfi, Halligan, Hedrick, Hellman, Hunt, Jennings, Kitchens, Marotta, Masters, Melkonian, Palmore, Petronio, Qian, Salgado, Santos, Schlafly, Schultz, Shah, Solomon, Underwood, Van Kirk, Wolff, Zionts; Attorney for Intervenors: Anders, Blake, Frazelle, Goldenberg, Gorod, Hammoud, Hanner, Kreisberg, Letter, Meltzer, Miller-Ziegler, Olson, Phatak, Shapiro, Stern, Tatelman, Verrilli, Wydra; Attorney for Appellants: Battles, Berns, Boergers, DiBattista, Elias, Flentje, Ikeda, Lenz, McGuire, Nakatsuji, Palma, Rubin, Siegel, Soueid, Sprung, Totaro, Van Zile, Vogel, Willey [19-10011] (William Jeffrey Olson ) [Entered: 05/08/2019 06:52 PM]
May 8, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-10011] (William Jeffrey Olson ) [Entered: 05/08/2019 05:42 PM]
May 8, 2019 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF FILED by American Center for Law and Justice. Date of service: 05/08/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Al-Fuhaid, Frederick, Hacker, Hawkins, Henneke, McCarty, White; Attorney for Amici Curiae: Allison, Anthony, Baker, Bierig, Blalack, Carr, Chen, Delery, DiCarlo, Dotzel, Flowers, Gyamfi, Halligan, Hedrick, Hellman, Hunt, Jennings, Kitchens, Marotta, Masters, Melkonian, Palmore, Petronio, Qian, Salgado, Santos, Schultz, Shah, Solomon, Underwood, Van Kirk, Wolff, Zionts; Attorney for Intervenors: Anders, Blake, Frazelle, Goldenberg, Gorod, Hammoud, Hanner, Kreisberg, Letter, Meltzer, Miller-Ziegler, Olson, Phatak, Shapiro, Stern, Tatelman, Verrilli, Wydra; Attorney for Appellants: Battles, Berns, Boergers, DiBattista, Elias, Flentje, Ikeda, Lenz, McGuire, Nakatsuji, Palma, Rubin, Siegel, Soueid, Sprung, Totaro, Van Zile, Vogel, Willey [19-10011] (Jay A. Sekulow ) [Entered: 05/08/2019 11:07 AM]
May 8, 2019 UNOPPOSED MOTION by American Center for Law and Justice to file amicus brief [9047828-2] Date of service: 05/08/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Al-Fuhaid, Frederick, Hacker, Hawkins, Henneke, McCarty, White; Attorney for Amici Curiae: Allison, Anthony, Baker, Bierig, Blalack, Carr, Chen, Delery, DiCarlo, Dotzel, Flowers, Gyamfi, Halligan, Hedrick, Hellman, Hunt, Jennings, Kitchens, Marotta, Masters, Melkonian, Palmore, Petronio, Qian, Salgado, Santos, Schultz, Shah, Solomon, Underwood, Van Kirk, Wolff, Zionts; Attorney for Intervenors: Anders, Blake, Frazelle, Goldenberg, Gorod, Hammoud, Hanner, Kreisberg, Letter, Meltzer, Miller-Ziegler, Olson, Phatak, Shapiro, Stern, Tatelman, Verrilli, Wydra; Attorney for Appellants: Battles, Berns, Boergers, DiBattista, Elias, Flentje, Ikeda, Lenz, McGuire, Nakatsuji, Palma, Rubin, Siegel, Soueid, Sprung, Totaro, Van Zile, Vogel, Willey [19-10011] (Jay A. Sekulow ) [Entered: 05/08/2019 11:03 AM]
May 8, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-10011] (Jay A. Sekulow ) [Entered: 05/08/2019 10:53 AM]
May 8, 2019 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF FILED by American Physicians & Surgeons and Citizens' Council for Health Freedom. The Consent is Included in the Brief. # of Copies Provided: 0 Paper Copies of Brief due on 05/13/2019 for Amicus Curiae American Physicians & Surgeons and Citizens' Council for Health Freedom. [19-10011] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF FILED by Association of American Physicians & Surgeons and Citizens' Council for Health Freedom. Date of service: 05/08/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Al-Fuhaid, Frederick, Hacker, Hawkins, Henneke, McCarty, White; Attorney for Amici Curiae: Allison, Anthony, Baker, Bierig, Blalack, Carr, Chen, Delery, DiCarlo, Dotzel, Flowers, Gyamfi, Halligan, Hedrick, Hellman, Hunt, Jennings, Kitchens, Marotta, Masters, Melkonian, Palmore, Petronio, Qian, Salgado, Santos, Schultz, Shah, Solomon, Underwood, Van Kirk, Wolff, Zionts; Attorney for Intervenors: Anders, Blake, Frazelle, Goldenberg, Gorod, Hammoud, Hanner, Kreisberg, Letter, Meltzer, Miller-Ziegler, Olson, Phatak, Shapiro, Stern, Tatelman, Verrilli, Wydra; Attorney for Appellants: Battles, Berns, Boergers, DiBattista, Elias, Flentje, Ikeda, Lenz, McGuire, Nakatsuji, Palma, Rubin, Siegel, Soueid, Sprung, Totaro, Van Zile, Vogel, Willey [19-10011] (Andrew Layton Schlafly ) [Entered: 05/08/2019 09:57 AM]
May 6, 2019 DOCUMENT RECEIVED - NO ACTION TAKEN. No action will be taken at this time on the amicus brief because the brief should have been uploaded with the motion for leave to file an amicus brief, the clerk's office has manually uploaded the brief to the motion [19-10011] (CMB) [Entered: 05/08/2019 10:02 AM]
May 6, 2019 Paper copies of Appellee Brief filed by Appellees Mr. Neill Hurley and Mr. John Nantz in 19-10011 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes # of Copies Provided: 7. Paper Copies of Brief due deadline satisfied. [19-10011] (SBS) [Entered: 05/06/2019 03:38 PM]
May 6, 2019 Paper copies of Appellee Brief filed by Appellees State of Tennessee, State of South Carolina, State of Alabama, State of Louisiana, State of Florida, State of Arkansas, State of South Dakota, State of Georgia, State of Missouri, State of Utah, State of Kansas, State of West Virginia, State of Texas, State of Nebraska, State of Mississippi, State of Arizona, State of Indiana and State of North Dakota in 19-10011 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes # of Copies Provided: 7. Paper Copies of Brief due deadline satisfied. [19-10011] (SBS) [Entered: 05/06/2019 03:36 PM]
May 6, 2019 Paper copies of Appellant Brief filed by Appellants USA, HHS, Mr. Alex M. Azar, II, Secretary, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, United States Internal Revenue Service and Mr. Charles P. Rettig in 19-10011 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes # of Copies Provided: 7. Paper Copies of Brief due deadline staisfied. [19-10011] (SBS) [Entered: 05/06/2019 03:34 PM]
May 6, 2019 UNOPPOSED MOTION by Foundation for Moral Law to file amicus brief [9045430-2] Date of service: 05/06/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Al-Fuhaid, Frederick, Hacker, Hawkins, Henneke, McCarty, White; Attorney for Amici Curiae: Allison, Anthony, Baker, Bierig, Blalack, Carr, Chen, Delery, DiCarlo, Dotzel, Flowers, Gyamfi, Halligan, Hedrick, Hellman, Hunt, Jennings, Kitchens, Marotta, Masters, Melkonian, Palmore, Petronio, Qian, Salgado, Santos, Schultz, Shah, Solomon, Underwood, Van Kirk, Wolff, Zionts; Attorney for Intervenors: Anders, Blake, Frazelle, Goldenberg, Gorod, Hammoud, Hanner, Kreisberg, Letter, Meltzer, Miller-Ziegler, Olson, Phatak, Shapiro, Stern, Tatelman, Verrilli, Wydra; Attorney for Appellants: Battles, Berns, Boergers, DiBattista, Elias, Flentje, Ikeda, Lenz, McGuire, Nakatsuji, Palma, Rubin, Siegel, Soueid, Sprung, Totaro, Van Zile, Vogel, Willey [19-10011] (John Allen Eidsmoe ) [Entered: 05/06/2019 10:51 AM]
May 6, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Marie Soueid for party(s) Appellant State of New Jersey, in case 19-10011 [19-10011] (CMB) [Entered: 05/06/2019 09:03 AM]
May 2, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-10011] (Marie Soueid ) [Entered: 05/02/2019 02:46 PM]
May 2, 2019 ATTORNEY NOT PARTICIPATING. Darren Lee McCarty is designated as inactive in this case. Reason:does not represent appellees Neill Hurley and John Nantz. [19-10011] (CMB) [Entered: 05/02/2019 11:44 AM]
May 1, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) August E. Flentje for party(s) Appellant USA Appellant HHS Appellant Charles P. Rettig Appellant Alex M. Azar, II, Secretary, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services Appellant United States Internal Revenue Service, in case 19-10011 [19-10011] (CMB) [Entered: 05/02/2019 08:53 AM]
May 1, 2019 APPELLEE'S BRIEF FILED by Mr. Neill Hurley and Mr. John Nantz. Date of service: 05/01/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Al-Fuhaid, Frederick, Hacker, Hawkins, Henneke, McCarty, White; Attorney for Amici Curiae: Allison, Anthony, Baker, Bierig, Blalack, Carr, Chen, Delery, DiCarlo, Dotzel, Flowers, Gyamfi, Halligan, Hedrick, Hellman, Hunt, Jennings, Kitchens, Marotta, Masters, Melkonian, Palmore, Petronio, Qian, Salgado, Santos, Schultz, Shah, Solomon, Underwood, Van Kirk, Wolff, Zionts; Attorney for Intervenors: Anders, Blake, Frazelle, Goldenberg, Gorod, Hammoud, Hanner, Kreisberg, Letter, Meltzer, Miller-Ziegler, Olson, Phatak, Shapiro, Stern, Tatelman, Verrilli, Wydra; Attorney for Appellants: Battles, Berns, Boergers, DiBattista, Elias, Flentje, Ikeda, Lenz, McGuire, Nakatsuji, Palma, Rubin, Siegel, Sprung, Totaro, Van Zile, Vogel, Willey [19-10011] (Robert E. Henneke ) [Entered: 05/01/2019 05:45 PM]
May 1, 2019 APPELLANT'S BRIEF FILED by USA. Date of service: 05/01/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Al-Fuhaid, Frederick, Hacker, Hawkins, Henneke, McCarty, White; Attorney for Amici Curiae: Allison, Anthony, Baker, Bierig, Blalack, Carr, Chen, Delery, DiCarlo, Dotzel, Flowers, Gyamfi, Halligan, Hedrick, Hellman, Hunt, Jennings, Kitchens, Marotta, Masters, Melkonian, Palmore, Petronio, Qian, Salgado, Santos, Schultz, Shah, Solomon, Underwood, Van Kirk, Wolff, Zionts; Attorney for Intervenors: Anders, Blake, Frazelle, Goldenberg, Gorod, Hammoud, Hanner, Kreisberg, Letter, Meltzer, Miller-Ziegler, Olson, Phatak, Shapiro, Stern, Tatelman, Verrilli, Wydra; Attorney for Appellants: Battles, Berns, Boergers, DiBattista, Elias, Flentje, Ikeda, Lenz, McGuire, Nakatsuji, Palma, Rubin, Siegel, Sprung, Totaro, Van Zile, Vogel, Willey [19-10011] (August E. Flentje ) [Entered: 05/01/2019 03:57 PM]
May 1, 2019 APPELLEE'S BRIEF FILED by State of Texas, State of Alabama, State of Arizona, State of Arkansas, State of Florida, State of Georgia, State of Indiana, State of Kansas, State of Louisiana, State of Mississippi, State of Missouri, State of Nebraska, State of North Dakota, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, State of Tennessee, State of Utah and State of West Virginia. Date of service: 05/01/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Al-Fuhaid, Frederick, Hacker, Hawkins, Henneke, McCarty, White; Attorney for Amici Curiae: Allison, Anthony, Baker, Bierig, Blalack, Carr, Chen, Delery, DiCarlo, Dotzel, Flowers, Gyamfi, Halligan, Hedrick, Hellman, Hunt, Jennings, Kitchens, Marotta, Masters, Melkonian, Palmore, Petronio, Qian, Salgado, Santos, Schultz, Shah, Solomon, Underwood, Van Kirk, Wolff, Zionts; Attorney for Intervenors: Anders, Blake, Frazelle, Goldenberg, Gorod, Hammoud, Hanner, Kreisberg, Letter, Meltzer, Miller-Ziegler, Olson, Phatak, Shapiro, Stern, Tatelman, Verrilli, Wydra; Attorney for Appellants: Battles, Berns, Boergers, DiBattista, Elias, Flentje, Ikeda, Lenz, McGuire, Nakatsuji, Palma, Rubin, Siegel, Sprung, Totaro, Van Zile, Vogel, Willey [19-10011] (Kyle Douglas Hawkins ) [Entered: 05/01/2019 03:10 PM]
May 1, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-10011] (August E. Flentje ) [Entered: 05/01/2019 09:48 AM]
April 30, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Munera Al-Fuhaid for party(s) Appellee Neill Hurley Appellee John Nantz, in case 19-10011 [19-10011] (CMB) [Entered: 04/30/2019 03:25 PM]
April 30, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-10011] (Andrew Layton Schlafly ) [Entered: 04/30/2019 11:34 AM]
April 30, 2019 CLERK ORDER granting Motion to withdraw as counsel filed by Ms. Kimberly Cahall [ # 9040024-2 ] [19-10011] (RAJ) [Entered: 04/30/2019 10:19 AM]
April 30, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-10011] (Munera Al-Fuhaid ) [Entered: 04/30/2019 09:53 AM]
April 29, 2019 MOTION filed by Attorney Ms. Kimberly Cahall for Appellant State of New Jersey to withdraw as counsel [9040024-2]. Date of Service: 04/29/2019 via email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Allison, Anthony, Baker, Bierig, Blalack, Carr, Chen, Delery, DiCarlo, Dotzel, Flowers, Gyamfi, Halligan, Hedrick, Hellman, Hunt, Jennings, Kitchens, Marotta, Masters, Melkonian, Palmore, Petronio, Qian, Salgado, Santos, Schultz, Shah, Solomon, Underwood, Van Kirk, Wolff, Zionts; Attorney for Intervenors: Anders, Blake, Frazelle, Goldenberg, Gorod, Hammoud, Hanner, Kreisberg, Letter, Meltzer, Miller-Ziegler, Olson, Phatak, Shapiro, Stern, Tatelman, Verrilli, Wydra; Attorney for Appellants: Battles, Berns, Boergers, Cahall, DiBattista, Elias, Ikeda, Lenz, McGuire, Nakatsuji, Palma, Rubin, Siegel, Sprung, Totaro, Van Zile, Vogel, Willey; Attorney for Appellees: Frederick, Hacker, Hawkins, Henneke, McCarty, White [19-10011] (Kimberly Cahall ) [Entered: 04/29/2019 04:48 PM]
April 18, 2019 DOCUMENT RECEIVED - NO ACTION TAKEN. No action will be taken at this time on the motion to intervene filed by Lawrence Crawford because we cannot determine which side filer wishes to intervene on behalf and the request is out of time [19-10011] (PAC) [Entered: 05/01/2019 04:06 PM]
April 15, 2019 Paper copies of Record Excerpts filed by Appellants USA, HHS, Mr. Alex M. Azar, II, Secretary, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, United States Internal Revenue Service and Mr. Charles P. Rettig in 19-10011 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes # of Copies Provided: 4. Paper Copies of Record Excerpts due deadline satisfied. [19-10011] (SBS) [Entered: 04/15/2019 03:36 PM]
April 12, 2019 FILING LETTER of State of Colorado, State of Iowa, State of Michigan and State of Nevada dated 04/12/2019 adopting record excerpts of Appellants Mr. Alex M. Azar, II, Secretary, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, HHS, USA and Mr. Charles P. Rettig. [19-10011] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: FILING LETTER of State of Colorado, State of Iowa, State of Michigan and State of Nevada adopting brief of Appellants Mr. Alex M. Azar, II, Secretary, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, HHS and Mr. Charles P. Rettig Date of Service: 04/12/2019 via email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Allison, Anthony, Baker, Bierig, Blalack, Carr, Chen, Delery, DiCarlo, Dotzel, Flowers, Gyamfi, Halligan, Hedrick, Hellman, Hunt, Jennings, Kitchens, Marotta, Masters, Melkonian, Palmore, Petronio, Qian, Salgado, Santos, Schultz, Shah, Solomon, Underwood, Van Kirk, Wolff, Zionts; Attorney for Intervenors: Anders, Blake, Frazelle, Goldenberg, Gorod, Hammoud, Hanner, Kreisberg, Letter, Meltzer, Miller-Ziegler, Olson, Phatak, Shapiro, Stern, Tatelman, Verrilli, Wydra; Attorney for Appellants: Battles, Berns, Boergers, Cahall, DiBattista, Elias, Ikeda, Lenz, McGuire, Nakatsuji, Palma, Rubin, Siegel, Sprung, Totaro, Van Zile, Vogel, Willey; Attorney for Appellees: Frederick, Hacker, Hawkins, Henneke, McCarty, White [19-10011] (Eric Olson ) [Entered: 04/12/2019 02:15 PM]
April 12, 2019 CLERK ORDER granting Motion to withdraw as counsel filed by Mr. Brett Shumate [ # 9027309-2 ] [19-10011] (RAJ) [Entered: 04/12/2019 09:55 AM]
April 11, 2019 Paper copies of Amicus Brief filed by American Medical Association, American Medical Women's Association, American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists, American Psychiatric Association, GLMA Health Professionals Advancing LGBT Equality, American Academy of Allergy, Asthma and Immunology, American Academy of Family Physicians, American Academy of Pediatrics, American Association of Child and Adolescent Psychiatry, American Association of Public Health Physicians, American College of Correctional Physicians, American College of Physicians, American College of Radiation Oncology, American Geriatrics Society, American Osteopathic Association, American Society of Hematology, American Society for Metabolic and Bariatric Surgery and Renal Physicians Association in 19-10011 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes # of Copies Provided: 7. Paper Copies of Brief due deadline satisfied. [19-10011] (SBS) [Entered: 04/12/2019 08:00 AM]
April 11, 2019 MOTION filed by Attorney Mr. Brett Shumate for Appellants Mr. Alex M. Azar, II, Secretary, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, Mr. Charles P. Rettig, HHS, United States Internal Revenue Service and USA to withdraw as counsel [9027309-2]. Date of Service: 04/11/2019 via email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Allison, Anthony, Baker, Bierig, Blalack, Carr, Chen, Delery, DiCarlo, Dotzel, Flowers, Gyamfi, Halligan, Hedrick, Hellman, Hunt, Jennings, Kitchens, Marotta, Masters, Melkonian, Palmore, Petronio, Qian, Salgado, Santos, Schultz, Shah, Solomon, Underwood, Van Kirk, Wolff, Zionts; Attorney for Intervenors: Anders, Blake, Frazelle, Goldenberg, Gorod, Hammoud, Hanner, Kreisberg, Letter, Meltzer, Miller-Ziegler, Olson, Phatak, Shapiro, Stern, Tatelman, Verrilli, Wydra; Attorney for Appellants: Battles, Berns, Boergers, Cahall, DiBattista, Elias, Ikeda, Lenz, McGuire, Nakatsuji, Palma, Rubin, Shumate, Siegel, Sprung, Totaro, Van Zile, Vogel, Willey; Attorney for Appellees: Frederick, Hacker, Hawkins, Henneke, McCarty, White [19-10011] (Brett Shumate ) [Entered: 04/11/2019 11:18 AM]
April 10, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Matthew S. Hellman for Amicus Curiae Bipartisan Economic Scholars in 19-10011 [19-10011] (CMB) [Entered: 04/10/2019 12:49 PM]
April 10, 2019 CLERK ORDER granting Motion to file brief in present form filed by Amici Curiae American Medical Association, American Medical Women's Association, American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists, American Psychiatric Association, GLMA Health Professionals Advancing LGBT Equality, American Academy of Allergy, Asthma and Immunology, American Academy of Family Physicians, American Academy of Pediatrics, American Association of Child and Adolescent Psychiatry, American Association of Public Health Physicians, American College of Correctional Physicians, American College of Physicians, American College of Radiation Oncology, American Geriatrics Society, American Osteopathic Association, American Society of Hematology, American Society for Metabolic and Bariatric Surgery and Renal Physicians Association [ # 9020307-2 ] Sufficient Brief deadline satisfied. Paper Copies of Brief due on 04/15/2019 for Amici Curiae American Academy of Allergy, American Academy of Family Physicians, American Academy of Pediatrics, American Association of Child and Adolescent Psychiatry, American Association of Public Health Physicians, American College of Correctional Physicians, American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists, American College of Physicians, American College of Radiation Oncology, American Geriatrics Society, American Medical Association, American Medical Women's Association, American Osteopathic Association, American Psychiatric Association, American Society for Metabolic and Bariatric Surgery, American Society of Hematology, Asthma and Immunology, GLMA Health Professionals Advancing LGBT Equality and Renal Physicians Association. [19-10011] (RAJ) [Entered: 04/10/2019 10:37 AM]
