Vapor Technology Association, et al v. FDA, et al
Plaintiff: VAPOR TECHNOLOGY ASSOCIATION
Plaintiff / Appellant: VAPOR STOCKROOM, LLC
Defendant / Appellee: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, UNITED STATES FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION, NORMAN E. SHARPLESS, M.D., Acting Commissioner for Food and Drug Administration, STEPHEN HAHN, MD, Commissioner for Food and Drug Administration and ALEX M. AZAR, II, Secretary of Health and Human Services
Case Number: 20-5199
Filed: February 21, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
October 5, 2020 Summary Vapor Technology Association v. United States Food and Drug Administration

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: the motion for injunction [ # 11 ] and the request to expedite [ # 11 ] are DENIED. Karen Nelson Moore, Circuit Judge; Ronald Lee Gilman, Circuit Judge and John M. Rogers, Circuit Judge. (LAJ) [Entered: 04/02/2020 09:10 AM]
March 21, 2020 Filing 16 APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Mr. Eric N. Heyer for Vapor Stockroom, LLC Certificate of Service:03/21/2020. Argument Request: requested. [20-5199] (ENH) [Entered: 03/21/2020 10:42 AM]
March 19, 2020 Filing 15 LETTER filed by Mr. Eric N. Heyer for Vapor Stockroom, LLC regarding Plaintiff-Appellant's Opening Merits Brief Certificate of Service: 03/19/2020. [20-5199] (ENH) [Entered: 03/19/2020 06:56 PM]
March 13, 2020 Filing 14 LETTER filed by Mr. Eric N. Heyer for Vapor Stockroom, LLC communicating dates of unavailability for oral argument: May 1, 2020. Certificate of Service: 03/13/2020. [20-5199] (ENH) [Entered: 03/13/2020 06:08 PM]
March 12, 2020 Filing 13 REPLY filed by Mr. Eric N. Heyer for Vapor Stockroom, LLC regarding Motion for Injunction Pending Appeal or, Alternatively, to Expedite Certificate of Service: 03/12/2020. [20-5199] (ENH) [Entered: 03/12/2020 11:56 PM]
March 9, 2020 Filing 12 RESPONSE in opposition filed regarding a motion for injunction pending appeal, a motion to expedite briefing schedule, a motion to expedite oral argument, and motion to expedite decision, [ # 11 ]; previously filed by Mr. Eric N. Heyer for Vapor Stockroom, LLC. Response from Attorney Mr. Joshua Revesz for Appellees Alex M. Azar, II, Stephen Hahn, MD, HHS and FDA Certificate of Service:03/09/2020. [20-5199] (JR) [Entered: 03/09/2020 01:10 PM]
February 27, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION filed by Mr. Eric N. Heyer for Vapor Stockroom, LLC for injunction pending appeal, or alternatively to expedite briefing schedule, to expedite oral argument, to expedite decision. Certificate of Service: 02/27/2020. [20-5199] --[Edited 02/27/2020 by LAJ to clarify relief requested] (ENH) [Entered: 02/27/2020 01:11 AM]
February 26, 2020 Filing 10 CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. Eric N. Heyer for Appellant Vapor Stockroom, LLC. Certificate of Service:02/26/2020. [20-5199] (ENH) [Entered: 02/26/2020 10:29 AM]
February 26, 2020 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Eric N. Heyer for Appellant Vapor Stockroom, LLC Certificate of Service: 02/26/2020. [20-5199] (ENH) [Entered: 02/26/2020 10:03 AM]
February 26, 2020 Filing 8 APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Vapor Stockroom, LLC by Eric N. Heyer. Certificate of Service: 02/26/2020. [20-5199] (ENH) [Entered: 02/26/2020 09:59 AM]
February 26, 2020 Filing 7 BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 04/06/2020;. appellee brief due 05/06/2020; (LAJ) [Entered: 02/26/2020 07:15 AM]
February 24, 2020 Filing 6 APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Vapor Stockroom, LLC by Robert P. Johnson. Certificate of Service: 02/24/2020. [20-5199] (RPJ) [Entered: 02/24/2020 12:13 PM]
February 24, 2020 Filing 5 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: The appearance form , [ # 3 ], filed by Ms. Lindsey Powell for Appellees FDA, HHS, Alex M. Azar, II and Stephen Hahn, MD is deficient for the reason noted on the attached checklist. (LAJ) [Entered: 02/24/2020 11:50 AM]
February 24, 2020 Filing 4 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Alex M. Azar, II, FDA, HHS and Stephen Hahn by Joshua Revesz. Certificate of Service: 02/24/2020. [20-5199] (JR) [Entered: 02/24/2020 11:06 AM]
February 23, 2020 Filing 3 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees FDA, HHS, Alex M. Azar, II and Stephen Hahn by Lindsey Powell. Certificate of Service: 02/23/2020. [20-5199] (LP) [Entered: 02/23/2020 03:45 PM]
February 21, 2020 Filing 2 The case manager for this case is: Laura Jones (LAJ) [Entered: 02/21/2020 12:47 PM]
February 21, 2020 Filing 1 Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Vapor Stockroom, LLC. Transcript needed: n. (LAJ) [Entered: 02/21/2020 12:43 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Vapor Technology Association, et al v. FDA, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: VAPOR STOCKROOM, LLC
Represented By: Eric N. Heyer
Represented By: Robert Paul Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VAPOR TECHNOLOGY ASSOCIATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Represented By: Lindsey Powell
Represented By: Joshua Revesz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITED STATES FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION
Represented By: Lindsey Powell
Represented By: Joshua Revesz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NORMAN E. SHARPLESS, M.D., Acting Commissioner for Food and Drug Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: STEPHEN HAHN, MD, Commissioner for Food and Drug Administration
Represented By: Lindsey Powell
Represented By: Joshua Revesz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ALEX M. AZAR, II, Secretary of Health and Human Services
Represented By: Lindsey Powell
Represented By: Joshua Revesz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?