Gen Land Off of the St of TX v. U.S. Fish and Wildlife, Svc, et al
Defendant / Appellee: RYAN ZINKE, in his official capacity as Secretary for the United States of the Interior, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, UNITED STATES FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE, DAVID BERNHARDT, ACTING SECRETARY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, in his official capacity as Secretary for the United States of the Interior, AMY LUEDERS, in her official capacity as Southwest Regional Director U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service and GREG SHEEHAN, in his official capacity as Acting Director of the U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service
Plaintiff / Appellant: GENERAL LAND OFFICE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS
Amicus Curiae: AMERICAN STEWARDS OF LIBERTY, STATE OF TEXAS and TEXAS SENATOR DONNA CAMPBELL
Case Number: 19-50178
Filed: March 6, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
January 15, 2020 Summary General Land Office of the State of Texas v. United States Department of the Interior

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 2, 2019 Paper copies of Amicus Brief filed by State of Texas in 19-50178 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes # of Copies Provided: 7. Paper Copies of Brief due deadline satisfied. [19-50178] (SBS) [Entered: 05/03/2019 09:03 AM]
May 1, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Sean Daniel Jordan for party(s) Amicus Curiae Donna Campbell, in case 19-50178 [19-50178] (CMB) [Entered: 05/01/2019 04:18 PM]
May 1, 2019 PROPOSED SUFFICIENT BRIEF filed by Amicus Curiae Ms. Donna Campbell [ # 9039809-2 ] Date of service: 05/01/2019 via email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Aston, Barho, Bennett, Weiland; Attorney for Appellees: Cooper, Durkee, Yowell; Attorney for Appellants: Hadzi-Antich, Henneke, Walters; US mail - Attorney for Appellee: Flanagan [19-50178] (Adam Warren Aston ) [Entered: 05/01/2019 10:52 AM]
May 1, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Amelia G. Yowell for party(s) Appellee Amy Lueders Appellee United States Department of the Interior Appellee Greg Sheehan Appellee David Bernhardt, Acting Secretary, U.S. Department of the Interior Appellee United States Fish and Wildlife Service, in case 19-50178 [19-50178] (CMB) [Entered: 05/01/2019 10:04 AM]
May 1, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Rebecca Barho for party(s) Amicus Curiae American Stewards of Liberty, in case 19-50178 [19-50178] (CMB) [Entered: 05/01/2019 09:32 AM]
May 1, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Paul Stanley Weiland for Amicus Curiae American Stewards of Liberty in 19-50178 [19-50178] (CMB) [Entered: 05/01/2019 09:30 AM]
May 1, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Adam Warren Aston for party(s) Amicus Curiae Donna Campbell, in case 19-50178 [19-50178] (CMB) [Entered: 05/01/2019 08:09 AM]
April 30, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Lisa Bennett for party(s) Amicus Curiae State of Texas, in case 19-50178 [19-50178] (CMB) [Entered: 04/30/2019 04:17 PM]
April 29, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-50178] (Rebecca Barho ) [Entered: 04/29/2019 06:37 PM]
April 29, 2019 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF FILED by American Stewards of Liberty. The Consent is Included in the Brief. # of Copies Provided: 0 Paper Copies of Brief due on 05/06/2019 for Amicus Curiae American Stewards of Liberty. [19-50178] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF FILED by American Stewards of Liberty. Date of service: 04/29/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Cooper, Durkee, Flanagan; Attorney for Appellants: Hadzi-Antich, Henneke, Walters; US mail - Attorney for Appellee: Flanagan [19-50178] (Paul Stanley Weiland ) [Entered: 04/29/2019 06:26 PM]
April 29, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-50178] (Paul Stanley Weiland ) [Entered: 04/29/2019 06:07 PM]
April 29, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-50178] (Amelia G. Yowell ) [Entered: 04/29/2019 04:05 PM]