April 10, 2019 COURT ORDER expediting the appeal [9026240-2]; granting Motion for oral argument filed by Appellants USA, HHS, Mr. Alex M. Azar, II, Secretary, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, United States Internal Revenue Service and Mr. Charles P. Rettig [ # 9024168-2 ] [19-10011] (RAJ) [Entered: 04/10/2019 09:41 AM]
April 9, 2019 Paper copies of Amicus Brief filed by National Women's Law Center, American Medical Women's Association, National Partnership for Women and Families and Black Women's Health Imperative in 19-10011 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes # of Copies Provided: 7. Paper Copies of Brief due deadline satisfied. [19-10011] (SBS) [Entered: 04/09/2019 01:36 PM]
April 9, 2019 Paper copies of Amicus Brief filed by SEIU, National Health Law Program, Families USA, Community Catalyst, Center on Budget and Policy Priorities in 19-10011 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes # of Copies Provided: 7. Paper Copies of Brief due deadline satisfied. [19-10011] (SBS) [Entered: 04/09/2019 01:32 PM]
April 9, 2019 COURT ORDER granting Motion for partial dismissal of appeal filed by Appellee State of Wisconsin [ # 9010734-2 ] Involvement terminated for Appellee State of Wisconsin in 19-10011. [19-10011] (RAJ) [Entered: 04/09/2019 11:46 AM]
April 9, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Wade Carr for party(s) Amicus Curiae Eleven Other Leading National Disability Rights Organizations Amicus Curiae American Association of People with Disabilities Amicus Curiae American Civil Liberties Union Amicus Curiae Judge David L Bazelon Center for Mental Health Law Amicus Curiae Disability Rights Education and Defense Fund, in case 19-10011 [19-10011] (CMB) [Entered: 04/09/2019 09:21 AM]
April 8, 2019 Paper copies of Amicus Brief filed by American Heart Association, American Cancer Society, Epilepsy Foundation, American Diabetes Association, American Lung Association, National Hemophilia Foundation, American Cancer Society Cancer Action Network, Crohn's and Colitis Foundation, Cystic Fibrosis Foundation, Global Healthy Living Foundation, Hemophilia Federation of America, Leukemia and Lymphoma Society, March of Dimes, National Alliance on Mental Illness, National Coalition for Cancer Survivorship, National Multiple Sclerosis Society and Kennedy Forum in 19-10011 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes # of Copies Provided: 7. Paper Copies of Brief due deadline satisfied. [19-10011] (SBS) [Entered: 04/09/2019 01:30 PM]
April 8, 2019 Paper copies of Amicus Brief filed by Mr. Jonathan H. Adler, Mr. Nicholas Bagley, Mr. Abbe R. Gluck, Mr. Ilya Somin in 19-10011 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes # of Copies Provided: 7. Paper Copies of Brief due deadline satisfied. [19-10011] (SBS) [Entered: 04/09/2019 01:26 PM]
April 8, 2019 Paper copies of Amicus Brief filed by Small Business Majority Foundation and Amicus Curiae Small Business Majority Foundation in 19-10011 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes # of Copies Provided: 7. Paper Copies of Brief due deadline satisfied. [19-10011] (SBS) [Entered: 04/09/2019 01:24 PM]
April 8, 2019 DOCUMENT RECEIVED - NO ACTION TAKEN. No action will be taken at this time on the Paper copies of First Focus and The Children's Partnership received from Amici Curiae Children's Partnership and First Focus because Amicus Brief was Striken. [19-10011] (RAJ) [Entered: 04/08/2019 02:25 PM]
April 8, 2019 UNOPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellants Mr. Alex M. Azar, II, Secretary, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, HHS, Mr. Charles P. Rettig, United States Internal Revenue Service and USA for expedited oral argument [9024168-2]. Date of service: 04/08/2019 via email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Allison, Anthony, Baker, Bierig, Blalack, Chen, Delery, DiCarlo, Dotzel, Flowers, Gyamfi, Halligan, Hedrick, Hellman, Hunt, Jennings, Kitchens, Marotta, Masters, Melkonian, Palmore, Petronio, Qian, Salgado, Santos, Schultz, Shah, Solomon, Underwood, Van Kirk, Wolff, Zionts; Attorney for Intervenors: Anders, Blake, Frazelle, Goldenberg, Gorod, Hammoud, Hanner, Kreisberg, Letter, Meltzer, Miller-Ziegler, Olson, Phatak, Shapiro, Stern, Tatelman, Verrilli, Wydra; Attorney for Appellants: Battles, Berns, Boergers, Cahall, DiBattista, Elias, Ikeda, Lenz, McGuire, Nakatsuji, Palma, Rubin, Shumate, Siegel, Sprung, Totaro, Van Zile, Vogel, Willey; Attorney for Appellees: Finkelmeyer, Frederick, Hacker, Hawkins, Henneke, McCarty, White [19-10011] (Martin Vincent Totaro ) [Entered: 04/08/2019 12:33 PM]
April 8, 2019 COURT ORDER granting Motion to extend time to file appellee's brief filed by Appellees State of Tennessee, State of South Carolina, State of Alabama, State of Louisiana, State of Florida, State of Arkansas, State of Wisconsin, State of South Dakota, State of Georgia, State of Missouri, State of Utah, State of Kansas, State of West Virginia, State of Texas, State of Nebraska, State of Mississippi, State of Arizona, State of Indiana and State of North Dakota [ # 9023097-2 ] E/Res's Brief deadline updated to 05/01/2019 for Appellees Neill Hurley, John Nantz, State of Alabama, State of Arizona, State of Arkansas, State of Florida, State of Georgia, State of Indiana, State of Kansas, State of Louisiana, State of Mississippi, State of Missouri, State of Nebraska, State of North Dakota, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, State of Tennessee, State of Texas, State of Utah, State of West Virginia and State of Wisconsin; to extend time to file brief as appellant [9024074-2] A/Pet's Brief deadline updated to 05/01/2019 for Appellants Alex M. Azar, II, Secretary, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, Charles P. Rettig, United States Department of Health and Human Services, United States Internal Revenue Service and United States of America [19-10011] (RAJ) [Entered: 04/08/2019 11:38 AM]
April 8, 2019 COURT ORDER striking AMICUS BRIEF filed by First Focus and Children's Partnership [ # 9018869-2 ] [19-10011] (RAJ) [Entered: 04/08/2019 09:52 AM]
April 8, 2019 COURT ORDER striking Amicus Brief filed by First Focus and Children's Partnership in 19-10011 [ # 9018869-2 ] [9023813-2] [19-10011] (RAJ) [Entered: 04/08/2019 09:45 AM]
April 5, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Jack R. Bierig for Amicus Curiae Renal Physicians Association in 19-10011, Attorney Jack R. Bierig for Amicus Curiae GLMA Health Professionals Advancing LGBT Equality in 19-10011, Attorney Jack R. Bierig for Amicus Curiae American Society for Metabolic and Bariatric Surgery in 19-10011, Attorney Jack R. Bierig for Amicus Curiae American Society of Hematology in 19-10011, Attorney Jack R. Bierig for Amicus Curiae American Psychiatric Association in 19-10011, Attorney Jack R. Bierig for Amicus Curiae American Osteopathic Association in 19-10011, Attorney Jack R. Bierig for Amicus Curiae American Medical Women's Association in 19-10011, Attorney Jack R. Bierig for Amicus Curiae American Geriatrics Society in 19-10011, Attorney Jack R. Bierig for Amicus Curiae American College of Radiation Oncology in 19-10011, Attorney Jack R. Bierig for Amicus Curiae American College of Physicians in 19-10011, Attorney Jack R. Bierig for Amicus Curiae American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists in 19-10011, Attorney Jack R. Bierig for Amicus Curiae American College of Correctional Physicians in 19-10011, Attorney Jack R. Bierig for Amicus Curiae American Association of Public Health Physicians in 19-10011, Attorney Jack R. Bierig for Amicus Curiae American Association of Child and Adolescent Psychiatry in 19-10011, Attorney Jack R. Bierig for Amicus Curiae American Academy of Pediatrics in 19-10011, Attorney Jack R. Bierig for Amicus Curiae American Academy of Family Physicians in 19-10011, Attorney Jack R. Bierig for Amicus Curiae Asthma and Immunology in 19-10011, Attorney Jack R. Bierig for Amicus Curiae American Academy of Allergy in 19-10011, Attorney Jack R. Bierig for Amicus Curiae American Medical Association in 19-10011 [19-10011] (CMB) [Entered: 04/10/2019 12:36 PM]
April 5, 2019 Paper copies of Amicus Brief filed by American Hospital Association, Federation of American Hospitals, Association of American Medical Colleges, Catholic Health Association of the United States, America's Essential Hospitals and Amici Curiae American Hospital Association, Federation of American Hospitals, Association of American Medical Colleges, Catholic Health Association of the United States and America's Essential Hospitals in 19-10011 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes # of Copies Provided: 7. Paper Copies of Brief due deadline satisfied. [19-10011] (CMB) [Entered: 04/09/2019 11:17 AM]
April 5, 2019 Paper copies of Amicus Brief filed by Bipartisan Economic Scholars in 19-10011 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes # of Copies Provided: 7. Paper Copies of Brief due deadline satisfied. [19-10011] (CMB) [Entered: 04/09/2019 11:12 AM]
April 5, 2019 Paper copies of Amicus Brief filed by Mr. Walter Dellinger and Mr. Douglas Laycock in 19-10011 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes # of Copies Provided: 7. Paper Copies of Brief due deadline satisfied. [19-10011] (CMB) [Entered: 04/09/2019 11:05 AM]
April 5, 2019 Paper copies of Amicus Brief filed by Blue Cross Blue Shield Association in 19-10011 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes # of Copies Provided: 7. Paper Copies of Brief due deadline satisfied. [19-10011] (CMB) [Entered: 04/09/2019 11:01 AM]
April 5, 2019 Paper copies of Amicus Brief filed by Mr. Samuel L. Bray, Mr. Michael W. McConnell and Mr. Kevin C. Walsh in 19-10011 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes # of Copies Provided: 7. Paper Copies of Brief due deadline satisfied. [19-10011] (CMB) [Entered: 04/09/2019 10:52 AM]
April 5, 2019 Paper copies of Amicus Brief filed by 35 Counties, Cities, and Towns, California State Association of Counties and Amici Curiae 35 Counties, Cities, and Towns and California State Association of Counties in 19-10011 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes # of Copies Provided: 7. Paper Copies of Brief due deadline satisfied. [19-10011] (CMB) [Entered: 04/09/2019 10:49 AM]
April 5, 2019 Paper copies of Amicus Brief filed by American Civil Liberties Union, American Association of People with Disabilities, Judge David L Bazelon Center for Mental Health Law, Disability Rights Education and Defense Fund and Eleven Other Leading National Disability Rights Organizations in 19-10011 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes # of Copies Provided: 7. Paper Copies of Brief due deadline satisfied. [19-10011] (CMB) [Entered: 04/09/2019 10:35 AM]
April 5, 2019 Paper copies of Amicus Brief filed by 483 Federally Recognized Tribal Nations in 19-10011 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes # of Copies Provided: 7. Paper Copies of Brief due deadline satisfied. [19-10011] (CMB) [Entered: 04/09/2019 10:28 AM]
April 5, 2019 Paper copies of Amicus Brief filed by HCA Healthcare, Incorporated in 19-10011 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes # of Copies Provided: 7. Paper Copies of Brief due deadline satisfied. [19-10011] (CMB) [Entered: 04/09/2019 10:24 AM]
April 5, 2019 Paper copies of Amicus Brief filed by Alliance of Community Health Plans and Association for Community Affiliated Plans in 19-10011 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes # of Copies Provided: 7. Paper Copies of Brief due deadline satisfied. [19-10011] (CMB) [Entered: 04/09/2019 10:17 AM]
April 5, 2019 Paper copies of Amicus Brief filed by AARP, AARP Found, Center for Medicare Advocacy and Justice in Aging in 19-10011 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes # of Copies Provided: 7. Paper Copies of Brief due deadline satisfied. [19-10011] (CMB) [Entered: 04/09/2019 10:10 AM]
April 5, 2019 UNOPPOSED MOTION to extend time to file brief of appellee until 05/01/2019 [9023097-2]. Date of service: 04/05/2019 [19-10011] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: UNOPPOSED LEVEL 1 EXTENSION REQUESTED by Appellees State of Alabama, State of Arizona, State of Arkansas, State of Florida, State of Georgia, State of Indiana, State of Kansas, State of Louisiana, State of Mississippi, State of Missouri, State of Nebraska, State of North Dakota, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, State of Tennessee, State of Texas, State of Utah, State of West Virginia and State of Wisconsin for filing Appellees' response brief until 05/01/2019 [19-10011] (Kyle Douglas Hawkins ) [Entered: 04/05/2019 01:05 PM]
April 5, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Matthew S. Hellman for Bipartisan Economic Scholars for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-10011] (Matthew S. Hellman ) [Entered: 04/05/2019 08:49 AM]
April 4, 2019 PROPOSED SUFFICIENT BRIEF filed by Amici Curiae SEIU, Center on Budget and Policy Priorities, National Health Law Program, Community Catalyst and Families USA [ # 9019143-2 ] Date of service: 04/04/2019 via email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Allison, Anthony, Baker, Bierig, Blalack, Chen, Delery, DiCarlo, Dotzel, Flowers, Gyamfi, Halligan, Hedrick, Hellman, Hunt, Jennings, Kitchens, Marotta, Masters, Melkonian, Palmore, Petronio, Qian, Salgado, Santos, Schultz, Shah, Solomon, Underwood, Van Kirk, Wolff, Zionts; Attorney for Intervenors: Anders, Blake, Frazelle, Goldenberg, Gorod, Hammoud, Hanner, Kreisberg, Letter, Meltzer, Miller-Ziegler, Olson, Phatak, Shapiro, Stern, Tatelman, Verrilli, Wydra; Attorney for Appellants: Battles, Berns, Boergers, Cahall, DiBattista, Elias, Ikeda, Lenz, McGuire, Nakatsuji, Palma, Rubin, Shumate, Siegel, Sprung, Totaro, Van Zile, Vogel, Willey; Attorney for Appellees: Finkelmeyer, Frederick, Hacker, Hawkins, Henneke, McCarty, White [19-10011] (Margaret Dotzel ) [Entered: 04/04/2019 06:00 PM]
April 4, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-10011] (Wade Carr ) [Entered: 04/04/2019 03:08 PM]
April 4, 2019 Paper copies of Amicus Brief filed by America's Health Insurance Plans in 19-10011 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes # of Copies Provided: 7. Paper Copies of Brief due deadline satisfied. [19-10011] (SBS) [Entered: 04/04/2019 03:02 PM]
April 4, 2019 Paper copies of Amicus Brief filed by State of Montana, State of Ohio and Amici Curiae State of Montana and State of Ohio in 19-10011 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes # of Copies Provided: 7. Paper Copies of Brief due deadline satisfied. [19-10011] (SBS) [Entered: 04/04/2019 02:53 PM]
April 4, 2019 DOCUMENT RECEIVED - NO ACTION TAKEN. No action will be taken at this time on the Amici Curiae brief received from Amici Curiae Center on Budget and Policy Priorities, Community Catalyst, Families USA, National Health Law Program and SEIU because it is premature. The electronic version of the brief has not yet been made sufficient. [19-10011] (SBS) [Entered: 04/04/2019 02:36 PM]
April 4, 2019 Paper copies of Intervenor Brief filed by Intervenor United States House of Representatives in 19-10011 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes # of Copies Provided: 7. Paper Copies of Brief due deadline satisfied. [19-10011] (SBS) [Entered: 04/04/2019 02:21 PM]
April 4, 2019 Paper copies of Amicus Brief filed by 24 State Hospitals Associations in 19-10011 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes # of Copies Provided: 7. Paper Copies of Brief due deadline satisfied. [19-10011] (SBS) [Entered: 04/04/2019 02:08 PM]
April 4, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Stuart F. Delery for Amicus Curiae Children's Partnership in 19-10011, Attorney Stuart F. Delery for Amicus Curiae First Focus in 19-10011 [19-10011] (CMB) [Entered: 04/04/2019 11:39 AM]
April 4, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Benna Ruth Solomon for Amicus Curiae California State Association of Counties in 19-10011, Attorney Benna Ruth Solomon for Amicus Curiae 35 Counties, Cities, and Towns in 19-10011 [19-10011] (CMB) [Entered: 04/04/2019 11:32 AM]
April 4, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Lorraine Alofa Van Kirk for Amicus Curiae California State Association of Counties in 19-10011, Attorney Lorraine Alofa Van Kirk for Amicus Curiae 35 Counties, Cities, and Towns in 19-10011 [19-10011] (CMB) [Entered: 04/04/2019 11:12 AM]
April 4, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Peter J. Anthony for Amicus Curiae Eleven Other Leading National Disability Rights Organizations in 19-10011, Attorney Peter J. Anthony for Amicus Curiae Disability Rights Education and Defense Fund in 19-10011, Attorney Peter J. Anthony for Amicus Curiae Judge David L Bazelon Center for Mental Health Law in 19-10011, Attorney Peter J. Anthony for Amicus Curiae American Civil Liberties Union in 19-10011, Attorney Peter J. Anthony for Amicus Curiae American Association of People with Disabilities in 19-10011 [19-10011] (CMB) [Entered: 04/04/2019 10:42 AM]
April 4, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney John T. Kitchens for Amicus Curiae 483 Federally Recognized Tribal Nations in 19-10011 [19-10011] (CMB) [Entered: 04/04/2019 10:40 AM]
April 4, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Richard Salgado for Amicus Curiae Eleven Other Leading National Disability Rights Organizations in 19-10011, Attorney Richard Salgado for Amicus Curiae Disability Rights Education and Defense Fund in 19-10011, Attorney Richard Salgado for Amicus Curiae Judge David L Bazelon Center for Mental Health Law in 19-10011, Attorney Richard Salgado for Amicus Curiae American Civil Liberties Union in 19-10011, Attorney Richard Salgado for Amicus Curiae American Association of People with Disabilities in 19-10011 [19-10011] (CMB) [Entered: 04/04/2019 10:36 AM]
April 4, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Paige Jennings for party(s) Amicus Curiae HCA Healthcare, Incorporated, in case 19-10011 [19-10011] (CMB) [Entered: 04/04/2019 10:31 AM]
April 4, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney David Meir Zionts for Amicus Curiae HCA Healthcare, Incorporated in 19-10011 [19-10011] (CMB) [Entered: 04/04/2019 10:28 AM]
April 4, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Margaret Dotzel for party(s) Amicus Curiae Center on Budget and Policy Priorities Amicus Curiae Families USA Amicus Curiae National Health Law Program Amicus Curiae SEIU Amicus Curiae Community Catalyst, in case 19-10011 [19-10011] (CMB) [Entered: 04/04/2019 10:25 AM]
April 4, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Jaime Santos for Amicus Curiae American Medical Women's Association in 19-10011, Attorney Jaime Santos for Amicus Curiae Black Women's Health Imperative in 19-10011, Attorney Jaime Santos for Amicus Curiae National Partnership for Women and Families in 19-10011, Attorney Jaime Santos for Amicus Curiae National Women's Law Center in 19-10011 [19-10011] (CMB) [Entered: 04/04/2019 10:22 AM]
