James Vandevender v. Captain Walter Sass, et al
Defendant / Appellee: Rick Bibeau, in their individual capacities, Lieutenant Sammy Burch, Lieutenant, Unknown Employee of MN Correctional Facility INDUS, in their individual capacities doing business as MINNCOR Industries, Correctional Officer Joshua Burdine, Correctional Officer, in their individual and official capacities, Captain Walter Sass, Captain, Sergeant Chris White, Sergeant, Correctional Officer DuWayne Dahl, Correctional Officer, in their individual and official capacities and Sergeant Trevor Sass, Sergeant
Plaintiff / Appellant: James Vandevender
Case Number: 19-1230
Filed: February 1, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eighth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
July 31, 2020 Summary Vandevender v. Sass

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2019 Paper copies Appellant/Petitioner Brief, [ # 4769687-2 ] filed by Mr. James Vandevender 10 copies paper copies received. w/Addendum attached [4770703] [19-1230] (LMT) [Entered: 03/26/2019 11:04 AM]
March 22, 2019 BRIEF FILED - APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Mr. James Vandevender. w/service 03/18/2019 , Length: 4540 words 10 COPIES OF PAPER BRIEFS (WITHOUT THE APPELLATE PDF FOOTER) FROM James Vandevender due 03/27/2019 WITH certificate of service for paper briefs . Brief of Rick Bibeau, Sammy Burch, Joshua Burdine, DuWayne Dahl, Trevor Sass, Walter Sass, Unknown Employee of MN Correctional Facility INDUS and Chris White due on 04/22/2019 [4769687] [19-1230] (LMT) [Entered: 03/22/2019 11:02 AM]
March 22, 2019 ADDENDUM of APPELLANT FILED by Appellant Mr. James Vandevender , w/service 03/21/2019 [4769680] [19-1230] Duplicative entry--[Edited 03/22/2019 by LMT] (LMT) [Entered: 03/22/2019 10:48 AM]
March 21, 2019 ADDENDUM of APPELLANT FILED by Appellant Mr. James Vandevender , w/service 03/21/2019 [4769519] [19-1230] (LMT) [Entered: 03/21/2019 04:13 PM]
March 21, 2019 Addendum of APPELLANT submitted for review by Mr. James Vandevender. To open/view this addendum, you must first login to CM/ECF and then open the document link in your Notice of Docket Activity. [4769448] [19-1230] (MRB) [Entered: 03/21/2019 03:01 PM]
March 20, 2019 RECORD FILED - JOINT APPENDIX, 1 volumes, Comments: 3 copies, Source Location: St. Louis [4769058] [19-1230] (LMT) [Entered: 03/20/2019 03:57 PM]
March 19, 2019 Addendum deficiency notice sent to counsel, Attorney Mr. Mark R. Bradford for Appellant Mr. James Vandevender. New electronic copy of addendum due on 03/25/2019 [4768079] [19-1230] Counsel must add cover to Addendum and add one page Judgment of District Court--[Edited 03/19/2019 by LMT] (LMT) [Entered: 03/19/2019 09:48 AM]
March 18, 2019 Addendum of APPELLANT submitted for review by Mr. James Vandevender. To open/view this addendum, you must first login to CM/ECF and then open the document link in your Notice of Docket Activity. [4767896] [19-1230] (MRB) [Entered: 03/18/2019 04:21 PM]
March 18, 2019 APPELLANT brief of Mr. James Vandevender submitted for review. The time for filing the subsequent brief (if any) does not begin to run until the brief has been approved and filed. To open/view this brief, you must first login to CM/ECF and then open the document link in your Notice of Docket Activity. Only direct recipients on accounts can open this document. [4767893] [19-1230] (MRB) [Entered: 03/18/2019 04:19 PM]
February 18, 2019 DESIGNATION of record filed by Appellant Mr. James Vandevender. w/service 02/18/2019 [4757257] [19-1230] (MRB) [Entered: 02/18/2019 10:13 AM]
February 18, 2019 STATEMENT of issues filed by Appellant Mr. James Vandevender - w/service 02/18/2019. [4757256] [19-1230] (MRB) [Entered: 02/18/2019 10:11 AM]
February 18, 2019 Certificate of transcript filed by Appellant Mr. James Vandevender. No Transcript[4757255] [19-1230] (MRB) [Entered: 02/18/2019 10:07 AM]
February 4, 2019 BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Transcript due on or before 03/18/2019. Appendix due on 03/18/2019. BRIEF OF APPELLANT James Vandevender due 03/18/2019. Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. Appellant reply brief is due 21 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the appellee brief. [4752759] [19-1230] (MMH) [Entered: 02/04/2019 11:34 AM]
February 4, 2019 Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, and Judgment 12/7/18 [4752714] [19-1230] (MMH) [Entered: 02/04/2019 11:03 AM]
February 4, 2019 CLERK LETTER sent regarding new caption in case. [4752702] [19-1230] (MMH) [Entered: 02/04/2019 10:47 AM]
February 4, 2019 APPEARANCE filed by Mark R. Bradford for Appellant Mr. James Vandevender w/service 02/04/2019 [4752619] [19-1230] (MRB) [Entered: 02/04/2019 09:28 AM]
February 4, 2019 APPEARANCE filed by Kathryn Iverson Landrum for Appellees Rick Bibeau, Sammy Burch, Joshua Burdine, DuWayne Dahl, Trevor Sass, Walter Sass and Chris White w/service 02/04/2019 [4752589] [19-1230] (KIL) [Entered: 02/04/2019 08:43 AM]
February 1, 2019 Prisoner case docketed. [4752490] [19-1230] (MMH) [Entered: 02/01/2019 04:37 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: James Vandevender v. Captain Walter Sass, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Rick Bibeau, in their individual capacities
Represented By: Kathryn Iverson Landrum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Lieutenant Sammy Burch, Lieutenant
Represented By: Kathryn Iverson Landrum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Unknown Employee of MN Correctional Facility INDUS, in their individual capacities doing business as MINNCOR Industries
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Correctional Officer Joshua Burdine, Correctional Officer, in their individual and official capacities
Represented By: Kathryn Iverson Landrum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Captain Walter Sass, Captain
Represented By: Kathryn Iverson Landrum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Sergeant Chris White, Sergeant
Represented By: Kathryn Iverson Landrum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Correctional Officer DuWayne Dahl, Correctional Officer, in their individual and official capacities
Represented By: Kathryn Iverson Landrum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Sergeant Trevor Sass, Sergeant
Represented By: Kathryn Iverson Landrum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: James Vandevender
Represented By: Phillip Frederick Fishman
Represented By: Mark R. Bradford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?