Keelan Harris v. FBOP, et al
Defendant: FBOP
Plaintiff / Appellant: KEELAN HARRIS
Defendant / Appellee: LT. CRAIG BRINKER, J.L. NORWOOD, Former Regional Director, Northeast Region, In His Individual and Official Capacity, BILL STORY, Associate Warden FCI Elkton, In His Individual and Official Capacity, GLEN JOHNSON, Chaplin, FCI Elkton, In His Individual and Official Capacity, JOEL COHN, Case Manager, FCI Elkton, In His Individual and Official Capacity, BRIAN BUTTS, MATTHEW BUTLER, KENNETH PINGATORE, RALPH HANSON, Warden, Former Warden, FCI Elkton, In His Individual and Official Capacity, HARRELL WATTS, Former Administrative Remedy Coordinator of the FBOP, In His Individual and Official Capacity, MARILOU BURNS, Unit Manager, FCI Elkton, In Her Individual and Official Capacity, STEVEN GRIMM, Captain, FCI Elkton, In His Indivudal and Official Capacity, MICHAEL CARVAJAL, Regional Director, Northeast Region, In His Individual and Official Capacity, IAN CONNORS, Administrative Remedy Coordinator of the FBOP, In His Individual and Official Capacity and STEVEN MERLAK, Warden, Warden, FCI Elkton, In His Individual and Official Capacity
Case Number: 19-3585
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Filing 7 Appellant MOTION filed by Keelan Harris to proceed in forma pauperis. Certificate of service: 08/08/2019. (REO) [Entered: 08/13/2019 11:21 AM]
August 12, 2019 Filing 6 Prisoner trust account statement filed. (REO) [Entered: 08/13/2019 11:19 AM]
August 12, 2019 Filing 5 Financial Affidavit filed by Party Keelan Harris Certificate of Service: 08/08/2019. (REO) [Entered: 08/13/2019 11:18 AM]
July 31, 2019 Filing 4 CORRESPONDENCE: request for IFP forms by Keelan Harris. (REO) [Entered: 08/01/2019 08:13 AM]
June 28, 2019 Filing 3 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Harrell Watts, Ian Connors, J.L. Norwood, Michael Carvajal, Ralph Hanson, Steven Merlak, Bill Story, Steven Grimm, Glen Johnson, Marilou Burns, Craig Brinker, Kenneth Pingatore, Brian Butts, Matthew Butler and Joel Cohn by Karen E. Swanson Haan. Certificate of Service: 06/28/2019. [19-3585] (KES) [Entered: 06/28/2019 01:48 PM]
June 24, 2019 Filing 2 The case manager for this case is: Ryan Orme (REO) [Entered: 06/24/2019 03:05 PM]
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 Prisoner Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Keelan Harris. Transcript needed: n. (REO) [Entered: 06/24/2019 03:01 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Keelan Harris v. FBOP, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: KEELAN HARRIS
Represented By: Keelan Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LT. CRAIG BRINKER
Represented By: Karen Elizabeth Swanson Haan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: J.L. NORWOOD, Former Regional Director, Northeast Region, In His Individual and Official Capacity
Represented By: Karen Elizabeth Swanson Haan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BILL STORY, Associate Warden FCI Elkton, In His Individual and Official Capacity
Represented By: Karen Elizabeth Swanson Haan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GLEN JOHNSON, Chaplin, FCI Elkton, In His Individual and Official Capacity
Represented By: Karen Elizabeth Swanson Haan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOEL COHN, Case Manager, FCI Elkton, In His Individual and Official Capacity
Represented By: Karen Elizabeth Swanson Haan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BRIAN BUTTS
Represented By: Karen Elizabeth Swanson Haan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MATTHEW BUTLER
Represented By: Karen Elizabeth Swanson Haan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KENNETH PINGATORE
Represented By: Karen Elizabeth Swanson Haan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RALPH HANSON, Warden, Former Warden, FCI Elkton, In His Individual and Official Capacity
Represented By: Karen Elizabeth Swanson Haan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HARRELL WATTS, Former Administrative Remedy Coordinator of the FBOP, In His Individual and Official Capacity
Represented By: Karen Elizabeth Swanson Haan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MARILOU BURNS, Unit Manager, FCI Elkton, In Her Individual and Official Capacity
Represented By: Karen Elizabeth Swanson Haan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: STEVEN GRIMM, Captain, FCI Elkton, In His Indivudal and Official Capacity
Represented By: Karen Elizabeth Swanson Haan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MICHAEL CARVAJAL, Regional Director, Northeast Region, In His Individual and Official Capacity
Represented By: Karen Elizabeth Swanson Haan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: IAN CONNORS, Administrative Remedy Coordinator of the FBOP, In His Individual and Official Capacity
Represented By: Karen Elizabeth Swanson Haan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: STEVEN MERLAK, Warden, Warden, FCI Elkton, In His Individual and Official Capacity
Represented By: Karen Elizabeth Swanson Haan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FBOP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?