April 4, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Beth Bivans Petronio for Amicus Curiae Kennedy Forum in 19-10011, Attorney Beth Bivans Petronio for Amicus Curiae National Multiple Sclerosis Society in 19-10011, Attorney Beth Bivans Petronio for Amicus Curiae National Hemophilia Foundation in 19-10011, Attorney Beth Bivans Petronio for Amicus Curiae National Coalition for Cancer Survivorship in 19-10011, Attorney Beth Bivans Petronio for Amicus Curiae National Alliance on Mental Illness in 19-10011, Attorney Beth Bivans Petronio for Amicus Curiae March of Dimes in 19-10011, Attorney Beth Bivans Petronio for Amicus Curiae Leukemia and Lymphoma Society in 19-10011, Attorney Beth Bivans Petronio for Amicus Curiae Hemophilia Federation of America in 19-10011, Attorney Beth Bivans Petronio for Amicus Curiae Global Healthy Living Foundation in 19-10011, Attorney Beth Bivans Petronio for Amicus Curiae Epilepsy Foundation in 19-10011, Attorney Beth Bivans Petronio for Amicus Curiae Cystic Fibrosis Foundation in 19-10011, Attorney Beth Bivans Petronio for Amicus Curiae Crohn's and Colitis Foundation in 19-10011, Attorney Beth Bivans Petronio for Amicus Curiae American Lung Association in 19-10011, Attorney Beth Bivans Petronio for Amicus Curiae American Heart Association in 19-10011, Attorney Beth Bivans Petronio for Amicus Curiae American Diabetes Association in 19-10011, Attorney Beth Bivans Petronio for Amicus Curiae American Cancer Society Cancer Action Network in 19-10011, Attorney Beth Bivans Petronio for Amicus Curiae American Cancer Society in 19-10011 [19-10011] (CMB) [Entered: 04/04/2019 10:19 AM]
April 4, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Kenneth Lee Blalack II for Amicus Curiae Blue Cross Blue Shield Association in 19-10011 [19-10011] (CMB) [Entered: 04/04/2019 10:13 AM]
April 4, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney William B. Schultz for Amicus Curiae SEIU in 19-10011, Attorney William B. Schultz for Amicus Curiae Center on Budget and Policy Priorities in 19-10011, Attorney William B. Schultz for Amicus Curiae National Health Law Program in 19-10011, Attorney William B. Schultz for Amicus Curiae Community Catalyst in 19-10011, Attorney William B. Schultz for Amicus Curiae Families USA in 19-10011, Attorney William B. Schultz for Amicus Curiae 24 State Hospitals Associations in 19-10011 [19-10011] (CMB) [Entered: 04/04/2019 10:10 AM]
April 4, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Ryan Wolfe Allison for party(s) Amicus Curiae Walter Dellinger Amicus Curiae Douglas Laycock, in case 19-10011 [19-10011] (CMB) [Entered: 04/04/2019 10:06 AM]
April 4, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Raffi Melkonian for Amicus Curiae Kevin C. Walsh in 19-10011, Attorney Raffi Melkonian for Amicus Curiae Michael W. McConnell in 19-10011, Attorney Raffi Melkonian for Amicus Curiae Samuel L. Bray in 19-10011 [19-10011] (CMB) [Entered: 04/04/2019 10:02 AM]
April 4, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Caitlin Joan Halligan for Amicus Curiae Douglas Laycock in 19-10011, Attorney Caitlin Joan Halligan for Amicus Curiae Walter Dellinger in 19-10011 [19-10011] (CMB) [Entered: 04/04/2019 09:59 AM]
April 4, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Z.W. Julius Chen for party(s) Amicus Curiae America's Health Insurance Plans, in case 19-10011 [19-10011] (CMB) [Entered: 04/04/2019 09:56 AM]
April 4, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Maame Gyamfi for Amicus Curiae Justice in Aging in 19-10011, Attorney Maame Gyamfi for Amicus Curiae Center for Medicare Advocacy in 19-10011, Attorney Maame Gyamfi for Amicus Curiae AARP Found in 19-10011, Attorney Maame Gyamfi for Amicus Curiae AARP in 19-10011 [19-10011] (CMB) [Entered: 04/04/2019 09:50 AM]
April 4, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Catherine M. Masters for Amicus Curiae Renal Physicians Association in 19-10011, Attorney Catherine M. Masters for Amicus Curiae GLMA Health Professionals Advancing LGBT Equality in 19-10011, Attorney Catherine M. Masters for Amicus Curiae American Society for Metabolic and Bariatric Surgery in 19-10011, Attorney Catherine M. Masters for Amicus Curiae American Society of Hematology in 19-10011, Attorney Catherine M. Masters for Amicus Curiae American Psychiatric Association in 19-10011, Attorney Catherine M. Masters for Amicus Curiae American Osteopathic Association in 19-10011, Attorney Catherine M. Masters for Amicus Curiae American Medical Women's Association in 19-10011, Attorney Catherine M. Masters for Amicus Curiae American Geriatrics Society in 19-10011, Attorney Catherine M. Masters for Amicus Curiae American College of Radiation Oncology in 19-10011, Attorney Catherine M. Masters for Amicus Curiae American College of Physicians in 19-10011, Attorney Catherine M. Masters for Amicus Curiae American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists in 19-10011, Attorney Catherine M. Masters for Amicus Curiae American College of Correctional Physicians in 19-10011, Attorney Catherine M. Masters for Amicus Curiae American Association of Public Health Physicians in 19-10011, Attorney Catherine M. Masters for Amicus Curiae American Association of Child and Adolescent Psychiatry in 19-10011, Attorney Catherine M. Masters for Amicus Curiae American Academy of Pediatrics in 19-10011, Attorney Catherine M. Masters for Amicus Curiae American Academy of Family Physicians in 19-10011, Attorney Catherine M. Masters for Amicus Curiae Asthma and Immunology in 19-10011, Attorney Catherine M. Masters for Amicus Curiae American Academy of Allergy in 19-10011, Attorney Catherine M. Masters for Amicus Curiae American Medical Association in 19-10011 [19-10011] (CMB) [Entered: 04/04/2019 09:45 AM]
April 4, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Nicholas M. DiCarlo for party(s) Amicus Curiae 24 State Hospitals Associations, in case 19-10011 [19-10011] (CMB) [Entered: 04/04/2019 09:35 AM]
April 4, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Sean Michael Marotta for Amicus Curiae Association of American Medical Colleges in 19-10011, Attorney Sean Michael Marotta for Amicus Curiae America's Essential Hospitals in 19-10011, Attorney Sean Michael Marotta for Amicus Curiae Catholic Health Association of the United States in 19-10011, Attorney Sean Michael Marotta for Amicus Curiae Federation of American Hospitals in 19-10011, Attorney Sean Michael Marotta for Amicus Curiae American Hospital Association in 19-10011 [19-10011] (CMB) [Entered: 04/04/2019 09:28 AM]
April 4, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Pratik A. Shah for Amicus Curiae America's Health Insurance Plans in 19-10011 [19-10011] (CMB) [Entered: 04/04/2019 09:23 AM]
April 4, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Michael Qian for party(s) Amicus Curiae Nicholas Bagley Amicus Curiae Jonathan H. Adler Amicus Curiae Ilya Somin Amicus Curiae Abbe R. Gluck, in case 19-10011 [19-10011] (CMB) [Entered: 04/04/2019 09:20 AM]
April 4, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Joseph R. Palmore for Amicus Curiae Ilya Somin in 19-10011, Attorney Joseph R. Palmore for Amicus Curiae Abbe R. Gluck in 19-10011, Attorney Joseph R. Palmore for Amicus Curiae Nicholas Bagley in 19-10011, Attorney Joseph R. Palmore for Amicus Curiae Jonathan H. Adler in 19-10011 [19-10011] (CMB) [Entered: 04/04/2019 09:17 AM]
April 4, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Daniel W. Wolff for party(s) Amicus Curiae Association for Community Affiliated Plans Amicus Curiae Alliance of Community Health Plans, in case 19-10011 [19-10011] (CMB) [Entered: 04/04/2019 09:13 AM]
April 4, 2019 ATTORNEY NOT PARTICIPATING. [19-10011] (CMB) [Entered: 04/04/2019 09:08 AM]
April 4, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Benjamin Michael Flowers for Amicus Curiae State of Ohio in 19-10011, by Attorney(s) Benjamin Michael Flowers for party(s) Amicus Curiae State of Montana, in case 19-10011 [19-10011] (CMB) [Entered: 04/04/2019 09:08 AM]
April 4, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney A. Xavier Baker for Amicus Curiae Alliance of Community Health Plans in 19-10011, Attorney A. Xavier Baker for Amicus Curiae Association for Community Affiliated Plans in 19-10011 [19-10011] (CMB) [Entered: 04/04/2019 09:00 AM]
April 4, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Jessica Elaine Underwood for party(s) Amicus Curiae Walter Dellinger Amicus Curiae Douglas Laycock, in case 19-10011 [19-10011] (CMB) [Entered: 04/04/2019 08:54 AM]
April 3, 2019 Paper copies of Appellant Brief filed by Appellants State of Connecticut, State of Illinois, State of Oregon, State of Delaware, State of Virginia, State of California, State of Hawaii, State of North Carolina, State of Rhode Island, State of Washington, State of New York, State of Massachusetts, District of Columbia, State of Vermont, State of Kentucky, State of Minnesota and State of New Jersey in 19-10011 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes # of Copies Provided: 7. Paper Copies of Brief due deadline satisfied. [19-10011] (SBS) [Entered: 04/03/2019 02:24 PM]
April 3, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Stuart F. Delery for Children's Partnership and First Focus for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-10011] (Stuart F. Delery ) [Entered: 04/03/2019 01:47 PM]
April 3, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM received from Ms. Benna Ruth Solomon for 35 Counties, Cities, and Towns and California State Association of Counties for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-10011] (Benna Ruth Solomon ) [Entered: 04/03/2019 01:40 PM]
April 3, 2019 PROPOSED SUFFICIENT BRIEF filed by Amici Curiae Association of American Medical Colleges, America's Essential Hospitals, Catholic Health Association of the United States, Federation of American Hospitals and American Hospital Association [ # 9018656-2 ] Date of service: 04/03/2019 via email - Attorney for Intervenors: Anders, Blake, Frazelle, Goldenberg, Gorod, Hammoud, Hanner, Kreisberg, Letter, Meltzer, Miller-Ziegler, Olson, Phatak, Shapiro, Stern, Tatelman, Verrilli, Wydra; Attorney for Amici Curiae: Baker, Bierig, Delery, Flowers, Fox, Gyamfi, Hedrick, Hunt, Marotta, Masters, Palmore, Petronio, Schultz, Shah, Solomon, Van Kirk; Attorney for Appellants: Battles, Berns, Boergers, Cahall, DiBattista, Elias, Ikeda, Lenz, McGuire, Nakatsuji, Palma, Rubin, Shumate, Siegel, Sprung, Totaro, Van Zile, Vogel, Willey; Attorney for Appellees: Finkelmeyer, Frederick, Hacker, Hawkins, Henneke, McCarty, White [19-10011] (Sean Michael Marotta ) [Entered: 04/03/2019 01:34 PM]
April 3, 2019 PROPOSED SUFFICIENT BRIEF filed by Amici Curiae Mr. Ilya Somin, Mr. Abbe R. Gluck, Mr. Nicholas Bagley and Mr. Jonathan H. Adler [ # 9018647-2 ] Date of service: 04/03/2019 via email - Attorney for Intervenors: Anders, Blake, Frazelle, Goldenberg, Gorod, Hammoud, Hanner, Kreisberg, Letter, Meltzer, Miller-Ziegler, Olson, Phatak, Shapiro, Stern, Tatelman, Verrilli, Wydra; Attorney for Amici Curiae: Baker, Bierig, Delery, Flowers, Gyamfi, Hedrick, Hunt, Marotta, Masters, Palmore, Petronio, Schultz, Shah, Solomon, Van Kirk; Attorney for Appellants: Battles, Berns, Boergers, Cahall, DiBattista, Elias, Ikeda, Lenz, McGuire, Nakatsuji, Palma, Rubin, Shumate, Siegel, Sprung, Totaro, Van Zile, Vogel, Willey; Attorney for Appellees: Finkelmeyer, Frederick, Hacker, Hawkins, Henneke, McCarty, White; US mail - Attorney for Amicus Curiae: Fox [19-10011] (Joseph R. Palmore ) [Entered: 04/03/2019 01:25 PM]
April 2, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-10011] (Lorraine Alofa Van Kirk ) [Entered: 04/02/2019 05:59 PM]
April 2, 2019 MOTION filed by Amici Curiae American Academy of Allergy, American Academy of Family Physicians, American Academy of Pediatrics, American Association of Child and Adolescent Psychiatry, American Association of Public Health Physicians, American College of Correctional Physicians, American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists, American College of Physicians, AMERICAN COLLEGE OF RADIATION ONCOLOGY, American Geriatrics Society, American Medical Association, American Medical Women's Association, American Osteopathic Association, American Psychiatric Association, American Society for Metabolic and Bariatric Surgery, American Society of Hematology, Asthma and Immunology, GLMA Health Professionals Advancing LGBT Equality and Renal Physicians Association to file brief in its present form [9020307-2]. Date of service: 04/02/2019 via email - Attorney for Intervenors: Anders, Blake, Frazelle, Goldenberg, Gorod, Hammoud, Hanner, Kreisberg, Letter, Meltzer, Miller-Ziegler, Olson, Phatak, Shapiro, Stern, Tatelman, Verrilli, Wydra; Attorney for Appellants: Battles, Berns, Boergers, Cahall, DiBattista, Elias, Ikeda, Lenz, McGuire, Nakatsuji, Palma, Rubin, Shumate, Siegel, Sprung, Totaro, Van Zile, Vogel, Willey; Attorney for Amici Curiae: Bierig, Flowers, Hedrick, Hunt, Marotta, Masters, Palmore; Attorney for Appellees: Finkelmeyer, Frederick, Hacker, Hawkins, Henneke, McCarty, White; US mail - Attorney for Amicus Curiae: Fox [19-10011] (Catherine M. Masters ) [Entered: 04/02/2019 05:48 PM]
April 2, 2019 PROPOSED SUFFICIENT BRIEF filed by American Medical Association, American Medical Women's Association, American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists, American Psychiatric Association, GLMA Health Professionals Advancing LGBT Equality, American Academy of Allergy, Asthma and Immunology, American Academy of Family Physicians, American Academy of Pediatrics, American Association of Child and Adolescent Psychiatry, American Association of Public Health Physicians, American College of Correctional Physicians, American College of Physicians, American College of Radiation Oncology, American Geriatrics Society, American Osteopathic Association, American Society of Hematology, American Society for Metabolic and Bariatric Surgery and Renal Physicians Association in 19-10011 [ # 9018582-2 ] Brief has been deemed sufficient. [19-10011] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: PROPOSED SUFFICIENT BRIEF filed by Amici Curiae Renal Physicians Association, GLMA Health Professionals Advancing LGBT Equality, American Society for Metabolic and Bariatric Surgery, American Society of Hematology, American Psychiatric Association, American Osteopathic Association, American Medical Women's Association, American Geriatrics Society, Aerican College of Radiation Oncology, American College of Physicians, American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists, American College of Correctional Physicians, American Association of Public Health Physicians, American Association of Child and Adolescent Psychiatry, American Academy of Pediatrics, American Academy of Family Physicians, Asthma and Immunology, American Academy of Allergy and American Medical Association [ # 9018582-2 ] Sufficient brief deadline was satisfied and paper copies of the brief were requested 4/10/19 and filed 4/11/19. Date of service: 04/02/2019 via email - Attorney for Intervenors: Anders, Blake, Frazelle, Goldenberg, Gorod, Hammoud, Hanner, Kreisberg, Letter, Meltzer, Miller-Ziegler, Olson, Phatak, Shapiro, Stern, Tatelman, Verrilli, Wydra; Attorney for Appellants: Battles, Berns, Boergers, Cahall, DiBattista, Elias, Ikeda, Lenz, McGuire, Nakatsuji, Palma, Rubin, Shumate, Siegel, Sprung, Totaro, Van Zile, Vogel, Willey; Attorney for Amici Curiae: Bierig, Flowers, Hunt, Masters; Attorney for Appellees: Finkelmeyer, Frederick, Hacker, Hawkins, Henneke, McCarty, White; US mail - Attorney for Amicus Curiae: Fox [19-10011] (Catherine M. Masters ) [Entered: 04/02/2019 02:44 PM]
April 2, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-10011] (Peter J. Anthony ) [Entered: 04/02/2019 02:07 PM]
April 2, 2019 PROPOSED SUFFICIENT BRIEF filed by Amici Curiae State of Montana and State of Ohio [ # 9018533-2 ] Date of service: 04/02/2019 via email - Attorney for Intervenors: Anders, Blake, Frazelle, Goldenberg, Gorod, Hammoud, Hanner, Kreisberg, Letter, Meltzer, Miller-Ziegler, Olson, Phatak, Shapiro, Stern, Tatelman, Verrilli, Wydra; Attorney for Appellants: Battles, Berns, Boergers, Cahall, DiBattista, Elias, Ikeda, Lenz, McGuire, Nakatsuji, Palma, Rubin, Shumate, Siegel, Sprung, Totaro, Van Zile, Vogel, Willey; Attorney for Amici Curiae: Bierig, Flowers, Hunt, Masters; Attorney for Appellees: Finkelmeyer, Frederick, Hacker, Hawkins, Henneke, McCarty, White; US mail - Attorney for Amicus Curiae: Fox [19-10011] (Benjamin Michael Flowers ) [Entered: 04/02/2019 12:57 PM]
April 2, 2019 PROPOSED SUFFICIENT BRIEF filed by Amicus Curiae Small Business Majority Foundation [ # 9018308-2 ] Date of service: 04/02/2019 via email - Attorney for Intervenors: Anders, Blake, Frazelle, Goldenberg, Gorod, Hammoud, Hanner, Kreisberg, Letter, Meltzer, Miller-Ziegler, Olson, Phatak, Shapiro, Stern, Tatelman, Verrilli, Wydra; Attorney for Appellants: Battles, Berns, Boergers, Cahall, DiBattista, Elias, Ikeda, Lenz, McGuire, Nakatsuji, Palma, Rubin, Shumate, Siegel, Sprung, Totaro, Van Zile, Vogel, Willey; Attorney for Amici Curiae: Bierig, Flowers, Hunt, Masters; Attorney for Appellees: Finkelmeyer, Frederick, Hacker, Hawkins, Henneke, McCarty, White; US mail - Attorney for Amicus Curiae: Fox [19-10011] (Hyland Hunt ) [Entered: 04/02/2019 12:48 PM]
April 2, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Hyland Hunt for Amicus Curiae Small Business Majority Foundation in 19-10011 [19-10011] (CMB) [Entered: 04/02/2019 10:34 AM]
April 1, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-10011] (John T. Kitchens ) [Entered: 04/01/2019 07:00 PM]
April 1, 2019 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF FILED by 483 Federally Recognized Tribal Nations. The Consent is Included in the Brief. # of Copies Provided: 0 Paper Copies of Brief due on 04/08/2019 for Amicus Curiae 483 Federally Recognized Tribal Nations. [19-10011] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF FILED by 483 Federally Recognized Tribal Nations. Date of service: 04/01/2019 via email - Attorney for Intervenors: Anders, Blake, Frazelle, Goldenberg, Gorod, Hammoud, Hanner, Kreisberg, Letter, Meltzer, Miller-Ziegler, Olson, Phatak, Shapiro, Stern, Tatelman, Verrilli, Wydra; Attorney for Appellants: Battles, Berns, Boergers, Cahall, DiBattista, Elias, Ikeda, Lenz, McGuire, Nakatsuji, Palma, Rubin, Shumate, Siegel, Sprung, Totaro, Van Zile, Vogel, Willey; Attorney for Appellees: Finkelmeyer, Frederick, Hacker, Hawkins, Henneke, McCarty, White [19-10011] (John T. Kitchens ) [Entered: 04/01/2019 06:49 PM]
