State of Louisiana v. Biden
Plaintiff / Appellee: State of Louisiana, State of Alabama, State of Alaska, State of Arkansas, State of Georgia, State of Mississippi, State of Missouri, State of Montana, State of Nebraska, State of Oklahoma, State of Texas, State of Utah and State of West Virginia
Defendant / Appellant: Joseph R. Biden, Jr., in his official capacity as President of the United States, Deb Haaland, in her official capacity as Secretary of the Interior, Michael Nedd, in his official capacity as Deputy Director of the Bureau of Land Management, Chad Padgett, in his official capacity as Director of the Bureau of Land Management Alaska Office, Raymond Suazo, in his official capacity as Director for the Bureau of Land Management Arizona Office, Karen Mouritsen, in her official capacity as Director for the Bureau of Land Management California Office, Jamie Connell, in his official capacity as Director for the Bureau of Land Management Colorado Office, Mitchell Leverette, in his official capacity as Director for the Bureau of Land Management Eastern States Office, John Ruhs, in his official capacity as Director for the Bureau of Land Management Idaho Office, John Mehlhoff, in his official capacity as Director for the Bureau of Land Management Montana-Dakotas Office, Jon Raby, in his official capacity as Director for the Bureau of Land Management Nevada Office, Steve Wells, in his official capacity as Director for the Bureau of Land Management New Mexico Office, Barry Bushue, in his official capacity as Director for the Bureau of Land Management Oregon-Washington Office, Greg Sheehan, in his official capacity as Director for the Bureau of Land Management Utah Office, Kim Liebhauser, in her official capacity as Director for the Bureau of Land Management Wyoming Office, Amanda Lefton, in her official capacity as Director of the Bureau of Ocean Energy Management, Michael Celata, in his official capacity as Regional Director of the Bureau of Ocean Energy Management Gulf of Mexico Office, Lars Herbst, in his official capacity as Regional Director of the Bureau of Safety and Environmental Enforcement Gulf of Mexico OCS Office and Mark Fesmire, in his official capacity as Regional Director of the Bureau of Safety and Environmental Enforcement Alaska and Pacific Office
Case Number: 21-30505
Filed: August 17, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
August 17, 2022 Summary State of Louisiana v. Biden

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2021 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Elizabeth Baker Murrill for Appellee State of West Virginia in 21-30505, Attorney Elizabeth Baker Murrill for Appellee State of Utah in 21-30505, Attorney Elizabeth Baker Murrill for Appellee State of Texas in 21-30505, Attorney Elizabeth Baker Murrill for Appellee State of Oklahoma in 21-30505, Attorney Elizabeth Baker Murrill for Appellee State of Nebraska in 21-30505, Attorney Elizabeth Baker Murrill for Appellee State of Montana in 21-30505, Attorney Elizabeth Baker Murrill for Appellee State of Missouri in 21-30505, Attorney Elizabeth Baker Murrill for Appellee State of Mississippi in 21-30505, Attorney Elizabeth Baker Murrill for Appellee State of Georgia in 21-30505, Attorney Elizabeth Baker Murrill for Appellee State of Arkansas in 21-30505, Attorney Elizabeth Baker Murrill for Appellee State of Alaska in 21-30505, Attorney Elizabeth Baker Murrill for Appellee State of Alabama in 21-30505, Attorney Elizabeth Baker Murrill for Appellee State of Louisiana in 21-30505 [21-30505] (AGL) [Entered: 10/15/2021 09:23 AM]
October 15, 2021 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Joseph Scott St. John for party(s) Appellee State of Utah Appellee State of West Virginia Appellee State of Arkansas Appellee State of Alabama Appellee State of Nebraska Appellee State of Alaska Appellee State of Oklahoma Appellee State of Georgia Appellee State of Missouri Appellee State of Texas Appellee State of Louisiana Appellee State of Montana Appellee State of Mississippi, in case 21-30505 [21-30505] (AGL) [Entered: 10/15/2021 09:15 AM]
