Zummer v. Sallet
Plaintiff / Appellant: Michael S. Zummer
Defendant / Appellee: Jeffery S. Sallet, Special Agent in Charge, FBI, New Orleans Division, in his individual capacity, Valerie Parlave, Executive Assistant Director, FBI, Human Resources Branch, in her individual and official capacities, Daniel Halphen Evans, Assistant Special Agent in Charge, FBI, New Orleans Division, Criminal Branch, in his individual capacity, David M. Hardy, Chief, FBI, Records Management Division, Record/Information Dissemination Section, in his individual capacity, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Brigette Class, former-Deputy Assistant Director, FBI, Security Division, in her individual capacity, David W. Schlendorf, Jr., Assistant Director, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Human Resources Division, in his individual capacity, Michelle Anne Jupina, Assistant Director, FBI, Records Management Division, in her individual capacity, Richard R. Brown, Assistant General Counsel, FBI, in his individual capacity, Gregory A. Brower, former Deputy General Counsel, FBI, currently Assistant Director,FBI, Office of Congressional Affairs, in his individual capacity, Stephen P. Rees, Assistant Director, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Records Management Division, in his individual capacity, Laura A. Bucheit, Assistant Director, FBI, Security Division, in her individual capacity, Gerald Roberts, Jr., Assistant Director, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Security Division, in his individual and official capacities, Michael G. Seidel, Acting/Assistant Section Chief, FBI, Records Management Division, Record/Information Dissemination Section, in his individual capacity and Daniel Powers, former-Section Chief, FBI, Security Division, in his individual capacity
Case Number: 21-30219
Filed: April 23, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2021 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Charles Wylie Scarborough for party(s) Appellee Valerie Parlave Appellee Daniel Powers Appellee Daniel Halphen Evans Appellee David W. Schlendorf Jr. Appellee Michael G. Seidel Appellee David M. Hardy Appellee Brigette Class Appellee Stephen P. Rees Appellee Laura A. Bucheit Appellee Richard R. Brown Appellee FBI Appellee Jeffery S. Sallet Appellee Gregory A. Brower Appellee Gerald Roberts Jr. Appellee Michelle Anne Jupina, in case 21-30219 [21-30219] (WMJ) [Entered: 06/11/2021 12:43 PM]
June 10, 2021 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [21-30219] (Charles Wylie Scarborough ) [Entered: 06/10/2021 01:26 PM]
June 10, 2021 EXTENSION RECEIVED for Appellant Mr. Michael S. Zummer. Extension Granted to and including 07/14/2021. A/Pet's Brief deadline updated to 07/14/2021 for Appellant Michael S. Zummer [21-30219] (WMJ) [Entered: 06/10/2021 11:52 AM]
June 10, 2021 UNOPPOSED LEVEL 1 EXTENSION REQUESTED by Appellant Mr. Michael S. Zummer for filing Brief for Appellant until 07/14/2021 [21-30219] (Robert Bruce McDuff ) [Entered: 06/10/2021 11:32 AM]
June 8, 2021 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Joshua Koppel for Appellees Valerie Parlave, Daniel Powers, Daniel Halphen Evans, David W. Schlendorf, Jr., Michael G. Seidel, David M. Hardy, Brigette Class, Stephen P. Rees, Laura A. Bucheit, Richard R. Brown, FBI, Jeffery S. Sallet, Gregory A. Brower, Gerald Roberts, Jr. and Michelle Anne Jupina, in case 21-30219. [21-30219] (DLJ) [Entered: 06/08/2021 12:25 PM]
June 7, 2021 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [21-30219] (Joshua Koppel ) [Entered: 06/07/2021 01:32 PM]
June 2, 2021 CLERK ORDER granting motion to file optional contents of record excerpts in excess pages, not to exceed 100 pages, filed by Appellant Mr. Michael S. Zummer [ # 9586515-2 ] The clerk is granting your unopposed motion for the Court subject to possible reconsideration by the merits panel at a later date. [21-30219] (AGL) [Entered: 06/02/2021 03:34 PM]
June 1, 2021 UNOPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellant Mr. Michael S. Zummer to file record excerpts in excess pages [9586515-2]. Date of service: 06/01/2021 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Centner, McDuff; US mail - Attorney for Appellee: Greene [21-30219] (Daniel Bernard Centner ) [Entered: 06/01/2021 04:03 PM]
May 12, 2021 COURT ORDER granting Motion to view and obtain sealed document filed by Appellant Mr. Michael S. Zummer [ # 9572168-2 ] [21-30219] (WMJ) [Entered: 05/12/2021 05:00 PM]
May 12, 2021 UNOPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellant Mr. Michael S. Zummer to view and obtain sealed document. [21-30219] (WMJ) [Entered: 05/12/2021 10:00 AM]
May 11, 2021 MOTION AND/OR DOCUMENT UNDER TEMPORARY SEAL pending a ruling by the court filed by Appellant Mr. Michael S. ZummerThis document is unopposed. Date of service: 05/11/2021 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Centner, McDuff; US mail - Attorney for Appellee: Greene [21-30219] (Daniel Bernard Centner ) [Entered: 05/11/2021 09:40 AM]
May 7, 2021 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Daniel Bernard Centner for Appellant Michael S. Zummer in 21-30219 [21-30219] (WMJ) [Entered: 05/07/2021 10:14 AM]
May 6, 2021 APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Daniel Bernard Centner, Esq. for Mr. Michael S. Zummer for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [21-30219] (Daniel Bernard Centner ) [Entered: 05/06/2021 12:29 PM]