April 1, 2019 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF FILED by American Civil Liberties Union, Judge David L Bazelon Center for Mental Health Law, Disability Rights Education and Defense Fund, Eleven Other Leading National Disability Rights Organizations and American Association of People with Disabilities. The Consent is Included in the Brief. # of Copies Provided: 0 Paper Copies of Brief due on 04/08/2019 for Amici Curiae American Association of People with Disabilities, Eleven Other Leading National Disability Rights Organizations, Disability Rights Education and Defense Fund, Judge David L Bazelon Center for Mental Health Law and American Civil Liberties Union. [19-10011] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF FILED by American Association of People with Disabilities, American Civil Liberties Union, The Judge David L. Bazelon Center for Mental Health Law, Disability Rights Education and Defense Fund, and Other Leading National Disability Rights Organizations. Date of service: 04/01/2019 via email - Attorney for Intervenors: Anders, Blake, Frazelle, Goldenberg, Gorod, Hammoud, Hanner, Kreisberg, Letter, Meltzer, Miller-Ziegler, Olson, Phatak, Shapiro, Stern, Tatelman, Verrilli, Wydra; Attorney for Appellants: Battles, Berns, Boergers, Cahall, DiBattista, Elias, Ikeda, Lenz, McGuire, Nakatsuji, Palma, Rubin, Shumate, Siegel, Sprung, Totaro, Van Zile, Vogel, Willey; Attorney for Appellees: Finkelmeyer, Frederick, Hacker, Hawkins, Henneke, McCarty, White [19-10011] (Richard Salgado ) [Entered: 04/01/2019 06:30 PM]
April 1, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-10011] (Richard Salgado ) [Entered: 04/01/2019 06:22 PM]
April 1, 2019 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF FILED by Bipartisan Economic Scholars. The Consent is Included in the Brief. # of Copies Provided: 0 Paper Copies of Brief due on 04/08/2019 for Amicus Curiae Bipartisan Economic Scholars. [19-10011] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF FILED by Bipartisan Economic Scholars. Date of service: 04/01/2019 via email - Attorney for Intervenors: Anders, Blake, Frazelle, Goldenberg, Gorod, Hammoud, Hanner, Kreisberg, Letter, Meltzer, Miller-Ziegler, Olson, Phatak, Shapiro, Stern, Tatelman, Verrilli, Wydra; Attorney for Appellants: Battles, Berns, Boergers, Cahall, DiBattista, Elias, Ikeda, Lenz, McGuire, Nakatsuji, Palma, Rubin, Shumate, Siegel, Sprung, Totaro, Van Zile, Vogel, Willey; Attorney for Appellees: Finkelmeyer, Frederick, Hacker, Hawkins, Henneke, McCarty, White [19-10011] (Matthew S. Hellman ) [Entered: 04/01/2019 06:15 PM]
April 1, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-10011] (Jack R. Bierig ) [Entered: 04/01/2019 06:09 PM]
April 1, 2019 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF FILED by American Medical Women's Association, Black Women's Health Imperative, National Partnership for Women and Families and National Women's Law Center. The Consent is Included in the Brief. # of Copies Provided: 0 Paper Copies of Brief due on 04/08/2019 for Amici Curiae National Women's Law Center, National Partnership for Women and Families, Black Women's Health Imperative and American Medical Women's Association. [19-10011] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF FILED by National Women's Law Center, National Partnership for Women & Families, Black Women's Health Imperative, and American Medical Women's Association. Date of service: 04/01/2019 via email - Attorney for Intervenors: Anders, Blake, Frazelle, Goldenberg, Gorod, Hammoud, Hanner, Kreisberg, Letter, Meltzer, Miller-Ziegler, Olson, Phatak, Shapiro, Stern, Tatelman, Verrilli, Wydra; Attorney for Appellants: Battles, Berns, Boergers, Cahall, DiBattista, Elias, Ikeda, Lenz, McGuire, Nakatsuji, Palma, Rubin, Shumate, Siegel, Sprung, Totaro, Van Zile, Vogel, Willey; Attorney for Appellees: Finkelmeyer, Frederick, Hacker, Hawkins, Henneke, McCarty, White [19-10011] (Jaime Santos ) [Entered: 04/01/2019 06:08 PM]
April 1, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-10011] (Paige Jennings ) [Entered: 04/01/2019 05:49 PM]
April 1, 2019 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF FILED by HCA Healthcare, Incorporated. The Consent is Included in the Brief. # of Copies Provided: 0 Paper Copies of Brief due on 04/08/2019 for Amicus Curiae HCA Healthcare, Incorporated. [19-10011] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF FILED by HCA Healthcare, Inc.. Date of service: 04/01/2019 via email - Attorney for Intervenors: Anders, Blake, Frazelle, Goldenberg, Gorod, Hammoud, Hanner, Kreisberg, Letter, Meltzer, Miller-Ziegler, Olson, Phatak, Shapiro, Stern, Tatelman, Verrilli, Wydra; Attorney for Appellants: Battles, Berns, Boergers, Cahall, DiBattista, Elias, Ikeda, Lenz, McGuire, Nakatsuji, Palma, Rubin, Shumate, Siegel, Sprung, Totaro, Van Zile, Vogel, Willey; Attorney for Appellees: Finkelmeyer, Frederick, Hacker, Hawkins, Henneke, McCarty, White [19-10011] (David Meir Zionts ) [Entered: 04/01/2019 05:47 PM]
April 1, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-10011] (David Meir Zionts ) [Entered: 04/01/2019 05:44 PM]
April 1, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-10011] (Jaime Santos ) [Entered: 04/01/2019 05:32 PM]
April 1, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-10011] (Margaret Dotzel ) [Entered: 04/01/2019 05:13 PM]
April 1, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-10011] (Beth Bivans Petronio ) [Entered: 04/01/2019 05:11 PM]
April 1, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-10011] (Jessica Elaine Underwood ) [Entered: 04/01/2019 05:08 PM]
April 1, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-10011] (Kenneth Lee Blalack II) [Entered: 04/01/2019 05:06 PM]
April 1, 2019 SUFFICIENT AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF FILED by Center on Budget and Policy Priorities, Community Catalyst, Families USA, National Health Law Program and SEIU. The Consent is Included in the Brief. # of Copies Provided: 0 Sufficient Brief deadline satisfied. Paper Copies of Brief due on 04/10/2019 for Amici Curiae Center on Budget and Policy Priorities, Community Catalyst, Families USA, National Health Law Program and Service Employees International Union. [19-10011] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF FILED by SEIU, Center on Budget and Policy Priorities, National Health Law Program, Community Catalyst and Families USA. The Consent is Included in the Brief. Instructions to Attorney: PLEASE READ THE ATTACHED NOTICE FOR INSTRUCTIONS ON HOW TO REMEDY THE DEFAULT. # of Copies Provided: 0 Sufficient Brief due on 04/15/2019 for Amici Curiae Families USA, Community Catalyst, National Health Law Program, Center on Budget and Policy Priorities and Service Employees International Union. [19-10011] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF FILED by Families USA; Community Catalyst; The National Health Law Program; The Center on Budget and Policy Priorities; and Service Employees International Union. Date of service: 04/01/2019 via email - Attorney for Intervenors: Anders, Blake, Frazelle, Goldenberg, Gorod, Hammoud, Hanner, Kreisberg, Letter, Meltzer, Miller-Ziegler, Olson, Phatak, Shapiro, Stern, Tatelman, Verrilli, Wydra; Attorney for Appellants: Battles, Berns, Boergers, Cahall, DiBattista, Elias, Ikeda, Lenz, McGuire, Nakatsuji, Palma, Rubin, Shumate, Siegel, Sprung, Totaro, Van Zile, Vogel, Willey; Attorney for Appellees: Finkelmeyer, Frederick, Hacker, Hawkins, Henneke, McCarty, White [19-10011] (William B. Schultz ) [Entered: 04/01/2019 05:04 PM]
April 1, 2019 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF FILED by Mr. Kevin C. Walsh, Mr. Michael W. McConnell and Mr. Samuel L. Bray. The Consent is Included in the Brief. # of Copies Provided: 0 Paper Copies of Brief due on 04/08/2019 for Amici Curiae Samuel L. Bray, Michael W. McConnell and Kevin C. Walsh. [19-10011] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF FILED by Samuel L. Bray, Michael W. McConnell, and Kevin C. Walsh. Date of service: 04/01/2019 via email - Attorney for Intervenors: Anders, Blake, Frazelle, Goldenberg, Gorod, Hammoud, Hanner, Kreisberg, Letter, Meltzer, Miller-Ziegler, Olson, Phatak, Shapiro, Stern, Tatelman, Verrilli, Wydra; Attorney for Appellants: Battles, Berns, Boergers, Cahall, DiBattista, Elias, Ikeda, Lenz, McGuire, Nakatsuji, Palma, Rubin, Shumate, Siegel, Sprung, Totaro, Van Zile, Vogel, Willey; Attorney for Appellees: Finkelmeyer, Frederick, Hacker, Hawkins, Henneke, McCarty, White [19-10011] (Raffi Melkonian ) [Entered: 04/01/2019 05:01 PM]
April 1, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-10011] (William B. Schultz ) [Entered: 04/01/2019 04:55 PM]
April 1, 2019 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF FILED by Blue Cross Blue Shield Association. The Consent is Included in the Brief. # of Copies Provided: 0 Paper Copies of Brief due on 04/08/2019 for Amicus Curiae Blue Cross Blue Shield Association. [19-10011] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF FILED by BLUE CROSS BLUE SHIELD ASSOCIATION. Date of service: 04/01/2019 via email - Attorney for Intervenors: Anders, Blake, Frazelle, Goldenberg, Gorod, Hammoud, Hanner, Kreisberg, Letter, Meltzer, Miller-Ziegler, Olson, Phatak, Shapiro, Stern, Tatelman, Verrilli, Wydra; Attorney for Appellants: Battles, Berns, Boergers, Cahall, DiBattista, Elias, Ikeda, Lenz, McGuire, Nakatsuji, Palma, Rubin, Shumate, Siegel, Sprung, Totaro, Van Zile, Vogel, Willey; Attorney for Appellees: Finkelmeyer, Frederick, Hacker, Hawkins, Henneke, McCarty, White [19-10011] (Kenneth Lee Blalack II) [Entered: 04/01/2019 04:55 PM]
April 1, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-10011] (Ryan Wolfe Allison ) [Entered: 04/01/2019 04:45 PM]
April 1, 2019 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF FILED by Mr. Douglas Laycock and Mr. Walter Dellinger. The Consent is Included in the Brief. # of Copies Provided: 0 Paper Copies of Brief due on 04/09/2019 for Amici Curiae Walter Dellinger and Douglas Laycock. [19-10011] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF FILED by Walter Dellinger and Douglas Laycock. Date of service: 04/01/2019 via email - Attorney for Intervenors: Anders, Blake, Frazelle, Goldenberg, Gorod, Hammoud, Hanner, Kreisberg, Letter, Meltzer, Miller-Ziegler, Olson, Phatak, Shapiro, Stern, Tatelman, Verrilli, Wydra; Attorney for Appellants: Battles, Berns, Boergers, Cahall, DiBattista, Elias, Ikeda, Lenz, McGuire, Nakatsuji, Palma, Rubin, Shumate, Siegel, Sprung, Totaro, Van Zile, Vogel, Willey; Attorney for Appellees: Finkelmeyer, Frederick, Hacker, Hawkins, Henneke, McCarty, White [19-10011] (Caitlin Joan Halligan ) [Entered: 04/01/2019 04:44 PM]
April 1, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-10011] (Raffi Melkonian ) [Entered: 04/01/2019 04:40 PM]
April 1, 2019 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF FILED by 35 Counties, Cities, and Towns and California State Association of Counties. Consent is Not Necessary as Amicus is a Government Entity. # of Copies Provided: 0 Paper Copies of Brief due on 04/08/2019 for Amici Curiae 35 Counties, Cities, and Towns and California State Association of Counties. [19-10011] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF FILED by California State Association of Counties and 35 Counties, Cities, and Towns. Consent is Not Necessary as Amicus is a Government Entity. Instructions to Attorney: PLEASE READ THE ATTACHED NOTICE FOR INSTRUCTIONS ON HOW TO REMEDY THE DEFAULT. # of Copies Provided: 0 Sufficient Brief due on 04/15/2019 for Amici Curiae 35 Counties, Cities, and Towns and California State Association of Counties. [19-10011] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF FILED by BENNA RUTH SOLOMON FOR 34 COUNTIES, CITIES, AND TOWNS AND CALIFORNIA STATE ASSOCIATION OF COUNTIES. Date of service: 04/01/2019 via email - Attorney for Intervenors: Anders, Blake, Frazelle, Goldenberg, Gorod, Hammoud, Hanner, Kreisberg, Letter, Meltzer, Miller-Ziegler, Olson, Phatak, Shapiro, Stern, Tatelman, Verrilli, Wydra; Attorney for Appellants: Battles, Berns, Boergers, Cahall, DiBattista, Elias, Ikeda, Lenz, McGuire, Nakatsuji, Palma, Rubin, Shumate, Siegel, Sprung, Totaro, Van Zile, Vogel, Willey; Attorney for Appellees: Finkelmeyer, Frederick, Hacker, Hawkins, Henneke, McCarty, White [19-10011] (Benna Ruth Solomon ) [Entered: 04/01/2019 04:34 PM]
April 1, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-10011] (Caitlin Joan Halligan ) [Entered: 04/01/2019 04:25 PM]
April 1, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-10011] (Z.W. Julius Chen ) [Entered: 04/01/2019 03:55 PM]
April 1, 2019 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF FILED by Association for Community Affiliated Plans and Alliance of Community Health Plans. The Consent is Included in the Brief. # of Copies Provided: 0 Paper Copies of Brief due on 04/08/2019 for Amici Curiae Alliance of Community Health Plans and Association for Community Affiliated Plans. [19-10011] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF FILED by Alliance of Community Health Plans and Association for Community Affiliated Plans. Date of service: 04/01/2019 via email - Attorney for Intervenors: Anders, Blake, Frazelle, Goldenberg, Gorod, Hammoud, Hanner, Kreisberg, Letter, Meltzer, Miller-Ziegler, Olson, Phatak, Shapiro, Stern, Tatelman, Verrilli, Wydra; Attorney for Appellants: Battles, Berns, Boergers, Cahall, DiBattista, Elias, Ikeda, Lenz, McGuire, Nakatsuji, Palma, Rubin, Shumate, Siegel, Sprung, Totaro, Van Zile, Vogel, Willey; Attorney for Appellees: Finkelmeyer, Frederick, Hacker, Hawkins, Henneke, McCarty, White [19-10011] (A. Xavier Baker ) [Entered: 04/01/2019 03:53 PM]
April 1, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-10011] (Maame Gyamfi ) [Entered: 04/01/2019 03:49 PM]
April 1, 2019 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF FILED by Justice in Aging, Center for Medicare Advocacy, AARP Found and AARP. The Consent is Included in the Brief. # of Copies Provided: 0 Paper Copies of Brief due on 04/08/2019 for Amici Curiae American Association of Retired Persons, American Association of Retired Persons Foundation, Center for Medicare Advocacy and Justice in Aging. [19-10011] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF FILED by AARP, AARP FOUNDATION, CENTER FOR MEDICARE ADVOCACY, AND JUSTICE IN AGING. Date of service: 04/01/2019 via email - Attorney for Intervenors: Anders, Blake, Frazelle, Goldenberg, Gorod, Hammoud, Hanner, Kreisberg, Letter, Meltzer, Miller-Ziegler, Olson, Phatak, Shapiro, Stern, Tatelman, Verrilli, Wydra; Attorney for Appellants: Battles, Berns, Boergers, Cahall, DiBattista, Elias, Ikeda, Lenz, McGuire, Nakatsuji, Palma, Rubin, Shumate, Siegel, Sprung, Totaro, Van Zile, Vogel, Willey; Attorney for Appellees: Finkelmeyer, Frederick, Hacker, Hawkins, Henneke, McCarty, White [19-10011] (Maame Gyamfi ) [Entered: 04/01/2019 03:42 PM]
April 1, 2019 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF FILED by Children's Partnership and First Focus. The Consent is Included in the Brief. # of Copies Provided: 0 Paper Copies of Brief due on 04/08/2019 for Amici Curiae First Focus and Children's Partnership. [19-10011] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF FILED by First Focus and The Children's Partnership. Date of service: 04/01/2019 via email - Attorney for Intervenors: Anders, Blake, Frazelle, Goldenberg, Gorod, Hammoud, Hanner, Kreisberg, Letter, Meltzer, Miller-Ziegler, Olson, Phatak, Shapiro, Stern, Tatelman, Verrilli, Wydra; Attorney for Appellants: Battles, Berns, Boergers, Cahall, DiBattista, Elias, Ikeda, Lenz, McGuire, Nakatsuji, Palma, Rubin, Shumate, Siegel, Sprung, Totaro, Van Zile, Vogel, Willey; Attorney for Appellees: Finkelmeyer, Frederick, Hacker, Hawkins, Henneke, McCarty, White [19-10011] (Stuart F. Delery ) [Entered: 04/01/2019 03:15 PM]
April 1, 2019 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF FILED by Kennedy Forum, National Multiple Sclerosis Society, National Hemophilia Foundation, National Coalition for Cancer Survivorship, National Alliance on Mental Illness, March of Dimes, Leukemia and Lymphoma Society, Hemophilia Federation of America, Global Healthy Living Foundation, Epilepsy Foundation, Cystic Fibrosis Foundation, Crohn's and Colitis Foundation, American Lung Association, American Heart Association, American Diabetes Association, American Cancer Society Cancer Action Network and American Cancer Society. The Consent is Included in the Brief. # of Copies Provided: 0 Paper Copies of Brief due on 04/08/2019 for Amici Curiae American Cancer Society, American Cancer Society Cancer Action Network, American Diabetes Association, American Heart Association, American Lung Association, Crohn's and Colitis Foundation, Cystic Fibrosis Foundation, Epilepsy Foundation, Global Healthy Living Foundation, Hemophilia Federation of America, Leukemia and Lymphoma Society, March of Dimes, National Alliance on Mental Illness, National Coalition for Cancer Survivorship, National Hemophilia Foundation, National Multiple Sclerosis Society and Kennedy Forum. [19-10011] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF FILED by The American Cancer Society, et al.. Date of service: 04/01/2019 via email - Attorney for Intervenors: Anders, Blake, Frazelle, Goldenberg, Gorod, Hammoud, Hanner, Kreisberg, Letter, Meltzer, Miller-Ziegler, Olson, Phatak, Shapiro, Stern, Tatelman, Verrilli, Wydra; Attorney for Appellants: Battles, Berns, Boergers, Cahall, DiBattista, Elias, Ikeda, Lenz, McGuire, Nakatsuji, Palma, Rubin, Shumate, Siegel, Sprung, Totaro, Van Zile, Vogel, Willey; Attorney for Appellees: Finkelmeyer, Frederick, Hacker, Hawkins, Henneke, McCarty, White [19-10011] (Beth Bivans Petronio ) [Entered: 04/01/2019 02:32 PM]
April 1, 2019 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF FILED by 24 State Hospitals. The Consent is Included in the Brief. # of Copies Provided: 0 Paper Copies of Brief due on 04/08/2019 for Amicus Curiae 24 State Hospitals. [19-10011] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF FILED by 24 State Hospital Associations. Date of service: 04/01/2019 via email - Attorney for Intervenors: Anders, Blake, Frazelle, Goldenberg, Gorod, Hammoud, Hanner, Kreisberg, Letter, Meltzer, Miller-Ziegler, Olson, Phatak, Shapiro, Stern, Tatelman, Verrilli, Wydra; Attorney for Appellants: Battles, Berns, Boergers, Cahall, DiBattista, Elias, Ikeda, Lenz, McGuire, Nakatsuji, Palma, Rubin, Shumate, Siegel, Sprung, Totaro, Van Zile, Vogel, Willey; Attorney for Appellees: Finkelmeyer, Frederick, Hacker, Hawkins, Henneke, McCarty, White [19-10011] (Nicholas M. DiCarlo ) [Entered: 04/01/2019 02:29 PM]
April 1, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-10011] (Catherine M. Masters ) [Entered: 04/01/2019 02:16 PM]
April 1, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-10011] (Nicholas M. DiCarlo ) [Entered: 04/01/2019 02:15 PM]