October 14, 2021 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [21-30505] (Joseph Scott St. John ) [Entered: 10/14/2021 12:34 PM]
October 13, 2021 DOCUMENT RECEIVED - NO ACTION TAKEN. No action will be taken at this time on the second appearance form received from attorney Elizabeth Baker Murrill because it is a duplicate filing [21-30505] (AGL) [Entered: 10/15/2021 09:26 AM]
October 13, 2021 APPEARANCE FORM received from Ms. Elizabeth Baker Murrill, Esq. for State of Alabama, State of Alaska, State of Arkansas, State of Georgia, State of Louisiana, State of Mississippi, State of Missouri, State of Montana, State of Nebraska, State of Oklahoma, State of Texas, State of Utah and State of West Virginia for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [21-30505] (Elizabeth Baker Murrill ) [Entered: 10/13/2021 12:01 PM]
September 30, 2021 CLERK ORDER granting joint motion to modify briefing schedule filed by Appellees State of Montana, State of Alaska, State of Alabama, State of Louisiana, State of Oklahoma, State of Arkansas, State of Georgia, State of Missouri, State of Utah, State of West Virginia, State of Texas, State of Nebraska, State of Mississippi and Appellants Mr. Steve Wells, Mr. Greg Sheehan, Mr. Joseph R. Biden, Jr., Ms. Deb Haaland, Mr. Michael Nedd, Mr. Chad Padgett, Mr. Raymond Suazo, Ms. Karen Mouritsen, Mr. Jamie Connell, Mr. Mitchell Leverette, Mr. John Ruhs, Mr. John Mehlhoff, Mr. Jon Raby, Mr. Barry Bushue, Ms. Kim Liebhauser, Ms. Amanda Lefton, Mr. Michael Celata, Mr. Lars Herbst and Mr. Mark Fesmire [ # 9677548-2 ] [9678841-2] A/Pet's Brief deadline updated to 11/16/2021 for Appellants Joseph R. Biden Jr., Barry Bushue, Michael Celata, Jamie Connell, Mark Fesmire, Deb Haaland, Lars Herbst, Amanda Lefton, Mitchell Leverette, Kim Liebhauser, John Mehlhoff, Karen Mouritsen, Michael Nedd, Chad Padgett, Jon Raby, John Ruhs, Greg Sheehan, Raymond Suazo and Steve Wells. [9678841-2] Appellee's Brief due on 01/06/2022 for Appellees State of Alabama, State of Alaska, State of Arkansas, State of Georgia, State of Louisiana, State of Mississippi, State of Missouri, State of Montana, State of Nebraska, State of Oklahoma, State of Texas, State of Utah and State of West Virginia. [21-30505] (AGL) [Entered: 09/30/2021 04:36 PM]
September 29, 2021 JOINT MOTION filed by Appellants Mr. Joseph R. Biden, Jr., Mr. Barry Bushue, Mr. Michael Celata, Mr. Jamie Connell, Mr. Mark Fesmire, Ms. Deb Haaland, Mr. Lars Herbst, Ms. Amanda Lefton, Mr. Mitchell Leverette, Ms. Kim Liebhauser, Mr. John Mehlhoff, Ms. Karen Mouritsen, Mr. Michael Nedd, Mr. Chad Padgett, Mr. Jon Raby, Mr. John Ruhs, Mr. Greg Sheehan, Mr. Raymond Suazo and Mr. Steve Wells and Appellees State of Alabama, State of Alaska, State of Arkansas, State of Georgia, State of Louisiana, State of Mississippi, State of Missouri, State of Montana, State of Nebraska, State of Oklahoma, State of Texas, State of Utah and State of West Virginia to modify briefing schedule[9677548-2]. Date of service: 09/29/2021 [21-30505] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: UNOPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellants Mr. Joseph R. Biden, Jr., Mr. Barry Bushue, Mr. Michael Celata, Mr. Jamie Connell, Mr. Mark Fesmire, Ms. Deb Haaland, Mr. Lars Herbst, Ms. Amanda Lefton, Mr. Mitchell Leverette, Ms. Kim Liebhauser, Mr. John Mehlhoff, Ms. Karen Mouritsen, Mr. Michael Nedd, Mr. Chad Padgett, Mr. Jon Raby, Mr. John Ruhs, Mr. Greg Sheehan, Mr. Raymond Suazo and Mr. Steve Wells to extend time to file brief as appellant until 11/16/2021 [9677548-2], to extend time to file brief of appellee until 01/06/2022 [9677548-3]. Date of service: 09/29/2021 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Bernie, Ports; Attorney for Appellee: Murrill [21-30505] (Andrew Marshall Bernie ) [Entered: 09/29/2021 04:14 PM]
September 16, 2021 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 10/26/2021 for Appellants Joseph R. Biden Jr., Barry Bushue, Michael Celata, Jamie Connell, Mark Fesmire, Deb Haaland, Lars Herbst, Amanda Lefton, Mitchell Leverette, Kim Liebhauser, John Mehlhoff, Karen Mouritsen, Michael Nedd, Chad Padgett, Jon Raby, John Ruhs, Greg Sheehan, Raymond Suazo and Steve Wells. [21-30505] (DDL) [Entered: 09/16/2021 02:57 PM]
