Reagan Natl Advtsng of Austin, et al v. City of Austin
Not Yet Classified: LAMAR ADVANTAGE OUTDOOR COMPANY, L.P., doing business as The Lamar Companies
Plaintiff / Appellant: REAGAN NATIONAL ADVERTISING OF AUSTIN, INCORPORATED
Defendant / Appellee: CITY OF AUSTIN
Case Number: 19-50354
Filed: April 25, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
August 26, 2020 Summary Reagan National Advertising of Austin, Inc. v. City of Austin

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2019 SUPPLEMENTAL ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [19-50354] (AS) [Entered: 06/14/2019 12:40 PM]
June 11, 2019 SUPPLEMENTAL ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED FROM DISTRICT COURT for 1:17-CV-673 (Specifically, the supplemental electronic record on appeal must contain District Court document# 56, filed 05/26/2019, which is the 2nd portion of the 06/26/2018 Bench Trial Hearing filed by Court Reporter Lily I. Reznik). Supplemental Electronic ROA due on 06/26/2019. [19-50354] (DLJ) [Entered: 06/11/2019 03:50 PM]
May 31, 2019 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 07/10/2019 for Appellants Lamar Advantage Outdoor Company, L.P. and Reagan National Advertising of Austin, Incorporated. [19-50354] (MRW) [Entered: 05/31/2019 08:49 AM]
May 31, 2019 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [19-50354] (MRW) [Entered: 05/31/2019 08:48 AM]
May 30, 2019 TRANSCRIPT FILED IN DISTRICT COURT [19-50354] (RLL) [Entered: 05/30/2019 03:52 PM]
May 28, 2019 NOTICE RECEIVED that the transcript ordered by Appellant Reagan National Advertising of Austin, Incorporated is complete and has been filed in the District Court. [19-50354] (Pamela Joy Andasola ) [Entered: 05/28/2019 10:12 AM]
May 20, 2019 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED FROM DISTRICT COURT for 1:17-CV-673. Electronic ROA due on 06/03/2019. [19-50354] (MFY) [Entered: 05/20/2019 04:30 PM]
May 20, 2019 TRANSCRIPT FILED IN DISTRICT COURT Transcript Order: Court Reporter: Lily Iva Reznik, Dt. Filed in Dist. Ct: 05/19/2019 ; Transcript Order: Court Reporter: Pamela Joy Andasola, Dt. Filed in Dist. Ct: 05/19/2019 [19-50354] (MFY) [Entered: 05/20/2019 04:28 PM]
May 20, 2019 ACKNOWLEDGMENT received on 4/26/19 Transcript Order: Court Reporter: Lily Iva Reznik, Est. Completion Dt: 05/28/2019, Est. No.of Pgs: 18, Dt. Fin Arrangements Made: 04/26/2019, Dt. Trans. to be Filed: 05/28/2019, Proceeding Type and Date: Bench Trial 06/26/2018. [19-50354] (MFY) [Entered: 05/20/2019 04:27 PM]
May 17, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Julie Anne Ford for party(s) Appellant Reagan National Advertising of Austin, Incorporated, in case 19-50354 [19-50354] (MRW) [Entered: 05/17/2019 09:29 AM]
May 17, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Bryan Russell Horton for Appellant Reagan National Advertising of Austin, Incorporated in 19-50354 [19-50354] (MRW) [Entered: 05/17/2019 09:26 AM]
May 15, 2019 TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellant Reagan National Advertising of Austin, Incorporated. DETAILS: Transcript Order: Court Reporter: Pamela Joy Andasola, Proceeding Type and Date: Pre-Trial Conference 06/13/2018. Electronic Filing Processed: [ # 9053469-2 ] [19-50354] (MFY) [Entered: 05/20/2019 04:20 PM]
May 15, 2019 TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellant Reagan National Advertising of Austin, Incorporated. DETAILS: Transcript Order: Court Reporter: Lily Iva Reznik, Proceeding Type and Date: Bench Trial 06/26/2018. Transcript Order ddl satisfied. Electronic Filing Processed: [ # 9053473-2 ] [19-50354] (MFY) [Entered: 05/20/2019 03:37 PM]
May 15, 2019 ATTORNEY TRANSCRIPT ORDER form filed by Appellant Reagan National Advertising of Austin, Incorporated Court Reporter - Reznik for the Court to process. Date of service: 05/15/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Horton, McLain; Attorney for Appellee: Laird. [19-50354] (Bryan Russell Horton ) [Entered: 05/15/2019 01:06 PM]
May 15, 2019 ATTORNEY TRANSCRIPT ORDER form filed by Appellant Reagan National Advertising of Austin, Incorporated Court Reporter - Andasola for the Court to process. Date of service: 05/15/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Horton, McLain; Attorney for Appellee: Laird. [19-50354] (Bryan Russell Horton ) [Entered: 05/15/2019 01:04 PM]
May 15, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-50354] (Julie Anne Ford ) [Entered: 05/15/2019 12:54 PM]
May 15, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Bryan Russell Horton for Reagan National Advertising of Austin, Incorporated for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-50354] (Bryan Russell Horton ) [Entered: 05/15/2019 12:29 PM]
May 7, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Henry Gray Laird III for Appellee City of Austin in 19-50354 [19-50354] (MRW) [Entered: 05/07/2019 02:41 PM]
May 7, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Henry Gray Laird, III, Esq. for City of Austin for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-50354] (Henry Gray Laird III) [Entered: 05/07/2019 09:53 AM]
May 6, 2019 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9045691-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Transcript order due on 05/21/2019 for Appellants Lamar Advantage Outdoor Company, L.P. and Reagan National Advertising of Austin, Incorporated [19-50354] (CCR) [Entered: 05/06/2019 12:48 PM]
April 26, 2019 COURT REPORTER ACKNOWLEDGMENT received from Lily Iva Reznik. [19-50354] (Lily Iva Reznik ) [Entered: 04/26/2019 04:52 PM]
April 26, 2019 CASE CAPTION updated. Additional appeal filed. [9038242-2] Parties added: Appellant Lamar Advantage Outdoor Company, L.P.. NOA filed by Appellant Lamar Advantage Outdoor Company, L.P.. [9038242-1], added to case. Reason: Additional Appeal Filed. [19-50354] (CCR) [Entered: 04/26/2019 11:44 AM]
April 25, 2019 PRIVATE CIVIL FEDERAL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Reagan National Advertising of Austin, Incorporated [19-50354] (CCR) [Entered: 04/25/2019 10:32 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Reagan Natl Advtsng of Austin, et al v. City of Austin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: LAMAR ADVANTAGE OUTDOOR COMPANY, L.P., doing business as The Lamar Companies
Represented By: Bradley Eugene McLain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: REAGAN NATIONAL ADVERTISING OF AUSTIN, INCORPORATED
Represented By: Bryan Russell Horton
Represented By: Julie Anne Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CITY OF AUSTIN
Represented By: Henry Gray Laird Esq. III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?