April 1, 2019 SUFFICIENT AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF FILED by America's Essential Hospitals, American Hospital Association, Association of American Medical Colleges, Catholic Health Association of the United States and Federation of American Hospitals. The Consent is Included in the Brief. # of Copies Provided: 0 Sufficient Brief deadline satisfied. Paper Copies of Brief due on 04/09/2019 for Amici Curiae America's Essential Hospitals, American Hospital Association, Association of American Medical Colleges, Catholic Health Association of the United States and Federation of American Hospitals. [19-10011] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF FILED by Association of American Medical Colleges, America's Essential Hospitals, Catholic Health Association of the United States, Federation of American Hospitals and American Hospital Association. The Consent is Included in the Brief. Instructions to Attorney: PLEASE READ THE ATTACHED NOTICE FOR INSTRUCTIONS ON HOW TO REMEDY THE DEFAULT. # of Copies Provided: 0 Sufficient Brief due on 04/15/2019 for Amici Curiae American Hospital Association, Federation of American Hospitals, Catholic Health Association of the United States, America's Essential Hospitals and Association of American Medical Colleges. [19-10011] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF FILED by American Hospital Association, Federation of American Hospitals, The Catholic Health Association of the United States, America's Essential Hospitals, and Association of American Medical Colleges. Date of service: 04/01/2019 via email - Attorney for Intervenors: Anders, Blake, Frazelle, Goldenberg, Gorod, Hammoud, Hanner, Kreisberg, Letter, Meltzer, Miller-Ziegler, Olson, Phatak, Shapiro, Stern, Tatelman, Verrilli, Wydra; Attorney for Appellants: Battles, Berns, Boergers, Cahall, DiBattista, Elias, Ikeda, Lenz, McGuire, Nakatsuji, Palma, Rubin, Shumate, Siegel, Sprung, Totaro, Van Zile, Vogel, Willey; Attorney for Appellees: Finkelmeyer, Frederick, Hacker, Hawkins, Henneke, McCarty, White [19-10011] (Sean Michael Marotta ) [Entered: 04/01/2019 02:07 PM]
April 1, 2019 SUFFICIENT AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF FILED by Mr. Jonathan H. Adler, Mr. Nicholas Bagley, Mr. Abbe R. Gluck and Mr. Ilya Somin. The Consent is Included in the Brief. # of Copies Provided: 0 Sufficient Brief deadline satisfied. Paper Copies of Brief due on 04/09/2019 for Amici Curiae Jonathan H. Adler, Nicholas Bagley, Abbe R. Gluck and Ilya Somin. [19-10011] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF FILED by Mr. Ilya Somin, Mr. Abbe R. Gluck, Mr. Nicholas Bagley and Mr. Jonathan H. Adler. The Consent is Included in the Brief. Instructions to Attorney: PLEASE READ THE ATTACHED NOTICE FOR INSTRUCTIONS ON HOW TO REMEDY THE DEFAULT. # of Copies Provided: 0 Sufficient Brief due on 04/15/2019 for Amici Curiae Jonathan H. Adler, Nicholas Bagley, Abbe R. Gluck and Ilya Somin. [19-10011] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF FILED by Jonathan H. Adler, Nicholas Bagley, Abbe R. Gluck, and Ilya Somin. Date of service: 04/01/2019 via email - Attorney for Intervenors: Anders, Blake, Frazelle, Goldenberg, Gorod, Hammoud, Hanner, Kreisberg, Letter, Meltzer, Miller-Ziegler, Olson, Phatak, Shapiro, Stern, Tatelman, Verrilli, Wydra; Attorney for Appellants: Battles, Berns, Boergers, Cahall, DiBattista, Elias, Ikeda, Lenz, McGuire, Nakatsuji, Palma, Rubin, Shumate, Siegel, Sprung, Totaro, Van Zile, Vogel, Willey; Attorney for Appellees: Finkelmeyer, Frederick, Hacker, Hawkins, Henneke, McCarty, White [19-10011] (Joseph R. Palmore ) [Entered: 04/01/2019 02:02 PM]
April 1, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-10011] (Sean Michael Marotta ) [Entered: 04/01/2019 01:58 PM]
April 1, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-10011] (Pratik A. Shah ) [Entered: 04/01/2019 01:50 PM]
April 1, 2019 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF FILED by America's Health Insurance Plans. The Consent is Included in the Brief. # of Copies Provided: 0 Paper Copies of Brief due on 04/08/2019 for Amicus Curiae America's Health Insurance Plans. [19-10011] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF FILED by America's Health Insurance Plans. Date of service: 04/01/2019 via email - Attorney for Intervenors: Anders, Blake, Frazelle, Goldenberg, Gorod, Hammoud, Hanner, Kreisberg, Letter, Meltzer, Miller-Ziegler, Olson, Phatak, Shapiro, Stern, Tatelman, Verrilli, Wydra; Attorney for Appellants: Battles, Berns, Boergers, Cahall, DiBattista, Elias, Ikeda, Lenz, McGuire, Nakatsuji, Palma, Rubin, Shumate, Siegel, Sprung, Totaro, Van Zile, Vogel, Willey; Attorney for Appellees: Finkelmeyer, Frederick, Hacker, Hawkins, Henneke, McCarty, White [19-10011] (Pratik A. Shah ) [Entered: 04/01/2019 01:49 PM]
April 1, 2019 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF FILED by Renal Physicians Association, GLMA Health Professionals Advancing LGBT Equality, American Society for Metabolic and Bariatric Surgery, American Society of Hematology, American Psychiatric Association, American Osteopathic Association, American Medical Women's Association, American Geriatrics Society, AMERICAN COLLEGE OF RADIATION ONCOLOGY, American College of Physicians, American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists, American College of Correctional Physicians, American Association of Public Health Physicians, American Association of Child and Adolescent Psychiatry, American Academy of Pediatrics, American Academy of Family Physicians, Asthma and Immunology, American Academy of Allergy and American Medical Association. The Consent is Included in the Brief. Instructions to Attorney: PLEASE READ THE ATTACHED NOTICE FOR INSTRUCTIONS ON HOW TO REMEDY THE DEFAULT. # of Copies Provided: 0 Sufficient Brief due on 04/15/2019 for Amici Curiae American Medical Association, American Academy of Allergy, Asthma and Immunology, American Academy of Family Physicians, American Academy of Pediatrics, American Association of Child and Adolescent Psychiatry, American Association of Public Health Physicians, American College of Correctional Physicians, American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists, American College of Physicians, AMERICAN COLLEGE OF RADIATION ONCOLOGY, American Geriatrics Society, American Medical Women's Association, American Osteopathic Association, American Psychiatric Association, American Society of Hematology, American Society for Metabolic and Bariatric Surgery, GLMA Health Professionals Advancing LGBT Equality and Renal Physicians Association. [19-10011] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF FILED by American Medical Association, et al.. Date of service: 04/01/2019 via email - Attorney for Intervenors: Anders, Blake, Frazelle, Goldenberg, Gorod, Hammoud, Hanner, Kreisberg, Letter, Meltzer, Miller-Ziegler, Olson, Phatak, Shapiro, Stern, Tatelman, Verrilli, Wydra; Attorney for Appellants: Battles, Berns, Boergers, Cahall, DiBattista, Elias, Ikeda, Lenz, McGuire, Nakatsuji, Palma, Rubin, Shumate, Siegel, Sprung, Totaro, Van Zile, Vogel, Willey; Attorney for Appellees: Finkelmeyer, Frederick, Hacker, Hawkins, Henneke, McCarty, White [19-10011] (Catherine M. Masters ) [Entered: 04/01/2019 01:33 PM]
April 1, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-10011] (Michael Qian ) [Entered: 04/01/2019 01:18 PM]
April 1, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-10011] (Joseph R. Palmore ) [Entered: 04/01/2019 01:16 PM]
April 1, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-10011] (Daniel W. Wolff ) [Entered: 04/01/2019 01:14 PM]
April 1, 2019 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF FILED by State of Montana and State of Ohio. Consent is Not Necessary as Amicus is a Government Entity. # of Copies Provided: 0 Sufficient Brief deadline satisfied. Paper Copies of Brief due on 04/08/2019 for Amici Curiae State of Ohio and State of Montana. [19-10011] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF FILED by State of Montana and State of Ohio. Consent is Not Necessary as Amicus is a Government Entity. Instructions to Attorney: PLEASE READ THE ATTACHED NOTICE FOR INSTRUCTIONS ON HOW TO REMEDY THE DEFAULT. # of Copies Provided: 0 Sufficient Brief due on 04/15/2019 for Amici Curiae State of Ohio and State of Montana. [19-10011] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF FILED by States of Ohio and Montana. Date of service: 04/01/2019 via email - Attorney for Intervenors: Anders, Blake, Frazelle, Goldenberg, Gorod, Hammoud, Hanner, Kreisberg, Letter, Meltzer, Miller-Ziegler, Olson, Phatak, Shapiro, Stern, Tatelman, Verrilli, Wydra; Attorney for Appellants: Battles, Berns, Boergers, Cahall, DiBattista, Elias, Ikeda, Lenz, McGuire, Nakatsuji, Palma, Rubin, Shumate, Siegel, Sprung, Totaro, Van Zile, Vogel, Willey; Attorney for Appellees: Finkelmeyer, Frederick, Hacker, Hawkins, Henneke, McCarty, White [19-10011] (Benjamin Michael Flowers ) [Entered: 04/01/2019 01:11 PM]
April 1, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-10011] (Benjamin Michael Flowers ) [Entered: 04/01/2019 01:07 PM]
April 1, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-10011] (A. Xavier Baker ) [Entered: 04/01/2019 01:00 PM]
April 1, 2019 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF FILED by Small Business Majority Foundation. The Consent is Included in the Brief. Sufficient Brief deadline satisfied. Paper Copies of Brief due on 04/08/2019 for Amicus Curiae Small Business Majority Foundation. [19-10011] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF FILED by Small Business Majority Foundation. The Consent is Included in the Brief. Instructions to Attorney: PLEASE READ THE ATTACHED NOTICE FOR INSTRUCTIONS ON HOW TO REMEDY THE DEFAULT. # of Copies Provided: 0 Sufficient Brief due on 04/15/2019 for Amicus Curiae Small Business Majority Foundation. [19-10011] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF FILED by Small Business Majority Foundation. Date of service: 04/01/2019 via email - Attorney for Intervenors: Anders, Blake, Frazelle, Goldenberg, Gorod, Hammoud, Hanner, Kreisberg, Letter, Meltzer, Miller-Ziegler, Olson, Phatak, Shapiro, Stern, Tatelman, Verrilli, Wydra; Attorney for Appellants: Battles, Berns, Boergers, Cahall, DiBattista, Elias, Ikeda, Lenz, McGuire, Nakatsuji, Palma, Rubin, Shumate, Siegel, Sprung, Totaro, Van Zile, Vogel, Willey; Attorney for Appellees: Finkelmeyer, Frederick, Hacker, Hawkins, Henneke, McCarty, White [19-10011] (Hyland Hunt ) [Entered: 04/01/2019 11:02 AM]
April 1, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-10011] (Hyland Hunt ) [Entered: 04/01/2019 10:58 AM]
March 28, 2019 DOCUMENT RECEIVED - NO ACTION TAKEN. No action will be taken at this time on the appearance form received from Amicus Curiae State of Ohio because document has been refiled to correctly reflect parties being represented. [19-10011] (RLL) [Entered: 04/03/2019 08:29 AM]
March 26, 2019 ATTORNEY NOT PARTICIPATING. Andrew B. Davis is designated as inactive in this case. Reason:Per Letter filed 3/26/19. [19-10011] (RAJ) [Entered: 03/28/2019 09:57 AM]
March 26, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Joseph Rubin for party(s) Appellant State of Connecticut, in case 19-10011 [19-10011] (SDH) [Entered: 03/26/2019 04:06 PM]
March 26, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Jeremy Kreisberg for party(s) Intervenor United States House of Representatives, in case 19-10011 [19-10011] (SDH) [Entered: 03/26/2019 04:04 PM]
March 26, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Jonathan Meltzer for party(s) Intervenor United States House of Representatives, in case 19-10011 [19-10011] (SDH) [Entered: 03/26/2019 04:03 PM]
March 26, 2019 LETTER filed by Appellees State of Alabama, State of Arizona, State of Arkansas, State of Florida, State of Georgia, State of Indiana, State of Kansas, State of Louisiana, State of Mississippi, State of Missouri, State of Nebraska, State of North Dakota, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, State of Tennessee, State of Texas, State of Utah, State of West Virginia and State of Wisconsin Counsel is withdrawing. Date of Service: 03/26/2019 via email - Attorney for Intervenors: Anders, Blake, Frazelle, Goldenberg, Gorod, Hammoud, Hanner, Letter, Miller-Ziegler, Olson, Phatak, Shapiro, Stern, Tatelman, Verrilli, Wydra; Attorney for Appellants: Battles, Berns, Boergers, Cahall, DiBattista, Elias, Ikeda, Lenz, McGuire, Nakatsuji, Palma, Shumate, Siegel, Sprung, Totaro, Van Zile, Vogel, Willey; Attorney for Appellees: Davis, Finkelmeyer, Frederick, Hacker, Hawkins, Henneke, McCarty, White [19-10011] (Andrew Bray Davis ) [Entered: 03/26/2019 02:16 PM]
March 26, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-10011] (Joseph Rubin ) [Entered: 03/26/2019 01:29 PM]
March 26, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Ginger Anders for party(s) Intervenor United States House of Representatives, in case 19-10011 [19-10011] (CMB) [Entered: 03/26/2019 08:57 AM]
March 25, 2019 FILING LETTER of State of Colorado, State of Iowa, State of Michigan and State of Nevada adopting brief of Appellants State of California, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Hawaii, State of Illinois, State of Kentucky, State of Massachusetts, State of New Jersey, State of New York, State of North Carolina, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Washington, State of Virginia, State of Minnesota and District of Columbia Date of Service: 03/25/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Battles, Berns, Boergers, Cahall, DiBattista, Elias, Ikeda, Lenz, McGuire, Nakatsuji, Palma, Shumate, Siegel, Sprung, Totaro, Van Zile, Vogel, Willey; Attorney for Intervenors: Blake, Frazelle, Goldenberg, Gorod, Hammoud, Hanner, Letter, Miller-Ziegler, Olson, Phatak, Shapiro, Stern, Tatelman, Verrilli, Wydra; Attorney for Appellees: Davis, Finkelmeyer, Frederick, Hacker, Hawkins, Henneke, McCarty, White [19-10011] (Eric Olson ) [Entered: 03/25/2019 10:15 PM]
March 25, 2019 FILING LETTER of United States House of Representatives dated 03/25/2019 adopting record excerpts of Azar, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services; Rettig, United States Department of Health and Human Services; United States IRS; and USA. [19-10011] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: LETTER FILED by Intervenor United States House of Representatives adopting record excerpts of Defendants-Appellants the United States of America, et al.. Date of Service: 03/25/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Battles, Berns, Boergers, Cahall, DiBattista, Elias, Ikeda, Lenz, McGuire, Nakatsuji, Palma, Shumate, Siegel, Sprung, Totaro, Van Zile, Vogel, Willey; Attorney for Intervenors: Blake, Frazelle, Goldenberg, Gorod, Hammoud, Hanner, Letter, Miller-Ziegler, Olson, Phatak, Shapiro, Stern, Tatelman, Verrilli, Wydra; Attorney for Appellees: Davis, Finkelmeyer, Frederick, Hacker, Hawkins, Henneke, McCarty, White [19-10011] (Donald B. Verrilli Jr.) [Entered: 03/25/2019 08:01 PM]
March 25, 2019 FILING LETTER of District of Columbia, State of California, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Hawaii, State of Illinois, State of Kentucky, State of Massachusetts, State of Minnesota, State of New Jersey, State of New York, State of North Carolina, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Virginia and State of Washington dated 03/25/2019 adopting record excerpts of Azar, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services; Rettig, United States Department of Health and Human Services; United States IRS; and USA. [19-10011] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: LETTER FILED by Appellants District of Columbia, State of California, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Hawaii, State of Illinois, State of Kentucky, State of Massachusetts, State of Minnesota, State of New Jersey, State of New York, State of North Carolina, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Virginia and State of Washington adopting record excerpts of Defendants - Appellants the United States of America, et al.. Date of Service: 03/25/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Battles, Berns, Boergers, Cahall, DiBattista, Elias, Ikeda, Lenz, McGuire, Nakatsuji, Palma, Shumate, Siegel, Sprung, Totaro, Van Zile, Vogel, Willey; Attorney for Intervenors: Blake, Frazelle, Goldenberg, Gorod, Hammoud, Hanner, Letter, Miller-Ziegler, Olson, Phatak, Shapiro, Stern, Tatelman, Verrilli, Wydra; Attorney for Appellees: Davis, Finkelmeyer, Frederick, Hacker, Hawkins, Henneke, McCarty, White [19-10011]--[Edited 04/08/2019 by RAJ] (Samuel Siegel ) [Entered: 03/25/2019 07:50 PM]
March 25, 2019 RECORD EXCERPTS FILED. # of Copies Provided: 0 Paper Copies of Record Excerpts due on 04/15/2019 for Appellants Alex M. Azar, II, Secretary, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, Charles P. Rettig, United States Department of Health and Human Services, United States Internal Revenue Service and United States of America. [19-10011] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: RECORD EXCERPTS FILED by Appellants Mr. Alex M. Azar, II, Secretary, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, HHS, Mr. Charles P. Rettig, United States Internal Revenue Service and USA. Date of service: 03/25/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Battles, Berns, Boergers, Cahall, DiBattista, Elias, Ikeda, Lenz, McGuire, Nakatsuji, Palma, Shumate, Siegel, Sprung, Totaro, Van Zile, Vogel, Willey; Attorney for Intervenors: Blake, Frazelle, Goldenberg, Gorod, Hammoud, Hanner, Letter, Miller-Ziegler, Olson, Phatak, Shapiro, Stern, Tatelman, Verrilli, Wydra; Attorney for Appellees: Davis, Finkelmeyer, Frederick, Hacker, Hawkins, Henneke, McCarty, White [19-10011] (Martin Vincent Totaro ) [Entered: 03/25/2019 07:30 PM]
March 25, 2019 LETTER filed by Appellants Mr. Alex M. Azar, II, Secretary, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, HHS, Mr. Charles P. Rettig, United States Internal Revenue Service and USA Letter re: United States brief. Date of Service: 03/25/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Battles, Berns, Boergers, Cahall, DiBattista, Elias, Ikeda, Lenz, McGuire, Nakatsuji, Palma, Shumate, Siegel, Sprung, Totaro, Van Zile, Vogel, Willey; Attorney for Intervenors: Blake, Frazelle, Goldenberg, Gorod, Hammoud, Hanner, Letter, Miller-Ziegler, Olson, Phatak, Shapiro, Stern, Tatelman, Verrilli, Wydra; Attorney for Appellees: Davis, Finkelmeyer, Frederick, Hacker, Hawkins, Henneke, McCarty, White [19-10011] (Martin Vincent Totaro ) [Entered: 03/25/2019 07:26 PM]
March 25, 2019 INTERVENOR'S BRIEF FILED by Intervenor United States House of Representatives. # of Copies Provided: 0 Paper Copies of Brief due on 04/08/2019 for Intervenor United States House of Representatives. [19-10011] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: INTERVENOR'S BRIEF FILED by Intervenor United States House of Representatives. Date of service: 03/25/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Battles, Berns, Boergers, Cahall, DiBattista, Elias, Ikeda, Lenz, McGuire, Nakatsuji, Palma, Shumate, Siegel, Sprung, Totaro, Van Zile, Vogel, Willey; Attorney for Intervenors: Blake, Frazelle, Goldenberg, Gorod, Hammoud, Hanner, Letter, Miller-Ziegler, Olson, Phatak, Shapiro, Stern, Tatelman, Verrilli, Wydra; Attorney for Appellees: Davis, Finkelmeyer, Frederick, Hacker, Hawkins, Henneke, McCarty, White [19-10011] (Donald B. Verrilli Jr.) [Entered: 03/25/2019 04:49 PM]