April 29, 2019 SUFFICIENT AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF FILED by Ms. Donna Campbell. The Consent is Included in the Brief. # of Copies Provided: 0 Sufficient Brief deadline satisfied. Paper Copies of Brief due on 05/06/2019 for Amicus Curiae Donna Campbell. [19-50178] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF FILED by Ms. Donna Campbell. The Consent is Included in the Brief. Brief NOT Sufficient as it requires a Cert of Int Parties. Instructions to Attorney: PLEASE READ THE ATTACHED NOTICE FOR INSTRUCTIONS ON HOW TO REMEDY THE DEFAULT. # of Copies Provided: 0 Sufficient Brief due on 05/13/2019 for Amicus Curiae Donna Campbell. [19-50178] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF FILED by Texas Senator Donna Campbell. Date of service: 04/29/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Cooper, Durkee; Attorney for Appellants: Hadzi-Antich, Henneke, Walters; US mail - Attorney for Appellee: Flanagan [19-50178] (Adam Warren Aston ) [Entered: 04/29/2019 03:23 PM]
April 29, 2019 Paper copies of Record Excerpts filed by Appellant General Land Office of the State of Texas in 19-50178 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes # of Copies Provided: 4. Paper Copies of Record Excerpts due deadline satisfied. [19-50178] (SBS) [Entered: 04/29/2019 02:06 PM]
April 29, 2019 Paper copies of Appellant Brief filed by Appellant General Land Office of the State of Texas in 19-50178 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes # of Copies Provided: 7. Paper Copies of Brief due deadline satisfied. [19-50178] (SBS) [Entered: 04/29/2019 02:05 PM]
April 29, 2019 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF FILED by State of Texas. Consent is Not Necessary as Amicus is a Government Entity. # of Copies Provided: 0 Paper Copies of Brief due on 05/06/2019 for Amicus Curiae State of Texas. [19-50178] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF FILED by The State of Texas. Date of service: 04/29/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Cooper, Durkee, Flanagan; Attorney for Appellants: Hadzi-Antich, Henneke, Walters [19-50178] (Lisa Bennett ) [Entered: 04/29/2019 01:59 PM]
April 25, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-50178] (Sean Daniel Jordan ) [Entered: 04/25/2019 12:19 PM]
April 25, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-50178] (Adam Warren Aston ) [Entered: 04/25/2019 12:17 PM]
April 24, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-50178] (Lisa Bennett ) [Entered: 04/24/2019 04:29 PM]
April 22, 2019 RECORD EXCERPTS FILED. # of Copies Provided: 0 Paper Copies of Record Excerpts due on 04/29/2019 for Appellant General Land Office of the State of Texas. [19-50178] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: RECORD EXCERPTS FILED by Appellant General Land Office of the State of Texas. Date of service: 04/22/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Cooper, Durkee; Attorney for Appellants: Hadzi-Antich, Henneke, Walters; US mail - Attorney for Appellee: Flanagan [19-50178] (Theodore Hadzi-Antich ) [Entered: 04/22/2019 02:42 PM]
April 22, 2019 APPELLANT'S BRIEF FILED # of Copies Provided: 0 A/Pet's Brief deadline satisfied. Appellee's Brief due on 05/22/2019 for Appellees David Bernhardt, Acting Secretary, U.S. Department of the Interior, Amy Lueders, Greg Sheehan, United States Department of the Interior and United States Fish and Wildlife Service. Paper Copies of Brief due on 04/29/2019 for Appellant General Land Office of the State of Texas. [19-50178] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: APPELLANT'S BRIEF FILED by General Land Office of the State of Texas. Date of service: 04/22/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Cooper, Durkee; Attorney for Appellants: Hadzi-Antich, Henneke, Walters; US mail - Attorney for Appellee: Flanagan [19-50178] (Theodore Hadzi-Antich ) [Entered: 04/22/2019 02:40 PM]
April 19, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Ellen J. Durkee for party(s) Appellee Amy Lueders Appellee United States Department of the Interior Appellee Greg Sheehan Appellee David Bernhardt, Acting Secretary, U.S. Department of the Interior Appellee United States Fish and Wildlife Service, in case 19-50178 [19-50178] (RSM) [Entered: 04/19/2019 08:06 AM]
April 18, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-50178] (Ellen J. Durkee ) [Entered: 04/18/2019 04:07 PM]