May 5, 2021 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Robert Bruce McDuff for party(s) Appellant Michael S. Zummer, in case 21-30219 [21-30219] (WMJ) [Entered: 05/05/2021 11:41 AM]
May 4, 2021 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 06/14/2021 for Appellant Michael S. Zummer. [21-30219] (DDL) [Entered: 05/04/2021 02:45 PM]
May 4, 2021 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Admitted Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Video/Audio Exhibits on File in District Court? No Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [21-30219] (DDL) [Entered: 05/04/2021 02:44 PM]
May 4, 2021 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [21-30219] (Robert Bruce McDuff ) [Entered: 05/04/2021 08:24 AM]
April 30, 2021 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED from District Court for 2:17-CV-7563. Electronic ROA due on 05/17/2021. [21-30219] (DLJ) [Entered: 04/30/2021 08:25 AM]
April 30, 2021 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9563171-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [21-30219] (DLJ) [Entered: 04/30/2021 08:15 AM]
April 23, 2021 US CIVIL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Michael S. Zummer. [21-30219] (DLJ) [Entered: 04/23/2021 10:23 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Zummer v. Sallet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Michael S. Zummer
Represented By: Daniel Bernard Centner Esq.
Represented By: Robert Bruce McDuff Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Jeffery S. Sallet, Special Agent in Charge, FBI, New Orleans Division, in his individual capacity
Represented By: Glenn Greene
Represented By: Joshua Koppel
Represented By: Charles Wylie Scarborough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Valerie Parlave, Executive Assistant Director, FBI, Human Resources Branch, in her individual and official capacities
Represented By: Glenn Greene
Represented By: Joshua Koppel
Represented By: Charles Wylie Scarborough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Daniel Halphen Evans, Assistant Special Agent in Charge, FBI, New Orleans Division, Criminal Branch, in his individual capacity
Represented By: Glenn Greene
Represented By: Joshua Koppel
Represented By: Charles Wylie Scarborough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: David M. Hardy, Chief, FBI, Records Management Division, Record/Information Dissemination Section, in his individual capacity
Represented By: Glenn Greene
Represented By: Joshua Koppel
Represented By: Charles Wylie Scarborough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Federal Bureau of Investigation
Represented By: Glenn Greene
Represented By: Joshua Koppel
Represented By: Charles Wylie Scarborough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Brigette Class, former-Deputy Assistant Director, FBI, Security Division, in her individual capacity
Represented By: Glenn Greene
Represented By: Joshua Koppel
Represented By: Charles Wylie Scarborough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: David W. Schlendorf, Jr., Assistant Director, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Human Resources Division, in his individual capacity
Represented By: Glenn Greene
Represented By: Joshua Koppel
Represented By: Charles Wylie Scarborough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Michelle Anne Jupina, Assistant Director, FBI, Records Management Division, in her individual capacity
Represented By: Glenn Greene
Represented By: Joshua Koppel
Represented By: Charles Wylie Scarborough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Richard R. Brown, Assistant General Counsel, FBI, in his individual capacity
Represented By: Glenn Greene
Represented By: Joshua Koppel
Represented By: Charles Wylie Scarborough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Gregory A. Brower, former Deputy General Counsel, FBI, currently Assistant Director,FBI, Office of Congressional Affairs, in his individual capacity
Represented By: Glenn Greene
Represented By: Joshua Koppel
Represented By: Charles Wylie Scarborough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Stephen P. Rees, Assistant Director, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Records Management Division, in his individual capacity
Represented By: Glenn Greene
Represented By: Joshua Koppel
Represented By: Charles Wylie Scarborough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Laura A. Bucheit, Assistant Director, FBI, Security Division, in her individual capacity
Represented By: Glenn Greene
Represented By: Joshua Koppel
Represented By: Charles Wylie Scarborough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Gerald Roberts, Jr., Assistant Director, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Security Division, in his individual and official capacities
Represented By: Glenn Greene
Represented By: Joshua Koppel
Represented By: Charles Wylie Scarborough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Michael G. Seidel, Acting/Assistant Section Chief, FBI, Records Management Division, Record/Information Dissemination Section, in his individual capacity
Represented By: Glenn Greene
Represented By: Joshua Koppel
Represented By: Charles Wylie Scarborough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Daniel Powers, former-Section Chief, FBI, Security Division, in his individual capacity
Represented By: Glenn Greene
Represented By: Joshua Koppel
Represented By: Charles Wylie Scarborough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?