March 25, 2019 APPELLANT'S BRIEF FILED # of Copies Provided: 0 A/Pet's Brief deadline satisfied. Paper Copies of Brief due on 04/08/2019 for Appellants District of Columbia, State of California, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Hawaii, State of Illinois, State of Kentucky, State of Massachusetts, State of Minnesota, State of New Jersey, State of New York, State of North Carolina, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Virginia and State of Washington. [19-10011] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: APPELLANT'S BRIEF FILED by District of Columbia, State of California, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Hawaii, State of Illinois, State of Kentucky, State of Massachusetts, State of Minnesota, State of New Jersey, State of New York, State of North Carolina, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Virginia and State of Washington. Date of service: 03/25/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Battles, Berns, Boergers, Cahall, DiBattista, Elias, Ikeda, Lenz, McGuire, Nakatsuji, Palma, Shumate, Siegel, Sprung, Totaro, Van Zile, Vogel, Willey; Attorney for Intervenors: Blake, Frazelle, Goldenberg, Gorod, Hammoud, Hanner, Letter, Miller-Ziegler, Olson, Phatak, Shapiro, Stern, Tatelman, Verrilli, Wydra; Attorney for Appellees: Davis, Finkelmeyer, Frederick, Hacker, Hawkins, Henneke, McCarty, White [19-10011] (Samuel Siegel ) [Entered: 03/25/2019 04:45 PM]
March 22, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-10011] (Jeremy Kreisberg ) [Entered: 03/22/2019 01:01 PM]
March 22, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-10011] (Jonathan Meltzer ) [Entered: 03/22/2019 12:59 PM]
March 22, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-10011] (Ginger Anders ) [Entered: 03/22/2019 12:57 PM]
March 21, 2019 MOTION filed by Appellee State of Wisconsin for partial dismissal of appeal as to the issues.. [19-10011] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: MOTION filed by Appellee State of Wisconsin to dismiss the appeal [9010734-2]. Response/Opposition due on 04/01/2019. [19-10011] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: MOTION filed by Appellee State of Wisconsin to dismiss the appeal [9010734-2]. Date of service: 03/21/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Battles, Berns, Boergers, Cahall, DiBattista, Elias, Ikeda, Lenz, McGuire, Nakatsuji, Palma, Shumate, Siegel, Sprung, Totaro, Van Zile, Vogel, Willey; Attorney for Intervenors: Blake, Frazelle, Goldenberg, Gorod, Hammoud, Hanner, Letter, Miller-Ziegler, Olson, Phatak, Shapiro, Stern, Tatelman, Verrilli, Wydra; Attorney for Appellees: Davis, Finkelmeyer, Frederick, Hacker, Hawkins, Henneke, McCarty, White [19-10011] (Corey Francis Finkelmeyer ) [Entered: 03/21/2019 12:27 PM]
March 19, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Corey Francis Finkelmeyer for party(s) Appellee State of Wisconsin, substituted in case 19-10011 in place of Attorneys Andrew Bray Davis for Appellee State of Wisconsin in 19-10011, Attorney David J. Hacker for Appellee State of Wisconsin in 19-10011, Attorney Kyle Douglas Hawkins for Appellee State of Wisconsin in 19-10011, Attorney Darren Lee McCarty for Appellee State of Wisconsin in 19-10011, Attorney Eric A. White for Appellee State of Wisconsin no longer participating in 19-10011 [19-10011] (CMB) [Entered: 03/19/2019 03:28 PM]
March 18, 2019 ATTORNEY NOT PARTICIPATING. Matthew Hamilton Frederick, Eric A. White, Kyle Douglsas Hawkins, Andrew Bray Davis, David J. Hacker, and Darren Lee McCarty is designated as inactive in this case as counsel for State of Wisconsin. Reason:substituted by Assistant Attorney General Corey F. Finkelmeyer. [19-10011] (CMB) [Entered: 03/19/2019 03:45 PM]
March 18, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-10011] (Corey Francis Finkelmeyer ) [Entered: 03/18/2019 02:51 PM]
March 14, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Robert E. Henneke for party(s) Appellee Neill Hurley Appellee John Nantz, in case 19-10011 [19-10011] (AGL) [Entered: 03/14/2019 08:50 AM]
March 12, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-10011] (Robert E. Henneke ) [Entered: 03/12/2019 04:26 PM]
March 7, 2019 DOCUMENT RECEIVED - NO ACTION TAKEN. No action will be taken at this time on the response because not a party to this appeal [19-10011] (RAJ) [Entered: 03/07/2019 04:27 PM]
February 26, 2019 COURT ORDER granting Motion for partial dismissal of appeal filed by Appellees State of Tennessee, State of South Carolina, State of Alabama, State of Louisiana, State of Florida, State of Arkansas, State of Wisconsin, State of South Dakota, State of Georgia, State of Missouri, State of Utah, State of Kansas, State of West Virginia, State of Texas, State of Nebraska, State of Mississippi, State of Arizona, State of Indiana, State of North Dakota and Mr. Paul LePage [ # 8991067-2 ] Involvement terminated for Appellee Paul LePage in 19-10011. [19-10011] (RAJ) [Entered: 02/26/2019 03:25 PM]
February 25, 2019 DOCUMENT RECEIVED - NO ACTION TAKEN. No action will be taken at this time on the Motion for partial dismissal as to Janet Mills received from Appellees State of Alabama, State of Arizona, State of Arkansas, State of Florida, State of Georgia, State of Indiana, State of Kansas, State of Louisiana, State of Mississippi, State of Missouri, State of Nebraska, State of North Dakota, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, State of Tennessee, State of Texas, State of Utah, State of West Virginia and State of Wisconsin because Janet Mills is not a party. [19-10011] (RAJ) [Entered: 02/25/2019 04:05 PM]
February 25, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Kimberly Cahall for party(s) Appellant State of New Jersey, in case 19-10011 [19-10011] (PAC) [Entered: 02/25/2019 02:38 PM]
February 25, 2019 UNOPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellees Mr. Paul LePage, State of Alabama, State of Arizona, State of Arkansas, State of Florida, State of Georgia, State of Indiana, State of Kansas, State of Louisiana, State of Mississippi, State of Missouri, State of Nebraska, State of North Dakota, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, State of Tennessee, State of Texas, State of Utah, State of West Virginia and State of Wisconsin for partial dismissal of appeal as to Paul LePage, Governor of Maine. Date of service: 02/25/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Battles, Berns, Boergers, DiBattista, Elias, Ikeda, Lenz, McGuire, Nakatsuji, Palma, Shumate, Siegel, Sprung, Totaro, Van Zile, Vogel, Willey; Attorney for Intervenors: Blake, Frazelle, Goldenberg, Gorod, Hammoud, Hanner, Letter, Miller-Ziegler, Olson, Phatak, Shapiro, Stern, Tatelman, Verrilli, Wydra; Attorney for Appellees: Davis, Frederick, Hacker, Hawkins, McCarty, White [19-10011] (Kyle Douglas Hawkins ) [Entered: 02/25/2019 08:50 AM]
February 22, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Todd Barry Tatelman for party(s) Intervenor United States House of Representatives, in case 19-10011 [19-10011] (PAC) [Entered: 02/22/2019 11:20 AM]
February 22, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-10011] (Kimberly Cahall ) [Entered: 02/22/2019 10:42 AM]
February 22, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Nathanael Blake for party(s) Intervenor State of Iowa, in case 19-10011 [19-10011] (PAC) [Entered: 02/22/2019 10:16 AM]
February 22, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Maria Rose Lenz for party(s) Appellant State of Rhode Island, in case 19-10011 [19-10011] (PAC) [Entered: 02/22/2019 10:15 AM]
February 21, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Scott H. Ikeda for party(s) Appellant State of Minnesota, in case 19-10011 [19-10011] (NFD) [Entered: 02/21/2019 01:16 PM]
February 21, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-10011] (Nathanael Blake ) [Entered: 02/21/2019 12:35 PM]
February 21, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-10011] (Maria Rose Lenz ) [Entered: 02/21/2019 09:15 AM]
February 20, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-10011] (Scott H. Ikeda ) [Entered: 02/20/2019 11:12 AM]
February 19, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Samuel Siegel for party(s) Appellant State of New Jersey Appellant State of Massachusetts Appellant State of New York Appellant State of Connecticut Appellant State of Oregon Appellant State of Rhode Island Appellant District of Columbia Appellant State of North Carolina Appellant State of Minnesota Appellant State of Vermont Appellant State of Virginia Appellant State of Illinois Appellant State of Delaware Appellant State of Hawaii Appellant State of Kentucky, in case 19-10011 [19-10011] (RLL) [Entered: 02/19/2019 09:20 AM]
February 19, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Fadwa A. Hammoud for party(s) Intervenor State of Michigan, in case 19-10011 [19-10011] (CMB) [Entered: 02/19/2019 08:59 AM]
February 19, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Matthew Joseph Berns for party(s) Appellant State of New Jersey, in case 19-10011 [19-10011] (RLL) [Entered: 02/18/2019 02:02 PM]
February 19, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Robert Tadao Nakatsuji for party(s) Appellant State of Hawaii, in case 19-10011 [19-10011] (RLL) [Entered: 02/18/2019 01:55 PM]
February 15, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Brian Rene Frazelle for party(s) Intervenor United States House of Representatives, in case 19-10011 [19-10011] (CMB) [Entered: 02/15/2019 08:02 AM]
February 15, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Ashwin Pradyumna Phatak for party(s) Intervenor United States House of Representatives, in case 19-10011 [19-10011] (CMB) [Entered: 02/15/2019 07:59 AM]
February 15, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Brianne Gorod for party(s) Intervenor United States House of Representatives, in case 19-10011 [19-10011] (CMB) [Entered: 02/15/2019 07:56 AM]
February 15, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Elizabeth Bonnie Wydra for party(s) Intervenor United States House of Representatives, in case 19-10011 [19-10011] (CMB) [Entered: 02/15/2019 07:54 AM]
February 15, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Rachel Miller-Ziegler for party(s) Intervenor United States House of Representatives, in case 19-10011 [19-10011] (CMB) [Entered: 02/15/2019 07:50 AM]
February 15, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Elaine Goldenberg for party(s) Intervenor United States House of Representatives, in case 19-10011 [19-10011] (CMB) [Entered: 02/15/2019 07:48 AM]
February 15, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Eric Olson for Intervenor State of Colorado in 19-10011 [19-10011] (CMB) [Entered: 02/15/2019 07:45 AM]
February 15, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Heidi Parry Stern for party(s) Intervenor State of Nevada, in case 19-10011 [19-10011] (CMB) [Entered: 02/15/2019 07:40 AM]
February 14, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-10011] (Robert Tadao Nakatsuji ) [Entered: 02/14/2019 05:46 PM]
February 14, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Brooks M. Hanner for party(s) Intervenor United States House of Representatives, in case 19-10011 [19-10011] (CMB) [Entered: 02/14/2019 04:07 PM]
February 14, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Kristin Ann Shapiro for party(s) Intervenor United States House of Representatives, in case 19-10011 [19-10011] (CMB) [Entered: 02/14/2019 04:05 PM]
February 14, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Douglas Neal Letter for party(s) Intervenor United States House of Representatives, in case 19-10011 [19-10011] (CMB) [Entered: 02/14/2019 03:48 PM]
February 14, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Donald B. Verrilli Jr. for Intervenor United States House of Representatives in 19-10011 [19-10011] (CMB) [Entered: 02/14/2019 03:02 PM]
February 14, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-10011] (Matthew Joseph Berns ) [Entered: 02/14/2019 02:46 PM]
February 14, 2019 COURT ORDER denying Motion to expedite appeal filed by Appellants State of Connecticut, State of Illinois, State of Oregon, State of Delaware, State of Virginia, State of California, State of Hawaii, State of North Carolina, State of Rhode Island, State of Washington, State of New York, State of Massachusetts, District of Columbia, State of Vermont, State of Kentucky, State of Minnesota and State of New Jersey [ # 8975481-2 ]; granting Motion to intervene [ # 8974306-2 ] by State of Colorado, State of Iowa, State of Michigan and State of Nevada in 19-10011 [19-10011] (PAC) [Entered: 02/14/2019 02:25 PM]
February 14, 2019 COURT ORDER granting motion to intervene [ # 8954363-2 ] by United States House of Representatives in 19-10011 (IN DETAIL) [19-10011] (PAC) [Entered: 02/14/2019 02:19 PM]
February 14, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Samuel Siegel for State of California and State of Washington for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-10011] (Samuel Siegel ) [Entered: 02/14/2019 11:54 AM]
February 14, 2019 REPLY filed by Appellant State of California [8984219-1] to the Response/Opposition filed by Appellees Mr. Paul LePage, State of Alabama, State of Arizona, State of Arkansas, State of Florida, State of Georgia, State of Indiana, State of Kansas, State of Louisiana, State of Mississippi, State of Missouri, State of Nebraska, State of North Dakota, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, State of Tennessee, State of Texas, State of Utah, State of West Virginia and State of Wisconsin [ # 8981652-2 ]. Date of Service: 02/14/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Battles, Boergers, DiBattista, Elias, McGuire, Palma, Shumate, Siegel, Sprung, Totaro, Van Zile, Vogel, Willey; Attorney for Appellees: Davis, Frederick, Hacker, Hawkins, McCarty, White; Attorney for Not Parties: Olson, Verrilli. [19-10011] (Samuel Siegel ) [Entered: 02/14/2019 11:35 AM]
February 13, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-10011] (Brian Rene Frazelle ) [Entered: 02/13/2019 04:19 PM]
February 13, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-10011] (Ashwin Pradyumna Phatak ) [Entered: 02/13/2019 03:38 PM]
February 13, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-10011] (Brianne Gorod ) [Entered: 02/13/2019 03:32 PM]
February 13, 2019 REPLY filed by Not Party United States House of Representatives [8983547-1] to the Response/Opposition filed by Appellants USA, HHS, Mr. Alex M. Azar, II, Secretary, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, United States Internal Revenue Service and Mr. Charles P. Rettig in 19-10011 [ # 8980145-2 ], to the Motion to intervene [ # 8954363-2 ]. Date of Service: 02/13/2019. [19-10011] (PAC) [Entered: 02/13/2019 02:34 PM]
February 12, 2019 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 03/25/2019 for Appellants Alex M. Azar, II, Secretary, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, District of Columbia, Charles P. Rettig, State of California, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Hawaii, State of Illinois, State of Kentucky, State of Massachusetts, State of Minnesota, State of New Jersey, State of New York, State of North Carolina, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Virginia, State of Washington, United States Department of Health and Human Services, United States Internal Revenue Service and United States of America. [19-10011] (DDL) [Entered: 02/12/2019 12:44 PM]
February 12, 2019 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [19-10011] (DDL) [Entered: 02/12/2019 11:21 AM]
February 11, 2019 RESPONSE/OPPOSITION filed by Mr. Paul LePage, State of Alabama, State of Arizona, State of Arkansas, State of Florida, State of Georgia, State of Indiana, State of Kansas, State of Louisiana, State of Mississippi, State of Missouri, State of Nebraska, State of North Dakota, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, State of Tennessee, State of Texas, State of Utah, State of West Virginia and State of Wisconsin [8981652-1] to the Motion filed by Appellants State of California, District of Columbia, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Hawaii, State of Illinois, State of Kentucky, State of Massachusetts, State of Minnesota, State of New Jersey, State of New York, State of North Carolina, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Virginia and State of Washington [ # 8975481-2 ] Date of Service: 02/11/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Battles, Boergers, DiBattista, Elias, McGuire, Palma, Shumate, Siegel, Sprung, Totaro, Van Zile, Vogel, Willey; Attorney for Appellees: Davis, Frederick, Hacker, Hawkins, McCarty, White; Attorney for Not Parties: Olson, Verrilli. [19-10011] (Kyle Douglas Hawkins ) [Entered: 02/11/2019 04:59 PM]
February 11, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Kathleen Boergers for party(s) Appellant State of California, in case 19-10011 [19-10011] (CMB) [Entered: 02/11/2019 08:15 AM]
February 8, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-10011] (Kathleen Boergers ) [Entered: 02/08/2019 02:02 PM]
February 8, 2019 RESPONSE/OPPOSITION filed by Mr. Alex M. Azar, II, Secretary, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, HHS, Mr. Charles P. Rettig, United States Internal Revenue Service and USA [8980145-1] to the Motion [ # 8954363-2 ] Date of Service: 02/08/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Battles, DiBattista, Elias, McGuire, Palma, Shumate, Siegel, Sprung, Totaro, Van Zile, Vogel, Willey; Attorney for Appellees: Davis, Frederick, Hacker, Hawkins, McCarty, White; Attorney for Not Parties: Olson, Verrilli. [19-10011] (Martin Vincent Totaro ) [Entered: 02/08/2019 01:03 PM]
February 7, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-10011] (Elizabeth Bonnie Wydra ) [Entered: 02/07/2019 03:13 PM]
February 6, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-10011] (Rachel Miller-Ziegler ) [Entered: 02/06/2019 01:13 PM]
February 6, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-10011] (Elaine Goldenberg ) [Entered: 02/06/2019 01:10 PM]
February 5, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Eric Olson for State of Colorado, State of Iowa, State of Michigan and State of Nevada for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-10011] (Eric Olson ) [Entered: 02/05/2019 10:25 AM]
February 4, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-10011] (Heidi Parry Stern ) [Entered: 02/04/2019 05:57 PM]
February 4, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Benjamin Battles for party(s) Appellant State of Vermont, in case 19-10011 [19-10011] (RSM) [Entered: 02/04/2019 02:48 PM]
February 4, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Jeffrey T. Sprung for party(s) Appellant State of Washington, in case 19-10011 [19-10011] (RSM) [Entered: 02/04/2019 02:37 PM]
