Select Comfort Corporation, et al v. John Baxter, et al
Defendant / Appellee: Digi Craft Agency, LLC, Scott Stenzel, Direct Commerce, LLC, doing business as Personal Touch Beds, Craig Miller, John Baxter and Dires, LLC, doing business as Personal Touch Beds and Personal Comfort Beds
Plaintiff / Appellant: Select Comfort SC Corporation and Select Comfort Corporation
Case Number: 19-1077
Filed: January 10, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eighth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2019 DESIGNATION of record filed by Appellees Dires, LLC, Mr. Craig Miller, Mr. Scott Stenzel and Mr. John Baxter in 19-1077, Appellants Dires, LLC, Mr. Craig Miller and Mr. Scott Stenzel in 19-1113, Appellant Mr. John Baxter in 19-1178. w/service 02/22/2019 [4759314] [19-1077, 19-1113, 19-1178] (JMR) [Entered: 02/22/2019 04:55 PM]
February 12, 2019 STATEMENT of issues filed by Appellants Select Comfort Corporation and Select Comfort SC Corporation in 19-1077, Appellees Select Comfort Corporation and Select Comfort SC Corporation in 19-1113, 19-1178 - w/service 02/12/2019. [4755983] [19-1077, 19-1113, 19-1178] (EAP) [Entered: 02/12/2019 03:44 PM]
February 12, 2019 METHOD of appendix preparation filed by Appellants Select Comfort Corporation and Select Comfort SC Corporation in 19-1077, Appellees Select Comfort Corporation and Select Comfort SC Corporation in 19-1113, 19-1178 - Separate Appendix - w/service 02/12/2019 [4755978] [19-1077, 19-1113, 19-1178] (EAP) [Entered: 02/12/2019 03:42 PM]
February 12, 2019 Certificate of transcript filed by Appellants Select Comfort Corporation and Select Comfort SC Corporation in 19-1077, Appellees Select Comfort Corporation and Select Comfort SC Corporation in 19-1113, 19-1178. No Transcript[4755974] [19-1077, 19-1113, 19-1178] (EAP) [Entered: 02/12/2019 03:38 PM]
February 11, 2019 RECORD FILED - MOTION TRANSCRIPT, 1 volumes, Location STL, Comments: Cross Motions for Summary Judgment Hearing - District Court document #298 [Copy do not return to the District Court at end of case], Source Location: USDC / MN, Dt. of Proceeding/Hearing: 10/02/2015, No. of Pgs.: 92, Court Reporter: Anderson, Jeanne Marie [4755631] [19-1077, 19-1113, 19-1178] (STL) [Entered: 02/12/2019 10:14 AM]
February 11, 2019 RECORD FILED - TRIAL TRANSCRIPT, 17 volumes, Location STL, Comments: Copies do not return to the District Court at end of case, Source Location: USDC / MN, Dt. of Proceeding/Hearing: 09/22/2017 - 10/18/2017 [4755397] [19-1077, 19-1113, 19-1178]--[Edited 02/11/2019 by STL] (STL) [Entered: 02/11/2019 02:55 PM]
February 11, 2019 RECORD FILED - TRIAL TRANSCRIPT, 1 volumes, Location STL, Comments: Voir Dire Proceedings - District Court document #580 [Copy do not return to the District Court at end of case], Source Location: USDC / MN, Dt. of Proceeding/Hearing: 09/22/2017, No. of Pgs.: 192, Court Reporter: Bebault, Carla R [4755380] [19-1077, 19-1113, 19-1178] (STL) [Entered: 02/11/2019 02:34 PM]
February 11, 2019 RECORD FILED - MOTION TRANSCRIPT, 1 volumes, Location STL, Comments: District Court document #701 [Copy do not return to the District Court at end of case], Source Location: USDC / MN, Dt. of Proceeding/Hearing: 06/25/2018, No. of Pgs.: 127, Court Reporter: Krenz, Lynne [4755374] [19-1077, 19-1113, 19-1178] (STL) [Entered: 02/11/2019 02:28 PM]
February 11, 2019 RECORD FILED - MOTION TRANSCRIPT, 1 volumes, Location STL, Comments: Daubert Motion Hearing - District Court document #324 [Copy do not return to the District Court at end of case], Source Location: USDC / MN, Dt. of Proceeding/Hearing: 08/19/2016, No. of Pgs.: 131, Court Reporter: Anderson, Jeanne Marie [4755372] [19-1077, 19-1113, 19-1178] (STL) [Entered: 02/11/2019 02:25 PM]