September 16, 2021 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Admitted Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Video/Audio Exhibits on File in District Court? No Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [21-30505] (DDL) [Entered: 09/16/2021 02:56 PM]
September 1, 2021 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED from District Court for 2:21-CV-778. Electronic ROA due on 09/16/2021. [21-30505] (CB) [Entered: 09/01/2021 10:25 AM]
August 30, 2021 TRANSCRIPT ORDER received advising transcript unnecessary for appeal purposes. Transcript Order ddl satisfied [21-30505] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellants Mr. Joseph R. Biden, Jr., Mr. Barry Bushue, Mr. Michael Celata, Mr. Jamie Connell, Mr. Mark Fesmire, Ms. Deb Haaland, Mr. Lars Herbst, Ms. Amanda Lefton, Mr. Mitchell Leverette, Ms. Kim Liebhauser, Mr. John Mehlhoff, Ms. Karen Mouritsen, Mr. Michael Nedd, Mr. Chad Padgett, Mr. Jon Raby, Mr. John Ruhs, Mr. Greg Sheehan, Mr. Raymond Suazo and Mr. Steve Wells advising transcript unnecessary for appeal purposes. Date of Service: 08/30/2021 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Bernie, Ports; Attorney for Appellee: Murrill [21-30505] (Andrew Marshall Bernie ) [Entered: 08/30/2021 05:04 PM]
August 18, 2021 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [21-30505] (Andrew Marshall Bernie ) [Entered: 08/18/2021 07:43 AM]
August 18, 2021 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Andrew Marshall Bernie for party(s) Appellant Deb Haaland Appellant Greg Sheehan Appellant Mark Fesmire Appellant Karen Mouritsen Appellant Mitchell Leverette Appellant John Mehlhoff Appellant Lars Herbst Appellant Steve Wells Appellant Amanda Lefton Appellant Joseph R. Biden Jr. Appellant Jamie Connell Appellant Jon Raby Appellant John Ruhs Appellant Kim Liebhauser Appellant Raymond Suazo Appellant Michael Celata Appellant Chad Padgett Appellant Barry Bushue Appellant Michael Nedd, in case 21-30505 [21-30505] (AGL) [Entered: 08/18/2021 02:50 PM]
August 17, 2021 CASE CAPTION updated. Involvement terminated for Appellant Steve Wells in 21-30505. [21-30505] (SEP) [Entered: 08/17/2021 01:52 PM]
August 17, 2021 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete. Action: Case OK to Process. [9645179-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. Transcript order due on 09/01/2021 for Appellants Joseph R. Biden Jr., Barry Bushue, Michael Celata, Jamie Connell, Mark Fesmire, Deb Haaland, Lars Herbst, Amanda Lefton, Mitchell Leverette, Kim Liebhauser, John Mehlhoff, Karen Mouritsen, Michael Nedd, Chad Padgett, Jon Raby, John Ruhs, Greg Sheehan, Raymond Suazo and Steve Wells. [21-30505] (SEP) [Entered: 08/17/2021 02:07 PM]
August 17, 2021 US CIVIL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants Mr. Joseph R. Biden, Jr., Mr. Barry Bushue, Mr. Michael Celata, Mr. Jamie Connell, Mr. Mark Fesmire, Ms. Deb Haaland, Mr. Lars Herbst, Ms. Amanda Lefton, Mr. Mitchell Leverette, Ms. Kim Liebhauser, Mr. John Mehlhoff, Ms. Karen Mouritsen, Mr. Michael Nedd, Mr. Chad Padgett, Mr. Jon Raby, Mr. John Ruhs, Mr. Greg Sheehan, Mr. Raymond Suazo and Mr. Steve Wells. [21-30505] (SEP) [Entered: 08/17/2021 01:49 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: State of Louisiana v. Biden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: State of Louisiana
Represented By: Elizabeth Baker Murrill Esq.
Represented By: Joseph Scott St. John
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: State of Alabama
Represented By: Elizabeth Baker Murrill Esq.
Represented By: Joseph Scott St. John
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: State of Alaska
Represented By: Elizabeth Baker Murrill Esq.
Represented By: Joseph Scott St. John
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: State of Arkansas
Represented By: Elizabeth Baker Murrill Esq.
Represented By: Joseph Scott St. John
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: State of Georgia
Represented By: Elizabeth Baker Murrill Esq.