February 4, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-10011] (Fadwa A. Hammoud ) [Entered: 02/04/2019 01:56 PM]
February 4, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Stephen B. Vogel for party(s) Appellant State of Massachusetts, in case 19-10011 [19-10011] (RSM) [Entered: 02/04/2019 01:52 PM]
February 4, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Jessica Willey for party(s) Appellant State of Delaware, in case 19-10011 [19-10011] (RSM) [Entered: 02/04/2019 01:37 PM]
February 1, 2019 OPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellants District of Columbia, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Hawaii, State of Illinois, State of Kentucky, State of Massachusetts, State of Minnesota, State of New Jersey, State of New York, State of North Carolina, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Virginia and State of Washington to expedite the appeal [8975481-2]. Date of service: 02/01/2019 Response/Opposition due on 02/11/2019. [19-10011] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: OPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellant State of California to expedite the appeal [8975481-2]. Date of service: 02/01/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Davis, Frederick, Hacker, Hawkins, McCarty, White; Attorney for Appellants: DiBattista, Elias, McGuire, Palma, Shumate, Siegel, Totaro, Van Zile; Attorney for Not Parties: Olson, Verrilli [19-10011] (Samuel Siegel ) [Entered: 02/01/2019 05:42 PM]
February 1, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-10011] (Stephen B. Vogel ) [Entered: 02/01/2019 10:47 AM]
January 31, 2019 UNOPPOSED MOTION to intervene filed by State of Colorado, State of Iowa, State of Michigan and State of Nevada, Date of Service: 01/31/2019 Response/Opposition due on 02/11/2019. [19-10011] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: UNOPPOSED MOTION by States of Colorado, Iowa, Michigan, and Nevada to intervene , Date of service: 01/31/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Davis, Frederick, Hacker, Hawkins, McCarty, White; Attorney for Appellants: DiBattista, Elias, McGuire, Palma, Shumate, Siegel, Totaro, Van Zile; Attorney for Not Party: Verrilli [19-10011] (Eric Olson ) [Entered: 01/31/2019 04:52 PM]
January 31, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-10011] (Benjamin Battles ) [Entered: 01/31/2019 10:28 AM]
January 30, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Samuel Siegel for party(s) Appellant State of Washington, in case 19-10011 [19-10011] (RLL) [Entered: 02/19/2019 09:30 AM]
January 30, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-10011] (Jeffrey T. Sprung ) [Entered: 01/30/2019 04:13 PM]
January 30, 2019 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED FROM DISTRICT COURT for 4:18-CV-167. Electronic ROA due on 02/14/2019. [19-10011] (PAC) [Entered: 01/30/2019 08:13 AM]
January 29, 2019 RESPONSE DUE to Motion to intervene [ # 8954363-2 ]Response/Opposition due on 02/08/2019 [19-10011] (RAJ) [Entered: 01/29/2019 09:59 AM]
January 29, 2019 COURT ORDER granting Motion to lift the stay of proceedings in this court filed by Appellants USA, HHS, Mr. Alex M. Azar, II, Secretary, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, United States Internal Revenue Service and Mr. Charles P. Rettig [ # 8970694-2 ] Case 19-10011 was held in abeyance other - See NOTE in this case [19-10011] (RAJ) [Entered: 01/29/2019 09:44 AM]
January 29, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-10011] (Jessica Willey ) [Entered: 01/29/2019 09:23 AM]
January 28, 2019 MOTION filed by Appellants Mr. Alex M. Azar, II, Secretary, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, HHS, Mr. Charles P. Rettig, United States Internal Revenue Service and USA to lift the stay of proceedings in this court [8970694-2]. Date of service: 01/28/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Davis, Frederick, Hacker, Hawkins, McCarty, White; Attorney for Appellants: DiBattista, Elias, McGuire, Palma, Shumate, Siegel, Totaro, Van Zile; Attorney for Not Party: Verrilli [19-10011] (Martin Vincent Totaro ) [Entered: 01/28/2019 03:01 PM]
January 25, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Bridget DiBattista for party(s) Appellant State of Illinois, in case 19-10011 [19-10011] (PAC) [Entered: 01/25/2019 01:49 PM]
January 24, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-10011] (Bridget DiBattista ) [Entered: 01/24/2019 10:37 AM]
January 18, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Caroline Van Zile for party(s) Appellant District of Columbia, in case 19-10011 [19-10011] (CMB) [Entered: 01/18/2019 12:30 PM]
January 17, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Kyle Douglas Hawkins for party(s) Appellee State of Utah Appellee State of West Virginia Appellee State of North Dakota Appellee State of Arkansas Appellee State of Alabama Appellee State of Florida Appellee State of Nebraska Appellee State of Arizona Appellee State of South Carolina Appellee State of Kansas Appellee State of Georgia Appellee State of Missouri Appellee State of Wisconsin Appellee State of South Dakota Appellee State of Indiana Appellee State of Tennessee Appellee State of Texas Appellee Paul LePage Appellee State of Louisiana Appellee State of Mississippi, in case 19-10011 [19-10011] (CMB) [Entered: 01/17/2019 07:50 AM]
January 16, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-10011] (Caroline Van Zile ) [Entered: 01/16/2019 03:00 PM]
January 15, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Matthew Robert McGuire for party(s) Appellant State of Virginia, in case 19-10011 [19-10011] (KGL) [Entered: 01/17/2019 01:28 PM]
January 15, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-10011] (Matthew Robert McGuire ) [Entered: 01/15/2019 12:52 PM]
January 14, 2019 TRANSCRIPT FILED IN DISTRICT COURT Transcript Order: Court Reporter: Shawn McRoberts, Dt. Filed in Dist. Ct: 01/04/2019 [19-10011] (MCS) [Entered: 01/18/2019 09:12 AM]
January 14, 2019 NOTICE RECEIVED that the transcript ordered by Appellant State of California is complete and has been filed in the District Court. [19-10011] (Shawn McRoberts ) [Entered: 01/14/2019 12:07 PM]
January 11, 2019 COURT ORDER granting motion to stay further proceedings in this court in light of lapse of appropriations filed by Appellants USA, HHS, Mr. Alex M. Azar, II, Secretary, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, United States Internal Revenue Service and Mr. Charles P. Rettig. [ # 8956705-2 ] [19-10011] (PAC) [Entered: 01/11/2019 09:28 AM]
January 10, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) David J. Hacker for party(s) Appellee State of Utah Appellee State of West Virginia Appellee State of North Dakota Appellee State of Arkansas Appellee State of Alabama Appellee State of Florida Appellee State of Nebraska Appellee State of Arizona Appellee State of South Carolina Appellee State of Kansas Appellee State of Georgia Appellee State of Missouri Appellee State of Wisconsin Appellee State of South Dakota Appellee State of Indiana Appellee State of Tennessee Appellee State of Texas Appellee Paul LePage Appellee State of Louisiana Appellee State of Mississippi, in case 19-10011 [19-10011] (KGL) [Entered: 01/15/2019 09:55 AM]
January 10, 2019 TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellants District of Columbia, State of California, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Hawaii, State of Illinois, State of Kentucky, State of Massachusetts, State of Minnesota, State of New Jersey, State of New York, State of North Carolina, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Virginia and State of Washington. DETAILS: Transcript Order: Court Reporter: Shawn McRoberts, Proceeding Type and Date: Motion Hearing 09/05/2018. Transcript Order ddl satisfied. Ct. Reporter Acknowledgment due on 01/22/2019 for Shawn McRoberts, Court Reporter. Electronic Filing Processed: [ # 8958349-2 ] [19-10011] (PAC) [Entered: 01/11/2019 09:23 AM]
January 10, 2019 ATTORNEY TRANSCRIPT ORDER form filed by Appellants District of Columbia, State of California, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Hawaii, State of Illinois, State of Kentucky, State of Massachusetts, State of Minnesota, State of New Jersey, State of New York, State of North Carolina, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Virginia and State of Washingtonfor the Court to process. Date of service: 01/10/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Elias, Palma, Shumate, Siegel, Totaro; Attorney for Appellee: McCarty; Attorney for Not Party: Verrilli. [19-10011] (Neli N. Palma ) [Entered: 01/10/2019 04:14 PM]
January 10, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-10011] (David J. Hacker ) [Entered: 01/10/2019 12:06 PM]
January 10, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Neli N. Palma for Appellant State of Minnesota in 19-10011, Attorney Neli N. Palma for Appellant State of Washington in 19-10011, Attorney Neli N. Palma for Appellant State of Virginia in 19-10011, Attorney Neli N. Palma for Appellant State of Vermont in 19-10011, Attorney Neli N. Palma for Appellant State of Rhode Island in 19-10011, Attorney Neli N. Palma for Appellant State of Oregon in 19-10011, Attorney Neli N. Palma for Appellant State of North Carolina in 19-10011, Attorney Neli N. Palma for Appellant State of New York in 19-10011, Attorney Neli N. Palma for Appellant State of New Jersey in 19-10011, Attorney Neli N. Palma for Appellant State of Massachusetts in 19-10011, Attorney Neli N. Palma for Appellant State of Kentucky in 19-10011, Attorney Neli N. Palma for Appellant State of Illinois in 19-10011, Attorney Neli N. Palma for Appellant State of Hawaii in 19-10011, Attorney Neli N. Palma for Appellant State of Delaware in 19-10011, Attorney Neli N. Palma for Appellant District of Columbia in 19-10011, Attorney Neli N. Palma for Appellant State of Connecticut in 19-10011, Attorney Neli N. Palma for Appellant State of California in 19-10011 [19-10011] (CMB) [Entered: 01/10/2019 07:54 AM]
January 10, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Nimrod Elias for party(s) Appellant State of California, in case 19-10011 [19-10011] (CMB) [Entered: 01/10/2019 07:41 AM]
January 9, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Eric A. White for party(s) Appellee State of Utah Appellee State of West Virginia Appellee State of North Dakota Appellee State of Arkansas Appellee State of Alabama Appellee State of Florida Appellee State of Nebraska Appellee State of Arizona Appellee State of South Carolina Appellee State of Kansas Appellee State of Georgia Appellee State of Missouri Appellee State of Wisconsin Appellee State of South Dakota Appellee State of Indiana Appellee State of Tennessee Appellee State of Texas Appellee Paul LePage Appellee State of Louisiana Appellee State of Mississippi, in case 19-10011 [19-10011] (KGL) [Entered: 01/15/2019 09:46 AM]
January 9, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Matthew Hamilton Frederick for party(s) Appellee State of Utah Appellee State of West Virginia Appellee State of North Dakota Appellee State of Arkansas Appellee State of Alabama Appellee State of Florida Appellee State of Nebraska Appellee State of Arizona Appellee State of South Carolina Appellee State of Kansas Appellee State of Georgia Appellee State of Missouri Appellee State of Wisconsin Appellee State of South Dakota Appellee State of Indiana Appellee State of Tennessee Appellee State of Texas Appellee Paul LePage Appellee State of Louisiana Appellee State of Mississippi, in case 19-10011 [19-10011] (KGL) [Entered: 01/15/2019 09:20 AM]
January 9, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Andrew Bray Davis for party(s) Appellee State of Utah Appellee State of West Virginia Appellee State of North Dakota Appellee State of Arkansas Appellee State of Alabama Appellee State of Florida Appellee State of Nebraska Appellee State of Arizona Appellee State of South Carolina Appellee State of Kansas Appellee State of Georgia Appellee State of Missouri Appellee State of Wisconsin Appellee State of South Dakota Appellee State of Indiana Appellee State of Tennessee Appellee State of Texas Appellee Paul LePage Appellee State of Louisiana Appellee State of Mississippi, in case 19-10011 [19-10011] (KGL) [Entered: 01/15/2019 09:12 AM]
January 9, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-10011] (Eric A. White ) [Entered: 01/09/2019 02:14 PM]
January 9, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-10011] (Matthew Hamilton Frederick ) [Entered: 01/09/2019 02:02 PM]
January 9, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-10011] (Andrew Bray Davis ) [Entered: 01/09/2019 01:59 PM]
January 9, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Samuel Siegel for party(s) Appellant State of California, in case 19-10011 [19-10011] (AGL) [Entered: 01/09/2019 12:41 PM]
January 9, 2019 OPPOSED MOTION to stay further proceedings in this court. Reason: in light of lapse of appropriations. Date of service: 01/09/2019 Response/Opposition due on 01/22/2019. [19-10011] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: OPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellants Mr. Alex M. Azar, II, Secretary, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, HHS, Mr. Charles P. Rettig, United States Internal Revenue Service and USA to stay further proceedings in this court.. Date of service: 01/09/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellee: McCarty; Attorney for Appellants: Palma, Shumate, Totaro; Attorney for Not Party: Verrilli [19-10011] (Martin Vincent Totaro ) [Entered: 01/09/2019 11:34 AM]
January 9, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-10011] (Kyle Douglas Hawkins ) [Entered: 01/09/2019 11:27 AM]
January 9, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Martin Vincent Totaro for party(s) Appellant USA Appellant HHS Appellant Charles P. Rettig Appellant Alex M. Azar, II, Secretary, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services Appellant United States Internal Revenue Service, in case 19-10011 [19-10011] (CMB) [Entered: 01/09/2019 11:22 AM]
January 8, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-10011] (Brooks M. Hanner ) [Entered: 01/08/2019 04:00 PM]
January 8, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-10011] (Kristin Ann Shapiro ) [Entered: 01/08/2019 03:58 PM]
January 8, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-10011] (Todd Barry Tatelman ) [Entered: 01/08/2019 03:57 PM]
January 8, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-10011] (Douglas Neal Letter ) [Entered: 01/08/2019 03:54 PM]
January 8, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM received from Ms. Neli N. Palma for District of Columbia, State of California, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Hawaii, State of Illinois, State of Kentucky, State of Massachusetts, State of Minnesota, State of New Jersey, State of New York, State of North Carolina, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Virginia and State of Washington for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-10011] (Neli N. Palma ) [Entered: 01/08/2019 03:50 PM]
January 8, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-10011] (Martin Vincent Totaro ) [Entered: 01/08/2019 02:52 PM]
January 8, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-10011] (Nimrod Elias ) [Entered: 01/08/2019 10:56 AM]
January 7, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-10011] (Samuel Siegel ) [Entered: 01/07/2019 02:43 PM]
January 7, 2019 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process as to the additional appeal filed by Appellants USA, et al. [8954441-2] [19-10011] (PAC) [Entered: 01/07/2019 12:17 PM]
January 7, 2019 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [8954436-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Transcript order due on 01/22/2019 for Appellants District of Columbia, State of California, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Hawaii, State of Illinois, State of Kentucky, State of Massachusetts, State of Minnesota, State of New Jersey, State of New York, State of North Carolina, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Virginia and State of Washington [19-10011] (PAC) [Entered: 01/07/2019 12:13 PM]
January 7, 2019 OPPOSED MOTION to intervene filed by United States House of Representatives, Response/Opposition due on 01/17/2019. [19-10011] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: OPPOSED MOTION by U.S. House of Representatives to intervene , on behalf of U.S. House of Representatives. Date of service: 01/07/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellee: McCarty; Attorney for Appellants: Palma, Shumate [19-10011] (Donald B. Verrilli Jr.) [Entered: 01/07/2019 11:27 AM]
January 7, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-10011] (Donald B. Verrilli Jr.) [Entered: 01/07/2019 11:18 AM]
January 7, 2019 CASE CAPTION updated. Additional appeal filed. [8954130-2] Parties added: Appellants USA, HHS, Alex M. Azar, II, Secretary, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, United States Internal Revenue Service and Charles P. Rettig. NOA filed by Appellants Mr. Charles P. Rettig, United States Internal Revenue Service, Mr. Alex M. Azar, II, Secretary, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, HHS and USA. [8954130-1] [19-10011] (PAC) [Entered: 01/07/2019 09:35 AM]
January 7, 2019 US CIVIL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants District of Columbia, State of California, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Hawaii, State of Illinois, State of Kentucky, State of Massachusetts, State of Minnesota, State of New Jersey, State of New York, State of North Carolina, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Virginia and State of Washington [19-10011] (PAC) [Entered: 01/07/2019 09:04 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State of Texas, et al v. USA, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: STATE OF TENNESSEE
Represented By: Andrew Bray Davis
Represented By: Kyle Douglas Hawkins
Represented By: Darren Lee McCarty Esq.
Represented By: David J. Hacker
Represented By: Matthew Hamilton Frederick
Represented By: Eric A. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: STATE OF WEST VIRGINIA
Represented By: Andrew Bray Davis
Represented By: Kyle Douglas Hawkins
Represented By: Darren Lee McCarty Esq.
Represented By: David J. Hacker
Represented By: Matthew Hamilton Frederick
Represented By: Eric A. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: STATE OF LOUISIANA
Represented By: Andrew Bray Davis
Represented By: Kyle Douglas Hawkins
Represented By: Darren Lee McCarty Esq.
Represented By: David J. Hacker
Represented By: Matthew Hamilton Frederick
Represented By: Eric A. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: STATE OF ARIZONA
Represented By: Andrew Bray Davis
Represented By: Kyle Douglas Hawkins
Represented By: Darren Lee McCarty Esq.
