McGaugh v. Griffin
Defendant / Appellee: Nicholas Graham, Matt Coates, Dylan Rodriguez, Vicky Fanning, Cody Powers, Roger Goldberg, Kelson Aguero, FNU Porter, Shaelynn Kellogg, Monty Benjamin "Ben" Moore, Danny Clayton, FNU Bar, David Southerland, James Robinson, Trey Yocham, Carolyn Stripling, Vanessa Griffin, James Dunbar, Taylor Williams, Jeffery Wright, Joshua Harris and Jake Bolin
Plaintiff / Appellant: Robert W. McGaugh
Case Number: 20-11268
Filed: December 31, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2021 DOCUMENT RECEIVED - NO ACTION TAKEN. No action will be taken at this time on the extension request received from Appellant Mr. Robert W. McGaugh because the motion is signed by a non-pary (Audrey McGaugh, POA). We cannot accept documents signed by a non-party [20-11268] (CNF) [Entered: 02/23/2021 09:01 AM]
February 19, 2021 DOCUMENT RECEIVED - NO ACTION TAKEN. No action will be taken at this time on the durable power of attorney, designation of conservator, John W. McGaugh received from Appellant Mr. Robert W. McGaugh because power of attorney does not authorize a non attorney, non party to sign and file court documents on behalf of others [20-11268] (CNF) [Entered: 02/19/2021 12:37 PM]
February 1, 2021 AMENDED COURT ORDER granting Motion to view and obtain sealed document filed by Appellees Mr. James Robinson, FNU Porter, Ms. Vanessa Griffin, Mr. Matt Coates, Mr. Danny Clayton, Mr. Taylor Williams, Mr. Trey Yocham, Mr. Dylan Rodriguez, FNU Bar, Ms. Shaelynn Kellogg, Ms. Carolyn Stripling, Mr. Joshua Harris, Mr. Jake Bolin, Mr. Cody Powers, Mr. Jeffery Wright, Mr. Roger Goldberg, Ms. Vicky Fanning, Mr. Monty Benjamin "Ben" Moore, Mr. David Southerland, Mr. James Dunbar, Mr. Kelson Aguero and Mr. Nicholas Graham. [ # 9494394-2 ] [20-11268] (LLL) [Entered: 02/01/2021 04:13 PM]
February 1, 2021 MOTION filed by Appellees Mr. Kelson Aguero, Mr. Jake Bolin, Mr. Danny Clayton, Mr. Matt Coates, Mr. James Dunbar, Ms. Vicky Fanning, FNU Bar, FNU Porter, Mr. Roger Goldberg, Mr. Nicholas Graham, Ms. Vanessa Griffin, Mr. Joshua Harris, Ms. Shaelynn Kellogg, Mr. Monty Benjamin Ben Moore, Mr. Cody Powers, Mr. James Robinson, Mr. Dylan Rodriguez, Mr. David Southerland, Ms. Carolyn Stripling, Mr. Taylor Williams, Mr. Jeffery Wright and Mr. Trey Yocham to view and obtain sealed document. Date of service: 02/01/2021 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Evans, Iglesias; US mail - Appellant McGaugh [20-11268] (David Ryan Herring Iglesias ) [Entered: 02/01/2021 02:30 PM]
January 26, 2021 LETTER OF ADVISEMENT. [20-11268] (LLL) [Entered: 01/26/2021 09:28 AM]
January 14, 2021 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Admitted Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Video/Audio Exhibits on File in District Court? No Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [20-11268] (CMB) [Entered: 01/14/2021 09:59 AM]
January 13, 2021 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney David Ryan Herring Iglesias for Appellee Nicholas Graham in 20-11268, Attorney David Ryan Herring Iglesias for Appellee Kelson Aguero in 20-11268, Attorney David Ryan Herring Iglesias for Appellee James Dunbar in 20-11268, Attorney David Ryan Herring Iglesias for Appellee Matt Coates in 20-11268, Attorney David Ryan Herring Iglesias for Appellee David Southerland in 20-11268, Attorney David Ryan Herring Iglesias for Appellee Monty Benjamin Ben Moore in 20-11268, Attorney David Ryan Herring Iglesias for Appellee James Robinson in 20-11268, Attorney David Ryan Herring Iglesias for Appellee Vicky Fanning in 20-11268, Attorney David Ryan Herring Iglesias for Appellee Roger Goldberg in 20-11268, Attorney David Ryan Herring Iglesias for Appellee Jeffery Wright in 20-11268, Attorney David Ryan Herring Iglesias for Appellee Cody Powers in 20-11268, Attorney David Ryan Herring Iglesias for Appellee Jake Bolin in 20-11268, Attorney David Ryan Herring Iglesias for Appellee FNU Porter in 20-11268, Attorney David Ryan Herring Iglesias for Appellee Joshua Harris in 20-11268, Attorney David Ryan Herring Iglesias for Appellee Carolyn Stripling in 20-11268, Attorney David Ryan Herring Iglesias for Appellee Shaelynn Kellogg in 20-11268, Attorney David Ryan Herring Iglesias for Appellee FNU Bar in 20-11268, Attorney David Ryan Herring Iglesias for Appellee Dylan Rodriguez in 20-11268, Attorney David Ryan Herring Iglesias for Appellee Trey Yocham in 20-11268, Attorney David Ryan Herring Iglesias for Appellee Taylor Williams in 20-11268, Attorney David Ryan Herring Iglesias for Appellee Danny Clayton in 20-11268, Attorney David Ryan Herring Iglesias for Appellee Vanessa Griffin in 20-11268 [20-11268] (RSM) [Entered: 01/13/2021 12:09 PM]
January 13, 2021 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) James A. Evans III for party(s) Appellee Trey Yocham Appellee FNU Bar Appellee Roger Goldberg Appellee Jeffery Wright Appellee Dylan Rodriguez Appellee FNU Porter Appellee Cody Powers Appellee David Southerland Appellee Monty Benjamin Ben Moore Appellee James Dunbar Appellee Taylor Williams Appellee Shaelynn Kellogg Appellee Danny Clayton Appellee Jake Bolin Appellee Kelson Aguero Appellee Matt Coates Appellee Vanessa Griffin Appellee Joshua Harris Appellee Vicky Fanning Appellee Carolyn Stripling Appellee Nicholas Graham Appellee James Robinson, in case 20-11268 [20-11268] (RSM) [Entered: 01/13/2021 11:01 AM]
