Larry Milton, et al v. Arkansas State Board of Educ., et al
Plaintiff: Lee Nayles, Dr.; on Behalf of Himself and Infant Jon Nayles, by next friend Jon Nayles
Defendant: Alice L. Preston, Member, Arkansas State Board of Education, Camden, AR, City of, A Public Body Corporate, Jeff Starling, Member, Arkansas State Board of Education, L. D. Harris, Member, Arkansas State Board of Education, Elaine Scott, Member, Arkansas State Board of Education, Harmony Grove, AR School District, The Board of Education of the, A Public Body Corporate, Burton Burton, Director, Arkansas Department of Education, Walter Turnbow, Member, Arkansas State Board of Education, Nancy Wood, Member, Arkansas State Board of Education, Bill Clinton, Governor of the St. of AR; Individually, Camden, AR Housing Authority, The Board of Directors of the, A Public Body Corporate, Earle Love, Member, Arkansas State Board of Education, Harry P. McDonald, Member, Arkansas State Board of Education, Camden, AR Fairview School District, A Public Body Corporate, Robert L. Newton, Member, Arkansas State Board of Education and Camden, AR School District No. 35, The Board of Education of the, A Public Body Corporate
Plaintiff / Appellee: Terry Alexander, Larry Milton, on behalf of Himself and Infants Shanna Milton and Shana Milton, by next friend Shanna Milton, by next friend Shana Milton, Bobbie Ray Cheeks, on Behalf of Infant Bobbie Ray, Jr., by next friend Bobbie Ray, Jr. and Willie D. Harris, Dr.; on Behalf of Himself and Infant Mark Neil, by next friend Mark Neil
Defendant / Appellant: Arkansas State Board of Education, The Members of the and Arkansas State Board of Education, The
Case Number: 19-1349
Filed: February 21, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eighth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
December 31, 2020 Summary United States v. Arkansas Department of Educ.

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2019 RECORD FILED - HEARING TRANSCRIPT, 1 volumes, Location STL, Comments: Copy do not return to the District Court at end of case, Source Location: USDC / WAED, Dt. of Proceeding/Hearing: 06/22/2018, No. of Pgs.: 41, Court Reporter: Burson, Felisha [4775672] [19-1340, 19-1342, 19-1348, 19-1349] (STL) [Entered: 04/09/2019 12:10 PM]
April 9, 2019 RECORD FILED - HEARING TRANSCRIPT, 1 volumes, Location STL, Comments: Copy do not return to the District Court at end of case, Source Location: USDC / WAED, Dt. of Proceeding/Hearing: 08/01/2018, No. of Pgs.: 252, Court Reporter: Congdon, Rick L [4775666] [19-1340, 19-1342, 19-1348, 19-1349] (STL) [Entered: 04/09/2019 12:07 PM]
April 8, 2019 JUDGE ORDER: [ # 4765290-2 ] Appellants' motion for stay pending appeal is denied. Adp Apr 2019 [4775320] [19-1340, 19-1342, 19-1348, 19-1349] (JPP) [Entered: 04/08/2019 03:35 PM]
April 4, 2019 CLERK ORDER:Granting [ # 4774152-2 ] motion for extension of time to file brief filed by Mr. Dylan L. Jacobs. Brief of Arkansas Department of Education and Arkansas State Board of Education due 05/03/2019. Appendix due on 05/03/2019. [4774215] [19-1340, 19-1342, 19-1348, 19-1349] (JPP) [Entered: 04/04/2019 02:48 PM]
April 4, 2019 MOTION for extension of time to file brief until 05/03/2019, filed by Attorney Mr. Dylan L. Jacobs for Appellants Arkansas Department of Education and Arkansas State Board of Education in 19-1340, 19-1342, 19-1348, Attorney Mr. Dylan L. Jacobs for Appellants Arkansas State Board of Education, Arkansas State Board of Education and Not Party Burton Burton in 19-1349 w/service 04/04/2019. [4774152] [19-1340, 19-1342, 19-1348, 19-1349] (DLJ) [Entered: 04/04/2019 01:27 PM]
April 4, 2019 Mail sent to Appellee Camden, AR Fairview School District Attorney Ms. Carol Crafton Anthony for Appellee Camden, AR Fairview School District on 03/12/2019 was returned on 04/01/2019 Reason Mail Returned: no forwarding address found; upon review, determined Judge Carol Crafton Anthony is deceased. [4774108] [19-1349] (AEV) [Entered: 04/04/2019 11:43 AM]
March 28, 2019 REPLY to response [ # 4769498-2 ] filed by Appellants Arkansas Department of Education and Arkansas State Board of Education in 19-1340, 19-1342, 19-1348, Appellants Arkansas State Board of Education and Arkansas State Board of Education in 19-1349 w/service 03/28/2019. [4771988] [19-1340, 19-1342, 19-1348, 19-1349] (DLJ) [Entered: 03/28/2019 09:53 PM]