Represented By: Joseph Scott St. John
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: State of Mississippi
Represented By: Elizabeth Baker Murrill Esq.
Represented By: Joseph Scott St. John
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: State of Missouri
Represented By: Elizabeth Baker Murrill Esq.
Represented By: Joseph Scott St. John
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: State of Montana
Represented By: Elizabeth Baker Murrill Esq.
Represented By: Joseph Scott St. John
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: State of Nebraska
Represented By: Elizabeth Baker Murrill Esq.
Represented By: Joseph Scott St. John
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: State of Oklahoma
Represented By: Elizabeth Baker Murrill Esq.
Represented By: Joseph Scott St. John
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: State of Texas
Represented By: Elizabeth Baker Murrill Esq.
Represented By: Joseph Scott St. John
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: State of Utah
Represented By: Elizabeth Baker Murrill Esq.
Represented By: Joseph Scott St. John
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: State of West Virginia
Represented By: Elizabeth Baker Murrill Esq.
Represented By: Joseph Scott St. John
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Joseph R. Biden, Jr., in his official capacity as President of the United States
Represented By: Andrew Marshall Bernie
Represented By: Thomas Wayne Ports Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Deb Haaland, in her official capacity as Secretary of the Interior
Represented By: Andrew Marshall Bernie
Represented By: Thomas Wayne Ports Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Michael Nedd, in his official capacity as Deputy Director of the Bureau of Land Management
Represented By: Andrew Marshall Bernie
Represented By: Thomas Wayne Ports Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Chad Padgett, in his official capacity as Director of the Bureau of Land Management Alaska Office
Represented By: Andrew Marshall Bernie
Represented By: Thomas Wayne Ports Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Raymond Suazo, in his official capacity as Director for the Bureau of Land Management Arizona Office
Represented By: Andrew Marshall Bernie
Represented By: Thomas Wayne Ports Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Karen Mouritsen, in her official capacity as Director for the Bureau of Land Management California Office
Represented By: Andrew Marshall Bernie
Represented By: Thomas Wayne Ports Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Jamie Connell, in his official capacity as Director for the Bureau of Land Management Colorado Office
Represented By: Andrew Marshall Bernie
Represented By: Thomas Wayne Ports Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Mitchell Leverette, in his official capacity as Director for the Bureau of Land Management Eastern States Office
Represented By: Andrew Marshall Bernie
Represented By: Thomas Wayne Ports Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: John Ruhs, in his official capacity as Director for the Bureau of Land Management Idaho Office
Represented By: Andrew Marshall Bernie
Represented By: Thomas Wayne Ports Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: John Mehlhoff, in his official capacity as Director for the Bureau of Land Management Montana-Dakotas Office
Represented By: Andrew Marshall Bernie
Represented By: Thomas Wayne Ports Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Jon Raby, in his official capacity as Director for the Bureau of Land Management Nevada Office
Represented By: Andrew Marshall Bernie
Represented By: Thomas Wayne Ports Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Steve Wells, in his official capacity as Director for the Bureau of Land Management New Mexico Office
Represented By: Andrew Marshall Bernie
Represented By: Thomas Wayne Ports Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Barry Bushue, in his official capacity as Director for the Bureau of Land Management Oregon-Washington Office
Represented By: Andrew Marshall Bernie
Represented By: Thomas Wayne Ports Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Greg Sheehan, in his official capacity as Director for the Bureau of Land Management Utah Office
Represented By: Andrew Marshall Bernie
Represented By: Thomas Wayne Ports Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Kim Liebhauser, in her official capacity as Director for the Bureau of Land Management Wyoming Office
Represented By: Andrew Marshall Bernie
Represented By: Thomas Wayne Ports Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Amanda Lefton, in her official capacity as Director of the Bureau of Ocean Energy Management
Represented By: Andrew Marshall Bernie
Represented By: Thomas Wayne Ports Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Michael Celata, in his official capacity as Regional Director of the Bureau of Ocean Energy Management Gulf of Mexico Office
Represented By: Andrew Marshall Bernie
Represented By: Thomas Wayne Ports Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Lars Herbst, in his official capacity as Regional Director of the Bureau of Safety and Environmental Enforcement Gulf of Mexico OCS Office
Represented By: Andrew Marshall Bernie
Represented By: Thomas Wayne Ports Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Mark Fesmire, in his official capacity as Regional Director of the Bureau of Safety and Environmental Enforcement Alaska and Pacific Office
Represented By: Andrew Marshall Bernie
Represented By: Thomas Wayne Ports Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?