February 11, 2019 RECORD FILED - MOTION TRANSCRIPT, 1 volumes, Location STL, Comments: District Court document #158 [Copy do not return to the District Court at end of case], Source Location: USDC / MN, Dt. of Proceeding/Hearing: 01/29/2014, No. of Pgs.: 48, Court Reporter: Bebault, Carla R [4755367] [19-1077, 19-1113, 19-1178] (STL) [Entered: 02/11/2019 02:19 PM]
February 11, 2019 RECORD FILED - MOTION TRANSCRIPT, 1 volumes, Location STL, Comments: District Court document #275 [Copy do not return to the District Court at end of case], Source Location: USDC / MN, Dt. of Proceeding/Hearing: 05/14/2015, No. of Pgs.: 71, Court Reporter: Heichert, Staci [4755364] [19-1077, 19-1113, 19-1178] (STL) [Entered: 02/11/2019 02:16 PM]
February 11, 2019 RECORD FILED - HEARING TRANSCRIPT, 1 volumes, Location STL, Comments: Pretrial Conference and Motions Hearing - District Court document #579 [Copy do not return to the District Court at end of case], Source Location: USDC / MN, Dt. of Proceeding/Hearing: 09/20/2017, No. of Pgs.: 93, Court Reporter: Bebault, Carla R [4755355] [19-1077, 19-1113, 19-1178] (STL) [Entered: 02/11/2019 02:07 PM]
February 11, 2019 RECORD FILED - HEARING TRANSCRIPT, 2 volumes, Location STL, Comments: Pretrial Motions Hearing - District Court documents #508 and #509 [Copies do not return to the District Court at end of case], Source Location: USDC / MN, Dt. of Proceeding/Hearing: 11/15/2016 - 11/16/2016, No. of Pgs.: 340, Court Reporter: Anderson, Jeanne Marie [4755350] [19-1077, 19-1113, 19-1178] (STL) [Entered: 02/11/2019 02:02 PM]
January 29, 2019 **CORRECTED** CROSS APPEAL BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Transcript due on or before 03/06/2019. Appendix due 03/18/2019. BRIEF APPELLANT, Select Comfort Corporation and Select Comfort SC Corporation due 03/18/2019. Appellee/cross Appellant brief due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the appellant's brief. [4750377] [19-1077, 19-1113, 19-1178] (CBO) [Entered: 01/29/2019 09:38 AM]
January 28, 2019 APPEARANCE filed by Cassandra B. Merrick for Appellees Dires, LLC, Mr. Craig Miller and Mr. Scott Stenzel w/service 01/28/2019 [4749893] [19-1077] (CBM) [Entered: 01/28/2019 09:37 AM]
January 25, 2019 CROSS APPEAL BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Transcript due on or before 03/06/2019. Appendix due 03/18/2019. BRIEF APPELLANT, John Baxter due 03/18/2019. Appellee/cross Appellant brief due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the appellant's brief. (DOCUMENT LOCKED - filed in error - new cross appeal briefing schedule set) [4749551] [19-1077, 19-1113, 19-1178]--[Edited 01/29/2019 by CYZ] (CBO) [Entered: 01/25/2019 01:13 PM]
January 18, 2019 APPEARANCE filed by Barbara P. Berens for Appellee Mr. John Baxter w/service 01/18/2019 [4747393] [19-1077] (BPB) [Entered: 01/18/2019 11:26 AM]
January 16, 2019 CROSS APPEAL BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Transcript due on or before 02/25/2019. Appendix due 03/07/2019. BRIEF APPELLANT, Select Comfort Corporation and Select Comfort SC Corporation due 03/07/2019. Appellee/cross Appellant brief due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the appellant's brief. [4746545] [19-1077, 19-1113] (CBO) [Entered: 01/16/2019 12:04 PM]
January 16, 2019 CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellees Dires, LLC, Mr. Craig Miller and Mr. Scott Stenzel. - FOR CAL [4746388] [19-1077] (CWM) [Entered: 01/16/2019 09:43 AM]
January 14, 2019 APPEARANCE filed by Jennifer M. Robbins for Appellees Dires, LLC, Mr. Craig Miller and Mr. Scott Stenzel w/service 01/14/2019 [4745780] [19-1077] (JMR) [Entered: 01/14/2019 04:46 PM]