March 21, 2019 RESPONSE in opposition to motion [ # 4765290-2 ] filed by Mr. Shawn Garrick Childs for Appellees Terry Alexander, Bobbie Ray Cheeks, Mr. Willie D. Harris and Larry Milton, Ms. Whitney F. Moore for Appellee Camden, AR Fairview School District, Mr. Allen P. Roberts for Appellee Camden, AR Fairview School District and Mr. John Winfred Walker, Sr. for Appellees Terry Alexander, Bobbie Ray Cheeks, Mr. Willie D. Harris and Larry Milton in 19-1349, Ms. Whitney F. Moore for Appellees Junction City School District, R.L. Bolen and Junction City School Board and Mr. Allen P. Roberts for Appellees Junction City School District, R.L. Bolen and Junction City School Board in 19-1340, Mr. Shawn Garrick Childs for Appellee Ms. Rosie L. Davis, Ms. Whitney F. Moore for Appellee Mr. William Dale Franks, Mr. Allen P. Roberts for Appellee Mr. William Dale Franks and Mr. John Winfred Walker, Sr. for Appellee Ms. Rosie L. Davis in 19-1342, Mr. Shawn Garrick Childs for Appellees Ms. Mary Turner, Ms. Lucy Cheatham, Mary Rose, Obie Sasser, Barbara Dudley, Ms. Ida Dudley, Ms. Rosie Blair, Johnny Blair, Mr. Robert Wise and Mr. Mildred Thompson, Ms. Whitney F. Moore for Appellee Lafayette County School District, Mr. Allen P. Roberts for Appellee Lafayette County School District and Mr. John Winfred Walker, Sr. for Appellees Ms. Mary Turner, Ms. Lucy Cheatham, Mary Rose, Obie Sasser, Barbara Dudley, Ms. Ida Dudley, Ms. Rosie Blair, Johnny Blair, Mr. Robert Wise and Mr. Mildred Thompson in 19-1348 , w/service 03/21/2019. [4769498] [19-1349, 19-1340, 19-1342, 19-1348] (WFM) [Entered: 03/21/2019 03:50 PM]
March 21, 2019 APPEARANCE filed by Allen P. Roberts for Appellee Camden, AR Fairview School District w/service 03/21/2019 [4769282] [19-1349] (WFM) [Entered: 03/21/2019 11:01 AM]
March 21, 2019 APPEARANCE filed by Whitney F. Moore for Appellee Camden, AR Fairview School District w/service 03/21/2019 [4769210] [19-1349] (WFM) [Entered: 03/21/2019 09:42 AM]
March 12, 2019 CORRECTED CONSOLIDATED BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Transcript due on or before 04/02/2019. Appendix due 04/12/2019. BRIEF APPELLANT, Arkansas Department of Education and Arkansas State Board of Education due 04/12/2019 Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. Appellant reply brief is due 21 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the appellee brief. [4765516] [19-1340, 19-1342, 19-1348, 19-1349] (AEV) [Entered: 03/12/2019 11:17 AM]
March 11, 2019 MOTION for stay pending appeal, filed by Attorney Mr. Dylan L. Jacobs for Appellants Arkansas Department of Education and Arkansas State Board of Education in 19-1340, 19-1342, 19-1348, Attorney Mr. Dylan L. Jacobs for Appellants Arkansas State Board of Education, Arkansas State Board of Education w/service 03/11/2019. [4765290] [19-1340, 19-1342, 19-1348, 19-1349] (DLJ) [Entered: 03/11/2019 11:13 PM]
March 7, 2019 DESIGNATION of record filed by Appellants Arkansas Department of Education and Arkansas State Board of Education in 19-1340, 19-1342, 19-1348, Appellants Arkansas State Board of Education and Arkansas State Board of Education in 19-1349. w/service 03/07/2019 [4764192] [19-1340, 19-1342, 19-1348, 19-1349] (DLJ) [Entered: 03/07/2019 05:49 PM]
March 7, 2019 STATEMENT of issues filed by Appellants Arkansas Department of Education and Arkansas State Board of Education in 19-1340, 19-1342, 19-1348, Appellants Arkansas State Board of Education and Arkansas State Board of Education in 19-1349 - w/service 03/07/2019. [4764191] [19-1340, 19-1342, 19-1348, 19-1349] (DLJ) [Entered: 03/07/2019 05:21 PM]
March 7, 2019 Certificate of transcript filed by Appellants Arkansas Department of Education and Arkansas State Board of Education in 19-1340, 19-1342, 19-1348, Appellants Arkansas State Board of Education and Arkansas State Board of Education in 19-1349. Transcript ordered[4764190] [19-1340, 19-1342, 19-1348, 19-1349] (DLJ) [Entered: 03/07/2019 05:19 PM]
March 7, 2019 METHOD of appendix preparation filed by Appellants Arkansas Department of Education and Arkansas State Board of Education in 19-1340, 19-1342, 19-1348, Appellants Arkansas State Board of Education and Arkansas State Board of Education in 19-1349 - Joint Appendix - w/service 03/07/2019 [4764189] [19-1340, 19-1342, 19-1348, 19-1349] (DLJ) [Entered: 03/07/2019 05:15 PM]
February 21, 2019 CONSOLIDATED BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Transcript due on or before 04/02/2019. Appendix due 04/12/2019. BRIEF APPELLANT, Arkansas Department of Education and Arkansas State Board of Education due 04/12/2019 Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. Appellant reply brief is due 21 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the appellee brief. [4758656] [19-1340, 19-1342, 19-1348, 19-1349] (AEV) [Entered: 02/21/2019 01:13 PM]