March 14, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Ryan Daniel Walters for party(s) Appellant General Land Office of the State of Texas, in case 19-50178 [19-50178] (AGL) [Entered: 03/14/2019 08:55 AM]
March 13, 2019 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 04/22/2019 for Appellant General Land Office of the State of Texas. [19-50178] (DDL) [Entered: 03/13/2019 03:04 PM]
March 13, 2019 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [19-50178] (DDL) [Entered: 03/13/2019 02:58 PM]
March 13, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Robert E. Henneke for Appellant General Land Office of the State of Texas in 19-50178 [19-50178] (AGL) [Entered: 03/13/2019 10:04 AM]
March 13, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Theodore Hadzi-Antich for party(s) Appellant General Land Office of the State of Texas, in case 19-50178 [19-50178] (AGL) [Entered: 03/13/2019 10:03 AM]
March 12, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-50178] (Ryan Daniel Walters ) [Entered: 03/12/2019 04:42 PM]
March 11, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Robert E. Henneke for General Land Office of the State of Texas for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-50178] (Robert E. Henneke ) [Entered: 03/11/2019 04:58 PM]
March 11, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-50178] (Theodore Hadzi-Antich ) [Entered: 03/11/2019 03:49 PM]
March 7, 2019 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED FROM DISTRICT COURT for 1:17-CV-538. Electronic ROA due on 03/22/2019. [19-50178] (CMB) [Entered: 03/07/2019 03:12 PM]
March 7, 2019 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [8999549-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [19-50178] (CMB) [Entered: 03/07/2019 03:09 PM]
March 7, 2019 CASE CAPTION updated. Appellee Ryan Zinke in 19-50178 substituted by Appellee David Bernhardt, Acting Secretary, U.S. Department of the Interior in 19-50178 [19-50178] (CMB) [Entered: 03/07/2019 03:07 PM]
March 6, 2019 US CIVIL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant General Land Office of the State of Texas [19-50178] (CMB) [Entered: 03/06/2019 09:49 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Gen Land Off of the St of TX v. U.S. Fish and Wildlife, Svc, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RYAN ZINKE, in his official capacity as Secretary for the United States of the Interior
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
Represented By: Devon L. Flanagan
Represented By: Charles Kneeland Cooper IV
Represented By: Amelia G. Yowell
Represented By: Ellen J. Durkee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITED STATES FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE
Represented By: Devon L. Flanagan
Represented By: Charles Kneeland Cooper IV
Represented By: Amelia G. Yowell
Represented By: Ellen J. Durkee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DAVID BERNHARDT, ACTING SECRETARY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, in his official capacity as Secretary for the United States of the Interior
Represented By: Devon L. Flanagan
Represented By: Charles Kneeland Cooper IV
Represented By: Amelia G. Yowell
Represented By: Ellen J. Durkee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AMY LUEDERS, in her official capacity as Southwest Regional Director U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service
Represented By: Devon L. Flanagan
Represented By: Amelia G. Yowell
Represented By: Ellen J. Durkee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GREG SHEEHAN, in his official capacity as Acting Director of the U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service
Represented By: Devon L. Flanagan
Represented By: Amelia G. Yowell
Represented By: Ellen J. Durkee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: GENERAL LAND OFFICE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS
Represented By: Robert E. Henneke
Represented By: Theodore Hadzi-Antich
Represented By: Ryan Daniel Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMERICAN STEWARDS OF LIBERTY
Represented By: Paul Stanley Weiland Esq.
Represented By: Rebecca Barho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF TEXAS
Represented By: Lisa Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: TEXAS SENATOR DONNA CAMPBELL
Represented By: Adam Warren Aston
Represented By: Sean Daniel Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?