Layne Lindberg, et al v. James Dimon, et al
Defendant / Appellee: Attorney David C. Piper, US Bank National Association, Jay Bray, Chief Executive Officer & Chairman Nationstar Mortgage LLC, doing business as Mr. Cooper, Nationstar Mortgage, LLC, doing business as Mr. Cooper, Mr. James Dimon, Chairman and Executive Officer JP Morgan Chase Bank, National Association, Andrew Cecere, President and Director US Bank National Association and JP Morgan Chase Bank
Plaintiff / Appellant: Barbara J. Lindberg and Layne A. Lindberg
Case Number: 19-1883
Filed: April 30, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eighth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 MOTION to dismiss case, filed by Appellees James Dimon and JP Morgan Chase Bank w/service 06/27/2019. [4802785] [19-1883] (CMS) [Entered: 06/27/2019 04:40 PM]
June 11, 2019 PUBLIC DOCKET NOTE: Correcting brief(s) due date for appellees. Brief(s) of appellees due on 07/11/2019.[4796427] [19-1883] (BNW) [Entered: 06/11/2019 02:26 PM]
June 10, 2019 BRIEF FILED - APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Ms. Barbara J. Lindberg and Mr. Layne A. Lindberg. w/service 06/11/2019 by USCA8, Length: 31 pages, Copies: 5 paper copies of brief. Brief(s) of Jay Bray, Andrew Cecere, James Dimon, JP Morgan Chase Bank, Nationstar Mortgage, LLC, David C. Piper and US Bank National Association due on 07/10/2019. [4796252] [19-1883] (BNW) [Entered: 06/11/2019 11:32 AM]
May 8, 2019 APPEARANCE filed by Jeffery D. Collins for Appellees James Dimon and JP Morgan Chase Bank w/service 05/08/2019 [4785691] [19-1883] (JDC) [Entered: 05/08/2019 03:48 PM]
May 8, 2019 APPEARANCE filed by Cassidy M. Stalley for Appellees James Dimon and JP Morgan Chase Bank w/service 05/08/2019 [4785688] [19-1883] (CMS) [Entered: 05/08/2019 03:45 PM]
May 8, 2019 APPEARANCE filed by Cassidy M. Stalley for Appellee JP Morgan Chase Bank w/service 05/08/2019 [4785551] [19-1883] DOCUMENT LOCKED. COUNSEL WILL FILE CORRECTED APPEARANCE FORM.--[Edited 05/08/2019 by AMT] (CMS) [Entered: 05/08/2019 01:00 PM]
May 8, 2019 APPEARANCE filed by Jeffery D. Collins for Appellee JP Morgan Chase Bank w/service 05/08/2019 [4785423] [19-1883] DOCUMENT LOCKED. COUNSEL WILL FILE CORRECTED APPEARANCE FORM.--[Edited 05/08/2019 by AMT] (JDC) [Entered: 05/08/2019 10:10 AM]
May 2, 2019 APPEARANCE filed by Justin D. Balser for Appellees Mr. Andrew Cecere, Mr. Jay Bray, US Bank National Association and Nationstar Mortgage, LLC w/service 05/02/2019 [4783731] [19-1883] (JDB) [Entered: 05/02/2019 10:12 AM]
April 30, 2019 BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: If the original file of the U.S. District Court is available for review in electronic format, the court will rely on the electronic version of the record in its review. The appendices required by 8th Circuit Rule 30A shall not be required. In accordance with 8th Circuit Local Rule 30A (a)(2), the clerk of the United States District Court is requested to forward to this Court forthwith any portions of the original record which are not available in an electronic format or filed under seal, exhibits, administrative records and state court files. BRIEF OF APPELLANT Barbara J. Lindberg and Layne A. Lindberg due 06/10/2019. Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. Appellant reply brief is due 21 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the appellee brief. [4782993] [19-1883] (CBO) [Entered: 04/30/2019 02:54 PM]
April 30, 2019 Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal filed 4/25/2019, docket entries, order and amended order filed 3/27/2019, orders filed 3/25/2019, and report and recommendation filed 2/12/2019. [4782989] [19-1883] (CBO) [Entered: 04/30/2019 02:51 PM]
April 30, 2019 Civil case docketed. [4782974] [19-1883] (CBO) [Entered: 04/30/2019 02:37 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Eighth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Layne Lindberg, et al v. James Dimon, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Attorney David C. Piper
Represented By: David C. Piper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: US Bank National Association
Represented By: Justin Donald Balser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Jay Bray, Chief Executive Officer & Chairman Nationstar Mortgage LLC, doing business as Mr. Cooper
Represented By: Janelle G. Ewing
Represented By: Justin Donald Balser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Nationstar Mortgage, LLC, doing business as Mr. Cooper
Represented By: Justin Donald Balser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Mr. James Dimon, Chairman and Executive Officer JP Morgan Chase Bank, National Association
Represented By: Cassidy M. Stalley
Represented By: Jeffery D. Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Andrew Cecere, President and Director US Bank National Association
Represented By: Janelle G. Ewing
Represented By: Justin Donald Balser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JP Morgan Chase Bank
Represented By: Cassidy M. Stalley
Represented By: Jeffery D. Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Barbara J. Lindberg
Represented By: Barbara J. Lindberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Layne A. Lindberg
Represented By: Layne A. Lindberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?