February 21, 2019 CLERK LETTER sent regarding new caption in case. Upon further review, Burton Burton was edited to a not party in this matter instead of an Appellant. If this is in correct, please advise the court of an error in docketing. [4758654] [19-1349] (AEV) [Entered: 02/21/2019 01:05 PM]
February 21, 2019 Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, Order 1/17/19, docket entries, [4758645] [19-1349] (AEV) [Entered: 02/21/2019 12:55 PM]
February 21, 2019 Civil case docketed. [4758635] [19-1340, 19-1342, 19-1348, 19-1349] (AEV) [Entered: 02/21/2019 12:44 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Larry Milton, et al v. Arkansas State Board of Educ., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alice L. Preston, Member, Arkansas State Board of Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Camden, AR, City of, A Public Body Corporate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Starling, Member, Arkansas State Board of Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. D. Harris, Member, Arkansas State Board of Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elaine Scott, Member, Arkansas State Board of Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harmony Grove, AR School District, The Board of Education of the, A Public Body Corporate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burton Burton, Director, Arkansas Department of Education
Represented By: Nicholas Jacob Bronni
Represented By: Ka Tina Rena Guest
Represented By: Renae Ford Hudson
Represented By: Sharon Carden Streett
Represented By: Rosalyn Lynette Middleton
Represented By: Dylan L. Jacobs
Represented By: KaTina Hodge-Guest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walter Turnbow, Member, Arkansas State Board of Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Wood, Member, Arkansas State Board of Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Clinton, Governor of the St. of AR; Individually
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Camden, AR Housing Authority, The Board of Directors of the, A Public Body Corporate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Earle Love, Member, Arkansas State Board of Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harry P. McDonald, Member, Arkansas State Board of Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Camden, AR Fairview School District, A Public Body Corporate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert L. Newton, Member, Arkansas State Board of Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Camden, AR School District No. 35, The Board of Education of the, A Public Body Corporate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Terry Alexander
Represented By: John Winfred Walker Sr.
Represented By: Shawn Garrick Childs
Represented By: Mark Burnette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Larry Milton, on behalf of Himself and Infants Shanna Milton and Shana Milton, by next friend Shanna Milton, by next friend Shana Milton
Represented By: John Winfred Walker Sr.
Represented By: Shawn Garrick Childs
Represented By: Mark Burnette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Bobbie Ray Cheeks, on Behalf of Infant Bobbie Ray, Jr., by next friend Bobbie Ray, Jr.
Represented By: John Winfred Walker Sr.
Represented By: Shawn Garrick Childs
Represented By: Mark Burnette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Willie D. Harris, Dr.; on Behalf of Himself and Infant Mark Neil, by next friend Mark Neil
Represented By: John Winfred Walker Sr.
Represented By: Shawn Garrick Childs
Represented By: Mark Burnette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Arkansas State Board of Education, The Members of the
Represented By: Nicholas Jacob Bronni
Represented By: Ka Tina Rena Guest
Represented By: Renae Ford Hudson
Represented By: Sharon Carden Streett
Represented By: Rosalyn Lynette Middleton
Represented By: Dylan L. Jacobs
Represented By: KaTina Hodge-Guest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Arkansas State Board of Education, The
Represented By: Nicholas Jacob Bronni
Represented By: Ka Tina Rena Guest
Represented By: Renae Ford Hudson
Represented By: Sharon Carden Streett
Represented By: Rosalyn Lynette Middleton
Represented By: Dylan L. Jacobs
Represented By: KaTina Hodge-Guest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lee Nayles, Dr.; on Behalf of Himself and Infant Jon Nayles, by next friend Jon Nayles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?