Represented By: David J. Hacker
Represented By: Matthew Hamilton Frederick
Represented By: Eric A. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: STATE OF NORTH DAKOTA
Represented By: Andrew Bray Davis
Represented By: Kyle Douglas Hawkins
Represented By: Darren Lee McCarty Esq.
Represented By: David J. Hacker
Represented By: Matthew Hamilton Frederick
Represented By: Eric A. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: STATE OF NEBRASKA
Represented By: Andrew Bray Davis
Represented By: Kyle Douglas Hawkins
Represented By: Darren Lee McCarty Esq.
Represented By: David J. Hacker
Represented By: Matthew Hamilton Frederick
Represented By: Eric A. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: STATE OF KANSAS
Represented By: Andrew Bray Davis
Represented By: Kyle Douglas Hawkins
Represented By: Darren Lee McCarty Esq.
Represented By: David J. Hacker
Represented By: Matthew Hamilton Frederick
Represented By: Eric A. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JOHN NANTZ
Represented By: Darren Lee McCarty Esq.
Represented By: Robert E. Henneke
Represented By: Munera Al-Fuhaid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: STATE OF SOUTH CAROLINA
Represented By: Andrew Bray Davis
Represented By: Kyle Douglas Hawkins
Represented By: Darren Lee McCarty Esq.
Represented By: David J. Hacker
Represented By: Matthew Hamilton Frederick
Represented By: Eric A. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: STATE OF MISSISSIPPI, by and through Governor Phil Bryant
Represented By: Andrew Bray Davis
Represented By: Kyle Douglas Hawkins
Represented By: Darren Lee McCarty Esq.
Represented By: David J. Hacker
Represented By: Matthew Hamilton Frederick
Represented By: Eric A. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: NEILL HURLEY
Represented By: Darren Lee McCarty Esq.
Represented By: Robert E. Henneke
Represented By: Munera Al-Fuhaid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: STATE OF ARKANSAS
Represented By: Andrew Bray Davis
Represented By: Kyle Douglas Hawkins
Represented By: Darren Lee McCarty Esq.
Represented By: David J. Hacker
Represented By: Matthew Hamilton Frederick
Represented By: Eric A. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: STATE OF TEXAS
Represented By: Andrew Bray Davis
Represented By: Kyle Douglas Hawkins
Represented By: Darren Lee McCarty Esq.
Represented By: David J. Hacker
Represented By: Matthew Hamilton Frederick
Represented By: Eric A. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: STATE OF ALABAMA
Represented By: Andrew Bray Davis
Represented By: Kyle Douglas Hawkins
Represented By: Darren Lee McCarty Esq.
Represented By: David J. Hacker
Represented By: Matthew Hamilton Frederick
Represented By: Eric A. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: STATE OF WISCONSIN
Represented By: Andrew Bray Davis
Represented By: Kyle Douglas Hawkins
Represented By: Darren Lee McCarty Esq.
Represented By: David J. Hacker
Represented By: Matthew Hamilton Frederick
Represented By: Eric A. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: STATE OF SOUTH DAKOTA
Represented By: Andrew Bray Davis
Represented By: Kyle Douglas Hawkins
Represented By: Darren Lee McCarty Esq.
Represented By: David J. Hacker
Represented By: Matthew Hamilton Frederick
Represented By: Eric A. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: STATE OF GEORGIA
Represented By: Andrew Bray Davis
Represented By: Kyle Douglas Hawkins
Represented By: Darren Lee McCarty Esq.
Represented By: David J. Hacker
Represented By: Matthew Hamilton Frederick
Represented By: Eric A. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: STATE OF UTAH
Represented By: Andrew Bray Davis
Represented By: Kyle Douglas Hawkins
Represented By: Darren Lee McCarty Esq.
Represented By: David J. Hacker
Represented By: Matthew Hamilton Frederick
Represented By: Eric A. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: PAUL LEPAGE, Governor of Maine
Represented By: Andrew Bray Davis
Represented By: Kyle Douglas Hawkins
Represented By: Darren Lee McCarty Esq.
Represented By: David J. Hacker
Represented By: Matthew Hamilton Frederick
Represented By: Eric A. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: STATE OF FLORIDA
Represented By: Andrew Bray Davis
Represented By: Kyle Douglas Hawkins
Represented By: Darren Lee McCarty Esq.
Represented By: David J. Hacker
Represented By: Matthew Hamilton Frederick
Represented By: Eric A. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: STATE OF MISSOURI
Represented By: Andrew Bray Davis
Represented By: Kyle Douglas Hawkins
Represented By: Darren Lee McCarty Esq.
Represented By: David J. Hacker
Represented By: Matthew Hamilton Frederick
Represented By: Eric A. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: STATE OF INDIANA
Represented By: Andrew Bray Davis
Represented By: Kyle Douglas Hawkins
Represented By: Darren Lee McCarty Esq.
Represented By: David J. Hacker
Represented By: Matthew Hamilton Frederick
Represented By: Eric A. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
Represented By: Samuel Siegel
Represented By: Caroline Van Zile Esq.
Represented By: Neli N. Palma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: STATE OF CONNECTICUT
Represented By: Samuel Siegel
Represented By: Neli N. Palma
Represented By: Joseph Rubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: STATE OF MINNESOTA
Represented By: Samuel Siegel
Represented By: Neli N. Palma
Represented By: Scott H. Ikeda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: STATE OF RHODE ISLAND
Represented By: Samuel Siegel
Represented By: Neli N. Palma
Represented By: Maria Rose Lenz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: STATE OF MASSACHUSETTS
Represented By: Samuel Siegel
Represented By: Stephen B. Vogel
Represented By: Neli N. Palma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: STATE OF OREGON
Represented By: Samuel Siegel
Represented By: Neli N. Palma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA
Represented By: Samuel Siegel
Represented By: Neli N. Palma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: STATE OF ILLINOIS
Represented By: Samuel Siegel
Represented By: Bridget DiBattista
Represented By: Neli N. Palma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: STATE OF NEW YORK
Represented By: Samuel Siegel
Represented By: Neli N. Palma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: STATE OF VIRGINIA
Represented By: Samuel Siegel
Represented By: Matthew Robert McGuire
Represented By: Neli N. Palma
Represented By: Michelle Shane Kallen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: STATE OF WASHINGTON
Represented By: Samuel Siegel
Represented By: Neli N. Palma
Represented By: Jeffrey T. Sprung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: STATE OF KENTUCKY
Represented By: Samuel Siegel
Represented By: Neli N. Palma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: STATE OF VERMONT
Represented By: Samuel Siegel
Represented By: Benjamin Battles
Represented By: Neli N. Palma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: STATE OF DELAWARE
Represented By: Samuel Siegel
Represented By: Neli N. Palma
Represented By: Jessica Willey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: STATE OF NEW JERSEY
Represented By: Samuel Siegel
Represented By: Matthew Joseph Berns
Represented By: Neli N. Palma
Represented By: Kimberly Cahall
Represented By: Marie Soueid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: STATE OF HAWAII
Represented By: Samuel Siegel
Represented By: Robert Tadao Nakatsuji
Represented By: Neli N. Palma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: STATE OF CALIFORNIA
Represented By: Samuel Siegel
Represented By: Kathleen Boergers
Represented By: Nimrod Elias
Represented By: Neli N. Palma
Represented By: Edward C. DuMont
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Brett Shumate
Represented By: Martin Vincent Totaro
Represented By: August E. Flentje
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: UNITED STATES INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE
Represented By: Brett Shumate
Represented By: Martin Vincent Totaro
Represented By: August E. Flentje
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Represented By: Brett Shumate
Represented By: Martin Vincent Totaro
Represented By: August E. Flentje
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: CHARLES P. RETTIG, in his Official Capacity as Commissioner of Internal Revenue
Represented By: Brett Shumate
Represented By: Martin Vincent Totaro
Represented By: August E. Flentje
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: ALEX M. AZAR, II, SECRETARY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Represented By: Brett Shumate
Represented By: Martin Vincent Totaro
Represented By: August E. Flentje
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: STATE OF COLORADO
Represented By: Eric Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: STATE OF IOWA
Represented By: Eric Olson
Represented By: Nathanael Blake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: UNITED STATES HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES
Represented By: Brooks M. Hanner
Represented By: Ashwin Pradyumna Phatak
Represented By: Elaine Goldenberg
Represented By: Donald B. Verrilli Jr.
Represented By: Douglas Neal Letter Esq.
Represented By: Rachel Miller-Ziegler
Represented By: Kristin Ann Shapiro
Represented By: Brianne Gorod
Represented By: Elizabeth Bonnie Wydra
Represented By: Brian Rene Frazelle
Represented By: Todd Barry Tatelman
Represented By: Jonathan Meltzer
Represented By: Jeremy Kreisberg
Represented By: Ginger Anders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: STATE OF MICHIGAN
Represented By: Fadwa A. Hammoud
Represented By: Eric Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: STATE OF NEVADA
Represented By: Heidi Parry Stern
Represented By: Eric Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF OHIO
Represented By: Benjamin Michael Flowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: 483 FEDERALLY RECOGNIZED TRIBAL NATIONS
Represented By: John T. Kitchens Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ILYA SOMIN
Represented By: Joshua L. Hedrick
Represented By: Michael Qian
Represented By: Joseph R. Palmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: JUSTICE IN AGING
Represented By: Maame Gyamfi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: SAMUEL L. BRAY
Represented By: Raffi Melkonian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: GLMA HEALTH PROFESSIONALS ADVANCING LGBT EQUALITY
Represented By: Catherine M. Masters
Represented By: Jack R. Bierig Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NATIONAL ALLIANCE ON MENTAL ILLNESS
Represented By: Beth Bivans Petronio Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: COMMUNITY CATALYST
Represented By: Margaret Dotzel
Represented By: William B. Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NICHOLAS BAGLEY
Represented By: Joshua L. Hedrick
Represented By: Michael Qian
Represented By: Joseph R. Palmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: WALTER DELLINGER
Represented By: Caitlin Joan Halligan
Represented By: Jessica Elaine Underwood
Represented By: Ryan Wolfe Allison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ALLIANCE OF COMMUNITY HEALTH PLANS
Represented By: A. Xavier Baker
Represented By: Daniel W. Wolff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMERICAN OSTEOPATHIC ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Catherine M. Masters
Represented By: Jack R. Bierig Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF PEOPLE WITH DISABILITIES
Represented By: Wade Carr
Represented By: Peter J. Anthony
Represented By: Richard Salgado Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CYSTIC FIBROSIS FOUNDATION
Represented By: Beth Bivans Petronio Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NATIONAL HEALTH LAW PROGRAM
Represented By: Margaret Dotzel
Represented By: William B. Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CENTER FOR MEDICARE ADVOCACY
Represented By: Maame Gyamfi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CHILDREN'S PARTNERSHIP
Represented By: Stuart F. Delery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: KENNEDY FORUM
Represented By: Beth Bivans Petronio Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ASSOCIATION FOR COMMUNITY AFFILIATED PLANS
Represented By: A. Xavier Baker
Represented By: Daniel W. Wolff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: HCA HEALTHCARE, INCORPORATED
Represented By: Paige Jennings
Represented By: David Meir Zionts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF CHILD AND ADOLESCENT PSYCHIATRY
Represented By: Catherine M. Masters
Represented By: Jack R. Bierig Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR METABOLIC AND BARIATRIC SURGERY
Represented By: Catherine M. Masters
Represented By: Jack R. Bierig Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMERICAN SOCIETY OF HEMATOLOGY
Represented By: Catherine M. Masters
Represented By: Jack R. Bierig Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMERICAN LUNG ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Beth Bivans Petronio Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF RETIRED PERSONS
Represented By: Maame Gyamfi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: RENAL PHYSICIANS ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Catherine M. Masters
Represented By: Jack R. Bierig Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NATIONAL WOMEN'S LAW CENTER
Represented By: Jaime Santos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CROHN'S AND COLITIS FOUNDATION
Represented By: Beth Bivans Petronio Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: HEMOPHILIA FEDERATION OF AMERICA
Represented By: Beth Bivans Petronio Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMERICAN CANCER SOCIETY CANCER ACTION NETWORK
Represented By: Beth Bivans Petronio Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMERICA'S HEALTH INSURANCE PLANS
Represented By: Z.W. Julius Chen
Represented By: Pratik A. Shah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMERICAN HEART ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Beth Bivans Petronio Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMERICAN COLLEGE OF CORRECTIONAL PHYSICIANS
Represented By: Catherine M. Masters
Represented By: Jack R. Bierig Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMERICAN COLLEGE OF OBSTETRICIANS AND GYNECOLOGISTS
Represented By: Catherine M. Masters
Represented By: Jack R. Bierig Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: KEVIN C. WALSH
Represented By: Raffi Melkonian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ABBE R. GLUCK
Represented By: Joshua L. Hedrick
Represented By: Michael Qian
Represented By: Joseph R. Palmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ELEVEN OTHER LEADING NATIONAL DISABILITY RIGHTS ORGANIZATIONS
Represented By: Wade Carr
Represented By: Peter J. Anthony
Represented By: Richard Salgado Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: BLUE CROSS BLUE SHIELD ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Kenneth Lee Blalack II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF RETIRED PERSONS FOUNDATION
Represented By: Maame Gyamfi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: MICHAEL W. MCCONNELL
Represented By: Raffi Melkonian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NATIONAL HEMOPHILIA FOUNDATION
Represented By: Beth Bivans Petronio Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: DOUGLAS LAYCOCK
Represented By: Caitlin Joan Halligan
Represented By: Jessica Elaine Underwood
Represented By: Ryan Wolfe Allison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMERICAN COLLEGE OF RADIATION ONCOLOGY
Represented By: Catherine M. Masters
Represented By: Jack R. Bierig Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NATIONAL COALITION FOR CANCER SURVIVORSHIP
Represented By: Beth Bivans Petronio Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ASTHMA AND IMMUNOLOGY
Represented By: Catherine M. Masters
Represented By: Jack R. Bierig Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: 35 COUNTIES, CITIES, AND TOWNS
Represented By: Lorraine Alofa Van Kirk
Represented By: Benna Ruth Solomon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: GLOBAL HEALTHY LIVING FOUNDATION
Represented By: Beth Bivans Petronio Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: DISABILITY RIGHTS EDUCATION AND DEFENSE FUND
Represented By: Wade Carr
Represented By: Peter J. Anthony
Represented By: Richard Salgado Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: MARCH OF DIMES
Represented By: Beth Bivans Petronio Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMERICAN GERIATRICS SOCIETY
Represented By: Catherine M. Masters
Represented By: Jack R. Bierig Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: FIRST FOCUS
Represented By: Stuart F. Delery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: LEUKEMIA AND LYMPHOMA SOCIETY
Represented By: Beth Bivans Petronio Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMERICAN DIABETES ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Beth Bivans Petronio Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF MONTANA
Represented By: Benjamin Michael Flowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CALIFORNIA STATE ASSOCIATION OF COUNTIES
Represented By: Lorraine Alofa Van Kirk
Represented By: Benna Ruth Solomon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: JUDGE DAVID L BAZELON CENTER FOR MENTAL HEALTH LAW
Represented By: Wade Carr
Represented By: Peter J. Anthony
Represented By: Richard Salgado Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: FEDERATION OF AMERICAN HOSPITALS
Represented By: Sean Michael Marotta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF PUBLIC HEALTH PHYSICIANS
Represented By: Catherine M. Masters
Represented By: Jack R. Bierig Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ASSOCIATION OF AMERICAN MEDICAL COLLEGES
Represented By: Sean Michael Marotta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: BIPARTISAN ECONOMIC SCHOLARS
Represented By: Matthew S. Hellman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: JONATHAN H. ADLER
Represented By: Joshua L. Hedrick
Represented By: Michael Qian
Represented By: Joseph R. Palmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMERICAN ACADEMY OF ALLERGY
Represented By: Catherine M. Masters
Represented By: Jack R. Bierig Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMERICAN MEDICAL ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Catherine M. Masters
Represented By: Jack R. Bierig Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: FAMILIES USA
Represented By: Margaret Dotzel
Represented By: William B. Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMERICAN COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS
Represented By: Catherine M. Masters
Represented By: Jack R. Bierig Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NATIONAL MULTIPLE SCLEROSIS SOCIETY
Represented By: Beth Bivans Petronio Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CENTER ON BUDGET AND POLICY PRIORITIES
Represented By: Margaret Dotzel
Represented By: William B. Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMERICAN CANCER SOCIETY
Represented By: Beth Bivans Petronio Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: BLACK WOMEN'S HEALTH IMPERATIVE
Represented By: Jaime Santos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMERICAN ACADEMY OF FAMILY PHYSICIANS
Represented By: Catherine M. Masters
Represented By: Jack R. Bierig Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CATHOLIC HEALTH ASSOCIATION OF THE UNITED STATES
Represented By: Sean Michael Marotta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION
Represented By: Wade Carr
Represented By: Peter J. Anthony
Represented By: Richard Salgado Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMERICAN HOSPITAL ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Sean Michael Marotta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMERICAN MEDICAL WOMEN'S ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Catherine M. Masters
Represented By: Jack R. Bierig Esq.
Represented By: Jaime Santos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: SMALL BUSINESS MAJORITY FOUNDATION
Represented By: Hyland Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NATIONAL PARTNERSHIP FOR WOMEN AND FAMILIES
Represented By: Jaime Santos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMERICAN PSYCHIATRIC ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Catherine M. Masters
Represented By: Jack R. Bierig Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: SERVICE EMPLOYEES INTERNATIONAL UNION
Represented By: Margaret Dotzel
Represented By: William B. Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: EPILEPSY FOUNDATION
Represented By: Beth Bivans Petronio Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: 24 STATE HOSPITALS ASSOCIATIONS
Represented By: Nicholas M. DiCarlo
Represented By: William B. Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMERICAN ACADEMY OF PEDIATRICS
Represented By: Catherine M. Masters
Represented By: Jack R. Bierig Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMERICA'S ESSENTIAL HOSPITALS
Represented By: Sean Michael Marotta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMERICAN BUSINESS DEFENSE FOUNDATION
Represented By: William Jeffrey Olson Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: RESTORING LIBERTY ACTION COMMITTEE
Represented By: William Jeffrey Olson Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ASSOCIATION OF AMERICAN PHYSICIANS & SURGEONS AND CITIZENS' COUNCIL FOR HEALTH FREEDOM
Represented By: Andrew Layton Schlafly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: DOWNSIZE DC FOUNDATION
Represented By: William Jeffrey Olson Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CONSERVATIVE LEGAL DEFENSE AND EDUCATION FUND
Represented By: William Jeffrey Olson Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CITIZENS UNITED FOUNDATION
Represented By: William Jeffrey Olson Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: GUN OWNERS FOUNDATION
Represented By: William Jeffrey Olson Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: GUN OWNERS OF AMERICA, INCORPORATED
Represented By: William Jeffrey Olson Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: DOWNSIZE DC.ORG
Represented By: William Jeffrey Olson Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: FITZGERALD GRIFFIN FOUNDATION
Represented By: William Jeffrey Olson Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: 60 PLUS FOUNDATION
Represented By: William Jeffrey Olson Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: 60 PLUS ASSOCIATION
Represented By: William Jeffrey Olson Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: EBERLE COMMUNICATIONS GROUP, INCORPORATED
Represented By: William Jeffrey Olson Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CITIZENS UNITED
Represented By: William Jeffrey Olson Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: FOUNDATION FOR MORAL LAW
Represented By: John Allen Eidsmoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMERICAN CENTER FOR LAW AND JUSTICE
Represented By: Jay A. Sekulow Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?