January 14, 2019 APPEARANCE filed by Christopher W. Madel for Appellees Dires, LLC, Mr. Craig Miller and Mr. Scott Stenzel w/service 01/14/2019 [4745778] [19-1077] (CWM) [Entered: 01/14/2019 04:41 PM]
January 14, 2019 CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellants Select Comfort Corporation and Select Comfort SC Corporation. - FOR CAL [4745417] [19-1077] (EAP) [Entered: 01/14/2019 09:46 AM]
January 14, 2019 APPEARANCE filed by Elizabeth A. Patton for Appellants Select Comfort Corporation and Select Comfort SC Corporation w/service 01/14/2019 [4745404] [19-1077] (EAP) [Entered: 01/14/2019 09:40 AM]
January 14, 2019 APPEARANCE filed by Heidi A.O. Fisher for Appellants Select Comfort Corporation and Select Comfort SC Corporation w/service 01/14/2019 [4745400] [19-1077] (HAF) [Entered: 01/14/2019 09:38 AM]
January 14, 2019 APPEARANCE filed by Andrew S. Hansen for Appellants Select Comfort Corporation and Select Comfort SC Corporation w/service 01/14/2019 [4745396] [19-1077] (ASH) [Entered: 01/14/2019 09:35 AM]
January 10, 2019 BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Transcript due on or before 02/19/2019. Appendix due 03/01/2019. BRIEF APPELLANT, Select Comfort Corporation and Select Comfort SC Corporation due 03/01/2019 Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. Appellant reply brief is due 21 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the appellee brief. [4744702] [19-1077] (CBO) [Entered: 01/10/2019 03:35 PM]
January 10, 2019 Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal filed 1/7/2019, docket entries, memorandum opinion and order filed 12/12/2018, and judgment filed 12/16/2018. [4744699] [19-1077] (CBO) [Entered: 01/10/2019 03:31 PM]
January 10, 2019 Civil case docketed. [4744676] [19-1077] (CBO) [Entered: 01/10/2019 03:13 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Eighth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Select Comfort Corporation, et al v. John Baxter, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Digi Craft Agency, LLC
Represented By: Cassandra B. Merrick
Represented By: Jennifer M. Robbins
Represented By: Christopher William Madel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Scott Stenzel
Represented By: Cassandra B. Merrick
Represented By: Jennifer M. Robbins
Represented By: Christopher William Madel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Direct Commerce, LLC, doing business as Personal Touch Beds
Represented By: Cassandra B. Merrick
Represented By: Jennifer M. Robbins
Represented By: Christopher William Madel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Craig Miller
Represented By: Cassandra B. Merrick
Represented By: Jennifer M. Robbins
Represented By: Christopher William Madel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: John Baxter
Represented By: Erin K. Fogarty Lisle
Represented By: Carrie L. Zochert
Represented By: Cassandra B. Merrick
Represented By: Barbara Podlucky Berens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Dires, LLC, doing business as Personal Touch Beds and Personal Comfort Beds
Represented By: Cassandra B. Merrick
Represented By: Jennifer M. Robbins
Represented By: Christopher William Madel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Select Comfort SC Corporation
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Patton
Represented By: Andrew Scott Hansen
Represented By: Heidi A.O. Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Select Comfort Corporation
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Patton
Represented By: Andrew Scott Hansen
Represented By: Heidi A.O. Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?