Richard Chichakli v. USA, et al
Defendant / Appellee: URS CORPORATION FEDERAL SERVICE DIVISION OF RIVERSIDE CALIFORNIA, JUSTICE MANAGEMENT DIVISION, MICHAEL DONDARSKI, Assistant Director of Enforcement OFAC, DEA, UNITED STATES ATTORNEY IN THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK, OFAC, United States Department of Treasury and its Office of Foreign Assets Control, FEDERAL TORT CLAIMS ACT SECTION, Tort Branch US DOJ, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, FBI, United States Department of Justice including the Federal Bureau of Investigation and THERESA NEWMAN
Plaintiff / Appellant: RICHARD A. CHICHAKLI
Case Number: 20-10018
Filed: January 6, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
May 5, 2020 Richard Chichakli v. USA, et al

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 27, 2020 Paper copies of Record Excerpts filed by Appellant Mr. Richard A. Chichakli in 20-10018 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes They require: Pro se provided only (2) copies of record excerpts, (4) are required # of Copies Provided: 2. Paper Copies of Record Excerpts due deadline satisfied.. Sufficient Paper Copies of Record Excerpts Due on 03/03/2020 for Appellant Richard A. Chichakli. [20-10018] (RAJ) [Entered: 02/27/2020 02:54 PM]
February 11, 2020 RECORD EXCERPTS FILED. # of Copies Provided: 0 Paper Copies of Record Excerpts due on 02/18/2020 for Appellant Richard A. Chichakli. [20-10018] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: APPELLANT'S BRIEF FILED by Mr. Richard A. Chichakli. Date of service: 02/11/2020 via email - Appellant Chichakli; Attorney for Appellee: Theiss [20-10018] (Richard A. Chichakli ) [Entered: 02/11/2020 09:09 AM]
February 10, 2020 APPELLANT'S BRIEF FILED # of Copies Provided: 0 A/Pet's Brief deadline satisfied. Appellee's Brief due on 03/11/2020 for Appellee United States of America. Paper Copies of Brief due on 02/18/2020 for Appellant Richard A. Chichakli. [20-10018] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: APPELLANT'S BRIEF FILED by Mr. Richard A. Chichakli. Date of service: 02/10/2020 via email - Appellant Chichakli; Attorney for Appellee: Theiss [20-10018] (Richard A. Chichakli ) [Entered: 02/10/2020 02:50 PM]
January 31, 2020 CLERK ORDER granting Motion for leave for pro se to file electronically filed by Appellant Mr. Richard A. Chichakli [ # 9241262-2 ] [20-10018] (MBC) [Entered: 01/31/2020 12:27 PM]
January 30, 2020 MOTION filed by Appellant Mr. Richard A. Chichakli for leave to file electronically as a pro se party [9241262-2]. Date of service: 01/26/2020 [20-10018] (MBC) [Entered: 01/30/2020 12:44 PM]
January 28, 2020 COURT ORDER denying Motion to amend caption filed by Appellant Mr. Richard A. Chichakli [ # 9233550-2 ] [20-10018] (MBC) [Entered: 01/28/2020 04:14 PM]
January 24, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Dawn Whalen Theiss for Appellee USA in 20-10018 [20-10018] (RSM) [Entered: 01/24/2020 02:43 PM]
January 24, 2020 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 03/04/2020 for Appellant Richard A. Chichakli. [20-10018] (DDL) [Entered: 01/24/2020 02:04 PM]
January 24, 2020 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [20-10018] (DDL) [Entered: 01/24/2020 02:03 PM]
January 23, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM received from Mrs. Dawn Whalen Theiss for USA for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [20-10018] (Dawn Whalen Theiss ) [Entered: 01/23/2020 04:48 PM]
January 21, 2020 CLERK ORDER denying Motion for leave for pro se to file electronically filed by Appellant Mr. Richard A. Chichakli [ # 9233548-2 ] [20-10018] (MBC) [Entered: 01/21/2020 04:16 PM]
January 17, 2020 MEMO IN SUPPORT of Motion to amend caption [ # 9233550-2 ] filed by Appellant Mr. Richard A. Chichakli [20-10018] (MBC) [Entered: 01/21/2020 09:45 AM]
January 17, 2020 MOTION filed by Appellant Mr. Richard A. Chichakli to amend caption [9233550-2]. Date of service: 01/14/2020 [20-10018] (MBC) [Entered: 01/21/2020 09:44 AM]
January 17, 2020 MOTION filed by Appellant Mr. Richard A. Chichakli for leave to file electronically as a pro se party [9233548-2]. Date of service: 01/14/2020 [20-10018] (MBC) [Entered: 01/21/2020 09:43 AM]
January 9, 2020 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED FROM DISTRICT COURT for 3:19-CV-372. Electronic ROA due on 01/24/2020. [20-10018] (MRW) [Entered: 01/09/2020 10:14 AM]
January 9, 2020 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9226167-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [20-10018] (MRW) [Entered: 01/09/2020 10:12 AM]
January 6, 2020 US CIVIL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Richard A. Chichakli [20-10018] (LEF) [Entered: 01/06/2020 10:53 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Richard Chichakli v. USA, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: URS CORPORATION FEDERAL SERVICE DIVISION OF RIVERSIDE CALIFORNIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JUSTICE MANAGEMENT DIVISION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MICHAEL DONDARSKI, Assistant Director of Enforcement OFAC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DEA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITED STATES ATTORNEY IN THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: OFAC, United States Department of Treasury and its Office of Foreign Assets Control
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FEDERAL TORT CLAIMS ACT SECTION, Tort Branch US DOJ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Dawn Whalen Theiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FBI, United States Department of Justice including the Federal Bureau of Investigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: THERESA NEWMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: RICHARD A. CHICHAKLI
Represented By: Richard A. Chichakli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?