January 13, 2021 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [20-11268] (James A. Evans III) [Entered: 01/13/2021 09:10 AM]
January 13, 2021 APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. David Ryan Herring Iglesias for Mr. Kelson Aguero, Mr. Jake Bolin, Mr. Danny Clayton, Mr. Matt Coates, Mr. James Dunbar, Ms. Vicky Fanning, FNU Bar, FNU Porter, Mr. Roger Goldberg, Mr. Nicholas Graham, Ms. Vanessa Griffin, Mr. Joshua Harris, Ms. Shaelynn Kellogg, Mr. Monty Benjamin Ben Moore, Mr. Cody Powers, Mr. James Robinson, Mr. Dylan Rodriguez, Mr. David Southerland, Ms. Carolyn Stripling, Mr. Taylor Williams, Mr. Jeffery Wright and Mr. Trey Yocham for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [20-11268] (David Ryan Herring Iglesias ) [Entered: 01/13/2021 09:07 AM]
January 11, 2021 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED from District Court for 4:20-CV-323. Electronic ROA due on 01/26/2021. [20-11268] (RSM) [Entered: 01/11/2021 10:12 AM]
January 11, 2021 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief due on 02/22/2021 for Appellant Robert W. McGaugh. [20-11268] (RSM) [Entered: 01/11/2021 08:49 AM]
January 11, 2021 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9478868-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [20-11268] (RSM) [Entered: 01/11/2021 08:49 AM]
December 31, 2020 PRISONER CASE WITHOUT COUNSEL docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Robert W. McGaugh [20-11268] (LEF) [Entered: 12/31/2020 02:30 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: McGaugh v. Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Nicholas Graham
Represented By: David Ryan Herring Iglesias
Represented By: James A. Evans III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Matt Coates
Represented By: David Ryan Herring Iglesias
Represented By: James A. Evans III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Dylan Rodriguez
Represented By: David Ryan Herring Iglesias
Represented By: James A. Evans III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Vicky Fanning
Represented By: David Ryan Herring Iglesias
Represented By: James A. Evans III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Cody Powers
Represented By: David Ryan Herring Iglesias
Represented By: James A. Evans III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Roger Goldberg
Represented By: David Ryan Herring Iglesias
Represented By: James A. Evans III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Kelson Aguero
Represented By: David Ryan Herring Iglesias
Represented By: James A. Evans III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FNU Porter
Represented By: David Ryan Herring Iglesias
Represented By: James A. Evans III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Shaelynn Kellogg
Represented By: David Ryan Herring Iglesias
Represented By: James A. Evans III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Monty Benjamin "Ben" Moore
Represented By: David Ryan Herring Iglesias
Represented By: James A. Evans III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Danny Clayton
Represented By: David Ryan Herring Iglesias
Represented By: James A. Evans III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FNU Bar
Represented By: David Ryan Herring Iglesias
Represented By: James A. Evans III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: David Southerland
Represented By: David Ryan Herring Iglesias
Represented By: James A. Evans III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: James Robinson
Represented By: David Ryan Herring Iglesias
Represented By: James A. Evans III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Trey Yocham
Represented By: David Ryan Herring Iglesias
Represented By: James A. Evans III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Carolyn Stripling
Represented By: David Ryan Herring Iglesias
Represented By: James A. Evans III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Vanessa Griffin
Represented By: David Ryan Herring Iglesias
Represented By: James A. Evans III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: James Dunbar
Represented By: David Ryan Herring Iglesias
Represented By: James A. Evans III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Taylor Williams
Represented By: David Ryan Herring Iglesias
Represented By: James A. Evans III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Jeffery Wright
Represented By: David Ryan Herring Iglesias
Represented By: James A. Evans III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Joshua Harris
Represented By: David Ryan Herring Iglesias
Represented By: James A. Evans III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Jake Bolin
Represented By: David Ryan Herring Iglesias
Represented By: James A. Evans III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Robert W. McGaugh
Represented By: Robert W. McGaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?